NorVergence, Inc. - Adversary Proceeding
Bankruptcy Case New Jersey Bankruptcy Court, Case No. 06-01749
District Judge Rosemary Gambardella, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 11:50 PM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
No Logo Crown Bank Leasing, Counter-Defendant

Represented by Forman Holt

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J. Connolly +1 201 845 1000 +1 201 655 6650

Represented by George LeRoy Moran

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY George LeRoy Moran

Represented by SILLS CUMMIS & GROSS P.C

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space George R. Hirsch +1 973 643 7000 +1 973 643 6500
No Logo De Lage Landen, 3rd Pty Defendant

Represented by Schulte Roth & Zabel LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Frank LaSalle
No Logo Marketing Designs Inc., 3rd Party Plaintiff

Represented by Hall Estill Hardwick Gable Golden & Nelson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
LEAD ATTORNEY Jeffrey M. Sherman +1 202 973 1200 +1 202 973 1212

Represented by The Kelly Firm, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Andrew J. Kelly +1 732 449 0525 +1 732 449 0592
Nature of Suit 498 - Other Action
  Entries (72) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/16/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Stipulated dismissal filed 9/12/08 (related document:1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Crown Bank Leasing, Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing) (car, )
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Adversary Case (06-1749) Closed. (iav, )
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/12/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding filed by Michael J. Connolly, Andrew J. Kelly, Frank LaSalle, Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing, De Lage Landen, Marketing Designs Inc.. (Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 09/12/2008)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/21/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Hearing Rescheduled from July 22, 2008. (related document:1 3 Notice of Status Conferencec Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 9/16/2008 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm,)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/26/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Stipulation Between Crown Bank Leasing and, re:Extending Time To Answer Counterclaim And Third-Party Complaint filed by Michael J. Connolly on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing. (Connolly, Michael) (Entered: 06/26/2008)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/3/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Hearing Rescheduled from 6/3/2008. (related document:3 Notice of Hearing - (Generic), Hearing (Document) Rescheduled) Hearing scheduled for 7/22/2008 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf, )
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/2/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Stipulation Between Crown Bank Leasing and Defendant, re:Extending Time To Answer filed by Michael J. Connolly on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing. (Connolly, Michael) (Entered: 06/02/2008)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Stipulation Between De Lage Landen and Crown Bank Leasing, Marketing Designs, Inc. and Alexandria Surveys International, re:Extending Time to Respond to Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of De Lage Landen. (Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 04/18/2008)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Hearing Rescheduled from April 23, 2008. (related document:3 Notice of Status Conference . 1 Hearing scheduled for 6/3/2008 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm,)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Hearing Rescheduled from April 1, 2008. (related document:1 RE: Status Conference RE: Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Crown Bank Leasing, Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing) Hearing scheduled for 4/23/2008 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm,)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/13/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Stipulation Between Crown Bank Leasing and, re:Extending Time To Answer Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint filed by Michael J. Connolly on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing. (Connolly, Michael) (Entered: 03/13/2008)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/29/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Hearing Rescheduled from 3/24/2008. (related document:1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Crown Bank Leasing, Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing 7 Answer to Complaint filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Marketing Designs Inc., Defendant Marketing Designs Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 4/1/2008 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/15/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Hearing Rescheduled from February 27, 2008. (related document:71 3Notice of Status Conference - (Generic))Hearing scheduled for 3/24/2008 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm,)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 2/11/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Stipulation Between Crown Bank Leasing and Defendant, re:Extending Time To Answer Counterclaims and Third-Party Complaint filed by Michael J. Connolly on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing. (Connolly, Michael) (Entered: 02/11/2008)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/7/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Hearing Rescheduled from 1/8/2008. (related document:1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Crown Bank Leasing, Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing, 3 Notice of Hearing )Hearing scheduled for 2/27/2008 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (mg, )
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 1/4/2008, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Stipulation Between Crown Bank Leasing and Defendants and Third-Party Defendant, re:Extending Time To Respond To Counterclaim And Third-Party Complaint filed by Michael J. Connolly on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing. (Connolly, Michael) (Entered: 01/04/2008)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 12/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Stipulation Between Crown Bank Leasing and, re:Extending Time To Answer filed by Michael J. Connolly on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing. (Connolly, Michael) (Entered: 12/04/2007)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/20/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Hearing Rescheduled from 11/20/07. (related document:3 Notice of Hearing - (Generic), ) Hearing scheduled for 1/8/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (jf, )
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/30/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Hearing Rescheduled from 10/30/2007. (related document:3 Notice of Hearing -(Status Conference) Hearing scheduled for 11/20/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Stipulation Between Crown Bank Leasing and Defendants and Third-Party Defendant, re:Extending Time To Respond To Counterclaims and Third-Party Complaint filed by Michael J. Connolly on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing. (Connolly, Michael) (Entered: 09/27/2007)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Letter to Court confirming rescheduled conference date (related document: 3 Notice of Hearing for: STATUS CONFERENCE) filed by Michael J. Connolly on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing. (Connolly, Michael) Modified Link on 9/14/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 09/13/2007)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/12/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Hearing Rescheduled from 9/12/2007. (related document:3 Notice of Hearing - Status Conference) Hearing scheduled for 10/30/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/28/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Answer Deadline Set/Reset/Satisfied (related document:31 Stipulation filed by Counter-Defendant Crown Bank Leasing, Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing, Set/Reset/Satisfy Deadline(s). Answer due by 9/27/2007. (iav, )
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 8/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Stipulation Between Crown Bank Leasing and Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiffs, re:Extending Time to Respond to Counterclaim and to Third-Party Complaint filed by Michael J. Connolly on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing. (Connolly, Michael) (Entered: 08/27/2007)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  BNC Certificate of Service - Order No. of Notices: 6. Service Date 08/17/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 08/18/2007)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Hearing Rescheduled from 8/14/2007. (related document:3 Notice of Hearing - (Status Conference) Hearing scheduled for 9/12/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice re: Frank LaSalle, Esq. be and hereby admitted to this Court Pro-hac-vice. . The following parties were served: Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant's Attorney,Frank LaSalle and New Jersey Lawyers' Fund (served by regular mail). Signed on 8/14/2007 (mg, ) Check number 360278 in the amount of $150.00 for pro hac vice fee (see main case # 04-32079) hand delivered to USDC on 8/22/07. Modified on 8/30/2007 (sfr, ). (Entered: 08/15/2007)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/26/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Stipulation Between Crown Bank Leasing and Defendants And Third-Party Defendants, re:Extending Time To Answer Counterclaims And Third-Party Complaint filed by Michael J. Connolly on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing. (Connolly, Michael) (Entered: 07/26/2007)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Correspondence re: Letter to Confirm Adjournment (related document:3 Notice of Hearing - (Generic), 24 Order (Generic), filed by Michael J. Connolly on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing. (lc, ) Modified Text on 7/11/2007 (lc, ). (Entered: 07/11/2007)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/9/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Hearing Rescheduled from 7/9/2007. (related document:3 Notice of Hearing - (Status Conference), 24 Second Amended Scheduling Order, filed by Counter-Defendant Crown Bank Leasing, Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing) Hearing scheduled for 8/14/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/18/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Stipulation Between De Lage Landen and Crown Bank Leasing, Marketing Designs, Inc. and Alexandria Surveys International, re:Extending Time to Respond to Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of De Lage Landen. (Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 06/18/2007)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/9/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                BNC Certificate of Service - Order No. of Notices: 6. Service Date 06/09/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 06/10/2007)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Hearing Scheduled. (related document:1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Crown Bank Leasing, Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing, 24Second Amended Scheduling Order)Hearing scheduled for 7/9/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (mg, )
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 6/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SECOND AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER (Status Conference Will Be Held on 7/9/2007 at 10:00 a.m.)(plaintiff shall answer or otherwise respond to the counterclaims on or before 6/11/2007)(third-party defendant shall answer or otherwise respond to the third-party complaint on or before 6/11/2007)((related document:1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Crown Bank Leasing, Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing).. The following parties were served: Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant's Attorney, 3rd Party Defendant. Signed on 6/1/2007 (mg, ) (Entered: 06/07/2007)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Document re: Letter to advise of Extention of Time to Answer (related document:10 Counterclaim,, Third-Party Complaint, filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Marketing Designs Inc., Defendant Marketing Designs Inc.) filed by Michael J. Connolly on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing. (lc, ) (Entered: 05/17/2007)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Hearing Rescheduled from May 23, 2007. (related document:1 31121 Status Conference: Hearing scheduled for 7/9/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (slm,)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          BNC Certificate of Service - Order No. of Notices: 5. Service Date 04/27/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 04/28/2007)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Hearing Scheduled. (related document:1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Crown Bank Leasing, Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing, 21 Order (Generic), Order (Generic))Hearing scheduled for 5/23/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (mg, )
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Amended Scheduling Order (status conference scheduled for 5/23/2007 at 10:00AM) (related document:1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Crown Bank Leasing, Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing). The following parties were served: Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant's Attorney. Signed on 4/24/2007 (mg, ) (Entered: 04/25/2007)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING Rescheduled from 4/25/2007. (related document:1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Crown Bank Leasing, Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing, 3 Notice of Hearing 11 Summons Issued) STATUS CONFERENCE HEARING RESCHEDULE FOR 5/23/2007 at 10:00 AM at Room 509, Federal Courthouse. (mg, )
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/4/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Stipulation Between De Lage Landen and Crown Bank Leasing, Marketing Designs, Inc. and Alexandria Surveys International, re:Extending Time to Respond to Counterclaim and Third-Party Complaint filed by Joseph Lubertazzi Jr. on behalf of De Lage Landen. (Lubertazzi, Joseph) (Entered: 04/04/2007)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    BNC Certificate of Service - Order No. of Notices: 5. Service Date 03/09/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/10/2007)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 3/9/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Service - Hearing. No. of Notices: 7. Service Date 03/09/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/10/2007)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 3/6/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Order Granting Motion To Consolidate Adversary Proceedings Lead Case: 06-1749 Member Cases: 06-1767 (Related Doc # 12). The following parties were served: Plaintiff 's Attorney, Defendant, Defendant 's Attorney. Signed on 3/6/2007. (car, ) Modified on 3/7/2007 (car, ). (Entered: 03/07/2007)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/5/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Granted (related document:12 Motion to Consolidate the following cases: 06-01767 filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Marketing Designs Inc., Defendant Marketing Designs Inc.) (jf, )
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 3/1/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            BNC Certificate of Service - Order No. of Notices: 5. Service Date 03/01/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 03/02/2007)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Hearing Rescheduled from 3/5/2007. (related document:3 Notice of Hearing - (STATUS CONFERENCE) Hearing scheduled for 4/25/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Scheduling Order (related document:1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Crown Bank Leasing, Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing, 12 Motion to Consolidate the following cases: 06-01767). The following parties were served: Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant, Defendant's Attorney. Signed on 2/27/2007 (car, ) (Entered: 02/27/2007)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/14/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Hearing Rescheduled from 2/14/2007. (related document:3 Notice of Hearing - (STATUS CONFERENCE) Hearing scheduled for 3/5/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/13/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Hearing Rescheduled from 2/13/2007. (related document:12 Motion to Consolidate the following cases: 06-01767 filed by 3rd Party Plaintiff Marketing Designs Inc., Defendant Marketing Designs Inc.) Hearing scheduled for 3/5/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/27/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      BNC Certificate of Service - Order No. of Notices: 5. Service Date 01/27/2007. (Admin.) (Entered: 01/28/2007)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/25/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Hearing Rescheduled from 2/14/2007. (related document:1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Crown Bank Leasing, Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing, 8 Order (Generic), Order (Generic), Hearing (Document) Scheduled) Hearing STATUS CONFERENCE scheduled for 2/14/2007 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (mg, )
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/24/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          AMENDED Scheduling Order re: Status Conference (hearing scheduled for 2/14/2007 at 11:00) (related document:1 Complaint filed by Counter-Defendant Crown Bank Leasing, Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing, 8 Order (Generic), Order (Generic)).. The following parties were served: Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant's Attorney. Signed on 1/24/2007 (mg, ) (Entered: 01/25/2007)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/17/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Motion to Consolidate the following cases: 06-01767 Filed by Marketing Designs Inc..Hearing scheduled for 2/13/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (Attachments: 1 Motion to Consolidate on Behalf of Defendants, Alexandria Surveys International and Marketing Designs, Inc.2 Proposed Order to Consolidate Adversary Proceedings) (Kelly, Andrew) (Entered: 01/17/2007)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/16/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Third Party Summons Issued to Marketings Designs Inc. for Service on De Lage Landen Answer due on 2/15/2007 Pre-Trial hearing to be held on 4/25/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (Attachments: 1 Pre Trial Instructions) (lc, ) (Entered: 01/16/2007)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/11/2007, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                Counterclaim by Andrew J. Kelly on behalf of Marketing Designs Inc. against Crown Bank Leasing, Third-Party Complaint by Andrew J. Kelly on behalf of Marketing Designs Inc. against De Lage Landen (Attachments: 1 Exhibit 12 Exhibit 23 Exhibit 34 Exhibit 45 Exhibit 56 Exhibit 67 Exhibit 78 Exhibit 89 Exhibit 910 Exhibit 1011 Exhibit 1112 Exhibit 1213 Exhibit 13) (Kelly, Andrew) (Entered: 01/11/2007)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/16/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  BNC Certificate of Service - Order No. of Notices: 4. Service Date 12/16/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 12/17/2006)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    Answer Deadline Set/Reset/Satisfied (related document:8 Scheduling Order). Answer due by 1/23/2007. (mg, )
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Hearing Scheduled. STATUS CONFERENCE(related document:8 Scheduling Order (Generic))Hearing scheduled for 2/14/2007 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (mg, )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/12/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Scheduling Order re: STATUS CONFERENCE will be held on 2/14/2007 at 11:00am. (related document:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing).. The following parties were served: Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant's Attorney. Signed on 12/12/2006 (mg, ) (Entered: 12/14/2006)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/21/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Hearing Rescheduled from 11/21/2006. (related document:3 Notice of Hearing -(STATUS CONFERENCE) Hearing scheduled for 2/14/2007 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 11/20/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            Answer to Complaint filed by Andrew J. Kelly on behalf of Marketing Designs Inc.. (Kelly, Andrew) (Entered: 11/20/2006)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/10/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              Hearing Rescheduled from 10/10/2006. (related document:3 Notice of Hearing -(Status Conference) Hearing scheduled for 11/21/2006 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                Hearing Rescheduled from 9/27/2006. (related document:3 Notice of Hearing - (STATUS CONFERENCE) Hearing scheduled for TELEPHONE CONFERENCE CALL 10/10/2006 at 10:30 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  Letter Re Responding To Counterclaims (related document:5 Application (Generic) filed by Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing) filed by George R. Hirsch on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing. (Hirsch, George) Modified TEXT on 9/26/2006 (iav, ). (Entered: 09/25/2006)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/5/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    Application for Extention of Time to Reply, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Counterclaim Filed by Crown Bank Leasing. (Hirsch, George) Modified TEXT on 9/6/2006 (iav, ). (Entered: 09/05/2006)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      Hearing Rescheduled from 6/29/2006. (related document:3 Notice of Hearing - (Status Conference) Hearing scheduled for TELEPHONE CONFERENCE 9/27/2006 at 11:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Hearing Rescheduled from 6/13/2006. (related document:3 Notice of Hearing - (Status) Hearing scheduled for 6/29/2006 at 02:00 PM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (car, )
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/17/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          BNC Certificate of Service - Order No. of Notices: 2. Service Date 05/17/2006. (Admin.) (Entered: 05/18/2006)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            Notice of Hearing for: STATUS CONFERENCE (related document:1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Crown Bank Leasing). The following parties were served: Plaintiff's Attorney, Defendant's Attorney. STATUS CONFERENCE Hearing scheduled for 6/13/2006 at 10:00 AM at RG - Courtroom 3E, Newark. (mg, ) (Entered: 05/15/2006)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              Copy of Docket Sheet from United Disctrict Court of Virginia filed by George LeRoy Moran on behalf of Crown Bank Leasing. (Attachments: 1 Copy of notice of removal2 Copy of deficient filing3 Copy of initial order4 Copy of initial scheduling order5 Copy of Adv. Cover sheet6 Copy7 Copy of Notice of Motion8 Copy of Motion9 Copy of Motion10 Copy of joint stipulation11 Copy of Response12 Copy13 Copy of order14 Copy of notice of appeal15 Copy of Statement of Issues16 Copy of Transmittal of Record17 Copy of Order18 Copy of order)(ORDER SIGNED MARCH 20TH, 2006) (iav, ) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                Adversary case 06-01749. Complaint by Crown Bank Leasing against Marketing Designs Inc.. Receipt Number No fee due, Fee Amount $ 250. Nature of Suits:. (498 (Other Action)) (iav, ) (Entered: 04/27/2006)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?