United States v. Carlson
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02917
District Judge Orinda D. Evans, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 1:52 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Neeli Ben-David +1 404 581 6303 neeli.ben-david@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Robert Scott Silverblatt +1 202 514 8682 Robert.S.Silverblatt@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Christiana Trust, Defendant
No Logo Fulton County Tax Commissioner, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Fulton County Superior Court

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Elizabeth Meyer Roberts +1 404 612 0246 +1 404 730 6324 Elizabeth.Roberts@fultoncountyga.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY William Shannon Sams +1 404 612 0246 william.sams@fultoncountyga.gov
No Logo GSRAN-Z LLC, Defendant
No Logo Investa Services, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gala Villahoz +1 404 863 7157 gvillahoz3@gmail.com

Toggle Switch Represented by The McDeer Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Alice Stafford McQuade +1 404 604 3029 alicemcquade@investaservices.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John E. Ramsey +1 404 949 3850 ramsey@investaservices.com
No Logo Kathleen W. Carlson, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Kathleen W. Carlson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Kathleen W. Carlson
Citation Section 26 U.S.C. § 7402
Nature of Suit 870 - Federal Tax Suits: Taxes (US Plaintiff or Defendant)
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION for Summary Judgment with Brief In Support by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Statement of Material Facts, # 2 Affidavit, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverblatt, Robert) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Entered: 11/28/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kathleen W. Carlson re 19 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (sap)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 9/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER GRANTING the United States' 17 Motion for Preliminary Injunction against Planned Tax Sale. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 9/25/2018. (sap) (Entered: 09/26/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 9/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): October 1-5, 2018 by Alice Stafford McQuade. (sap) (Entered: 09/25/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Against Planned Tax Sale with Brief In Support by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverblatt, Robert) (Entered: 09/20/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Clerk's Certificate of Mailing as to Kathleen W. Carlson re 16 Scheduling Order. (sap)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER re 15 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. Signed by Judge Orinda D. Evans on 9/17/2018. (sap) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Silverblatt, Robert) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  RESPONSE in Opposition re 10 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default filed by Kathleen W. Carlson. (sap) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Submission of 12 MOTION to Set Aside Default to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (sap)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      AFFIDAVIT by Kathleen W. Carlson. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (sap) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        MOTION to Set Aside Default by Kathleen W. Carlson. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (sap) (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by Kathleen W. Carlson. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (sap) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 08/24/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Clerks Entry of Default as to Kathleen W. Carlson (sap)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 8/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Correspondence with Defendant Carlson)(Silverblatt, Robert) (Entered: 08/16/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Return of Service Executed by United States of America. Kathleen W. Carlson served on 7/23/2018, answer due 8/13/2018. (Silverblatt, Robert) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by Investa Services, LLC.(McQuade, Alice) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 07/16/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    ANSWER to 1 COMPLAINT by Fulton County Tax Commissioner. Discovery ends on 11/26/2018.(Roberts, Elizabeth) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 06/29/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Submission of 1 Complaint to District Judge Orinda D. Evans. (btql)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Electronic Summons Issued as to Kathleen W. Carlson. (btql) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Electronic Summons Issued as to Investa Services, LLC. (btql) Modified on 6/19/2018 to correct date filed (btql). (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Electronic Summons Issued as to GSRAN-Z LLC. (btql) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Electronic Summons Issued as to Fulton County Tax Commissioner. (btql) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Electronic Summons Issued as to Christiana Trust. (btql) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  COMPLAINT filed by United States of America. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(btql) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions and Pretrial Associated Forms which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                    Statistics

                                                    This case has been viewed 9 times.

                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                    Space
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                     
                                                    PlainSite
                                                    Sign Up
                                                    Need Password Help?