United States v. Sharma
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00340
District Judge Lorna G. Schofield, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2019 at 12:50 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Samson Aaron Enzer +1 212 637 2342 +1 212 637 2443 samson.enzer@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Negar Tekeei +1 212 637 2482 +1 212 637 2527 negar.tekeei@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo Raymond Trapani, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph Aaron Bondy +1 212 219 3572 +1 212 219 8456 josephbondy@mac.com
No Logo Robert Farkas, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Paul Domenic Petruzzi +1 305 373 6773 +3733 373 373 3832 petruzzi-law@msn.com

Toggle Switch Represented by McLaughlin & Stern, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/17/2018 Daniel James Horwitz +1 212 448 1100 dhorwitz@mclaughlinstern.com
No Logo Sohrab Sharma, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Gennaro Cariglio, Jr. +1 305 899 0438 +8912 891 891 2297 Sobeachlaw@aol.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Partner/Kostelanetz & Fink, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 09/11/2018 Sharon L. McCarthy +1 212 808 8100 +1 212 808 8108 smccarthy@kflaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (104) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 85 Filed: 11/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 83 LETTER MOTION Modification of Bail as to Robert Farkas (3). Application Granted. Defendant Robert Farkas' conditions of bail are temporarily modified to permit travel to the District of New Jersey from November 21, 2018 through November 25, 2018; and from December 23, 2018 through December 27, 2018. All other condition of bail shall remain in effect. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 83. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 11/19/2018) (ft) (Entered: 11/19/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 84 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Barbara C. Moses: Bond Hearing as to Sohrab Sharma held on 11/16/2018. Defendant is present with attorney Cariglio; AUSA Enzer is also present. Bail is modified as follows: I. The bond amount remains $5 million, but the cash security amount is reduced to $750,000. 2. The excess cash ($250,000) must be transferred to attorney Cariglio's attorney trust account and may be used only for defendant Shanna's attorney fees and expenses incurred in the defense of this action. On the request of the Government, made on reasonable notice, attorney Cariglio must provide an accounting of the funds. 3. Defendant's bond must be co-signed by a third financially responsible person, acceptable to the USAO, by 11/26/18. 4. Defendant may not access the internet, directly or indirectly, or use/possess internet-enabled devices (computers, smart phones, etc.), except (a) in his attorney's office and in the presence of his attorney (including staff), and (b) for the purpose of his defense of this action. 4. Defendant is reminded that he must have no contact with Centra Tech investors, directly or indirectly. (jm) Modified on 11/16/2018 (jm). Modified on 11/16/2018 (jm). (Entered: 11/16/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Paul D. Petruzzi, Esq. dated November 15, 2018 re: Travel Permit . Document filed by Robert Farkas. (Petruzzi, Paul) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Robert Farkas: Notice to Attorney Petruzzi, Paul to RE-FILE Document 82 MOTION to Travel. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Travel . Document filed by Robert Farkas. (Petruzzi, Paul) Modified on 11/15/2018 (ka). (Entered: 11/15/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 11/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition by Sohrab Sharma addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Gennaro Cariglio Jr. dated November 15, 2018 re: 77 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Negar Tekeei / Samson Enzer dated October 29, 2018 re: Bail Revocation for Defendant Sohrab Sharma .. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Defense Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit Defense Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit Defense Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit Defense Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit Defense Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit Defense Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit Defense Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit Defense Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit Defense Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit Defense Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit Defense Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit Defense Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit Defense Exhibit M, # 14 Exhibit Defense Exhibit N, # 15 Exhibit Defense Exhibit O, # 16 Exhibit Defense Exhibit P, # 17 Exhibit Defense Exhibit Q)(Cariglio, Gennaro) (Entered: 11/15/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Robert Farkas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Hearing proceeding held on 10/11/18 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 11/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Robert Farkas re: Hearing held on 10/11/18 before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Alena Lynch, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 11/28/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/10/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/5/2019. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 11/07/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 10/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  MEMO ENDORSEMENT: as to Sohrab Sharma (1) terminating 76 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Gennaro Cariglio Jr. dated October 26, 2018 re: Modification of Bond. ; terminating 77 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Negar Tekeei / Samson Enzer dated October 29, 2018 re: Bail Revocation for Defendant Sohrab Sharma. ENDORSEMENT: This application is referred to the Magistrate Judge on duty. The parties shall promptly schedule a bail review hearing. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motions at docket numbers 76 and 77. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/30/2018) (ap) (Entered: 10/30/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Negar Tekeei / Samson Enzer dated October 29, 2018 re: Bail Revocation for Defendant Sohrab Sharma . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhibit E, # 6 Exhibit F, # 7 Exhibit G, # 8 Exhibit H, # 9 Exhibit I, # 10 Exhibit J, # 11 Exhibit K, # 12 Exhibit L, # 13 Exhibit M)(Tekeei, Negar) (Entered: 10/29/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Gennaro Cariglio Jr. dated October 26, 2018 re: Modification of Bond . Document filed by Sohrab Sharma. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Exhibits A and B)(Cariglio, Gennaro) (Entered: 10/26/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER granting 74 LETTER MOTION as to Raymond Trapani (2). Application Granted. Defendant Raymond Trapani's conditions of bail are hereby modified impose a curfew from 11:00 pm to 5:00 am with the use of location monitoring during curfew hours. All other condition of bail shall remain in effect. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 74. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/17/2018) (ft) (Entered: 10/17/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 10/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated October 16, 2018 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release to Facilitate Employment (Unopposed). Document filed by Raymond Trapani. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 10/16/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Lorna G. Schofield: Curcio Hearing as to (18-Cr-340-3) Robert Farkas held on 10/11/2018. Defendant appears with attorneys Paul Petruzzi and Rita Glavin. AUSA's Samson Enzer and Negar Tekeei present for the Government. Court reporter present. (bw)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER as to Raymond Trapani (2) granting 70 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joseph A. Bondy dated October 3, 2018 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release from Home Detention to a Curfew (Unopposed). Application Granted. Defendant Raymond Trapani's conditions of bail are hereby modified to: (i) remove the condition of home detention; and (ii) impose a curfew from 11:00 pm to 7:00 am with the use of location monitoring during curfew hours. All other condition of bail shall remain in effect. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 70. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/10/2018) (ap) Modified on 10/11/2018 (ap). (Entered: 10/10/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Set/Reset Hearings as to Robert Farkas: Curcio Hearing set for 10/11/2018 at 11:10 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield. (ap)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER as to Robert Farkas (3) granting 68 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Negar Tekeei / Samson Enzer dated September 14, 2018 re: Curcio Hearing. Application Granted. It is hereby ORDERED that Defendant Robert Farkas, his counsel, and the Government shall appear for a Curcio Hearing on October 11, 2018 at 11:10 a.m. It is further, ORDERED that Ms. Rita Glavin, CJA counsel on duty today, is appointed for the limited purpose of discussing any potential conflicts with Defendant Robert Farkas. Ms. Glavin is directed to contact and speak with Defendant Robert Farkas in advance of this hearing. A copy of this Order will be emailed to Ms. Glavin. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 68. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 10/5/2018) (ap) (Entered: 10/05/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 71 Filed: 10/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    NOTICE of Change of Address as to Robert Farkas. New Address: Law Offices of Paul D. Petruzzi, P.A., 8101 Biscayne Blvd., PH 701, Miami, Florida, United States 33138, (305) 373-6773. (Petruzzi, Paul) (Entered: 10/04/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 70 Filed: 10/3/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joseph A. Bondy dated October 3, 2018 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release from Home Detention to a Curfew (Unopposed). Document filed by Raymond Trapani. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 10/03/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Attorney update in case as to Robert Farkas (3). Attorney Daniel James Horwitz terminated. (bw)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 9/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY as to (18-Cr-340-3) Robert Farkas. Notice is hereby given that, subject to approval by the court, Robert Farkas substitutes Paul D. Petruzzi, State Bar No. 982059 as counsel of record in place of Daniel J. Horwitz (DJH). The substitution of attorney is hereby approved and so ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/17/2018)(bw) (Entered: 09/17/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Negar Tekeei / Samson Enzer dated September 14, 2018 re: Curcio Hearing . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Tekeei, Negar) (Entered: 09/14/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 67 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER as to Sohrab Sharma (1), Raymond Trapani (2), Robert Farkas (3) granting 64 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Request to Exclude Speedy Trial Time through December 11, 2018. Application Granted. For the reasons stated above, the Court finds that the ends of justice served by excluding the time between today and December 11, 2018 outweigh the best interests of the public and the Defendant in a speedy trial as provided in 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A). It is hereby ORDERED that the time between today and December 11, 2018 is excluded. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 64. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/11/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                CONSENT ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY as to Sohrab Sharma. The substitution of attorney (Gennaro Cariglio Jr.) is hereby approved and ORDERED. (Attorney Sharon Louise McCarthy terminated in case as to Sohrab Sharma) (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/11/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 09/12/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Paul Domenic Petruzzi appearing for Robert Farkas. Appearance Type: Retained. (Petruzzi, Paul) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 9/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Request to Exclude Speedy Trial Time through December 11, 2018 . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Enzer, Samson) (Entered: 09/11/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 9/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. It is hereby ORDERED that the status conference currently scheduled for September 11, 2018, shall be adjourned to December 11, 2018 at 4:00 p.m. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/10/2018)(bw) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        ORDER FOR ADMISSION FOR PRO HAC VICE as to Robert Farkas. This matter is before the Court on attorney PAUL D. PETRUZZI's motion to appear Pro Hac Vice in this matter. The motion of PAUL D. PETRUZZI, ESQ., for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. Applicant has declared that he is a member in good standing of the bar of the states of Florida; and that his contact information is as follows:...[See this Order]... Applicant having requested admission Pro Hac Vice to appear for all purposes as counsel for ROBERT FARKAS in the above entitled action; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. Counsel shall immediately forward the Pro Hac Vice fee to the clerk of Court. (The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket number 59.)(Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/7/2018)(bw) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 9/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                          ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE as to (18-Cr-340-01) Sohrab Sharma. The motion of Gennaro Cariglio Jr., Esq., for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. Applicant has declared that he is a member in good standing of the bars of the States of Florida and Rhode Island; and that his contact information is as follows:...[See this Order]... Applicant having requested admission Pro Hac Vice to appear as counsel for Sohrab Sharma in the above title action; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Gennaro Cariglio Jr., Esq. is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion at docket number 56.)(Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 9/7/2018)(bw) (Entered: 09/10/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            LETTER by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Raymond Trapani, Robert Farkas addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Negar Tekeei dated September 4, 2018 re: Discovery Status Update Document filed by USA. (Tekeei, Negar) (Entered: 09/04/2018)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/4/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              ***NOTE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - NON-ECF DOCUMENT ERROR. Note to Attorney Cariglio, Gennaro as to Sohrab Sharma: to E-MAIL Dcument Document No. 58 Consent Order Granting Substitution of Attorney. This document is not filed via ECF. (ka)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 59 MOTION for Paul D. Petruzzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  MOTION for Paul D. Petruzzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Farkas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petruzzi, Paul) (Entered: 08/29/2018)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    FILING ERROR - ELECTRONIC FILING OF NON-ECF DOCUMENT - MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Sharon McCarthy, New Attorney: Gennaro Cariglio Jr. . Document filed by Sohrab Sharma. (Cariglio, Gennaro) Modified on 9/4/2018 (ka). (Entered: 08/29/2018)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice as to Robert Farkas to RE-FILE Document No. 57 MOTION for Paul D. Petruzzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15487086. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Attorney Affidavit is missing some of the language required by Local Rule 1.3, i.e. whether the applicant has ever been censured, suspended, disbarred or denied admission or readmission by any court. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Attorney Affidavit - attach Proposed Order. (jc)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                        FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Paul D. Petruzzi to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15487086. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Robert Farkas. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Petruzzi, Paul) Modified on 8/23/2018 (jc). (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 56 AMENDED MOTION for Gennaro Cariglio Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 8/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            AMENDED MOTION for Gennaro Cariglio Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sohrab Sharma. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cariglio, Gennaro) (Entered: 08/23/2018)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani to RE-FILE Document No. 55 MOTION for Gennaro Cariglio Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Sohrab Sharma. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15475913. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Gennaro Cariglio Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice as Counsel for Sohrab Sharma. Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-15475913. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Sohrab Sharma. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Cariglio, Gennaro) Modified on 8/21/2018 (wb). (Entered: 08/21/2018)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER as to Raymond Trapani (2) granting 53 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated August 17, 2018 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release. Application Granted. Defendant Trapani's conditions of bail are modified to allow him to reside at his grandmother's residence in the Eastern District of New York. All other conditions of bail shall remain in effect. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 53. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 8/17/2018) (ap) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated August 17, 2018 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release . Document filed by Raymond Trapani. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 8/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Discovery Status Update . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Enzer, Samson) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 7/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER Robert Farkas (3) granting 49 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel J. Horwitz dated July 24, 2018 re: bail modification. Application Granted. Defendant Robert Farkas' conditions of bail are hereby modified to: (i) permit the use of computers, smartphones and the internet; (ii) remove the condition of home detention; and (iii) impose a curfew from 11:00 pm to 7:00 am with the use of location monitoring during curfew hours. All other condition of bail shall remain in effect. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 49. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/31/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 08/01/2018)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          PROTECTIVE ORDER as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material.... (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 7/24/2018) (ap) (Entered: 07/25/2018)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 7/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel J. Horwitz dated July 24, 2018 re: bail modification . Document filed by Robert Farkas as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Horwitz, Daniel) (Entered: 07/24/2018)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Raymond Trapani. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Initial Appearance proceeding held on 7/19/2018 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (ft) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Raymond Trapani re: Initial Appearance held on 5/30/2018 before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 8/9/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/20/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/17/2018. (ft) (Entered: 07/19/2018)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 7/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Request for Entry of Proposed Protective Order . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Protective Order)(Enzer, Samson) (Entered: 07/18/2018)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 7/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to Sohrab Sharma addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Sharon L. McCarthy dated 7/11/2018 re: Modification of Bail. ENDORSEMENT: Application granted as modified. Defendant must submit to any search upon request by Pretrial Services. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 7/11/2018)(ft) (Entered: 07/13/2018)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      LETTER by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Raymond Trapani, Robert Farkas addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Discovery Status Update Letter Document filed by USA. (Enzer, Samson) (Entered: 07/02/2018)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Sealed Legal Document 43 Filed: 6/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 06/28/2018)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 6/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                          ENDORSED LETTER as to (18-Cr-340-01) Sohrab Sharma addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Attorney Sharon L. McCarthy dated June 20, 2018 re: We respectfully request that the Court modify Mr. Sharma's bail conditions to permit use and access to the internet for the purpose of using his home television and other media players, such as Apple TV, Playstation, and Xbox. ENDORSEMENT: This application is referred to the Magistrate Judge on duty. The parties shall promptly schedule a bail review hearing. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 39. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/27/2018)(bw) (Entered: 06/27/2018)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 6/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER as to Robert Farkas (3) denying 38 Motion to Modify Conditions of Release; denying 40 LETTER MOTION to Modify Conditions. Application DENIED in deference to the objection of Pretrial Services and cited policy grounds. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket numbers 38 and 40. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/22/2018) (ap) (Entered: 06/22/2018)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Daniel J. Horwitz dated June 21, 2018 re: bail modification . Document filed by Robert Farkas as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Horwitz, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Sharon L. McCarthy dated 06/20/18 re: Modification of bail conditions. . Document filed by Sohrab Sharma. (McCarthy, Sharon) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                  MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release . Document filed by Robert Farkas as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Horwitz, Daniel) (Entered: 06/21/2018)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Sohrab Sharma: Notice to Attorney McCarthy, Sharon to RE-FILE Document 37 MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 6/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION to Modify Conditions of Release . Document filed by Sohrab Sharma. (McCarthy, Sharon) Modified on 6/21/2018 (ka). (Entered: 06/20/2018)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Raymond Trapani (2) granting 35 LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated June 15, 2018 re: Modification of Bond and enlargement of time to satisfy modification. The request is GRANTED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 6/15/2018) (ap) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 6/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated June 15, 2018 re: Modification of Bond and enlargement of time to satisfy modification . Document filed by Raymond Trapani. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 06/15/2018)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 6/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated June 13, 2018 re: Modification of Bond and enlargement of time to satisfy modification . Document filed by Raymond Trapani. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 06/13/2018)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 6/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              PRB Bond Entered as to Sohrab Sharma in amount of $ 5 Million. To be co-signed by 2 financially responsible persons; Secured by $1 Million Cash or property; Travel limited to SDNY/EDNY & SDFL (Travel to NY only for court appearances and meetings with counsel); Surrender travel documents (& No new applications); Strict pretrial supervision with drug and alcohol testing/treatment as deemed appropriate by PTS; Refrain from use of alcohol; Home detention with GPS monitoring; No possession of firearm/destructive device/other weapon; Surrender any firearm licenses; Deft's assets in the digital wallet containing his funds (9,000 in either, which the Court undertands to be valuded of approx $6 Million), is to be placed in trust, with a trust agreement to be reviewed by the Gov't and found acceptable; Prohibition against use or access to computers, smart phones, or internet; No contact with co-defendant except in presence of counsel; No contact with CETRA Tech Investors; Deft to disclose all assets to PTS and USAO, including any assets or which has possession, custody or control, including joint or business accounts and including cash, cryptocurrency, or digital currency, all conditions to be met prior to release. BAIL MODIFIED BY JUDGE WANG on 5/23/18; The required personal recognizance bond of $5 Million need only be co-signed by two financially responsible persons instead of three, and Farkas need only secure the bond with $600,000 instead of $1 Million in real property and/or cash. (jw) (Entered: 06/07/2018)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Sohrab Sharma (1), Raymond Trapani (2), Robert Farkas (3) granting 31 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Discovery Proposal as to Certain Centra Tech Materials Provided to the FBI. Application Granted. By June 29, 2018, the Government shall (i) produce a complete copy of the Hard Copy Documents to all Defendants; and (ii) produce any forensic images of the Selected Devices that have/will be created to all Defendants. The parties shall file joint status letters regarding the status of discovery on July 2, 2018, August 1, 2018, and September 3, 2018. The schedule as set forth in the Court's May 23, 2018 Order will remain unchanged. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 31. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 6/5/2018) (lnl) (Entered: 06/06/2018)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 6/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Discovery Proposal as to Certain Centra Tech Materials Provided to the FBI . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Enzer, Samson) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 5/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 29 LETTER MOTION To allow him to reside with his mother under home confinement with electronic monitoring in the Eastern District of Virginia, with leave to attend relevant substance abuse treatment, employment and educational appointments as to Raymond Trapani...ENDORSEMENT...Application GRANTED. The conditions of defendant's release are modified to remove any curfew condition. Home detention remains a condition of his release. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn on 5/31/18) (jw) (Entered: 06/01/2018)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn from Joseph Aaron Bondy dated May 30, 2018 re: Modification of the Terms of Pre-Trial Release . Document filed by Raymond Trapani. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn:Arraignment on disposition sheet as to Raymond Trapani (2) Count 1,2,3,4 held on 5/30/2018., Not Guilty Plea entered by Raymond Trapani (2) Count 1,2,3,4. Deft present with atty Joseph Bondy. AUSA Samson Enzer present. Deft arraigned and pleads not guilty. Next conference set before District Judge on 9/11/18. (jw)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn:Initial Appearance on disposition sheet as to Raymond Trapani held on 5/30/2018. Deft present with atty Raymond Trapani. AUSA Samson Enzer present. $2.5 Million PRB, Three FRP, Secured by $750,000 Cash/Property: Cash or property. Travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/ED Virginia and points in between for travel. Surrender travel documents (& No new applications), Pretrial supervision: Strict, Drug testing/treatment as directed by PTS); Mental health eval/treatment as directed by PTS, Home detention, Curfew, Electronic monitoring, Deft to continue or seek employment, Deft to continue or start education program, Deft not to possess firearm/destructive device/other weapon, Deft to be released on own signature, remaining conditions to be met by 6/13/18. Deft will reside with his mother at 2000 Meredith Avenue Virginia Beach, VA. He must report to ED Va. Pretrial within 48 Hours of arrival in the District. Participation of a drug program. Deft prohibited from using alcohol in excess. Deft is allowed to use the Internet but his use is to be monitored by Pretrial, including through any device or random search. Curfew to be set by E.D. Va PTS Officer. (jw) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            PRB Bond Entered as to Robert Farkas in amount of $ 5 Million. Agreed conditions of release: $5 Million personal recognizance bond; Cosigned by three financially responsible persons; Secured by $1 Million in real property and or cash; Home detention with location monitoring; Compliance with the April 16 seizure warrant, (which directs "any person or entity presently in possession or control of the property" to effectuate the transfer of 91,000 ether currently on deposit in ether wallet address, with compliance defined as the actual successful transfer of the relevant assets into the custody and control of law enforcement; prohibition against accessing, directly or indirectly, the digital wallet containing centra tech ICO Funds or transferring any funds out of the digital wallet, except for purposes of complying with the seizure warrant; Prohibition against use or access to any computers, smartphones or internet; Prohibition against possession of any firearms, destructive devices, or other weapons; Drug testing as required by pretrial services officer; travel restricted to SDNY/EDNY/SDFL; Surrender travel documents and no new applications; Deft shall disclose all assets to PTS and the USAO, including any assets he has possession, custody, or control, including joint or business accounts, and including cash, cryptocurrency, or digital currency; deft shall have no contact with any co-defendants outside of the presence of counsel; any other as recommended by PTS; Deft shall be released if all the conditions are met. Bail conditions modified by Magistrate Judge on a T. Wang on 5/23/18; The $5,000,000.00 PRB; The Co-signer requirement is reduced from 3 FRP's to 2 FRP's; The $1,000,000.00 cash requirement is reduced to $600,000.00 in real property or cash. Bail conditions modified by US Magistrate Judge Katherine H. Parker on 5/25/18; Deft may reside in the District of NJ with his mother. Advice of Penalties and Sanctions attached. (jw) (Entered: 05/30/2018)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Joseph A. Bondy, Esq. dated May 24, 2018 re: Modification of Bond, to Allow Defendant to Reside with his Mother in the EDVA . Document filed by Raymond Trapani. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                SCHEDULING ORDER as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani ( Motions due by 10/15/2018., Replies due by 11/19/2018., Responses due by 11/5/2018, Status Conference set for 9/11/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.), Time excluded from 5/23/18 until 9/11/18. It is hereby ORDERED that the stipulated dates are approved as follows: By June 1, 2018, the parties shall file a joint letter with a proposed schedule for the treatment and production of the referenced Centra Tech materials; By June 29, 2019, the parties shall produce Rule 16 discovery, except the referenced Centra Tech materials; On September 11, 2018, at 11:00 a.m., the parties shall appear for a status conference; No later than October 15, 2018, Defendants shall file any motions. The Government shall file a response by November 5, 2018. Defendants shall file a reply by November 19, 2018. It is further, ORDERED that for the reasons stated in the parties May 18, 2018 letter, the Court finds that the ends of justice served by excluding the time between today and September 11, 2018, outweigh the best interests of the public and the Defendants in a speedy trial as provided in 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A). The time between today and September 11, 2018, is hereby excluded. The parties are warned that any discussions regarding the possible disposition of this matter will not stay the above schedule. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/23/18)(jw) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER as to Sohrab Sharma addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang from Samson Enzer & Negar Tekeei dated 5/23/2018 re: The Government respectfully submits that Farkas' bail conditions should be modified such that the required personal recognizance bond of $5 million need only be co-signed by two financially responsible persons (instead of three), and Farkas need only secure the bond with $600,000 (instead of $1 million) in real property and/or cash. ENDORSEMENT: The above modification is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/23/2018)(ft) (Entered: 05/24/2018)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    ORDER as to Robert Farkas (3) granting 22 LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang re: Joint Request to Modify Defendant Farkas' Bail Conditions. The above modification is GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang on 5/23/2018) (ap) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 5/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang re: Joint Request to Modify Defendant Farkas' Bail Conditions . Document filed by USA as to Robert Farkas. (Enzer, Samson) (Entered: 05/23/2018)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker:Arraignment on disposition sheet as to Robert Farkas (3) Count 1,2,3,4 held on 5/21/2018., Plea entered by Robert Farkas (3) Count 1,2,3,4 Not Guilty. Deft present with atty Dan Horowitz. AUSA Samson Aaron Enzer present. Deft arraigned and pleads not guilty. Speedy trial time excluded under 18 USC 3161(h)(7) until 9/10/18. (jw) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker:Arraignment on disposition sheet as to Sohrab Sharma (1) Count 1,2,3,4 held on 5/21/2018., Plea entered by Sohrab Sharma (1) Count 1,2,3,4 Not Guilty. Deft present with atty Sharon Louise McCarthy. AUSA Samson Aaron Enzer present. See transcript. Deft arraigned and pleads not guilty. Speedy trial time excluded under 18 USC 3161(h)(7) until 9/10/18. (jw) (Entered: 05/21/2018)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani: Notice to Attorney Enzer, Samson to RE-FILE Document 19 MOTION for Leave to File. LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Motion to Approve Proposed Schedule and Speedy Trial Exclusion. Use the event type Letter Motion found under the event list Motions. (ka)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Leave to File ., LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Joint Motion to Approve Proposed Schedule and Speedy Trial Exclusion . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Enzer, Samson) Modified on 5/21/2018 (ka). (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties shall file by Friday, May 18, 2018, a joint letter via CM/ECF proposing a schedule for discovery, the filing of motions, and three proposed dates for a status conference. The parties also should state whether the parties seek to have the Court exclude time under the Speedy Trial Act between the filing of the order and the pretrial conference, and the basis for the exclusion (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/16/18)(jw) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                  ENDORSED LETTER as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield from Samson Enzer and Negar Tekeei re: The Government respectfully submits this letter for two purposes: (a) to advise Your Honor that the defendants in this case are scheduled to appear in Magistrates Court on Monday May 21, 2018 at 10:30 a.m. to be arraigned on the above-referenced Indictment, which was returned yesterday against them; and (b) to respectfully request, with the consent of the defendants through their respective counsel, that time under the Speedy Trial Act be excluded until May 21, 2018....ENDORSEMENT: For the reasons stated above, the Court finds that the ends of justice served by excluding the time between today and May 21, 2018 outweigh the best interests of the public and the Defendant in a speedy trial as provided in 18 U.S.C. 3161(h)(7)(A). It is hereby ORDERED that the time between today and May 21, 2018 is excluded. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the letter motion at docket number 15 ( Arraignment set for 5/21/2018 at 10:30 AM before Judge Lorna G. Schofield.) Time excluded from 5/16/18 until 5/21/18. (Signed by Judge Lorna G. Schofield on 5/16/18)(jw) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 5/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph Aaron Bondy appearing for Raymond Trapani. Appearance Type: Retained. (Bondy, Joseph) (Entered: 05/16/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/15/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Lorna G. Schofield re: Request for Speedy Trial Exclusion through Arraignment . Document filed by USA as to Sohrab Sharma, Robert Farkas, Raymond Trapani. (Enzer, Samson) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Case Designated ECF as to Sohrab Sharma, Raymond Trapani, Robert Farkas. (bw)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/14/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          INDICTMENT FILED as to Sohrab Sharma (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Raymond Trapani (2) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4, Robert Farkas (3) count(s) 1, 2, 3, 4. (bw) (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman: Bail Hearing as to Sohrab Sharma held on 5/11/2018. Deft Appears with Retained Attorney Sharon McCarthy and AUSA Samson Enzer for the government. $5 Million PRB with 2 FRP'S; Secured by $1 Million Cash or Property; Travel Restricted to SDNY/EDNY/SDFL (Travel to NY Only for Court Appearances and Meetings with Counsel); Surrender Travel Documents (& No New Applications); Strict Pretrial Supervision with Drug and Alcohol Testing/Treatment As Deemed Appropriate by PTS; Refrain from Use of Alcohol; Home Detention; GPS Monitoring; No Possession of Firearm/Destructive Device/Other Weapon; Surrender Any Firearm Licenses; Deft's Assets in the Digital Wallet Containing his Funds (9,000 in Ether, Which the Court Understands To Be Valued of Approx. $6 Million) is to Be Placed in Trust, with a Trust Agreement To Be Reviewed by the Gov't and Found Acceptable; Prohibition Against Use or Access to Computers, Smart Phones, or Internet; No Contact with Co-Defendant Except in Presence of Counsel; No Contact with Centra Tech Investors; Deft to Disclose All Assets to PTS and USAO, Including Any Assets of Which he Has Possession, Custody or Control, Including Joint or Business Accounts, and Including Cash, Cryptocurrency, or Digital Currency; All Conditions To Be Met Prior to Release (dif) Modified on 5/14/2018 (dif). [1:18-mj-02695-UA] (Entered: 05/14/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Robert Farkas. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Bail Hearing proceeding held on 4/25/2018 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (ft) [1:18-mj-02695-UA] (Entered: 05/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Robert Farkas re: Hearing held on 4/25/2018 before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2018. (ft) [1:18-mj-02695-UA] (Entered: 05/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Sohrab Sharma. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Bail Hearing proceeding held on 5/2/2018 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days. (ft) [1:18-mj-02695-UA] (Entered: 05/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Sohrab Sharma re: Bail Hearing held on 5/2/2018 before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Shari Riemer, (518) 581-8973, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/31/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 6/11/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 8/8/2018. (ft) [1:18-mj-02695-UA] (Entered: 05/10/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman: As to Sohrab Sharma Detention Hearing set for 5/11/2018 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman. (jm) [1:18-mj-02695-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman:Detention Hearing as to Sohrab Sharma held on 5/2/2018. Deft. is present with attorney Sharon McCarthy; AUSA Tekeei is also present. Deft. is detained owing to risk of flight for the reasons presented but will hear further argument 5/11/18 at 2:00 PM, Courtroom 17A. (jm) [1:18-mj-02695-UA] (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman: As to Sohrab Sharma Detention Hearing set for 5/2/2018 at 11:30 AM before Judge Unassigned. (jm) [1:18-mj-02695-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman:Initial Appearance as to Sohrab Sharma held on 5/1/2018. Deft. is present with attorney Sharon McCarty; AUSAs Tekeei and Enzer are also present. Deft. is detained on consent without prejudice. Detention hearing set for 5/2/18 at 11:30 AM. (jm) [1:18-mj-02695-UA] (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Sharon Louise McCarthy appearing FOR BAIL PURPOSES ONLY for Sohrab Sharma. (jm) [1:18-mj-02695-UA] (Entered: 05/02/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Raymond Trapani from the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (dif) [1:18-mj-03271-UA] (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang: Initial Appearance as to Robert Farkas held on 4/25/2018. Defendant appears with retained counsel Dan Horwitz. AUSA Negar Tekeei present for the government. BAIL DISPOSITION: AGREED CONDITIONS OF RELEASE; $5 MILLION PERSONAL RECOGNIZANCE BOND; COSIGNED BY THREE FINANCIALLY RESPONSIBLE PERSONS; SECURED BY $1 MILLION IN REAL PROPERTY AND OR CASH; HOME DETENTION WITH LOCATION MONITORING; COMPLIANCE WITH THE APRIL 16 SEIZURE WARRANT, WHICH DIRECTS "ANY PERSON OR ENTITY PRESENTLY IN POSSESSION OR CONTROL OF THE PROPERTY" TO EFFECTUATE THE TRANSFER OF 91,000 ETHER CURRENTLY ON DEPOSIT IN ETHER WALLET ADDRESS 0xDA6F983076725cB2899205A16E16d1ed60a0067A, WITH COMPLIANCE DEFINED AS THE ACTUAL SUCCESSFUL TRANSFER OF THE RELEVANT ASSETS INTO THE CUSTODY AND CONTROL OF LAW ENFORCEMENT; PROHIBITION AGAINST ACCESSING, DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THE DIGITAL WALLET CONTAINING CENTRA TECH ICO FUNDS OR TRANSFERRING ANY FUNDS OUT OF THE DIGITAL WALLET, EXCEPT FOR PURPOSES OF COMPLYING WITH THE SEIZURE WARRANT; PROHIBITION AGAINST USE OR ACCESS TO ANY COMPUTERS, SMARTPHONES, OR INTERNET; PROHIBITION AGAINST POSSESSION OF ANY FIREARMS, DESTRUCTIVE DEVICES, OR OTHER WEAPONS; DRUG TESTING AS REQUIRED BY PRETRIAL SERVICES OFFICER; TRAVEL RESTRICTED TO SDNY/EDNY/SDFL; SURRENDER TRAVEL DOCUMENTS AND NO NEW APPLICATIONS; DEFT SHALL DISCLOSE ALL ASSETS TO PTS AND THE USAO, INCLUDING ANY ASSETS HE HAS POSSESSION, CUSTODY, OR CONTROL, INCLUDING JOINT OR BUSINESS ACCOUNTS, AND INCLUDING CASH, CRYPTOCURRENCY, OR DIGITAL CURRENCY; DEFT SHALL HAVE NO CONTACT WITH ANY CO-DEFENDANTS OUTSIDE OF THE PRESENCE OF COUNSEL; ANY OTHER AS RECOMMENDED BY PTS; DEFT SHALL BE RELEASED IF ALL THE CONDITIONS ARE MET. (Preliminary Hearing set for 5/25/2018 at 10:00 AM before Judge Unassigned.) (jbo) [1:18-mj-02695-UA] (Entered: 04/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Arrest of Robert Farkas. (jbo) [1:18-mj-02695-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniel James Horwitz appearing for Robert Farkas. (jbo) [1:18-mj-02695-UA] (Entered: 04/26/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Arrest of Raymond Trapani in the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. (dif) [1:18-mj-03271-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          COMPLAINT as to Raymond Trapani (1). In Violation of 15 U.S.C. 78j (B), 78ff; 17 C.F.R. 240.10b-5; 18 U.S.C. 371, 1349, 1343 and 2 (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron) (dif) [1:18-mj-03271-UA] (Entered: 05/15/2018)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 4/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            SEALED ORAL ORDER as to Sealed Defendant 1. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 4/18/2018)(dif) [1:18-mj-03271-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Arrest of Sohrab Sharma in the United States District Court - Southern District of Florida. Rule 5(c)(3) documents received. (jbo) [1:18-mj-02695-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document  Filed: 3/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                SEALED ORAL ORDER as to Sealed Defendant 1. (Signed by Magistrate Judge James L. Cott on 3/31/18) (jbo) [1:18-mj-02695-UA]
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  This case has been viewed 50 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                   
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Need Password Help?