AMID/Metro Partnership, LLC v. River Birch, Inc.

Federal Civil Lawsuit Louisiana Eastern District Court, Case No. 2:12-cv-00508
District Judge Eldon E. Fallon, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Eldon E. Fallon
Last Updated February 8, 2019 at 12:37 AM EST (6.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo AMID/Metro Partnership, LLC, Plaintiff

Represented by Adams and Reese LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Eugene Gregg Barrios +1 504 581 3234 +1 504 566 0210 gregg.barrios@arlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Scott Edward Delacroix +1 504 581 3234 scott.delacroix@arlaw.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Christopher J. Kane +1 504 581 3234 Christopher.kane@arlaw.com
v.
No Logo Albert J Ward, Jr, Defendant
No Logo Frederick R. Heebe, Defendant

Represented by Direct: 504-680-6050

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED William P. Gibbens +1 504 680 6050 billy@semmlaw.com
No Logo Highway 90, LLC, Defendant
No Logo Riverbirch Inc., Defendant
Attributes
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1962
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Timeline
  Entries (7) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/23/2013, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice as to River Birch, Inc., Highway 90, LLC, Frederick R. Heebe, Albert J. Ward, Jr. by AMID Metro Partnership, LLC. (Barrios, Eugene) (Entered: 05/23/2013)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 4 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 3/19/12. (ala, ) (Entered: 03/19/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
EXPARTE/CONSENT Joint MOTION to Stay with Incorporated Memorandum of Law by Frederick R. Heebe. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Gibbens, William) (Entered: 03/16/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Rico Standing Order. by Clerk. (ala, ) (Entered: 02/29/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Knowles, III. (cl, ) (Entered: 02/28/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Filing fee received from AMID/Metro Partnership, LLC: $ 350 (cl, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT with jury demand against Frederick R. Heebe, Highway 90, LLC, River Birch, Inc., Albert J. Ward, Jr. (Credit Card not accepted or unavailable - payment of filing fee due within 2 business days) filed by AMID/Metro Partnership, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Delacroix, Scott) (Entered: 02/24/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1 time.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?