Cox v. Eberle Associates
Federal Civil Lawsuit Virginia Eastern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00774
District Judge John A. Gibney, Jr, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 2:17 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Francis Schaeffer Cox, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Francis Schaeffer Cox
v.
No Logo Eberle Associates, Defendant
No Logo Mike Murray, Defendant
No Logo Tammy Cali, Defendant
No Logo William D. Griffins, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (2) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MEMORANDUM ORDER that this action is CONDITIONALLY docketed; Plaintiff to submit statement as set out herein within 30 days of entry hereof, Plaintiff must submit a statement under oath or under penalty of perjury. The Court is forwarding to Plaintiff an affidavit for compliance with the above procedures. Failure to complete the affidavit in its entirety will result in summary dismissal of the action. Clerk to obtain certified copy of Plaintiffs trust fund account for 6 month period immediately preceding the initiation of this action; Plaintiff to return the Consent to Collection of Fees form within thirty (30) days of entry hereof. See Order for more details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roderick C. Young on 11/19/2018. Forms mailed to Prisoner: IFP, Consent to Collection Forms and Memorandum Order. Inmate Account Form mailed to Institution.(ccol, ) (Entered: 11/20/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    COMPLAINT for Negligence and Misrepresentation filed by Francis Schaeffer Cox against Eberle Associates, Tammy Cali, William D. Griffins, and Mike Murray. (Attachments: # 1 Letter, # 2 Envelope). (sbea, ) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF

      Statistics

      This case has been viewed 5 times.

      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
      Space
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
       
      PlainSite
      Sign Up
      Need Password Help?