Guerrero-Sanchez v. Goodrich
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-00763
Magistrate Judge Paul Papak, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 3:45 PM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Terry Goodrich, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by nw-attorneys.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 10/30/2015 Anthony J. Estrada +1 503 399 7001 +1 503 399 0745 aestrada@nw-attorneys.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jon H. Weiner +1 503 399 7001 +1 503 399 0745 jweiner@nw-attorneys.com
No Logo Raul Guerrero-Sanchez, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 06/01/2015 Mark G. Hansen +1 503 753 9125 mark.g.hansen@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bonnie E. Allen-Sailer +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 bonnie@nwjp.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 2(a)
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 12/5/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Satisfaction re Judgment, 53, Judgment, 41 by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez. Filed by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 12/05/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    SUPPLEMENTAL JUDGMENT: Based on the Order granting Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 52, it is Ordered and Adjudged that Plaintiff is awarded attorneys' fees in the amount of $34,975.00 and costs in the amount of $1,555.96. Signed on 1/25/16 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 01/25/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 12/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 36 is Granted for the reasons provided in Plaintiff's Supporting Memorandum and Reply. (gm) (Entered: 12/29/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 12/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Notice of Change of Address. Filed by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 12/04/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Declaration of Bonnie Allen-Sailer in Support of Reply to Defendant's Objections to Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Reply to Motion, 49 .) (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Reply to Defendant's Objections to Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs 36 . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defendant's Response to Plaintiff's First Request for Production of Documents) (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 10/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service) (Estrada, Anthony) (Entered: 10/30/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Declaration of Terry Goodrich . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Objections to Bill of Costs, 45 .) (Estrada, Anthony) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Declaration of Anthony Estrada . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Objections to Bill of Costs, 45 .) (Estrada, Anthony) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Objections to Attorney Fees and Costs. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Proof of Service, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit, # 10 Exhibit, # 11 Exhibit) (Estrada, Anthony) (Entered: 10/19/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 10/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 43 as follows: Response to motion for attorney fees/costs due by 10/19/2015. Reply to response due by 11/5/2015. Order: Resetting Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 36 from 11/2/2015 to the under advisement calendar of 11/9/2015. (gm) (Entered: 10/02/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Motion for Extension of Time to File a Response/Reply to Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs 36 . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration) (Estrada, Anthony) (Entered: 09/30/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Setting Plaintiff's Motion for Award of Attorney Fees and Costs 36 on the under advisement calendar of 11/2/2015. (gm) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 9/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            JUDGMENT: Based on the accepted offer of judgment 35, it is Ordered and Adjudged that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff and against Defendant in the amount of $13,500.00 plus reasonable attorney fees and costs incurred by Plaintiff in an amount to be determined by the court. Signed on 9/22/15 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 09/22/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Declaration of D. Michael Dale in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Filed by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez. (Related document(s): Motion for Attorney Fees 36 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Resume, # 2 Exhibit Dale Hours, # 3 Exhibit Hansen Hours, # 4 Exhibit Costs) (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Declaration of Corinna Spencer-Scheurich in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Filed by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez. (Related document(s): Motion for Attorney Fees 36 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Resume, # 2 Exhibit Notice of Claims, # 3 Exhibit Spencer-Scheurich Hours, # 4 Exhibit Law Clerk Hours) (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Declaration of Bonnie Allen-Sailer in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Filed by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez. (Related document(s): Motion for Attorney Fees 36 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Resume, # 2 Exhibit Hours) (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Memorandum in Support of Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Filed by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez. (Related document(s): Motion for Attorney Fees 36 .) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Offer of Judgment, # 2 Exhibit Bill of Costs, # 3 Attachment Affidavit supporting bill of costs) (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Motion for Attorney Fees and Costs. Filed by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez. (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Accepted Offer of Judgment . Filed by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez. (Attachments: # 1 Acceptance of Offer of Judgment) (Allen-Sailer, Bonnie) (Entered: 09/21/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 8/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: As this case is reported tentatively settled, the Pretrial Conference of 12/7/2015 at 9:30AM and the 4-day Jury Trial of 12/15/2015 at 9:00AM are Stricken. The parties shall submit Final Papers on or before 9/21/2015. (gm) (Entered: 08/21/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 8/6/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER Referring Case to Mediation: In accordance with LR 16-4, this case is referred to the Court-Sponsored Mediator Panel for mediation. Parties should refer to the webpage at ord.uscourts.gov/index.php/attorneys/adr/district-adr-program for more information. Signed on 8/6/15 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 08/06/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/1/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez (Hansen, Mark) (Entered: 06/01/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                JURY TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 5/26/15 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/26/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting the parties' joint E-mail Request dated 5/7/15 for extension of time. Order Resetting the following deadlines: Discovery deadline is extended to 6/23/2015 for the limited purpose of conducting depositions. Dispositive Motions due by 8/24/2015. Order Resetting the following trial schedule: Pretrial Conference reset from 8/10/2015 at 9:30AM to 12/7/2015 at 9:30AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. 4-day Jury Trial reset from 8/18/2015 at 9:00AM to begin on 12/15/2015 at 9:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 05/26/2015)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Joint ADR Report . Filed by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez.(Hansen, Mark) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/3/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Telephone Conference re: discovery issues held 4/3/15. Order Resetting the following deadlines: Discovery deadline is extended to 5/7/2015 for the limited purpose of conducting depositions. Dispositive Motions are due by 6/1/2015. Mark Hansen present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Jon Weiner; Anthony Estrada present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: (None). (gm) (Entered: 04/03/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 3/31/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Setting a Telephone Conference re: discovery issues for 4/3/2015 at 10:00AM in Portland before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (phone number to be provided via separate email) five minutes prior to the scheduled conference time. The court will join the conference call at or shortly after the appointed time. (gm) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting in Part Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 25 as follows and as modified: Discovery is to be completed by 4/15/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 4/15/2015. Dispositive Motions are due by 5/6/2015. The Pretrial Conference of 8/10/2015 and the 4-day Jury Trial set to begin on 8/18/2015 will remain as scheduled. (gm) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/13/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment) (Estrada, Anthony) (Entered: 03/13/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/21/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              JURY TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 1/21/15 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 01/21/2015)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 22 as follows: Discovery is to be completed by 3/16/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/16/2015. Dispositive Motions are due by 4/15/2015. Order Resetting the following trial schedule: Pretrial Conference reset from 6/1/2015 at 10:00AM to 8/10/2015 at 9:30AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. 4-day Jury Trial reset from 6/9/2015 at 9:00AM to begin on 8/18/2015 at 9:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 01/20/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/16/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration in Support of Motion) (Hansen, Mark) (Entered: 01/16/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    JURY TRIAL MANAGEMENT ORDER. Signed on 9/17/14 by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (gm) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (dsg) (Entered: 09/12/2014)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Notice of Appearance of Anthony J. Estrada appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Service) (Estrada, Anthony) (Entered: 09/10/2014)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 9/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Telephonic Rule 16 Conference held 9/4/14. Order Resetting the following deadlines: Discovery is to be completed by 1/30/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 1/30/2015. Dispositive Motions are due by 2/27/2015. Pretrial Order is Waived. Order Setting the following trial schedule: Pretrial Conference set for 6/1/2015 at 10:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. 4-day Jury Trial set to begin on 6/9/2015 at 9:00AM in Portland Courtroom 10B before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. Mark Hansen present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Jon Weiner; Anthony Estrada present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: (None). (gm) (Entered: 09/19/2014)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez. (Hansen, Mark) (Entered: 08/27/2014)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: The Rule 16 Conference of 9/4/2014 at 1:30PM is changed to a Telephonic Rule 16 Conference in Chambers. The Court will initiate the call to counsel. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Rule 16 Conference set for 9/4/2014 at 1:30PM in Portland Chambers before Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer prior to the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If consents are going to be filed, it is helpful if they are filed prior to the time of the conference, particularly if a firm trial date is desired. (gm) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Answer to 13 Amended Complaint, Counterclaim Raul Guerrero-Sanchez. Filed by Terry Goodrich. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment certificate of service) (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Second Amended Complaint . Filed by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Certificate of Service). (Hansen, Mark) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion to Amended Complaint 11 . Plaintiff shall promptly file his amended complaint. (gm) (Entered: 08/08/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Proposed Second Amended Complaint) (Hansen, Mark) (Entered: 08/07/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Second Motion for Extension of Time 9 as follows: Answer deadline reset to 8/7/2014 for Defendant Terry Goodrich. Order: Counsel are again reminded to use the judge's initials 'PK' following the case number on all future pleadings. (gm) (Entered: 07/31/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Declaration) (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Amended Amended Complaint . Filed by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez against Raul Guerrero-Sanchez. (Hansen, Mark) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER issued by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak: Granting Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time 6 as follows: Answer deadline reset to 7/22/2014 for Defendant Terry Goodrich. Order: Counsel are reminded to use the judge's initials 'PK' following the case number on all future pleadings. (gm) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Complaint. Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration) (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 07/07/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Terry Goodrich waiver sent on 5/9/2014. Filed by Terry Goodrich. (Weiner, Jon) (Entered: 06/09/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      Notice of Appearance of Mark G. Hansen appearing on behalf of Raul Guerrero-Sanchez Filed by on behalf of Raul Guerrero-Sanchez (Hansen, Mark) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        Summons Issued Electronically as to Terry Goodrich. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (cib) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Paul Papak and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/4/2014. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/6/2014. Pretrial Order is due by 10/6/2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Paul Papak. (cib) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3670598 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Raul Guerrero-Sanchez against Terry Goodrich (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 05/07/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?