Lindsay v. WDFG North America LLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Kentucky Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-00169
District Judge William O. Bertelsman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 5, 2019 at 8:15 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Garey E. Lindsay, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Daniel Goode +1 513 684 3678 +1 513 684 3946 daniel.goode@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 09/29/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY Garey E. Lindsay +1 513 684 3656 +1 513 684 3946
v.
No Logo Wdfg North America LLC, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 790 - Labor: Other
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: That Petitioner's motion to voluntarily dismiss this action without prejudice is GRANTED. The Show Cause Hearing currently set for 11/15/2016 is VACATED. The pending motions (Docs. 1 and 6 ) are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/19/2016.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 10/19/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/19/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re 10 MOTION to Dismiss by Garey E. Lindsay (ECO)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/18/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION to Dismiss by Garey E. Lindsay (Attachments: # 1 certificate of service, # 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Goode, Daniel) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      ORDER: That Plf file proof of such service or a status report regarding service efforts on or before 10/21/2016. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 10/11/2016.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 10/11/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        VIRTUAL ORDER: granting 7 Motion of Garey E. Lindsay to Withdraw as counsel of record for Petitioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Candace J. Smith on 9/29/2016. (ECO)cc: COR w/copy mailed to Garey E. Lindsay (Entered: 09/29/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of Candace J. Smith for review: re 7 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Garey E. Lindsay (ECO)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Garey E. Lindsay Motions referred to Candace J. Smith. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Goode, Daniel) (Entered: 09/26/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              NOTICE OF MANDATORY ECF DIRECTED TO Garey E. Lindsay, a non-registered attorney re 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE had to be MAILED TO a non-registered attorney, which is in direct violation of this court's General Orders re: Mandatory ECF. Failure to comply will result in this matter being submitted to the Chief Judge. cc: COR (ECO) (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: 1) That the Respondent appear before the Court at a SHOW CAUSE HEARING set for 11/15/2016 at 01:00 PM at the U.S. Courthouse in Covington, Kentucky and then and there show cause; 2) That Respondent shall file an answer to the allegations of said petition with the Clerk of this Court and serve a copy thereof on Petitioner w/in 7 days of the date of this Order. Should respondent wish to file a memorandum in response to Petitioner's Memorandum in Support of Petition, such response shall be served and filed w/in 14 days of the date of this Order. Should Petitioner wish to file a response, such reply shall be served and filed w/in 7 days of respondent's response memorandum; and 3) That service of a copy of this Order to Show Cause together with a copy of the petition and exhibits upon which it is issued be forthwith made upon Respondent in any manner provided by the Rules of Civil Procedure for the U.S. District Court or by certified mail on or before 9/24/2016, and that proof of such service be filed with the Court. Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 9/22/2016.(ECO)cc: COR (Entered: 09/22/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  MOTION to Adjudicate Based on Affidavit Evidence by Garey E. Lindsay. (Attachments: # 1 Memo in Support, # 2 Proposed Order)(TJZ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 9/23/2016: # 3 Ex 1a-Unfair Labor Practice Charge,, # 4 Ex 1b-Amended Unfair Labor Practice Charge, # 5 Ex 2a-Complaint and Notice of Hearing,, # 6 Ex 2b-Amendment to Complaint,, # 7 Ex 4-Parties expired CBA, # 8 Ex 3-Respondent Answer to Complaint,, # 9 Ex 5-Lisha Sly Affidavit,, # 10 Ex 6-Email btw Union and Employer re bargaining dates, # 11 Ex 7-extension agreement,) (TJZ). (Entered: 09/23/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ***MOTION SUBMITTED TO CHAMBERS of William O. Bertelsman for review: re 1 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Garey E. Lindsay (TJZ)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Conflict Check run. (TJZ)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        STANDING REFERRAL ORDER: 1) Case referred to presiding Magistrate Judge to supervise discovery and pretrial proceedings; 2) Magistrate Judge shall conduct all pretrial and status conferences, rule on non-dispositive motions. Dispositive motions and motions in limine will be ruled on by district judge; final pretrial conference and trial will be conducted by the district judge unless the parties agree to trial by Magistrate Judge, pursuant to 28 USC ยง 636(c). Signed by Judge William O. Bertelsman on 6/18/2010. (TJZ)cc: COR (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION for Preliminary Injunction, MOTION to Adjudicate based on Affidavit and Exhibits by Garey E. Lindsay. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum in Support, # 2 Civil Cover Sheet, # 3 Motion to Adjudicate based on Affidavit and Exhibits, # 4 Memo in Support of Motion to Adjudicate, # 5 proposed order to show case, # 6 proposed order on motion to adjudicate, # 7 proposed order on preliminary injunction, # 8 Ex 1a-Unfair Labor Practice Charge, # 9 Ex 1b-Amended Unfair Labor Practice Charge, # 10 Ex 2a-Complaint and Notice of Hearing, # 11 Ex 2b-Amendment to Complaint, # 12 Ex 3-Respondent Answer to Complaint, # 13 Ex 4-Parties expired CBA, # 14 Ex 5-Lisha Sly Affidavit, # 15 Ex 6-Email btw Union and Employer re bargaining dates, # 16 Ex 7-extension agreement, # 17 Certificate of Service)(TJZ) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 12 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?