Jolley v. All Star Tents and Party Rentals, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 6:14-cv-00169
Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 8, 2019 at 7:14 AM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo All Star Tents and Party Rentals, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heltzel Williams, Yandell,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Charles Petersen +1 503 585 4422 +1 503 370 4302 mpetersen@heltzel.com
No Logo David Stueve, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Heltzel Williams, Yandell,

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael Charles Petersen +1 503 585 4422 +1 503 370 4302 mpetersen@heltzel.com
No Logo Josh Jolley, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 180

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED James N. Keddis +1 503 922 2687 +1 503 922 2307 james.keddis@keddislawoffice.com
Citation Section 05 U.S.C. § 704
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/20/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within ninety (90) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. Signed on 3/20/2015 by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb) (Entered: 03/20/2015)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 3/18/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. The court having been informed that this matter has settled, it is ordered that the settlement conference set for 3/20/2015 and all pretrial deadlines are vacated. The parties are ordered to submit Final Papers or a status report re: settlement negotiations by 4/17/2015. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb) (Entered: 03/18/2015)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 3/4/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. Settlement Conference is set for 3/20/2015 at 10:00AM in Eugene chambers before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. Presence of all parties with settlement authority required. This includes anyone who is to have input on the decision of whether or not to settle the case. If any of the parties is going to seek input from a third person(s) regarding decisions associated with the settlement of a case, that third person should be present during all phases of the settlement process. Ordered parties to submit settlement document to the court by 12:00PM, 3/13/2015, in which they state realistic proposals they are willing to make or accept to resolve this case. PLEASE SEE ATTACHED INSTRUCTIONS REGARDING SETTLEMENT DOCUMENT. Signed on 3/4/2015 by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb) (Entered: 03/04/2015)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 1/28/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 19 . Discovery is to be completed by 4/27/2015. Dispositive Motions are due by 6/25/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order are due 30 days after dispositive motions are ruled on or by 7/27/2015 if no dispositive motions are filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb) (Entered: 01/28/2015)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Declaration of Michael C. Petersen in Support of Third Unopposed Motion to Extend Discovery and PTO Deadlines. Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 19 .) (Petersen, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 1/27/2015, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Defendants. (Petersen, Michael) (Entered: 01/27/2015)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/1/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 16 . Discovery is to be completed by 1/27/2015. Dispositive Motions are due by 3/27/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order are due 30 days after dispositive motions are ruled on or by 4/27/2015 if no dispositive motions are filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb) (Entered: 12/01/2014)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Declaration of Michael C. Petersen . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 16 .) (Petersen, Michael) Modified typo on 12/1/2014 (kf). (Entered: 11/28/2014)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Defendants. (Petersen, Michael) (Entered: 11/28/2014)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 8/29/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 13 . Discovery is to be completed by 11/28/2014. Dispositive Motions are due by 1/26/2015. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report and Pretrial Order are due 30 days after dispositive motions are ruled on or by 2/26/2015 if no dispositive motions are filed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb) (Entered: 08/29/2014)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Declaration of Michael C. Petersen . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 13 .) (Petersen, Michael) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/28/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Defendants. (Petersen, Michael) (Entered: 08/28/2014)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/15/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Notice of Appearance of James N. Keddis appearing on behalf of All Plaintiffs, Notice of Association of Attorney James N. Keddis,James N. Keddis for Josh Jolley,James N. Keddis for Josh Jolley. Filed by on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Keddis, James) (Entered: 08/15/2014)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Rule 16 Conference. Parties orally consent to jurisdiction by Magistrate Judge and will conventionally file formal consent with the Court. Discovery is to be completed by 8/29/2014. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 9/29/2014. Pretrial Order is due by 9/29/2014. Michael Dale present as counsel for plaintiff. Michael Petersen present as counsel for defendants. Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin presiding. (plb) (Entered: 05/08/2014)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/9/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. Rule 16 Conference is reset on 5/6/2014 from 1:30PM to 10:15AM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. The Court will initiate the call. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb) (Entered: 04/09/2014)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/7/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                Scheduling Order by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. Rule 16 Conference is set for 5/6/2014 at 01:30PM by Telephone before Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. The court will initiate the call. The parties should be prepared to discuss the status of discovery, any actual or potential discovery related conflicts, magistrate consent, potential trial dates, other issues presented by this action, and proposed modifications to the schedule outlined in the initial Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Ordered issued by the court at the commencement of the action. The parties additionally should be prepared to discuss Alternate Dispute Resolution (ADR) pursuant to L.R. 16.4. Pursuant to this minute order the parties are relieved of their responsibility set forth in the Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order, Section (c). Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (plb) (Entered: 04/07/2014)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by All Star Tents and Party Rentals, Inc.. (Petersen, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/4/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Answer to 1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, Counterclaim David Stueve, All Star Tents and Party Rentals, Inc.. Filed by David Stueve, All Star Tents and Party Rentals, Inc.. (Petersen, Michael) (Entered: 04/04/2014)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/11/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Summons Issued Electronically as to All Star Tents and Party Rentals, Inc.. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kf) (Entered: 02/11/2014)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 2/10/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Amended Proposed Summons All Star Tents and Party Rentals, Inc. Filed by Josh Jolley. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 02/10/2014)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/6/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Summons Issued Electronically as to David Stueve. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (kf) (Entered: 02/06/2014)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/5/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Amended Proposed Summons David Stueve Filed by Josh Jolley. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 02/05/2014)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 1/31/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/2/2014. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 6/30/2014. Pretrial Order is due by 6/30/2014. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Thomas M. Coffin. (kf) (Entered: 01/31/2014)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 1/30/2014, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-3566210 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Josh Jolley against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons All Star). (Dale, D.) (Entered: 01/30/2014)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 6 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?