Arturo Porzecanski v. Alex Azar
Appeal Court of Appeals for the D.C. Circuit, Case No. 18-5222

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 8, 2019 at 12:31 AM EST (3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts
Nature of Suit 2151 - Contract: Medicare Act Overpay
  Entries (13) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208090652 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
UNOPPOSED MOTION [1766422] stay briefing schedule filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II [Service Date: 12/31/2018 ] Length Certification: 203 words. [18-5222] (Lilley, Jaynie) [Entered: 12/31/2018 12:23 PM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208088945 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    CORRECTED APPELLANT BRIEF [1765559] filed by Arturo C. Porzecanski [Service Date: 12/21/2018 ] Length of Brief: 7,181 Words. [18-5222] (Wolverton, Caroline) [Entered: 12/21/2018 04:24 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208088939 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      RESPONSE [1765556] to letter concerning acronyms in briefs [1764388-2] filed by Arturo C. Porzecanski [Service Date: 12/21/2018 by CM/ECF NDA] Length Certification: 85 Words. [18-5222] (Wolverton, Caroline) [Entered: 12/21/2018 04:19 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208086682 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        LETTER [1764388] sent to counsel concerning the use of uncommon acronyms and abbreviations in briefs. [18-5222] [Entered: 12/17/2018 10:18 AM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208086384 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          APPELLANT BRIEF [1764213] filed by Arturo C. Porzecanski [Service Date: 12/13/2018 ] Length of Brief: 7,105 words, excluding the parts of the brief exempted by Fed. R. App. P. 32(f) and Circuit Rule 32(e)(1). [18-5222] (Wolverton, Caroline) [Entered: 12/13/2018 06:12 PM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208068730 Filed: 10/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            CLERK'S ORDER [1754681] filed granting the joint motion to extend the briefing schedule to accommodate pending mediation [1754508-2], The following revised briefing schedule will now apply: APPELLANT Brief due 12/13/2018. APPELLEE Brief due on 01/28/2019. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 02/11/2019. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 02/19/2019. Final Briefs due 03/04/2019. [18-5222] [Entered: 10/11/2018 01:04 PM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208068479 Filed: 10/10/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              JOINT UNOPPOSED MOTION [1754508] to extend time to file brief to 12/13/2018 filed by Arturo C. Porzecanski [Service Date: 10/10/2018 ] Length Certification: 283. [18-5222] (Wolverton, Caroline) [Entered: 10/10/2018 01:07 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208062572 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                CLERK'S ORDER [1751354] filed setting briefing schedule: APPELLANT Brief due 10/29/2018. APPELLEE Brief due on 11/28/2018. APPELLANT Reply Brief due 12/12/2018. DEFERRED APPENDIX due 12/19/2018. Final Briefs due 01/02/2019. [18-5222] [Entered: 09/18/2018 06:10 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208053576 Filed: 8/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CERTIFICATE AS TO PARTIES, RULINGS AND RELATED CASES [1746592] filed by Mr. Alex Michael Azar, II [Service Date: 08/21/2018 ] [18-5222] (Lilley, Jaynie) [Entered: 08/21/2018 11:04 AM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208053485 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    TRANSCRIPT STATUS REPORT [1746548] filed by Arturo C. Porzecanski [Service Date: 08/20/2018 ]. Status of Transcripts: Final - No transcripts are needed for the appeal. [18-5222] (Keough, Christopher) [Entered: 08/20/2018 06:25 PM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208053482 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      STATEMENT OF ISSUES [1746547] filed by Arturo C. Porzecanski [Service Date: 08/20/2018 ] [18-5222] (Keough, Christopher) [Entered: 08/20/2018 06:23 PM]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208053488 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        UNDERLYING DECISION IN CASE [1746549] submitted by Arturo C. Porzecanski [Service Date: 08/20/2018 ] [18-5222] (Keough, Christopher) [Entered: 08/20/2018 06:26 PM]
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1208053479 Filed: 8/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          STATEMENT OF INTENT REGARDING APPENDIX DEFERRAL [1746546] filed by Arturo C. Porzecanski [Service Date: 08/20/2018 ] Intent: AppxDeferred [18-5222] (Keough, Christopher) [Entered: 08/20/2018 06:23 PM]
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 18 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?