American Resources Insurance Company, Inc. v. Purdue Pharma L.P.
Federal Court Proceeding Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-op-45910
District Judge Dan Aaron Polster, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 19, 2019 at 5:59 PM DT (2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo American Resources Insurance Company, Inc, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Daniell, Upton, Perry & Morris

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David Anthony Busby +1 251 625 0046 +1 251 625 0464
v.
No Logo Abbott Laboratories, Defendant
Abbott Laboratories, Inc. Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo ACTAVIS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Actavis Pharma, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Defendant
Allergan PLC Allergan PLC, Defendant
No Logo Alvogen, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Chad A. Landmon (Unknown Firm)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Craig M. Reiser +1 212 728 2218 +1 212 728 2201 creiser@axinn.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John M. Tanski +1 860 275 8175 +1 860 275 8101 jtanski@axinn.com
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Watkins & Eager, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David L Brown, Jr. +1 205 586 6262 dbrown@watkinseager.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY H. Lanier Brown, II +1 205 598 2199
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY J Patrick Strubel +1 205 937 6755 pstrubel@watkinseager.com
No Logo AMNEAL PHARMACEUTICALS LLC, Defendant
No Logo Amneal Pharmaceuticals Of New York, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Aurolife Pharma LLC, Defendant
Cardinal Health, Inc. Cardinal Health, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Cephalon, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Acusphere, Inc.
No Logo Endo Health Solutions Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Maynard Cooper & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED F. Grey Redditt, Jr. +1 334 432 9772
No Logo Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Maynard Cooper & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED F. Grey Redditt, Jr. +1 334 432 9772
No Logo Impax Generics, Defendant
No Logo Impax Laboratories Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Johnson & Johnson, Defendant
No Logo Kvk-tech, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Baker, Sterchi, Cowden & Rice, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Suzanne E Billam +1 816 471 2121 +1 816 472 0288 sbillam@bscr-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas E. Rice, Jr. +1 816 471 2121 +1 816 472 0288 rice@bscr-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Thomas E. Rice, Jr. +1 816 471 2121 +1 816 472 0288 rice@bscr-law.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McDowell Knight Roedder & Sledge, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Frederick George Helmsing, Jr. +1 251 431 8818 +1 251 432 5303 fhelmsing@mcdowellknight.com
No Logo Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals Inc. Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals Inc., Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC Mallinckrodt LLC, Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC Mallinckrodt PLC, Defendant
McKesson Corporation McKesson Corporation, Defendant
No Logo MYLAN PHARMACEUTICALS INC., Defendant
Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. Ortho-mcneil-janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Par Pharmaceutical Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Maynard Cooper & Gale, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED F. Grey Redditt, Jr. +1 334 432 9772
No Logo Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Frazer, Greene, Upchurch & Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blair Graffeo Mattei +1 251 431 6020 +1 251 431 6030
PURDUE PHARMA, INC. PURDUE PHARMA, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Frazer, Greene, Upchurch & Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blair Graffeo Mattei +1 251 431 6020 +1 251 431 6030
Purdue Pharma LP Purdue Pharma LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Frazer, Greene, Upchurch & Baker

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Blair Graffeo Mattei +1 251 431 6020 +1 251 431 6030
No Logo Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P., Defendant
No Logo Specgx LLC, Defendant
No Logo Sun Pharmaceutical Industries Inc., Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Tris Pharma, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Carr, Allison, Pugh, Howard, Oliver & Sisson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Caroline Thomason Pryor +1 251 626 9340 +6268 626 626 8928 cpryor@carrallison.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Carr, Allison, Pugh, Oliver & Sisson, P.C.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas L. Oliver, II +1 205 822 2006
No Logo Ucb, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Goldman Ismail Tomaselli Brennan & Baum LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Shayna Susanne Cook +1 312 681 6000 +1 312 881 5191 scook@goldmanismail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Hughes Hubbard & Reed LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, (Inactive) William Joseph Beausoleil, JR., +1 212 837 6000 +1 212 299 6643 beausole@hugheshubbard.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Diane E. Lifton +1 212 649 4700 +1 212 333 5980 lifton@Hugheshubbard.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Law in Motion: Downs, LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Helen Kathryn Downs +1 205 492 8290 +1 205 297 2201
No Logo Watson Laboratories, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Defendant
Unknown Role, Andrx Corp
No Logo West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by WHITE ARNOLD & DOWD PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Hansel Eli Lightner, II +1 205 323 1888 +1 205 323 8907 elightner@whitearnolddowd.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Thomas E. Walker +1 205 879 9954 twalker@whitearnolddowd.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (85) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Rice, Thomas) (Entered: 11/12/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Corporate Disclosure Statement identifying Corporate Parent Alvogen Pharma U.S. Inc. for Alvogen Inc. filed by Alvogen Inc.. (Tanski, John) (Entered: 10/15/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Attorney Appearance by John M. Tanski filed by on behalf of Alvogen Inc. (B,R) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 3/13/2019, Entered: None Amended Complaint
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Attorney Appearance by Craig M. Reiser filed on behalf of Alvogen Inc.. (B,R) (Entered: 10/10/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 8/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Attorney Appearance by Diane E. Lifton filed on behalf of UCB Inc. (P,R) (Entered: 08/14/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Alabama Southern. Case number 1:18-cv-00145. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 08/02/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Conditional Transfer Order (MDL) from Northern District of Ohio requesting transfer of action. Entire case file sent to requesting District electronically. Case Closed. (Attachments: # 1 Order Lifting Stay) (tgw) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Order. The Court construes the Notices of Voluntary Dismissal (docs. 70, 71), additionally, as motions to lift the stay as to Defendant Aurolife Pharma LLC and Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. Accordingly, the stay is lifted for purposes of Plaintiff's voluntary dismissals. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), no orders will be entered. See Matthews v. Gaither, 902 F. 2d 877, 880 (11th Cir. 1990). Additionally the stay is REINSTATED upon dismissal of these Defendants. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 7/26/2018. (khc) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc. (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc. (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 07/26/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Order: The Court construes Doc. 68 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal as, additionally, a motion to lift the stay as to Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. It is ORDERED that the stay is accordingly lifted for purposes of Doc. 68, Plaintiff's Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Per Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i), no order will be entered. See Matthews v. Gaither, 902 F. 2d 877, 880 (11th Cir. 1990). Additionally the stay is REINSTATED upon dismissal of Defendant Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 07/19/2018. (nah) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 07/19/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          REFERRAL OF 68 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal to Judge DuBose. (nah) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 7/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc. (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 07/10/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/26/2018, answer due 5/17/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Actavis, LLC served on 4/26/2018, answer due 5/17/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Caroline Thomason Pryor on behalf of Tris Pharma, Inc. (Pryor, Caroline) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas L. Oliver, II on behalf of Tris Pharma, Inc. (Oliver, Thomas) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 4/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      NOTICE of Appearance by F. Grey Redditt, Jr on behalf of Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. (Redditt, F.) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/24/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        NOTICE of Appearance by Hansel Eli Lightner, II on behalf of West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Lightner, Hansel) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas E. Walker on behalf of West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. (Walker, Thomas) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ENDORSED ORDER granting 58 Defendants' unopposed Motion to Stay (filed with consent of Plaintiff). Signed by Chief Judge Kristi K. DuBose on 4/20/18. (gcp) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              MOTIONS REFERRED: 58 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Consented-To Motion to Stay and REFERRAL OF 59 Memorandum in Support to Judge DuBose. (nah) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Memorandum in Support re 58 MOTION to Stay Defendants' Consented-To Motion to Stay filed by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Mattei, Blair) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/19/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  MOTION to Stay Defendants' Consented-To Motion to Stay by Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.. (Mattei, Blair) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/19/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    ENDORSED ORDER granting 53 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Thomas E. Rice. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/18/18. (lto) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ENDORSED ORDER granting 44 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Suzanne E. Billam. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/18/18. (lto) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ENDORSED ORDER granting 42 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by William J. Beausoleil. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/18/18. (lto) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/18/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTIONS REFERRED: 44 MOTION for Suzanne E. Billam to Appear Pro Hac Vice and 53 MOTION for Thomas E. Rice, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            MOTIONS REFERRED: 42 MOTION for William J. Beausoleil to Appear Pro Hac Vice and 54 Notice of Filing Exhibits to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by UCB, Inc. re: 42 MOTION for William J. Beausoleil to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2211173, Online Credit Card Payment.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1) (Downs, Helen) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                MOTION for Thomas E. Rice, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2211598, Online Credit Card Payment.) by KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Application for Admission, # 2 Exhibit B - Certificate of Good Standing) (Rice, Thomas) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ENDORSED ORDER granting 43 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Shayna S. Cook. Signed by Magistrate Judge P. Bradley Murray on 4/17/18. (lto) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. West-Ward Pharmaceuticals Corp. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Purdue Pharma L.P. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. McKesson Corporation served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Aurolife Pharma LLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Abbott Laboratories served on 4/3/2018, answer due 4/24/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  MOTION for Suzanne E. Billam to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2211497, Online Credit Card Payment.) by KVK-Tech, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice, # 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing) (Billam, Suzanne) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/17/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    MOTIONS REFERRED: 43 MOTION for Shayna S. Cook to Appear Pro Hac Vice Referred to Judge P. Bradley Murray. (nah) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.]
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      MOTION for Shayna S. Cook to Appear Pro Hac Vice by UCB, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B) (Downs, Helen) Modified on 4/17/2018 (cmj) (Filing Fee $50, Receipt No. 18460300390) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        MOTION for William J. Beausoleil to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 50, Receipt number 1128-2211173, Online Credit Card Payment.) by UCB, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Downs, Helen) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 4/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE of Appearance by Helen Kathryn Downs on behalf of UCB, Inc. (Downs, Helen) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/16/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            NOTICE of Appearance by Frederick George Helmsing, Jr on behalf of KVK-Tech, Inc. (Helmsing, Frederick) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 4/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Allergan PLC served on 4/9/2018, answer due 4/30/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/12/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Purdue Pharma, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. KVK-Tech, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Impax Generics served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 4/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/10/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              NOTICE of Appearance by David L. Brown, Jr on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                NOTICE of Appearance by John Patrick Strubel on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Strubel, John) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by H. Lanier Brown, II on behalf of Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation (Brown, H.) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Qualitest Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Mylan Pharmaceuticals Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/09/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Watson Laboratories, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Tris Pharma, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Sun Pharmaceutical Industries, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Specgx LLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Mallinckrodt PLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Mallinckrodt LLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Johnson & Johnson served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Impax Laboratories, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Cephalon, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Cardinal Health, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Actavis South Atlantic LLC served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Abbott Laboratories, Inc. served on 4/2/2018, answer due 4/23/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/05/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. UCB, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                              SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Par Pharmaceutical, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Lupin Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Alvogen Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/04/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. Actavis Pharma, Inc. served on 3/30/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 (Busby, David) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 04/03/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Summons Issued as to All Defendants. Note to Counsel: The Summons have been issued. Please print copies necessary for service. (nah) [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 03/28/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number 1128-2201657, Online Credit Card Payment), filed by American Resources Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Summons, # 2 Summons, # 3 Summons, # 4 Summons, # 5 Summons, # 6 Summons, # 7 Summons, # 8 Summons, # 9 Summons, # 10 Summons, # 11 Summons, # 12 Summons, # 13 Summons, # 14 Summons, # 15 Summons, # 16 Summons, # 17 Summons, # 18 Summons, # 19 Summons, # 20 Summons, # 21 Summons, # 22 Summons, # 23 Summons, # 24 Summons, # 25 Summons, # 26 Summons, # 27 Summons, # 28 Summons, # 29 Summons, # 30 Summons, # 31 Summons, # 32 Summons, # 33 Summons, # 34 Summons, # 35 Summons, # 36 Summons, # 37 Summons, # 38 Summons, # 39 Summons, # 40 Summons, # 41 Summons, # 42 Summons) (Busby, David) (Additional attachment(s) added on 3/28/2018: # 43 Civil Cover Sheet) (nah). [Transferred from alsd on 8/2/2018.] (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                            Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                            This case has been viewed 24 times.

                                                                                                                                                                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                            Space
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                             
                                                                                                                                                                            PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                            Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                            Need Password Help?