Home Legend, LLC v. Dillon
Federal Civil Lawsuit Georgia Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-01015
District Judge Mark H. Cohen, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2019 at 12:45 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Home Legend, LLC, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Edward Hine, Jr.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Edward Hine, Jr. +1 706 291 2531 +1 706 291 1301 ed@edwardhinelaw.com
v.
No Logo Alan Chou, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hill Kertscher & Pixley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Martha Logan Decker +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 mh@hkw-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven G. Hill +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 sgh@hkw-law.com
No Logo Alston, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hill Kertscher & Pixley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Martha Logan Decker +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 mh@hkw-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven G. Hill +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 sgh@hkw-law.com
No Logo Chris A. Dillon, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Hill Kertscher & Pixley LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Martha Logan Decker +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 mh@hkw-law.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Steven G. Hill +1 770 953 0995 +1 770 953 1358 sgh@hkw-law.com
No Logo John Does 1-5, Defendant
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1964
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (49) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Civil Case Terminated. (bnw)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Clerk's Entry of Dismissal APPROVING 39 Stipulation of Dismissal pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P.41(a)(1)(ii) (bnw)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice of all claims by Home Legend, LLC. (Hine, Edward) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Submission of 33 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: 31 Response in Opposition to Motion, to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (bnw)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: 37 Notice of Filing, of Exhibit E to Defendants' Statement of Material Facts to Which There is No Genuine Dispute with Brief In Support by Alston, Inc., Alan Chou, Chris A. Dillon. (Attachments: # 1 Brief, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Hill, Steven) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing Exhibit E to Plaintiffs' Statement of Material Facts to Which There is No Genuine Dispute by Alston, Inc., Alan Chou, Chris A. Dillon re 36 MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Proximate Cause and No Damages (Hill, Steven) (Entered: 10/09/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              MOTION for Summary Judgment as to No Proximate Cause and No Damages with Brief In Support by Alston, Inc., Alan Chou, Chris A. Dillon. (Attachments: # 1 Brief Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion for Summary Judgment, # 2 Statement of Material Facts, # 3 Ex. A, # 4 Ex. B, # 5 Ex. C, # 6 Ex. D, # 7 Ex. E, # 8 Ex. F)(Hill, Steven) --Please refer to http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain the Notice to Respond to Summary Judgment Motion form contained on the Court's website.-- (Entered: 10/09/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Submission of 29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (btql)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  REPLY to Response to Motion re 29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings, 33 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: 31 Response in Opposition to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Alan Chou. (Hill, Steven) (Entered: 09/18/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    PROVISIONALLY SEALED NOTICE Of Filing documents provisonally under seal by Home Legend, LLC re 33 MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: 31 Response in Opposition to Motion, 31 Response in Opposition to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit, # 6 Exhibit, # 7 Exhibit, # 8 Exhibit, # 9 Exhibit)(Hine, Edward) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      MOTION for Leave to File Matters Under Seal re: 31 Response in Opposition to Motion by Home Legend, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hine, Edward) (Entered: 09/05/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE Of Filing Documents under Seal by Home Legend, LLC re 31 Response in Opposition to Motion (Hine, Edward) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RESPONSE in Opposition re 29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Home Legend, LLC. (Hine, Edward) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE by Alan Chou re 29 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings Defendant's Notice of Plaintiff Home Legend, LLC's Non-Opposition to Motion (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Steven) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Alan Chou. (Hill, Steven) (Entered: 08/15/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Submission of 23 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) to District Judge Mark H. Cohen. (btql)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  REPLY BRIEF re 23 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) filed by Alston, Inc., Alan Chou, Chris A. Dillon. (Hill, Steven) (Entered: 07/31/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Home Legend, LLC (Response to First Interrogatories) (Hine, Edward) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 7/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Home Legend, LLC (Response to First Request for Production) (Hine, Edward) (Entered: 07/30/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        RESPONSE re 23 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) filed by Home Legend, LLC. (Hine, Edward) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Alston, Inc. filed by Home Legend, LLC (Hine, Edward) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 7/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings (Partial) by Alston, Inc., Alan Chou, Chris A. Dillon. (Hill, Steven) (Entered: 07/05/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Case Reassigned to Judge Mark H. Cohen. Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:18-cv-1015-MHC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. (ddm)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Requests by Alston, Inc., Alan Chou, Chris A. Dillon.(Hill, Steven) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Discovery Responses by Alston, Inc., Alan Chou, Chris A. Dillon.(Hill, Steven) (Entered: 06/20/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 6/19/18. (ddm) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      PROPOSED ORDER Stipulated Protective Order. (Hill, Steven) (Entered: 06/19/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Notice for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): August 1, 2018 through August 15, 2018, by Edward Hine, Jr. (Hine, Edward) (Entered: 06/11/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Defendants' Initial Disclosures by Alston, Inc., Alan Chou, Chris A. Dillon.(Hill, Steven) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            SCHEDULING ORDER approving the parties' 15 Joint Preliminary Report and Discovery Plan. The time limits for adding parties, amending the pleadings, filing motions, completing discovery, and discussing settlement are as set out in the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of this Court. All discovery, fact and expert, shall be completed on or before September 17, 2018. Signed by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr. on 5/14/18. (ddm) (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              JOINT PRELIMINARY REPORT AND DISCOVERY PLAN filed by Home Legend, LLC. (Hine, Edward) (Entered: 05/04/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Certificate of Interested Persons by Alston, Inc., Alan Chou, Chris A. Dillon. (Hill, Steven) (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  ANSWER to 12 Amended Complaint by Alston, Inc., Alan Chou, Chris A. Dillon. Discovery ends on 9/17/2018.(Hill, Steven) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov to obtain Pretrial Instructions. (Entered: 04/20/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    NOTICE FROM THE COURT (by docket entry only): Parties are advised to go to the district court's website at www.gand.uscourts.gov/case-prep-judge-duffey. Here, the Court has provided its Standing Order Regarding Civil Litigation. The Parties shall abide by this Standing Order throughout the processing of this case. Parties are instructed to pay particular attention to the requirements for Motions for Summary Judgment. (bgt)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants with Jury Demand, filed by Home Legend, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit)(Hine, Edward) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 04/06/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        Return of Service Executed by Home Legend, LLC. Alston, Inc. served on 3/13/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 per 10 ; Alan Chou served on 3/19/2018, answer due 4/20/2018 per 11 . (ddm) Modified on 3/28/2018 per the 3/27/2018 Minute Order. (jtj)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          ORDER (by docket entry only) granting Defendants Chris A. Dillon's, Alston, Inc.'s and Alan Chou's 9 Motion for Extension of Time, up to and including 4/20/2018, to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint 1 . No further extensions will be granted. Ordered by Judge William S. Duffey, Jr on 3/27/2018. (bgt)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            NOTICE Of Filing Proof of Service on Alan Chou by Home Legend, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Hine, Edward) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTICE Of Filing Filing Proof of Service on Alston, Inc. by Home Legend, LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit)(Hine, Edward) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Alston, Inc., Alan Chou, Chris A. Dillon. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Hill, Steven) (Entered: 03/27/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 3/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Initial Disclosures by Home Legend, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Witness List, # 2 Exhibit Document list, # 3 Exhibit Damage Calculation)(Hine, Edward) (Entered: 03/23/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    Docketed to set answer deadline per 7 - Return of Service Executed by Home Legend, LLC. Chris A. Dillon served on 3/10/2018, answer due 4/2/2018. (ddm)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 3/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      NOTICE Of Filing proof of service on Chris A. Dillon by Home Legend, LLC (Hine, Edward) (Entered: 03/14/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of First Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents addressed to Defendant Chris Dillon by Home Legend, LLC.(Hine, Edward) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Corporate Disclosure Statement by Home Legend, LLC by Home Legend, LLC.(Hine, Edward) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Electronic Summons Issued as to Alan Chou. (eop) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Electronic Summons Issued as to Alston, Inc.. (eop) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                Electronic Summons Issued as to Chris A. Dillon. (eop) (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  COMPLAINT with Jury Demand, filed by Home Legend, LLC.; and Summon(s) issued. ( Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113E-7735387.) (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit -A, # 2 Exhibit -B, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet)(eop) Please visit our website at http://www.gand.uscourts.gov/commonly-used-forms to obtain Pretrial Instructions which includes the Consent To Proceed Before U.S. Magistrate form. (Entered: 03/09/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                    Statistics

                                                                                                    This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                                                                    No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                    Space
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                    Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                     
                                                                                                    PlainSite
                                                                                                    Sign Up
                                                                                                    Need Password Help?