Morrow v. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC

Federal Civil Lawsuit Pennsylvania Middle District Court, Case No. 1:15-cv-00883
District Judge Yvette Kane, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Yvette Kane
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 1:54 AM EST (6.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Jolene Morrow, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Richard B. Bateman, Jr. +1 610 566 3322 +1 610 548 9986 batemanlaw@aol.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Samuel A. Dion +1 215 546 6033 +5466 546 546 6269 samueldion@aol.com
v.
No Logo Lowe's Home Centers, LLC, Defendant

Represented by Connell Foley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED THOMAS M. BLEWITT, JR. +1 856 317 7100 +1 856 317 7117 tblewitt@connellfoley.com

Represented by Direct: 973-535-0500

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tricia B O'Reilly +1 973 757 1100 toreilly@walsh.law
Attributes
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 2611
Nature of Suit 751 - Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Timeline
  Entries (22) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without costs and without prejudice to the right of either party, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to reinstate the action if settlement is not consummated. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 11/3/15. (pw) (Entered: 11/03/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Blewitt, Thomas) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that the settlement conference scheduled for October 14, 2015, at 10:00 a.m. is CANCELED. Parties are to file a stipulation of dismissal with prejudice as soon as reasonably possible. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 10/8/2015. (ktt) (Entered: 10/08/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a settlement conference is scheduled for October 14, 2015, at 10:00 a.m., in Chambers, Room 1135, Eleventh Floor, Ronald Reagan Federal Building, Third and Walnut Streets, Harrisburg, Pennsylvania. Counsel are advised that their clients, or client representatives, with complete authority to negotiate and consummate a settlement shall be in attendance at the settlement conference. SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 10/1/2015. (ktt) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order approving 15 Stipulation. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/23/15. (pw) (Entered: 09/23/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that on or before September 21, 2015 the parties are to file a letter with the Court informing the Court whether they have achieved settlement. In the event that settlement is not achieved, IT IS ORDERED that on or before September 25, 2015 the parties are to file a letter with the Court informing the Court of proposed dates for a settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/15/2015. (ktt) (Entered: 09/15/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/10/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Proposed Discovery Confidentiality Order by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Blewitt, Thomas) (Entered: 09/10/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER - IT IS ORDERED that a conference call shall be held on September 14, 2015, at 2:00 p.m., to discuss the status of this case. Counsel for the plaintiff shall initiate the call, ensuring that all parties are on the telephone line before contacting Chambers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab on 9/9/2015. (ktt) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING CASE for Magistrate Judge Susan E. Schwab for the purpose of conducting a settlement conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Martin C. Carlson on September 9, 2015. (kjn) (Entered: 09/09/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER REFERRING case to Chief Magistrate Judge Carlson for referral of matters to U.S. Magistrate Judge. Status Conference set for 11/12/2015 at 09:15 AM before Honorable Yvette Kane.Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 9/3/15. (sc) (Entered: 09/04/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN submitted jointly by Plaintiff and Defendant by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Blewitt, Thomas) (Entered: 08/28/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SPECIAL ADMISSIONS FORM APPROVED as to Tricia B. O'Reilly, Esq. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/27/15. (pw) (Entered: 07/27/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DOCKET ANNOTATION: Petitioner and Associate Counsel bar status verified. (pjr)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
PETITION FOR SPECIAL ADMISSION (PRO HAC VICE) by Thomas M. Blewitt, Jr on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC Attorney Tricia B. O'Reilly is seeking special admission. Filing fee $ 50, receipt number 0314-3494022., filed by on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Blewitt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SCHEDULING ORDER: A Telephone Scheduling Conference is set for 9/2/2015 at 01:30 PM in Harrisburg before Honorable Yvette Kane. The Joint Case Management Plan is due on or before 8/28/15. Plaintiff's counsel shall initiate the call. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 7/21/15. (pw) (Entered: 07/21/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 1 Complaint with Affirmative Defenses, Certificate of Service by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC.(Blewitt, Thomas) (Entered: 07/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT PURSUANT TO FRCP 7.1 by Lowe's Home Centers, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Lowe's Companies, Inc. for Lowe's Home Centers, LLC. (Blewitt, Thomas) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas M. Blewitt, Jr on behalf of Lowe's Home Centers, LLC (Blewitt, Thomas) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned by Jolene Morrow. Lowe's Home Centers, LLC waiver sent on 5/20/2015, answer due 7/20/2015. (Dion, Samuel) (Entered: 05/20/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/7/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
LETTER addressed to counsel Re: Case Assignment and Procedures. Signed by Honorable Yvette Kane on 5/7/15. (sc) (Entered: 05/07/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued as to Lowe's Home Centers, LLC and provided TO ATTORNEY ELECTRONICALLY VIA ECF for service on Defendant(s)in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (NOTICE TO ATTORNEYS RECEIVING THE SUMMONS ELECTRONICALLY: You must print the summons and the attachment when you receive it in your e-mail and serve them with the complaint on all defendants in the manner prescribed by Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure). (Attachments: # 1 Summons Packet) (pjr) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against Lowe's Home Centers, LLC ( Filing fee $400, Receipt Number 0314-3429132) filed by Jolene Morrow.(pjr) (Entered: 05/06/2015)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 5 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?