Courser v. Radisson Hotels International, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Michigan Western District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01232
District Judge Gordon J. Quist, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 30, 2021 at 11:31 AM DT (1.6 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Todd Courser, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by DePerno Law Office PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Matthew S. DePerno +1 269 321 5064 +1 269 321 5164 matthew@depernolaw.com
v.
No Logo Block 100 Limited Partnership, Defendant
No Logo Carlson Rezidor Hotel Group, Defendant
No Logo Radisson Group, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Radisson Hotels International, Inc., Defendant
No Logo Vincent Krell, Defendant
No Logo Winegardner & Hammons Hotel Group LLC, Defendant
No Logo Winegardner & Hammons, Inc., Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (75) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 3/30/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 1/15/2021, Entered: None Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 1/8/2021, Entered: None Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 1/4/2021, Entered: None Notice Rescheduling Hearing
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 161 Filed: 12/29/2020, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Proposed Order
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 11/18/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: None Order on Objection
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Objection
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 10/1/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 9/30/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 9/23/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Sanctions
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 8/20/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Adjourn
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 8/14/2020, Entered: None Order
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 7/29/2020, Entered: None Compel
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: None Sanctions
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 119 Filed: 7/22/2020, Entered: None Sanctions
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 7/20/2020, Entered: None Adjourn
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 115 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Objection
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 7/17/2020, Entered: None Sanctions
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 108 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: None Objection
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Objection
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 106 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Objection
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 104 Filed: 7/13/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 5/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Proposed Order
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 5/20/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Stay
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 97 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: None Stay
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 5/1/2020, Entered: None Objection
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 4/17/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 94 Filed: 3/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Proposed Order
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 2/24/2020, Entered: None Protective Order
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 2/20/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 2/19/2020, Entered: None Order on Proposed Order
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 86 Filed: 2/18/2020, Entered: None Attorney Fees
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 2/13/2020, Entered: None Proposed Order
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 2/4/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 1/30/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Attorney Fees
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 1/22/2020, Entered: None Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 1/17/2020, Entered: None Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 11/20/2019, Entered: None Notice Cancelling Hearing
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Notice of Hearing
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Order
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 9/10/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Compel
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 7/8/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/24/2019, Entered: None Compel
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 5/10/2019, Entered: None Case Management Order
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/9/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation to Dismiss
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 4/5/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 3/22/2019, Entered: None Stipulation of Dismissal
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/18/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 3/12/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 3/11/2019, Entered: None Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: None Order on Stipulation
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/21/2019, Entered: None Stipulation
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 1/31/2019, Entered: None extension of time
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Summons issued
                                                                                                                                      SUMMONS ISSUED as to defendants Block 100 Limited Partnership, Carlson Rezidor Hotel Group, Vincent Krell, Radisson Group, Inc., Radisson Hotels International, Inc., Winegardner & Hammons Hotel Group, LLC, Winegardner & Hammons, Inc. (mg) (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Proposed Summons to be issued
                                                                                                                                        PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued re 1 (DePerno, Matthew) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          SUMMONS NOT ISSUED as to defendants Block 100 Limited Partnership, Carlson Rezidor Hotel Group, Vincent Krell, Radisson Group, Inc., Radisson Hotels International, Inc., Winegardner & Hammons Hotel Group, LLC, Winegardner & Hammons, Inc. (none provided) (mg)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Notice Regarding Assignment of Case
                                                                                                                                            NOTICE that this case has been assigned Gordon J. Quist (mg) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Summons Not Issued
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/5/2018, Entered: None Memorandum Re Possibly Related Case Returned to ClerkCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                Memorandum regarding potentially related case returned to Clerk from Magistrate Judge Green indicating that this case is related to 1:16-cv-1094, 1:18-cv-874 and 1:18-cv-882 (jlb) (Entered: 11/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  FILING FEE PAID re 1 by plaintiff Todd Courser in the amount of $400, receipt number 0646-4282029 (DePerno, Matthew)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                                                                                                                                    COMPLAINT with jury demand against Todd Courser filed by Todd Courser (DePerno, Matthew) (Entered: 11/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/2/2018, Entered: None Filing Fee (Civil Case) - Credit Card Payment
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?