United States v. Dineen
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Southern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00131
District Judge Lisa G. Wood, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 1:17 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Nicholas S. Bahnsen +1 202 616 3309 Nicholas.S.Bahnsen@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Otto Woelke Leithart +1 912 652 4422 woelke.leithart@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Frank T. Dineen, Defendant
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (4) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Frank T. Dineen waiver sent on 11/1/2018, answer due 12/31/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Waiver of Service Frank T. Dineen)(Bahnsen, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/30/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Litigants' Bill of Rights by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Appendix LR 16.7 Litigants' Bill of Rights)(Bahnsen, Nicholas) (Entered: 11/14/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Summons Issued as to Frank T. Dineen. (slt) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        COMPLAINT to Reduce Tax Assessment to Judgment against Frank T. Dineen, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(slt) (Entered: 10/31/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF

          Statistics

          This case has been viewed 6 times.

          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
          Space
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
           
          PlainSite
          Sign Up
          Need Password Help?