United States v. Langlois
Criminal Case Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-10352

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 12, 2021 at 6:47 PM DT (1.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/12/2021, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/8/2021, Entered: None Sentencing Memorandum
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/7/2018, Entered: None Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Order on Excludable Delay
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None order setting conditions of release
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 0 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?