Mohamed v. Ess-A-Bagel Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-08726
District Judge Lewis A. Kaplan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 2:16 AM ST (2.4 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Alfonso Velazquez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kraselnik & Lee, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C.K. Lee +1 212 465 1188 +1 212 465 1181 cklee@leelitigation.com
No Logo Jamaluddin Ahmed, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kraselnik & Lee, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C.K. Lee +1 212 465 1188 +1 212 465 1181 cklee@leelitigation.com
No Logo Jose M. Arellano Mendez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kraselnik & Lee, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C.K. Lee +1 212 465 1188 +1 212 465 1181 cklee@leelitigation.com
No Logo Jose Rivera, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kraselnik & Lee, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C.K. Lee +1 212 465 1188 +1 212 465 1181 cklee@leelitigation.com
No Logo Mahmoud Mohamed, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kraselnik & Lee, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C.K. Lee +1 212 465 1188 +1 212 465 1181 cklee@leelitigation.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Anne Seelig +1 212 465 1124 +1 212 465 1181 anne@leelitigation.com
No Logo Vicente Velazquez C., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Kraselnik & Lee, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED C.K. Lee +1 212 465 1188 +1 212 465 1181 cklee@leelitigation.com
v.
No Logo Aaron Wenzelburg, Defendant
No Logo David Wilpon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Sklaire Grindlinger +1 212 905 2305 +1 212 692 0940 ggrindlinger@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Ess-A-Bagel 1 Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Sklaire Grindlinger +1 212 905 2305 +1 212 692 0940 ggrindlinger@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Ess-A-Bagel Inc, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Sklaire Grindlinger +1 212 905 2305 +1 212 692 0940 ggrindlinger@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Estate of Florence Wilpon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Sklaire Grindlinger +1 212 905 2305 +1 212 692 0940 ggrindlinger@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Florence Wilpon, Defendant
No Logo Gene Wilpon, Defendant
No Logo Melanie Frost, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Sklaire Grindlinger +1 212 905 2305 +1 212 692 0940 ggrindlinger@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Michael Wenzelberg, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Sklaire Grindlinger +1 212 905 2305 +1 212 692 0940 ggrindlinger@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com
No Logo Muriel Frost, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fox Rothschild LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Glenn Sklaire Grindlinger +1 212 905 2305 +1 212 692 0940 ggrindlinger@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James M. Lemonedes +1 212 788 0881 +1 212 788 0940 jlemonedes@foxrothschild.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Carolyn Diane Richmond +1 212 878 7983 +1 212 692 0940 crichmond@foxrothschild.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (84) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 11/17/15 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 12/9/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 11/17/2015 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Khristine Sellin, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/2/2016. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/12/2016. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2016.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 12/09/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Terminate Transcript Deadlines (kl)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 11/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER GRANTING IN PART AND DENYING IN PART (1) PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR CERTIFICATION OF THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, FINAL APPROVAL OF THE CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT, AND APPROVAL OF THE FLSA SETTLEMENT; (2) PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF CLASS REPRESENTATIVE SERVICE AWARDS AND RELEASE PAYMENTS; (3) PLAINTIFFS' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF ATTORNEYS' FEES AND REIMBURSEMENT OF EXPENSES granting in part and denying in part 58 Motion for Settlement; granting in part and denying in part 61 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting in part and denying in part 63 Motion to Approve. Pursuant to 29 ยง U.S.C. 216(b), the Court approves the FLSA Settlement as modified on the record on Nov. 17, 2015, and certifies the collective class under the FLSA. Pursuant to Rule 23(e), this Court hereby grants the Motion for Final Approval to the Agreement as modified and finally approves the settlement as set forth therein and on the record. The Court finds that the settlement is fair, reasonable and adequate in all respects and that it is binding on Class Members who did not timely opt out pursuant to the procedures set forth in the Preliminary Approval Order. The Court finds that the proposed settlement as modified is procedural fair because it was reached through vigorous, arm's-length negotiations and after experienced counsel had evaluated the merits of Plaintiffs claims through factual and legal investigation. The settlement as modified is also substantively fair. The Court hereby grants Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees to the extent that it awards Class Counsel to $165,000, which the Court finds to be fair and reasonable based on: (A) the number of hours worked by Class Counsel during the Litigation; (B) the results achieved on behalf of the Class; (C) the contingent nature of Class Counsel's representation; (D) the complexity of the issues raised by the Litigation; (E) a lodestar cross check; and (F) Class Counsel's professional performance. The Court also awards Class Counsel reimbursement of their litigation expenses in the amount of $3,199.23 which expenses the Court finds were necessarily and reasonably incurred by Class Counsel in prosecuting the Litigation. In recognition of the service they rendered on behalf of the class, the Court approves and finds reasonable Primary Service Awards of $1,000 for each the Class Representatives Tarfaia, Perez, Bravo, Arroyo, Vidal, Rivera, and (vii) Mohamed and the Secondary Service Awards of $2,000 to each of Tarfaia, Perez, Bravo and Rivera. The Primary Service Awards as set forth in the settlement agreement. The Court approves and finds reasonable Primary Release Payments of $1,000 to each of plaintiffs Rivera and Mohammed and a Secondary Release payment to plaintiff Tarfaia of $2,000. The Clerk shall terminate DI 58, 61 and 63 and close the case. (As further set forth in this Order) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 11/18/2015) (kl) (Entered: 11/18/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Oral Argument held on 11/17/2015 re: 63 MOTION to Approve Service Awards and Release Payments . filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera, 58 MOTION for Settlement final approval of class settlement. filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera, 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees . filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Court Reporter Khris Sellin) (Mohan, Andrew)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 11/5/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          AFFIDAVIT of Adel Tarfaia in Support re: 63 MOTION to Approve Service Awards and Release Payments .. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed. (Bernstein, Jonathan) (Entered: 11/05/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            DECLARATION of Ani Shirinian of CPT Group, Inc. in Support re: 58 MOTION for Settlement final approval of class settlement.. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              DECLARATION of Jose Rivera in Support re: 63 MOTION to Approve Service Awards and Release Payments .. Document filed by Jose Rivera. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                DECLARATION of Mahmoud Mohamed in Support re: 63 MOTION to Approve Service Awards and Release Payments .. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  DECLARATION of Jonathan A. Bernstein in Support re: 63 MOTION to Approve Service Awards and Release Payments ., 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1-2 (Redacted))(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    DECLARATION of C.K. Lee in Support re: 63 MOTION to Approve Service Awards and Release Payments ., 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees .. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Redacted))(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 63 MOTION to Approve Service Awards and Release Payments . . Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Approve Service Awards and Release Payments . Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera.(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 61 MOTION for Attorney Fees . . Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            MOTION for Attorney Fees . Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera.(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              DECLARATION of C.K. Lee in Support re: 58 MOTION for Settlement final approval of class settlement.. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 58 MOTION for Settlement final approval of class settlement. . Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 11/2/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION for Settlement final approval of class settlement. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order))(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/02/2015)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    REQUEST FOR EXCLUSION FROM CLASS . Document filed by Alfonso Velazquez.(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      REQUEST FOR EXCLUSION FROM CLASS . Document filed by Jamaluddin Ahmed.(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        REQUEST FOR EXCLUSION FROM CLASS . Document filed by Jose M. Arellano Mendez.(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 10/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          REQUEST FOR EXCLUSION FROM CLASS . Document filed by Vicente Velazquez C..(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 10/15/2015)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 39 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. ENDORSEMENT: The Clerk shall terminate this motion which was resolved by DI 52. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 9/17/2015) (kl) (Entered: 09/17/2015)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER GRANTING PROVISIONAL CERTIFICATION OF THE SETTLEMENT CLASS, APPOINTMENT OF PLAINTIFFS' COUNSEL AS CLASS COUNSEL, AND APPROVAL OF PLAINTIFFS' PROPOSED NOTICES OF SETTLEMENT: The Court provisionally certifies a class of all hourly, non-managerial, non-exempt and non-administrative employees (other than Raul Camacho, who has filed and settled a separate lawsuit), employed at the Ess-A-Bagel stores located at (1) 831 Third Avenue, New York, NY, and (2) 359 First Avenue, New York, NY, where such individuals work or have worked between December 9, 2007 and the November 30, 2014 for purposes of settling those class members' claims under the New York Labor Law. Plaintiffs appear to meet all the requirements for class certification under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(a) and (b)(3). The Court appoints Lee Litigations Group, PLLC ("LLG") and Levy Davis & Maher, LLP ("LDM") (together, "Plaintiffs' Counsel") as Class Counsel becuase they appear to meet all of the requirements of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 23(g). The Court hereby adopts the following settlement procedure: a. Within 30 days of the date of this Order, the Claims Administrator shall mail the Notices to Class Members; b. Class Members will have 30 days from the date the Notice is mailed to opt out of the settlement or object to it; c. Plaintiffs will file a Motion for final Approval of Settlement no later than 15 days before the fairness hearing; d. The Court will hold a final fairness hearing on Nov. 17th, 2015 at 4:00 p.m. at the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York, Courtroom 21-B; e. If the Court grants Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the Settlement, the Court will issue a Final Order and Judgment. If no party appeals the Court's Final Order and Judgment, the "Effective Date" of the settlement will be the date 30 days after entry of such Order; f. If rehearing, reconsideration or appellate review is sought, the "Effective Date" shall be the day after all appeals are resolved in favor of final approval; g. The Claims Administrator will disburse settlement checks to the Class Members, Class Counsel's attorneys' fees and expenses to Class Counsel, the Service Awards, and the Claims Administrator's fee as provided in the Parties' Settlement Agreement; and h. The parties shall abide by all terms of the Settlement Agreement. (As further set forth in this Order.) ( Fairness Hearing set for 11/17/2015 at 04:00 PM in Courtroom 21B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan.) (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 8/4/2015) (mro) Modified on 8/12/2015 (mro). (Entered: 08/05/2015)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/29/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from C.K. Lee dated July 29, 2015 re: enclosing revised documents. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1 (Settlement Agreement with Amendment), # 3 Exhibit 2 (Class Notice), # 4 Exhibit 3 (Collective Notice))(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 07/29/2015)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/24/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Minute Entry Telephone Conference held on 7/24/2015 with counsel and law clerk. (Mohan, Andrew)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from C.K. Lee dated July 22, 2015 re: enclosing proposed Order including Exhibits. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit 1, # 3 Exhibit 2, # 4 Exhibit 3)(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 07/22/2015)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from C.K. Lee dated July 15, 2015 re: enclosing revised proposed order, class notice and collective notice. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Order, # 2 Exhibit Class Notice, # 3 Exhibit Collective Notice)(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 07/15/2015)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Status Conference held on 6/23/2015. (Court Reporter Steve Greenblum) (Mohan, Andrew)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 5/12/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER: In light of these changes, the parties shall submit to the Court (i) revised forms of notice as to the class and collective action members and (ii) a proposed order regarding approval of such notices and the schedule for the parties' final motion to approve the settlement. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 5/12/2015) (ama) (Entered: 05/12/2015)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from C.K. Lee dated 4/30/2015 re: Status of the Class Settlement Agreement. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera.(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 04/30/2015)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Telephone Conference held on 4/22/2015. (Court Reporter Michael McDaniels) (Mohan, Andrew)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/14/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from C.K. Lee dated April 14, 2015 re: enclosing revised Settlement Agreement and revised Collective and Class Notices. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Revised Settlement Agreement, # 2 Exhibit Revised Class Notice, # 3 Exhibit Revised Collective Notice)(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 04/14/2015)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER. The Court denies the pending motions, docket items 16 and 39 in the Mohamed action, as moot without prejudice to the filing of revised motions in due course, and as further set forth. Denying as Moot 39 Motion for Settlement; Denying as Moot 16 Motion to Certify Class. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 3/30/2015) (rjm) (Entered: 03/31/2015)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a CONFERENCE proceeding held on 3/12/2015 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days...(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 3/30/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: CONFERENCE held on 3/12/2015 before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Samuel Mauro, (212) 805-0300. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/23/2015. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/4/2015. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/2/2015.(McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 03/30/2015)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        DECLARATION of Jonathan A. Bernstein in Support re: 39 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement.. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          DECLARATION of C.K. Lee in Support re: 39 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement.. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 39 MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. . Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/15/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              MOTION for Settlement Preliminary Approval of Class Settlement. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A (Proposed Order))(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/15/2015)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lewis A. Kaplan: Status Conference held on 1/8/2015. (Court Reporter Pat Kaneshiro-Miller) (Mohan, Andrew)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from C.K. Lee dated 12/31/2014 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera.(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 12/31/2014)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE, CONSENT, AND REFERENCE OF A DISPOSITIVE MOTION TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE. ENDORSEMENT: Denied. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/9/2014) (lmb) (Entered: 12/10/2014)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER: Pursuant to today's conference, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties in these two cases are to submit documentation of their finalized settlement agreement to the court by no later than December 31, 2014. If the parties have not reached mutually agreed upon settlement terms by that date, they are to submit in lieu of settlement documents a joint statement clarifying the status of the cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 12/05/2014) Copies Sent By Chambers. (ama) (Entered: 12/08/2014)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that a conference has been scheduled in the above-captioned actions for FRIDAY, DECEMBER 5, 2014, at 12:00 P.M., at which time you are directed to appear in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007-1312. Any requests for adjournment of this scheduled conference must be in writing, with copies to all other parties, and must be preceded by reasonable efforts by the requesting party to obtain the consent of those parties. ( Status Conference set for 12/5/2014 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 12/3/2014) Copies Sent By Chambers. (mro) (Entered: 12/04/2014)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (33 in 1:13-cv-08726-LAK-MHD) Letter filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. In the event that counsel have not completed the drafting process by Dec. 1, 2014, we will schedule a conference to address all open issues in the case. Copies Faxed by Chambers. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 11/19/2014) (ama) Modified on 11/19/2014 (ama). (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from C.K. Lee dated 11/19/2014 re: Joint Status Letter. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera.(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/19/2014)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (31 in 1:13-cv-08726-LAK-MHD) Letter filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. Accordingly, the parties request that all discovery in these two actions continue to be stayed and for the parties to provide a status report to the Court by November 19, 2014. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 11/04/2014) Copies Faxed By Chambers. (ama) (Entered: 11/04/2014)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from C.K. Lee dated 11/3/14 re: Status Letter. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera.(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 11/03/2014)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: (29 in 1:13-cv-08726-LAK-MHD) Letter filed by Ess-A-Bagel Inc, Ess-A-Bagel Inc, Melanie Frost, Michael Wenzelberg, David Wilpon, Muriel Frost, Estate of Florence Wilpon. ENDORSEMENT: Application Granted. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 9/17/2014) (ama) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger from James M. Lemonedes dated September 17, 2014 re: Status Update. Document filed by Ess-A-Bagel 1 Inc, Ess-A-Bagel Inc, Melanie Frost, Muriel Frost, Michael Wenzelberg, David Wilpon, Estate of Florence Wilpon.(Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 09/17/2014)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      ANSWER to 24 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Ess-A-Bagel 1 Inc, Ess-A-Bagel Inc, Melanie Frost, Muriel Frost, Michael Wenzelberg, David Wilpon, Estate of Florence Wilpon.(Grindlinger, Glenn) (Entered: 08/13/2014)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the undersigned, the attorneys of record for the parties to the above-entitled action, that Plaintiffs may amend the First Amended Complaint in the form annexed, on consent of all parties. The caption of this action shall be amended accordingly. Defendants reserve all rights, including the right to dispute the factual allegations raised in the amended pleading and to assert all affirmative defenses thereto. So ordered (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 7/28/2014) (kgo) Modified on 7/28/2014 (kgo). (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the Parties in the above captioned action, acting by means of their respective counsel, that Defendants agree to accept service of the Second Amended Complaint. So Ordered (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 7/28/2014) (kgo) Modified on 7/28/2014 (kgo). (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: 24 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera.(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 07/28/2014)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT AMENDED COMPLAINT. Notice to Attorney C.K. Lee RE: Document No. 24 Amended Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Filing Does Not Comply with FRCP Rule 15 (a)(1)(A)(B)(2). File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event category Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (mqu)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 7 Amended Complaint, against Ess-A-Bagel 1 Inc, Ess-A-Bagel Inc, Melanie Frost, Muriel Frost, Michael Wenzelberg, David Wilpon, Estate of Florence Wilpon with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. Related document: 7 Amended Complaint, filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Stipulation to Amend, # 2 Stipulation to Accept Service)(Lee, C.K.) Modified on 7/28/2014 (mqu). Modified on 7/30/2014 (cde). (Entered: 07/25/2014)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER: Pursuant to today's conference, we hereby establish the following schedule: 1. Initial disclosures are to be served by no later than JULY 2, 2014. 2. Plaintiffs are to file any motions to amend the complaints by no later than JULY 25, 2014. 3. Defendants are to produce the payroll records for all individual plaintiffs and a representative sample of payroll documents for the class plaintiffs by no later than JULY 31, 2014. 4. The parties are to provide the court with a report as to the status of mediation efforts by SEPTEMBER 17, 2014. 5. Efforts to mediate these cases are to be completed by SEPTEMBER 29, 2014. (Motions due by 7/25/2014.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 6/25/2014) Copies Sent By Chambers. (kgo) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/3/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    DECLARATION of Jose Rivera in Support re: 16 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Jose Rivera. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 06/03/2014)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: 20 Letter, filed by Ess-A-Bagel 1 Inc, Ess-A-Bagel Inc, Aaron Wenzelburg, Melanie Frost, Michael Wenzelberg, Muriel Frost. ENDORSEMENT: The court will set a schedule for briefing of any and all certification motions at our June 25, 2014 conference. Any such motions in these cases are to be filed prior to the conference. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 5/28/2014) Copies Faxed By Chambers. (kgo) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        LETTER addressed to Judge Lewis A. Kaplan from James Lemonedes dated May 28, 2014 re: Plaintiffs' Motion for Conditional Certification. Document filed by Ess-A-Bagel 1 Inc, Ess-A-Bagel Inc, Melanie Frost, Muriel Frost, Michael Wenzelberg, Aaron Wenzelburg.(Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 05/28/2014)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: 16 MOTION to Certify Class . . Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1, # 2 Exhibit 2, # 3 Exhibit 3, # 4 Exhibit 4, # 5 Exhibit 5)(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 05/23/2014)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            DECLARATION of Marielisa Araque in Support re: 16 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              DECLARATION of Mahmoud Mohamed in Support re: 16 MOTION to Certify Class .. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                MOTION to Certify Class . Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 05/22/2014)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/20/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  ORDER: Initial Conference set for 6/25/2014 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 5/20/2014) Copies Sent By Chambers. (kgo) (Entered: 05/20/2014)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Jose Rivera.(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 05/12/2014)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James M. Lemonedes on behalf of Ess-A-Bagel 1 Inc, Ess-A-Bagel Inc, Melanie Frost, Muriel Frost, Michael Wenzelberg, David Wilpon. (Lemonedes, James) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Carolyn Diane Richmond on behalf of Ess-A-Bagel 1 Inc, Ess-A-Bagel Inc, Melanie Frost, Muriel Frost, Michael Wenzelberg, David Wilpon. (Richmond, Carolyn) (Entered: 04/28/2014)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          ANSWER to 7 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Ess-A-Bagel 1 Inc, Ess-A-Bagel Inc, Melanie Frost, Muriel Frost, Michael Wenzelberg, David Wilpon.(Grindlinger, Glenn) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/25/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ess-A-Bagel 1 Inc, Ess-A-Bagel Inc.(Grindlinger, Glenn) (Entered: 04/25/2014)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/2/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              STIPULATION EXTENDING DEFENDANTS' TIME TO ANSWER: Ess-A-Bagel 1 Inc answer due 4/25/2014; Ess-A-Bagel Inc answer due 4/25/2014; Melanie Frost answer due 4/25/2014; Muriel Frost answer due 4/25/2014; Michael Wenzelberg answer due 4/25/2014; David Wilpon answer due 4/25/2014. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger on 4/2/2014) (ajs) (Entered: 04/02/2014)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                EXHIBIT TO PLEADING re: 7 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera.(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 03/27/2014)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT AMENDED COMPLAINT. Notice to Attorney C.K. Lee RE: Document No. 7 Amended Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Filing Does Not Comply with FRCP Rule 15 (a)(1)(A)(B)(2). File the Exhibit to Pleading event found under the event category Other Documents and attach either opposing party's written consent or Court's leave. (cde)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    AMENDED COMPLAINT amending 1 Complaint against Ess-A-Bagel 1 Inc, Ess-A-Bagel Inc, Muriel Frost, Melanie Frost, Michael Wenzelberg, David Wilpon with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed, Jose Rivera. Related document: 1 Complaint filed by Mahmoud Mohamed. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons)(Lee, C.K.) Modified on 3/27/2014 (cde). Modified on 3/28/2014 (laq). (Entered: 03/26/2014)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Florence Wilpon served on 2/24/2014, answer due 3/17/2014. Service was accepted by Britney (last name unknown). Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/24/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Aaron Wenzelburg served on 2/24/2014, answer due 3/17/2014. Service was accepted by Britney (last name unknown). Service was made by Mail. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed. (Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 02/24/2014)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT TO SUE UNDER THE F.L.S.A.. Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed.(Lee, C.K.) (Entered: 01/23/2014)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement) and Dispositive Motion (i.e., motion requiring a Report and Recommendation). Referred to Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger. (Signed by Judge Lewis A. Kaplan on 12/12/2013) (lmb) (Entered: 12/12/2013)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              STANDING ORDER IN RE PILOT PROJECT REGARDING CASE MANAGEMENT TECHNIQUES FOR COMPLEX CIVIL CASES IN THE SOUTHERN DISTRICT OF NEW YORK (See M-10-468 Order filed November 1, 2011). This case is hereby designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project Regarding Case Management Techniques for Complex Civil Cases in the Southern District of New York (the Pilot Project), unless the judge to whom this case is assigned determines otherwise. This case is designated for inclusion in the Pilot Project because it is a class action, an MDL action, or is in one of the following Nature of Suit categories: 160, 245, 315, 355, 365, 385, 410, 830, 840, 850, 893, or 950. The presiding judge in a case that does not otherwise qualify for inclusion in the Pilot Project may nevertheless designate the case for inclusion in the Pilot Project by issuing an order directing that the case be included in the Pilot Project. The description of the Pilot Project, including procedures to be followed, is attached to this Order. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/31/2011) (jd) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                Case Designated ECF. (jd)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Michael H. Dolinger is so designated. (jd)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ess-A-Bagel 1 Inc, Ess-A-Bagel Inc, Aaron Wenzelburg, Florence Wilpon, Gene Wilpon. (jd)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/9/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      COMPLAINT against Ess-A-Bagel 1 Inc, Ess-A-Bagel Inc, Aaron Wenzelburg, Florence Wilpon, Gene Wilpon. (Filing Fee $ 350.00, Receipt Number 465401083069)Document filed by Mahmoud Mohamed.(jd) (Entered: 12/10/2013)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?