Brown v. Phoenix, City of
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-04466
District Judge Roslyn O Silver, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 24, 2020 at 5:33 PM ST (5.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Edward Lewis Brown, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Horne Slaton PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas C Horne +1 480 483 2178 +1 480 367 0691 horne@horneslaton.com
v.
No Logo Kenneth Silvia, Defendant
No Logo Municipal Entities, Defendant
No Logo Phoenix Police Department, Defendant
No Logo Phoenix, City of, Defendant
No Logo Unknown Silvia, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/24/2020, Entered: None Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Report - Status
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 9/9/2020, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 6/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: None extension of time
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/23/2020, Entered: None USCA Mandate
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None USCA Case Number
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/2/2020, Entered: None Notice of Errata
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 2/28/2020, Entered: None Notice of Appeal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/26/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None extension of time
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 11/1/2019, Entered: None Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: None Stay
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Order to Show Cause
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-16272567 filed by Edward Lewis Brown. (Horne, Thomas) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(MCO) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SUMMONS Submitted by Edward Lewis Brown. (Horne, Thomas) (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons)(MCO) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT: (MCO) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 12/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: 1 Complaint filed by Edward Lewis Brown. Document not in compliance with LRCiv 7.1(a)(3) - Party names must be capitalized using proper upper and lower case type. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MCO) (Entered: 12/06/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?