Green v. Clingman
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Mexico District Court, Case No. 2:18-cv-00817-GBW-SMV

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated October 7, 2020 at 6:31 PM DT (7.2 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 10/7/2020, Entered: None Judgment
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: None Extension of Time to File Document
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Reply to Response to Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/27/2019, Entered: None Response to Motion
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/13/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/12/2019, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: None Status Conference
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 1/8/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            INITIAL SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar. Joint Status Report is due by February 19, 2019. A telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for March 14, 2019, at 3:30 p.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT &T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. Unless otherwise notified by the Clerk or the Court a notice of consent or non-consent for this case to proceed before the trial Magistrate Judge should be submitted by each party no later than 1/29/2019. (jcm)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Stephan M. Vidmar SETTING telephonic Status Conference for January 8, 2019, at 9:30 a.m. Counsel must call Judge Vidmar's AT&T Conference Line at (888) 363-4734 (access code: 4382538) to connect to the proceedings. (jcm)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?