City of Fall River v. Purdue Pharma L.P.
Federal Court Proceeding Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-op-46285
District Judge Dan Aaron Polster, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 15, 2019 at 5:35 PM DT (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo City of Fall River, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Joseph I. Macy

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph I. Macy +1 508 678 4556
v.
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Pierce, Atwood LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Joshua D. Dunlap +1 207 791 1100 jdunlap@pierceatwood.com
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Insys Therapeutics, Inc. Insys Therapeutics, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Jane Does 1-50, Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. O'Connor +1 617 235 4650 +1 617 235 9882 andrew.oconnor@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIEN T. O'CONNOR +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 Brien.O'Connor@ropesgray.com
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. O'Connor +1 617 235 4650 +1 617 235 9882 andrew.oconnor@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIEN T. O'CONNOR +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 Brien.O'Connor@ropesgray.com
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant
No Logo Specgx LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Ropes & Gray LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Andrew J. O'Connor +1 617 235 4650 +1 617 235 9882 andrew.oconnor@ropesgray.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED BRIEN T. O'CONNOR +1 617 951 7000 +1 617 951 7050 Brien.O'Connor@ropesgray.com
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 3/15/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Massachusetts. Case number 1:18-cv-12363. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 11/30/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Case transferred to the District of Ohio (Northern) pursuant to Conditional Transfer Order entered by the MDL Panel on November 29, 2018. Case File Electronically Transferred to the Clerk in that District on November 30, 2018. (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/30/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Certified copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 68 in MDL Case 2804 received from District of District of Ohio (Northern) requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/30/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Informational copy of MDL Conditional Transfer Order number 68 in MDL Case 2804 received from the mdl panel requesting transfer of case for consolidated pretrial proceedings. (Jones, Sherry) (Main Document 10 replaced on 11/29/2018) (Jones, Sherry). [Transferred from mad on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            STATE COURT Record. (Dunlap, Joshua) [Transferred from mad on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/27/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 4 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint ; granting 5 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond to the Complaint. (Paine, Matthew) [Transferred from mad on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/20/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew O'Connor on behalf of Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, SPECGX LLC (O'Connor, Andrew) [Transferred from mad on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, SPECGX LLC. (O'Connor, Brien) [Transferred from mad on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time [Manufacturer Defendants' Assented-To Motion for an Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond] by Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt plc, SPECGX LLC.(O'Connor, Brien) (Modified on 11/20/2018 to Correct CM/ECF Filing Event) (Paine, Matthew). [Transferred from mad on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer DISTRIBUTOR DEFENDANTS ASSENTED-TO MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.(Dunlap, Joshua) [Transferred from mad on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/19/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Jennifer C. Boal. (Finn, Mary) [Transferred from mad on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/15/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Duplicate Filing Fee and Credit for Refund, for $400.00 paid on 11/13/2018, receipt number 0101-7409688. (Tran, Henry) [Transferred from mad on 11/30/2018.]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation ( Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0101-7409931 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Process Pleadings, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Category Sheet)(Dunlap, Joshua) [Transferred from mad on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Services Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation.. (Dunlap, Joshua) [Transferred from mad on 11/30/2018.] (Entered: 11/13/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 17 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?