Eno v. Southwood Norwell Nursing Home
Federal Civil Lawsuit Massachusetts District Court, Case No. 1:13-cv-10885
Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 3:37 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cassandra Antoine, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Christopher J. Trombetta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J. Trombetta +1 508 339 5900 +1 508 339 3111 chris@trombettalaw.com
No Logo Christine Rowan, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Christopher J. Trombetta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J. Trombetta +1 508 339 5900 +1 508 339 3111 chris@trombettalaw.com
No Logo Diana Ruidiaz, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Christopher J. Trombetta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J. Trombetta +1 508 339 5900 +1 508 339 3111 chris@trombettalaw.com
No Logo Evena Joseph, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Christopher J. Trombetta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J. Trombetta +1 508 339 5900 +1 508 339 3111 chris@trombettalaw.com
No Logo Jillian Eno, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Christopher J. Trombetta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J. Trombetta +1 508 339 5900 +1 508 339 3111 chris@trombettalaw.com
No Logo Linda Holland, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Christopher J. Trombetta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J. Trombetta +1 508 339 5900 +1 508 339 3111 chris@trombettalaw.com
No Logo Maggy Laurent, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Office of Christopher J. Trombetta

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J. Trombetta +1 508 339 5900 +1 508 339 3111 chris@trombettalaw.com
v.
No Logo Lindsey Starr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Posternak Blankstein & Lund LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/02/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/02/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/02/2014 Joseph W. Corrigan +1 617 973 6151 +1 617 722 4967 jcorrigan@pbl.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Kruzer +1 617 973 6100 +1 617 367 2315 jkruzer@pbl.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam L. Littman +1 617 973 6175 alittman@pbl.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Valerie C. Samuels +1 617 973 6248 +1 617 367 2315 vsamuels@pbl.com
No Logo Richard Starr, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Posternak Blankstein & Lund LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/02/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/02/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/02/2014 Joseph W. Corrigan +1 617 973 6151 +1 617 722 4967 jcorrigan@pbl.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Kruzer +1 617 973 6100 +1 617 367 2315 jkruzer@pbl.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam L. Littman +1 617 973 6175 alittman@pbl.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Valerie C. Samuels +1 617 973 6248 +1 617 367 2315 vsamuels@pbl.com
No Logo Southwood Norwell Nursing Home, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Posternak Blankstein & Lund LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/02/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/02/2014, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 04/02/2014 Joseph W. Corrigan +1 617 973 6151 +1 617 722 4967 jcorrigan@pbl.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James E. Kruzer +1 617 973 6100 +1 617 367 2315 jkruzer@pbl.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Adam L. Littman +1 617 973 6175 alittman@pbl.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Valerie C. Samuels +1 617 973 6248 +1 617 367 2315 vsamuels@pbl.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ORDER entered. 30-DAY SETTLEMENT ORDER OF DISMISSAL & CLOSING ORDER. (Montes, Mariliz) (Entered: 12/05/2014)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 12/1/2014. Counsel appear with a signed settlement agreement and request the court to approve the settlement. The court reviews the agreement and approves the settlement. A 30 day settlement order of dismissal will enter and the case will be closed. (Court Reporter: Rachel Lopez., raeufp@gmail.com.) (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 12/02/2014)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. The Initial Pretrial Conference has been reset for 12/1/2014 03:30 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 10/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. The Status conference set for 10/28/14 has been canceled. The 12/1/14 status conference will be reset as the initial pretrial conference. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 10/07/2014)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 9/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. An Initial Pretrial Conference has been set for 10/16/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 09/30/2014)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/22/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered: In light of the status reports filed by counsel regarding the status of discovery, see 41 and 43, the defendants' 33 Motion to Compel is DENIED as moot. (Matteson, Nicholas) (Entered: 08/22/2014)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 8/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              STATUS REPORT by Cassandra Antoine, Jillian Eno, Linda Holland, Evena Joseph, Maggy Laurent, Christine Rowan, Diana Ruidiaz. (Trombetta, Christopher) (Entered: 08/21/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 8/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. Plaintiff shall file a response within seven days. re 41 Status Report filed by Lindsey Starr, Richard Starr, Southwood Norwell Nursing Home (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 08/06/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 8/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  STATUS REPORT Concerning Defendants' Motion to Compel by Southwood Norwell Nursing Home, Lindsey Starr, Richard Starr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kruzer, James) (Entered: 08/01/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 7/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. By Close of business Friday 8/1/14; The Defendant shall notify the court if they seek a ruling on this motion otherwise this motion will be denied as moot in light of the representation that it was responded. If Plaintiff responds by Friday, Defendant may simply file a request to revive its motion to compel. re 33 MOTION to Compel Supplementation and Responses to Discovery filed by Lindsey Starr, Richard Starr, Southwood Norwell Nursing Home, Set Deadlines as to 33 MOTION to Compel Supplementation and Responses to Discovery.( Responses due by 8/1/2014)(Simeone, Maria) Modified on 7/30/2014 (Simeone, Maria). (Entered: 07/30/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 38 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 33 MOTION to Compel Supplementation and Responses to Discovery Responses due by 7/25/2014 (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/25/2014 to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION to Compel Supplementation and Responses to Discovery by Cassandra Antoine, Jillian Eno, Linda Holland, Evena Joseph, Maggy Laurent, Christine Rowan, Diana Ruidiaz.(Trombetta, Christopher) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 36 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 33 MOTION to Compel Supplementation and Responses to Discovery Responses due by 7/21/2014 (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 7/17/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/21/2014 to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION to Compel Supplementation and Responses to Discovery by Cassandra Antoine, Jillian Eno, Linda Holland, Evena Joseph, Maggy Laurent, Christine Rowan, Diana Ruidiaz.(Trombetta, Christopher) (Entered: 07/17/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              District Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered; Allowed. re 34 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re 33 MOTION to Compel Supplementation and Responses to Discovery Responses due by 7/17/2014 (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 07/10/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 7/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to 07/17/2014 to File Response/Reply as to 33 MOTION to Compel Supplementation and Responses to Discovery by Cassandra Antoine, Jillian Eno, Linda Holland, Evena Joseph, Maggy Laurent, Christine Rowan, Diana Ruidiaz.(Trombetta, Christopher) (Entered: 07/09/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/26/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  MOTION to Compel Supplementation and Responses to Discovery by Southwood Norwell Nursing Home, Lindsey Starr, Richard Starr. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G)(Littman, Adam) (Entered: 06/26/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Hearing. A Status Conference has been set for 12/1/2014 03:00 PM in Courtroom 13 before District Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria) Modified on 6/13/2014 (Simeone, Maria). (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/13/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered ; ALLOWED. The Court anticipates completing discovery on the revised schedule. The Court will hold a status conference on December 1, 2014 at 3:00 p.m. in Courtroom #13.re 30 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Discovery to be completed by 11/21/2014 (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 06/13/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 6/12/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to 11/21/2014 to Complete Discovery by Defendants and by Cassandra Antoine, Jillian Eno, Linda Holland, Evena Joseph, Maggy Laurent, Christine Rowan, Diana Ruidiaz.(Trombetta, Christopher) (Entered: 06/12/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by James E. Kruzer on behalf of Southwood Norwell Nursing Home, Lindsey Starr, Richard Starr (Kruzer, James) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Joseph W. Corrigan (Corrigan, Joseph) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              NOTICE of Withdrawal of Appearance by Joseph W. Corrigan (Corrigan, Joseph) (Entered: 04/01/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                NOTICE of Change of Address or Firm Name by Christopher J. Trombetta (Trombetta, Christopher) (Entered: 03/07/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: Scheduling Conference held on 1/31/2014; Counsel state the status of the case; The Court sets a schedule; S/J Motions due by 9/15/2014; Oppositions to Summary judgment/cross motions for s/j due 10/15/14; oppositions to cross motions due 21 days after 11/5/14; sur-reply due within 10 days 11/15/14; A Status Conference has been set for 8/1/2014 02:00 PM in Courtroom 24 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Court Reporter: Digital Recording - For transcripts or CDs contact Deborah Scalfani by email at deborah_scalfani@mad.uscourts.gov.) (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 02/03/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    NOTICE of Scheduling Conference; A Scheduling Conference has been set for 1/31/2014 02:15 PM in Courtroom 24 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE Canceling Hearing. Scheduling conference cancelled entered in error (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        NOTICE of Scheduling Conference; A Scheduling Conference has been set for 1/31/2014 02:15 PM in Courtroom 24 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 20 Motion for Protective Order (Simeone, Maria) (Entered: 01/09/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Southwood Norwell Nursing Home, Lindsey Starr, Richard Starr.(Corrigan, Joseph) (Entered: 01/08/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              CERTIFICATION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 (D)(3). (Corrigan, Joseph) (Entered: 10/24/2013)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The Court hereby ADOPTS the proposed schedule contained in 17 Joint statement of counsel. Discovery to be completed by 7/31/2014. Status Conference set for 8/1/2014 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 24 before Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. Further deadlines and a schedule for dispositive motions, if necessary, will be set at the status conference. (Robinson, Amy) (Entered: 10/17/2013)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/30/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  JOINT STATEMENT of counsel . (Corrigan, Joseph) (Entered: 09/30/2013)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered. The parties shall file a joint status report within ten days. (Status Report due by 9/30/2013) (Robinson, Amy) (Entered: 09/18/2013)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Reassignment. Ch. Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin added. Judge William G. Young no longer assigned to case. (Folan, Karen) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/12/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        CONSENT by all parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Cassandra Antoine, Jillian Eno, Linda Holland, Evena Joseph, Maggy Laurent, Christine Rowan, Diana Ruidiaz, Southwood Norwell Nursing Home, Lindsey Starr, Richard Starr.. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/11/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          ELECTRONIC Clerk's Notes for proceedings held before Judge William G. Young: Scheduling Conference held on 9/11/2013. The parties consent to proceed before the magistrate judge. Consent form executed. No deadlines set. (Court Reporter: No Court Reporter Used.) (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 09/12/2013)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            Judge William G. Young: ORDER entered. re 11 JOINT STATEMENT is so ordered as modified as the case management scheduling order. DISCOVERY DUE July 31, 2014 and DISPOSITIVE MOTIONS DUE June 30, 2014. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 09/10/2013)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/4/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              JOINT SUBMISSION pursuant to Local Rule 16.1 by Cassandra Antoine, Jillian Eno, Linda Holland, Evena Joseph, Maggy Laurent, Christine Rowan, Diana Ruidiaz.(Trombetta, Christopher) (Entered: 09/04/2013)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 7/25/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                NOTICE of Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/11/2013 02:00 PM in Courtroom 18 before Judge William G. Young. (Gaudet, Jennifer) (Entered: 07/25/2013)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/24/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Southwood Norwell Nursing Home. (Corrigan, Joseph) (Entered: 07/24/2013)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/18/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph W. Corrigan on behalf of Southwood Norwell Nursing Home, Lindsey Starr, Richard Starr (Corrigan, Joseph) (Entered: 07/18/2013)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/17/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Defendants' ANSWER to 4 Amended Complaint, Affirmative Defenses and Jury Demand by Southwood Norwell Nursing Home, Lindsey Starr, Richard Starr.(Samuels, Valerie) (Entered: 07/17/2013)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/1/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        Judge William G. Young: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting 5 Assented to MOTION to Amend Complaint (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 07/01/2013)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/28/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Assented to MOTION to Amend Complaint by Cassandra Antoine, Jillian Eno, Linda Holland, Evena Joseph, Maggy Laurent, Christine Rowan, Diana Ruidiaz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Trombetta, Christopher) (Entered: 06/28/2013)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/14/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Cassandra Antoine, Jillian Eno, Linda Holland, Evena Joseph, Maggy Laurent, Christine Rowan, Diana Ruidiaz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I)(Trombetta, Christopher) (Entered: 06/14/2013)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Summons Issued as to Southwood Norwell Nursing Home, Lindsey Starr, Richard Starr. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should download this summons, complete one for each defendant and serve it in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4 and LR 4.1. Summons will be mailed to plaintiff(s) not receiving notice electronically for completion of service. (Paine, Matthew) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/15/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge William G. Young assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Chief Magistrate Judge Leo T. Sorokin. (Rynne, Michelle) (Entered: 04/15/2013)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/13/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT against All Defendants Filing fee: $ 350, receipt number 0101-4410366 (Fee Status: Filing Fee paid), filed by cassandra antoine, jillian eno, linda holland, evena joseph, maggy laurent, christine rowan, diana ruidiaz. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Civil Cover Sheet, # 11 Civil Cover Sheet)(Trombetta, Christopher) (Entered: 04/13/2013)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 21 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?