Lindsay v. Sterling
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kentucky Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00095
District Judge David L. Bunning, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 10:38 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Gary E. Lindsay, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Jonathan D. Duffey +1 513 684 3633 +1 513 684 3946 jonathan.duffey@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Theresa Lynn Laite +1 513 684 3641 +1 513 684 3946 theresa.laite@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Sandra Sterling, Respondent
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (11) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE; 1)Matter is dismissed w/out prejudice and remanded from the Court's docket. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 7/17/2018.(LST)cc: COR (Entered: 07/17/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER: The Show Cause hearing scheduled for 7/27/2018 is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 7/13/2018.(TJZ)cc: COR (Entered: 07/13/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of David L. Bunning for review: re 6 MOTION to Dismiss by Gary E. Lindsay (TJZ)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      MOTION to Dismiss by Gary E. Lindsay (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order, # 2 Certificate of Service)(Duffey, Jonathan) (Entered: 07/11/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        USM 285 PROCESS RETURN AND RECEIPT for Sandra Sterling served 7/2/2018. (TJZ) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ORDER; 1)Matter to come before the undersigned for a SHOW CAUSE HEARING set for 7/27/2018 at 10:30 AM in COVINGTON before Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith; 2)At the hearing, Respondent Sandra Sterling shall show cause as to why an order of this Court should not issue directing her to attend and give testimony, at such time and place as theBoard may determine, in connection with the proceeding in Case 9-CA-215817 now pending before the Board pursuant to Section 10 of the National Labor Relations Act, as amended, 29 U.S.C. ยง 160. 3) On or before July 10, 2018, the United States Marshals Service shall serve Respondent Sandra Sterling, 9952 Cobblestone Blvd., Independence, Kentucky 41051, with a copy of this Order, together with a copy of the Boards Application and its attached exhibits.4) Respondent must file an answer to the Application or written statement of any and all objections or reasons the Court should not grant the Application by no later than July 20, 2018.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 6/26/2018. (Attachments: # 1 USM 285)(LST)cc: COR, USM w/copy of Application and attachments of 1 to be served upon respondent (Attachment 1 replaced on 6/26/2018) (LST). (Entered: 06/26/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE OF DOCKET MODIFICATION TO All Counsel of Record re 1 PETITION to Enforce Subpoena Ad Testificandum; Error: incorrect filed date entered; Entry by Clerk; Correction: file date changed from 6/7/2018 to 6/6/2018; no action required by counsel. cc: COR (ECO)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ***FILE SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: 1 PETITION to Enforce Subpoena Ad Testificandum (ECO)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Conflict Check run. (ECO)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to assigned U.S. Magistrate Judge at Covington to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge is authorized to conduct all pretrial and status conferences, to hold such hearings as may be required, and to rule on nondispositive motions, except motions in limine. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be referred by the Clerk of this Court to the undersigned. The final pretrial conference and trial will also be before the undersigned, unless parties agree to a trial by a Magistrate Judge; 3) Discovery disputes shall be resolved in the following manner: (1) Parties to meet/confer in an attempt to resolve disputes; (2) If parties unable to resolve such disputes formally, they shall attempt to resolve their disagreements by telephone conference with the Magistrate Judge; 3) If parties unable to resolve their disputes after conference with the Magistrate Judge, they may file appropriate written motions with the Court, which shall include the certification required. Signed by Judge David L. Bunning on 1/13/2011.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 06/07/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    PETITION to Enforce Subpoena Ad Testificandum (Application for Order Requiring Obedience to Subpoena Ad Testificandum) filed by Gary E. Lindsay. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Proposed Order, # 3 Supplemental Certificate of Service, # 4 Civil Cover Sheet, # 5 Exhibit A-NLRB Charge, # 6 Exhibit B- Supboena, # 7 Exhibit C-Cover Ltr for Supboena, # 8 Exhibit D-5/4/18 Ltr to Sterling)(ECO) Modified to change filed from 6/7/2018 to 6/6/2018 on 6/7/2018 (ECO). (Entered: 06/07/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 18 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?