Hamilton v. Cox
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:16-cv-01263
District Judge David S. Doty, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 7:08 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Bryce Carroll Davis, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Bryce Carroll Davis

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Bryce Carroll Davis +1 651 216 8551
No Logo John Arnold Michelson, Jr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by John Arnold Michelson, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Arnold Michelson, Jr.
No Logo Joseph Homme, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Joseph Homme

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Joseph Homme +1 612 533 2112
No Logo Mr. Chete Gore, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Chete Gore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Chete Gore +1 612 532 1933
No Logo Mr. Colin Michael Barrett, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Colin Michael Barrett

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Colin Michael Barrett +1 651 329 9578
No Logo Mr. Stanley Guy Walton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Stanley Guy Walton

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Stanley Guy Walton +1 612 533 2112
No Logo Paul Edward Hamilton, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Paul Edward Hamilton +1 612 597 2768 paulham2@yahoo.com
v.
No Logo American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cummins & Cummins, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan D Cummins +1 612 465 0108 +1 612 465 0109 brendan@cummins-law.com
No Logo Jane Nygarrd, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cummins & Cummins, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan D Cummins +1 612 465 0108 +1 612 465 0109 brendan@cummins-law.com
No Logo Jeffrrey David Cox, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cummins & Cummins, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan D Cummins +1 612 465 0108 +1 612 465 0109 brendan@cummins-law.com
No Logo Lonnie Brackett, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Cummins & Cummins, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brendan D Cummins +1 612 465 0108 +1 612 465 0109 brendan@cummins-law.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TEXT ONLY ENTRY - Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 8/11/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty is hereby stricken from the Court's calendar. (CLB) cc: Pre Se Plaintiffs. Modified text on 7/13/2016 (JDF). (Entered: 07/12/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 7/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    TEXT ONLY ENTRY - Pursuant to the NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Paul Edward Hamilton, this action is dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(I). (CLB) cc: Pro Se plaintiffs. Modified text on 7/13/2016 (JDF). (Entered: 07/12/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Paul Edward Hamilton (AKL) Document QC'd on 8/5/2016 (SAE). (Entered: 07/11/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, Lonnie Brackett, Jeffrrey David Cox re 18 Declaration in Support, 17 Affidavit in Support of Motion, 16 Memorandum in Support of Motion, (Cummins, Brendan) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Declaration of Lonnie Brackett in Support of 13 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, Lonnie Brackett, Jeffrrey David Cox. (Cummins, Brendan) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            AFFIDAVIT of Bradley Turflinger in SUPPORT OF 13 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, Lonnie Brackett, Jeffrrey David Cox. (Cummins, Brendan) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MEMORANDUM in Support re 13 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General filed by American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, Lonnie Brackett, Jeffrrey David Cox. (Attachments: # 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate)(Cummins, Brendan) (Entered: 06/23/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, Lonnie Brackett, Jeffrrey David Cox re 13 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General, 14 Amended Notice of Hearing on Motion (Cummins, Brendan) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  AMENDED NOTICE of Hearing on Motion: 13 Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Cummins, Brendan) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/14/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Amended MOTION to Dismiss/General by American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, Lonnie Brackett, Jeffrrey David Cox. (Cummins, Brendan) (Entered: 06/14/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      LETTER REFERRING Litigant to FBA Pro Se Project from Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. (cc: Hamilton) (AKL) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to John Arnold Michelson, Jr (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Envelope)(AKL) (Entered: 06/06/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Clerk's Notice of APPLICATION FOR PRO SE LITIGANT TO FILE ELECTRONICALLY. Paul Edward Hamilton is GRANTED e-filing privileges in this case. Pursuant to F.R.Cv.P. Rule 5 and 7(d), Paul Edward Hamilton has consented to electronic service and has agreed to waive service by other means for all subsequent filings in this case, except when electronic service is not allowed under the rules. (JGK) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, Lonnie Brackett, Jeffrrey David Cox, Jane Nygarrd. Filed by Bryce Carroll Davis, Colin Michael Barrett, Joseph Homme, Stanley Guy Walton, Chete Gore, Paul Edward Hamilton, John Arnold Michelson, Jr. No summons requested. (AKL) DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 6/9/16. (kt) (Entered: 06/01/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE OF DOCKETING CORRECTION for 1 Complaint: Exhibits rescanned to include missing pages. (kt)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, Lonnie Brackett, Jeffrrey David Cox re 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General, 7 Notice of Hearing on Motion (Cummins, Brendan) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION 6 MOTION to Dismiss/General : Motion Hearing set for 8/11/2016 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14W (MPLS) before Senior Judge David S. Doty. (Cummins, Brendan) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION to Dismiss/General by American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, Lonnie Brackett, Jeffrrey David Cox. (Cummins, Brendan) (Entered: 05/25/2016)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/20/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER Regarding Dispositive Motion Procedure. Signed by Senior Judge David S. Doty on 5/20/2016. (CLB) cc: All plaintiffs. Modified text on 5/23/2016 (JDF). (Entered: 05/20/2016)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Brendan D Cummins on behalf of Defendants. (Cummins, Brendan) Modified text on 5/20/2016 (JDF). (Entered: 05/19/2016)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, Lonnie Brackett, Jeffrrey David Cox, Jane Nygarrd. Filed by Bryce Carroll Davis, Colin Michael Barrett, Joseph Homme, Stanley Guy Walton, Chete Gore, Paul Edward Hamilton, John Arnold Michelson, Jr. No summons requested. (AKL) DOCUMENTS QC'd by KT on 5/19/16. (kt) (Entered: 05/17/2016)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Summons Issued Conventionally as to American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, Lonnie Brackett, Jefferrey David Cox, Jane Nygarrd. (AKL) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            COMPLAINT against American Federation of Government Employees, AFL-CIO, Lonnie Brackett, Jefferrey David Cox, Jane Nygarrd. (Filing fee $400 receipt number 4088659) Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per Master List and referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Filed by Bryce Carroll Davis, Colin Michael Barrett, Joseph Homme, Stanley Guy Walton, Chete Gore, Paul Edward Hamilton, John Arnold Michelson, Jr. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s), # 2 Civil Cover Sheet) (AKL) (cc: Plaintiffs) Modified on 5/13/2016 (AKL). (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/31/2016: # 3 Rescanned Exhibit(s)) (kt). DOCUMENT QC'd by KT on 5/31/16. (kt) (Entered: 05/13/2016)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                              Statistics

                                              This case has been viewed 10 times.

                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                              Space
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                               
                                              PlainSite
                                              Sign Up
                                              Need Password Help?