National Labor Relations Board v. Statham
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:17-cv-03219
District Judge Ellen L. Hollander, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 1:22 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Labor Relations Board, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Sean Robert Marshall +1 410 962 2785 +1 410 962 2198 sean.marshall@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 05/15/2018 Stacey C McClurkin +1 410 962 2200 +1 410 962 2198 stacey.mcclurkin@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Jasper Statham, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
AFFIDAVIT of Service served on Jasper Statham on 2/7/18, filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Proof Of Service)(McClurkin, Stacey) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion to Withdraw Application served on Jasper Statham on 2/5/2018, filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Proof of Shipping)(McClurkin, Stacey) (Entered: 02/09/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      CORRECTED ORDER granting 15 MOTION to Withdraw Application for Subpoena Enforcement. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/1/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER granting 15 MOTION to Withdraw Application for Subpoena Enforcement. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 2/1/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 02/02/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 2/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION to Withdraw Application for Subpoena Enforcement by National Labor Relations Board(McClurkin, Stacey) (Entered: 02/01/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MARGINAL ORDER approving 13 MOTION for Other Relief Reschedule Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/26/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION for Other Relief Reschedule Oral Argument by National Labor Relations Board(McClurkin, Stacey) (Entered: 01/26/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order Approving Motion to Postpone Oral Argument served on Jasper Statham on 1/24/18, filed by National Labor Relations Board.(McClurkin, Stacey) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 1/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  AFFIDAVIT of Service for Motion to Postpone Oral Argument served on Jasper Statham on 1/23/18, filed by National Labor Relations Board.(McClurkin, Stacey) (Entered: 01/25/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    MARGINAL ORDER Approving 9 MOTION for Other Relief Postpone Oral Argument. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/22/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Other Relief Postpone Oral Argument by National Labor Relations Board(McClurkin, Stacey) (Entered: 01/22/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AFFIDAVIT of Service for Notice to Show Cause served on Jasper Statham on January 4, 2018, filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 Proof of Shipping, # 2 Exhibit 2 Proof of Service)(McClurkin, Stacey) (Entered: 01/09/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Labor Relations Board (McClurkin, Stacey) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 1/3/2018. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              NOTICE by National Labor Relations Board (McClurkin, Stacey) (Entered: 01/03/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Show Cause Hearing set for 1/4/2018 12:00 PM in Courtroom 5B, 101 West Lombard Street, Baltimore, Maryland 21201, before Judge Ellen L. Hollander.. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 11/15/2017. (kw2s, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 11/16/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  AFFIDAVIT of Service for Copy of Application for Subpoena Enforcement and Supporting Documents served on Jasper Statham on November 9, 2017, filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Exhibits on Proof of Delivery)(McClurkin, Stacey) (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey C McClurkin on behalf of National Labor Relations Board (McClurkin, Stacey) (Entered: 11/08/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      APPLICATION FOR ORDER REQUIRING COMPLIANCE WITH ADMINISTRATIVE SUBPOENA DUCES TECUM against Jasper Statham, filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Application, # 3 Proposed Order, # 4 Exhibit 1)# 5 Proposed Show Cause Order) (kw2s, Deputy Clerk). (Entered: 11/02/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?