Vucak v. Danville Services of Oregon, LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:14-cv-00818
District Judge Anna J. Brown, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 8, 2019 at 7:13 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Danville Services of Oregon, LLC, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Innova Legal Advisors PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Ronald G. Guerra +1 503 479 7175 +1 503 905 8766 ron.guerra@innovalegaladvisors.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Heidi W. Mason +1 503 479 7175 heidi.mason@innovalegaladvisors.com
No Logo Suzana Vucak, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 207
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (30) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 8/11/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Mary L. Moran. (bb) (Entered: 08/11/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 6/22/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Third Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 26 . All discovery is to be completed by 7/20/2015. The last date to file any discovery motion is 7/6/2015, and responses to such motions are due no later than seven (7) calendar days after the initiating motion is filed; no replies are permitted for discovery motions. Updated Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due 8/10/2015. Joint Statement of Agreed Material Facts due 8/10/2015. Dispositive Motions are due 8/20/2015. Jointly proposed Pretrial order/jointly proposed Verdict form shall be filed by 01/04/2016. Pretrial Documents are due by 2/23/2016. Pretrial Conference is SET for 03/11/2016 at 09:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. Jury Trial (2 days) is SET for 03/15/2016 at 09:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb) (Entered: 06/22/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 6/19/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Motion to Substitute Attorney 25 Heidi W. Mason for Danville Services of Oregon, LLC,Heidi W. Mason for Danville Services of Oregon, LLC added as counsel of record. (bb) (Entered: 06/19/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Declaration of Ronald G. Guerra in Support of Defendant Danville Services of Oregon, LLC's Motion for Extension of Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 26 .) (Guerra, Ronald) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Defendants. (Guerra, Ronald) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 6/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            First Motion to Substitute Attorney Innova Legal Advisors PC. Filed by All Defendants. (Guerra, Ronald) (Entered: 06/18/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/8/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER by Judge Anna J. Brown. Granting Second Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 22 . All discovery is to be completed by 6/19/2015. The last date to file any discovery motion is 6/5/2015, and responses to such motions are due no later than seven (7) calendar days after the initiating motion is filed; no replies are permitted for discovery motions. Updated Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due 7/10/2015. Joint Statement of Agreed Material Facts due 7/10/2015. Dispositive Motions are due 7/20/2015. Jointly proposed Pretrial order/jointly proposed Verdict form shall be filed by 12/04/2015. Pretrial Documents are due by 1/8/2016. Pretrial Conference is SET for 01/27/2016 at 09:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. Jury Trial (2 days) is SET for 02/02/2016 at 09:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb) (Entered: 05/08/2015)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Declaration of Corinna Spencer-Scheurich In Support of Second Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery and Pre-trial Deadlines. Filed by Suzana Vucak. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 22 .) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Suzana Vucak. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 04/17/2015)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    MINUTES of Proceedings: Hearing on Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 17 . Motion granted. All discovery is to be completed by 4/17/2015. The last date to file any discovery motion is 4/3/2015, and responses to such motions are due no later than seven (7) calendar days after the initiating motion is filed; no replies are permitted for discovery motions. Updated Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due 4/30/2015. Joint Statement of Agreed Material Facts due 4/30/2015. Dispositive Motions are due 5/08/2015. Jointly proposed Pretrial order/jointly proposed Verdict form shall be filed by 9/30/2015. Pretrial Documents are due by 10/20/2015. Pretrial Conference is SET for 11/12/2015 at 10:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. Jury Trial (2 days) is SET for 11/17/2015 at 09:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. Corinna Spencer-Scheurich present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Ronald Guerra present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. Judge Anna J. Brown presiding. (bb) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 2/23/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      Stipulated Qualified Protective Order: Signed on 02/23/2015 by Judge Anna J. Brown. (bb) (Entered: 02/23/2015)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Hearing on Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 17 is SET for 2/23/2015 at 01:00 PM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. Counsel may appear by telephone by emailing the courtroom deputy with their contact information. (bb) (Entered: 02/20/2015)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Declaration of Corinna Spencer-Scheurich In Support of Motion for Extension of Discovery and Pre-Trial Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 17 .) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 2/17/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Stipulated Motion for Protective Order . Filed by Suzana Vucak. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 02/17/2015)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 10/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference. Amendment to pleadings/joining of parties due no later than 1/15/2015. All discovery is to be completed by 2/17/2015. The last date to file any discovery motion is 1/30/2015, and responses to such motions are due no later than seven (7) calendar days after the initiating motion is filed; no replies are permitted for discovery motions. Updated Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due 3/6/2014. Joint Statement of Agreed Material Facts due 3/6/2015. Dispositive Motions are due 3/20/2015. Jointly proposed Pretrial order/jointly proposed Verdict form shall be filed by 7/27/2015. Pretrial Documents are due by 8/14/2015. Pretrial Conference is SET for 8/27/2015 at 10:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. Jury Trial (2 days) is SET for 9/1/2015 at 09:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. Corinna Spencer-Scheurich present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Ronald Guerra, Heidi Mason present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Amanda LeGore. Judge Anna J. Brown presiding. (bb) (Entered: 10/30/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/27/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Joint Status Report . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 10/27/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Answer to 11 Answer to Amended Complaint, Counterclaim with Jury Demand . Filed by Suzana Vucak. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 10/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Scheduling Order by Judge Anna J. Brown. Rule 16 Conference is set for 10/30/2014 at 10:00 AM in Portland Courtroom 14A before Judge Anna J. Brown. Before the Conference, counsel shall hold an initial planning conference. The parties shall submit a written joint status report (to include proposed case management schedule) no later than 10/27/2014 that include deadlines to complete discovery, to file dispositive motions, and for trial. Parties shall also determine whether they agree to forgo the disclosures required under Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1), and file separately with the Clerk of Court the form required by LR 26-2 no later than 10/27/2014. Counsel may participate by telephone by e-mailing the courtroom deputy with their phone number. (bb) (Entered: 10/06/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/8/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Answer to 10 Amended Complaint Affirmative Defenses and, Counterclaim against Suzana Vucak. Filed by Danville Services of Oregon, LLC. (Guerra, Ronald) (Entered: 09/08/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          First Amended Complaint . Filed by Suzana Vucak against Danville Services of Oregon, LLC. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            ORDER: Granting Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 8 . Amended Complaint is due 9/9/2014. (bb) (Entered: 09/05/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition . Filed by Suzana Vucak. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Complaint) (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Suzana Vucak. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Defendants. (Guerra, Ronald) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/21/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Notice of Appearance Filed by All Defendants (Guerra, Ronald) (Entered: 07/21/2014)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/23/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Danville Services of Oregon, LLC waiver sent on 5/22/2014. Filed by Suzana Vucak. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 06/23/2014)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Summons Issued Electronically as to Danville Services of Oregon, LLC. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (sss) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/19/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Anna J. Brown and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 9/16/2014. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/16/2014. Pretrial Order is due by 10/16/2014. Ordered by Judge Anna J. Brown. (sss) (Entered: 05/19/2014)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/16/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3683679 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Suzana Vucak against Danville Services of Oregon, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons). (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 05/16/2014)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                              Statistics

                                                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                              Space
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                               
                                                              PlainSite
                                                              Sign Up
                                                              Need Password Help?