Nina Flecha v. Medicredit, Incorporated
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Fifth Circuit, Case No. 18-50551

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 6, 2019 at 12:27 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Paper copies of Appellee Brief filed by Appellee Ms. Nina Flecha in 18-50551 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [18-50551] (KGL) [Entered: 11/27/2018 09:14 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504733267 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Medicredit, Incorporated and by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland. # of Copies Provided: 0 Reply Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 12/03/2018 for Appellants Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Medicredit, Incorporated. [18-50551] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S REPLY BRIEF FILED by Medicredit, Incorporated. Date of service: 11/21/2018 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Dickenson, Kumpf, Monaghan, Sparks, Stahl, Williford; Attorney for Appellees: Wood, Zimmer [18-50551] (Maura Kathleen Monaghan ) [Entered: 11/21/2018 08:28 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504719066 Filed: 11/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Appellee Ms. Nina Flecha [8915970-2] Date of service: 11/09/2018 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Dickenson, Kumpf, Monaghan, Sparks, Stahl, Williford; Attorney for Appellee: Zimmer; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Wood [18-50551] (Robert Zimmer ) [Entered: 11/09/2018 04:42 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504715546 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        SUFFICIENT APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED # of Copies Provided: 0 Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 11/19/2018 for Appellee Nina Flecha. [18-50551] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires name and address of counsel on the cover. Additionally the Brief requires signature on certificate of interested persons, at conclusion of the brief, on certificate of service and on certificate of compliance. Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT.. # of Copies Provided: 0. E/Res's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 11/23/2018 for Appellee Nina Flecha.. Reply Brief due on 11/21/2018 for Appellants Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Medicredit, Incorporated [18-50551] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLEE'S BRIEF FILED by Ms. Nina Flecha. Date of service: 11/07/2018 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Dickenson, Kumpf, Monaghan, Sparks, Stahl, Williford; Attorney for Appellee: Zimmer; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Wood [18-50551] (Robert Zimmer ) [Entered: 11/07/2018 08:47 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Paper copies of Appellant Brief filed by Appellants Medicredit, Incorporated and Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland in 18-50551 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 7. Paper Copies of Brief due deadline satisfied. [18-50551] (SBS) [Entered: 10/22/2018 08:30 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Paper copies of Record Excerpts filed by Appellant Medicredit, Incorporated in 18-50551 received. Paper copies match electronic version of document? Yes # of Copies Provided: 4. Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due deadline satisfied. [18-50551] (SBS) [Entered: 10/16/2018 03:54 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504678891 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              PROPOSED SUFFICIENT BRIEF filed by Appellants Medicredit, Incorporated and Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland [8893046-2] Date of service: 10/11/2018 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Dickenson, Kumpf, Monaghan, Sparks, Stahl, Williford; Attorney for Appellee: Zimmer; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Wood [18-50551] (Maura Kathleen Monaghan ) [Entered: 10/11/2018 08:01 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504674575 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                RECORD EXCERPTS FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0 Paper Copies of Record Excerpts due on 10/16/2018 for Appellants Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Medicredit, Incorporated. [18-50551] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: RECORD EXCERPTS FILED by Appellant Medicredit, Incorporated. Date of service: 10/09/2018 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Dickenson, Kumpf, Monaghan, Sparks, Stahl, Williford; Attorney for Appellee: Zimmer; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Wood [18-50551] (Maura Kathleen Monaghan ) [Entered: 10/09/2018 05:20 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504674572 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SUFFICIENT APPELLANTS' BRIEF FILED. # of Copies Provided: 0. Sufficient Brief deadline satisfied. Paper Copies of Brief due on 10/22/2018 for Appellants Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Medicredit, Incorporated. [18-50551] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Medicredit, Incorporated. Brief NOT Sufficient as it requires a cover w/ Case No. & Caption. Additionally the Brief requires the proper court name of the district court (Austin) is not included on the cover page; the certificate of compliance is out of order (must come after the certificate of service). Instructions to Attorney: PLEASE READ THE ATTACHED NOTICE FOR INSTRUCTIONS ON HOW TO REMEDY THE DEFAULT. # of Copies Provided: 0 A/Pet's Brief deadline satisfied. Sufficient Brief due on 10/23/2018 for Appellants Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Medicredit, Incorporated.. Appellee's Brief due on 11/08/2018 for Appellee Nina Flecha [18-50551] REVIEWED AND/OR EDITED - The original text prior to review appeared as follows: APPELLANT'S BRIEF FILED by Medicredit, Incorporated. Date of service: 10/09/2018 via email - Attorney for Appellants: Dickenson, Kumpf, Monaghan, Sparks, Stahl, Williford; Attorney for Appellee: Zimmer; US mail - Attorney for Appellee: Wood [18-50551] (Maura Kathleen Monaghan ) [Entered: 10/09/2018 05:18 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 504623102 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED A/Pet's Brief Due on 10/09/2018 for Appellants Fidelity and Deposit Company of Maryland and Medicredit, Incorporated. [18-50551] (MRB) [Entered: 08/30/2018 12:15 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 6 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?