National Labor Relations Board v. Scott
Federal Civil Lawsuit Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:16-cv-01664
District Judge Ellen L. Hollander, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 8, 2019 at 9:03 AM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo National Labor Relations Board, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Patrick J Cullen +1 213 894 5213 +1 213 894 2778 patrick.cullen@nlrb.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 10/15/2016, LEAD ATTORNEY Joseph E McGlew-Castaneda +1 410 962 2775 +1 410 962 2198 joseph.mcglew-castaneda@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Clinton S. Scott, Respondent
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
MARGINAL ORDER granting 6 Motion of plaintiff for Voluntary Dismissal. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 6/28/2016. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    MOTION for Voluntary Dismissal by National Labor Relations Board Responses due by 7/15/2016 (McGlew-Castaneda, Joseph) (Entered: 06/28/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph E McGlew-Castaneda on behalf of National Labor Relations Board (McGlew-Castaneda, Joseph) (Entered: 06/07/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/3/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by National Labor Relations Board re 3 Affidavit of Service Proof of Delivery (Cullen, Patrick) (Entered: 06/03/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          AFFIDAVIT of Service for Order to Show Cause and Application served on Clinton S. Scott on 06/02/2016, filed by National Labor Relations Board. (Cullen, Patrick) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 5/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 5/27/2016. (jnls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/31/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 5/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              APPLICATION for Order Requiring Compliance with Administrative Subpoena Ad Testificandum by National Labor Relations Board (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Memorandum in Support, # 3 Exhibit Index, # 4 Exhibit 1, # 5 Exhibit 2, # 6 Exhibit 3, # 7 Exhibit 4, # 8 Exhibit 5, # 9 Exhibit 6, # 10 Text of Proposed Order granting motion, # 11 Text of Proposed Order to show cause)(dass, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 05/27/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF

                Statistics

                This case has been viewed 12 times.

                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                Space
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                 
                PlainSite
                Sign Up
                Need Password Help?