Olymbec USA LLC v. CWFS Insight LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 8:18-cv-02606
District Judge George Jarrod Hazel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 8:04 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Olymbec USA LLC, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher R Mellott +1 410 244 7400 +1 410 244 7742 crmellott@venable.com
No Logo Brian Tageson, Defendant
No Logo Citigroup Commercial Mortgage Trust 2007-C6, Defendant
No Logo CWCapital Asset Management LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher R Mellott +1 410 244 7400 +1 410 244 7742 crmellott@venable.com
No Logo CWFS Insight LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher R Mellott +1 410 244 7400 +1 410 244 7742 crmellott@venable.com
No Logo CWFS-REDS LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher R Mellott +1 410 244 7400 +1 410 244 7742 crmellott@venable.com
No Logo Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher R Mellott +1 410 244 7400 +1 410 244 7742 crmellott@venable.com
No Logo Fisher Auction Co., Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LeClairRyan-VA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert P Fletcher +1 202 659 6714 +1 202 659 4130 robert.fletcher@leclairryan.com
No Logo Isaac Pesin, Defendant
No Logo John Doe, Defendant
No Logo John Doe Members of 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, Defendant
No Logo John Doe Members of Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, Defendant
No Logo John Doe Members of Lenox Park A,, LLC, Defendant
No Logo John Doe Members of Lenox Park B, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Kevin Wodicka, Defendant
No Logo Lamar P. Fisher, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by LeClairRyan-VA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert P Fletcher +1 202 659 6714 +1 202 659 4130 robert.fletcher@leclairryan.com
No Logo Larry Golinsky, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher R Mellott +1 410 244 7400 +1 410 244 7742 crmellott@venable.com
No Logo LaSalle Bank National Association, Citigroup Global Markets Realty Corp, Campmark Finance, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Lenox Park A, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Lenox Park B, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Midland Loan Services Inc, Defendant
PNC Bank, NA PNC Bank, NA, Defendant
Officially listed as "PNC Bank National Association"
No Logo Randolph Wolpert, Defendant
No Logo Robert Cherry, Defendant
No Logo Ronald Schrager, Defendant
No Logo Victor Gutierrez, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher R Mellott +1 410 244 7400 +1 410 244 7742 crmellott@venable.com
Wells Fargo Bank, NA Wells Fargo Bank, NA, Defendant
Unknown Role, NORWEST CORP
Unknown Role, Day Runner, Inc.
Unknown Role, Yucca Uranium Inc
Unknown Role, Munienhanced Fund Inc

Toggle Switch Represented by Venable LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE N Christopher R Mellott +1 410 244 7400 +1 410 244 7742 crmellott@venable.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (55) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by CWFS Insight LLC (Mellott, Christopher) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, Larry Golinsky, Victor Gutierrez, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Mellott, Christopher) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 9/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE re 49 Standing Order Concerning Removal filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, Larry Golinsky, Victor Gutierrez, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Mellott, Christopher) (Entered: 09/13/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        PAPERLESS ORDER approving 52 Stipulation, filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., CWFS-REDS LLC, Larry Golinsky, CWFS Insight LLC, Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, Victor Gutierrez, CWCapital Asset Management LLC. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 9/4/2018. (am2s, Chambers) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          STIPULATION Parties' Joint Stipulation to Request Enlargement of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, Larry Golinsky, Victor Gutierrez, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.(Mellott, Christopher) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 8/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE of Appearance by Robert P Fletcher on behalf of Lamar P. Fisher, Fisher Auction Co., Inc. (Fletcher, Robert) (Entered: 08/31/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Transfer Notification Letter (Attachments: # 1 Transfer Notification Letter to Parties)(c/m 08/24/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                Standing Order Concerning Removal. Signed by Judge George Jarrod Hazel on 8/24/2018. (c/m to parties and counsel 08/24/2018 - jf3s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Case transferred in from District of Tennessee Western; Case Number 2:18-cv-02059. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER Granting DE 7 Motion to Transfer Venue to USDC for District of Maryland and finding as moot all remaining motions signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 8/20/18. (Fowlkes, John) (Entered: 08/20/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Mellott on behalf of Larry Golinsky (Mellott, Christopher) (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Dismiss by Larry Golinsky. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Law in Support, # 2 Declaration of Larry Golinsky)(Tom, Robert) (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          NOTICE by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC of Service of Discovery Responses (Tom, Robert) (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr.: Scheduling Conference held on 3/23/2018. Both Parties present in Court. Parties updated the Court as to the status of the case. Court will deal with pending Motions & will not enter a scheduling order today. A future court date will be set should the Court determine a hearing date is needed. (Plaintiff: S. Joshua Kahane, Ryan M. Skertich)(Defense: Christopher R. Mellott, Robert F. Tom, Diane M. Comes, Robert L. Crawford - by phone) (Court Reporter Lynn Dudley.) (wrh) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Mellott on behalf of Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC (Mellott, Christopher) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 3/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher R. Mellott on behalf of Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Mellott, Christopher) (Entered: 03/22/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 3/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION to Dismiss (Defendant Wells Fargo Bank's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 12(b)(4) and 12(b)(5) by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit 1 - Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, # 3 Exhibit 2 - Corrected Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal, # 4 Exhibit 3 - Summons on Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.)(Tom, Robert) (Entered: 03/21/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 3/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    RESPONSE to Motion re 37 MOTION to Dismiss Capmark Finance Inc. proposed order submitted (Certain Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss Defendant Capmark Finance Inc.) filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Tom, Robert) (Entered: 03/20/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 3/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      RESPONSE in Opposition re 36 MOTION to Extend Deadline to Submit Proposed Joint Scheduling Order proposed order submitted (Certain Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Joint Scheduling Order and Memorandum in Support Thereof) filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Tom, Robert) (Entered: 03/19/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        MOTION to Dismiss Capmark Finance Inc. proposed order submitted by Olymbec USA LLC. (Kahane, S) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          MOTION to Extend Deadline to Submit Proposed Joint Scheduling Order proposed order submitted by Olymbec USA LLC. (Kahane, S) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 3/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting (Rule 26(f) Planning Report). (Kisber, Zachary) (Entered: 03/16/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC's Joinder in Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motions and Memorandum in Support Thereof) filed by Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC. (Tom, Robert) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 32 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions and Memorandum in Support Thereof (Removing Defendants' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendants' Motion and Meorandum in Support) filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Tom, Robert) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 3/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply to Defendants' Motions and Memorandum in Support Thereof by Olymbec USA LLC. (Kahane, S) (Entered: 03/07/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Diana M. Comes on behalf of Lamar P. Fisher, Fisher Auction Co., Inc. (Comes, Diana) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      MOTION to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(4) and 12(b)(5) by Lamar P. Fisher, Fisher Auction Co., Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(4) and 12(b)(5), # 2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss, # 3 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Crawford, Robert) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Robert L. Crawford on behalf of Lamar P. Fisher, Fisher Auction Co., Inc. (Crawford, Robert) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          NOTICE by Olymbec USA LLC re 13 MOTION to Withdraw the Federal RICO Claim and Remand Plaintiff's State Law Claims to Part II of Chancery Court of Shelby County, Tennessee proposed order submitted of Filing Proposed Third Amended Verified Complaint (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Third Amended Verified Complaint)(Kahane, S) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Stay All Filing Period and Deadlines proposed order submitted (Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC's Joinder in Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay all Filing Periods and Deadlines Pending the Adjudication of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Federal Claim Under 18 U.S.C. 1961-1968, Objection to Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand with Supporting Memorandum) filed by Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC. (Tom, Robert) Updated which motion filing is in opposition to on 3/6/2018 (cbs). (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Withdraw the Federal RICO Claim and Remand Plaintiff's State Law Claims to Part II of Chancery Court of Shelby County, Tennessee proposed order submitted (Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC's Joinder in Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Federal Claim Under 18 U.S.C. 1961-1968, Objection to Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand with Supporting Memorandum) filed by Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC. (Tom, Robert) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                RESPONSE in Opposition re 15 MOTION to Stay All Filing Period and Deadlines Pending the Adjudication of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Federal Claim Under 18 U.S.C. Sections 1961-1968, Ojbection to Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand With Supporting Memoran (Removing Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay all Filing Periods and Deadlines Pending the Adjudication of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Federal Claim under 18 U.S.C 1961-1968, Objection to Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand with Supporting Memorandum) filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Tom, Robert) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 13 MOTION to Withdraw the Federal RICO Claim and Remand Plaintiff's State Law Claims to Part II of Chancery Court of Shelby County, Tennessee proposed order submitted (Removing Defendants' Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Federal Claim Under 18 U.S.C 1961-1968, Objection to Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand with Supporting Memorandum) filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A to Response in Opposition)(Tom, Robert) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    ORDER Granting DE 22 Motion to Dismiss Defendants PNC BANK and MIDLAND LOAN SERVICES, INC. signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 2/27/18. (Fowlkes, J.) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 2/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Joint MOTION to Dismiss Defendants PNC Bank National Association and Midland Loan Services, Inc. proposed order submitted by Olymbec USA LLC. (Kahane, S) (Entered: 02/27/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        SETTING LETTER: Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2018 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 3 - Memphis, before Judge John T. Fowlkes Jr. A JOINT proposed scheduling order in WORD format should be submitted at least 4 days prior to the scheduling conference to the ECF propdocs email address, ECF_Judge_Fowlkes@tnwd.uscourts.gov. Please follow Judge Fowlkes scheduling guidelines at https://connection.tnwd.circ6.dcn. Counsel should be prepared to set case deadlines and discuss case status and all pending motions at the conference. Following the scheduling conference, the approved order will be filed by the Case Manager.(pyb) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez re 1 Notice of Removal,, Notice of Consents to Removal (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(Tom, Robert) (Entered: 02/21/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Corporate Disclosure Statement by Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Eightfold Real Estate Capital, L.P. for Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC.. (Tom, Robert) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Eightfold Lincoln Investors, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum)(Tom, Robert) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER Granting DE 10 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 2/20/18. (Fowlkes, J.) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER Granting DE 11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer signed by Judge John T. Fowlkes, Jr. on 2/20/18. (Fowlkes, J.) (Entered: 02/20/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MOTION to Stay All Filing Period and Deadlines Pending the Adjudication of Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Withdraw Federal Claim Under 18 U.S.C. Sections 1961-1968, Ojbection to Notice of Removal and Motion to Remand With Supporting Memorandum proposed order submitted by Olymbec USA LLC. (Skertich, Ryan) (Entered: 02/19/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 2/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Notice of Correction to 13 MOTION to Withdraw the Federal RICO Claim and Remand Plaintiff's State Law Claims to Part II of Chancery Court of Shelby County, Tennessee proposed order submitted to correct signature of filer. (Skertich, Ryan) (Entered: 02/19/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION to Withdraw the Federal RICO Claim and Remand Plaintiff's State Law Claims to Part II of Chancery Court of Shelby County, Tennessee proposed order submitted by Olymbec USA LLC. (Entered: 02/19/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 2/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Ryan Michael Skertich on behalf of Olymbec USA LLC (Skertich, Ryan) (Entered: 02/19/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer (Midland Loan Services, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion and Supporting Memorandum for an Extension of Time within which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Olymbec's Second Amended Complaint (proposed Order to be submitted)) by Midland Loan Services, Inc.. (Kisber, Zachary) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice proposed order submitted (Filing fee $ 150 receipt number 0651-2725356) by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Attachments: # 1 Certificates of Good Standing)(Mellott, Christopher) (Entered: 02/14/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Corporate Disclosure Statement by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC identifying Corporate Parent Citigroup Commercial Mortgage Trust 2007-C6 for 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC; Corporate Parent CW Financial Services LLC for CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC.. (Tom, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  AFFIDAVIT (Affidavit of Victor Gutierrez) by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 to Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit 2 to Affidavit, # 3 Exhibit 3 to Affidavit, # 4 Exhibit 4 to Affidavit)(Tom, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    MOTION Request to transfer venue to the U.S. District Court for the District of Maryland (proposed Order to be submitted) by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit 5 to the Memorandum, # 3 Exhibit 6 to Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit 7 to Memorandum, # 5 Exhibit 8 to Memorandum, # 6 Exhibit 9 to Memorandum, # 7 Exhibit 10 to Memorandum)(Tom, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      MOTION to Dismiss (Moving Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint) by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWCapital Asset Management LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum, # 2 Exhibit A to Memorandum, # 3 Exhibit B to Memorandum, # 4 Exhibit C to Memorandum, # 5 Exhibit D to Memorandum, # 6 Exhibit E to Memorandum, # 7 Exhibit F to Memorandum)(Tom, Robert) (Entered: 02/12/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        NOTICE OF RIGHT TO CONSENT TO THE EXERCISE OF CIVIL JURISDICTION BY A MAGISTRATE JUDGE Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c), Fed.R.Civ.P.73, and Local Rule 72.1, this Court has designated the Magistrate Judges of this District to conduct trials and otherwise dispose of any civil case that is filed in this Court. Your decision to consent, or not consent, to the referral of your case to a United States Magistrate Judge for trial and entry of a final judgment must be entirely voluntary. The judge or magistrate judge to whom the case has been assigned will not be informed of your decision unless all parties agree that the case may be referred to a magistrate judge for these specific purposes. A less than unanimous decision will not be communicated by this office to either the judge or magistrate judge. The consent form is available on the courts website at https://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/forms-and-applications.php (jae) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE TO COMPLY WITH PLAN FOR ALTERNATE DISPUTE RESOLUTION (ADR): Pursuant to Section to 2.1 of the ADR Plan, all civil cases filed on or after Sept. 1, 2014, shall be referred automatically for ADR. For compliance requirements, refer to the ADR Plan at: http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/ADRPlan.pdf (jae) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            NOTICE OF CASE TRACKING ASSIGNMENT PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 16.2: Pursuant to Local Rule 16.2, this case has been assigned to the Standard track. http://www.tnwd.uscourts.gov/pdf/content/LocalRules.pdf (jae) (Entered: 01/29/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE OF REMOVAL by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez, CWCapital Asset Management LLC from Shelby County, Tennessee Chancery Court, case number CH-17-1425-1 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0651-2711995), filed by 6625 Lenox Park Boulevard Holdings, LLC, CWFS Insight LLC, CWFS-REDS LLC, Victor Gutierrez, CWCapital Asset Management LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - State Court Pleadings)(Tom, Robert) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                                This case has been viewed 5 times.

                                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                 
                                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                                Need Password Help?