United States v. Talley
Criminal Case Maryland District Court, Case No. 1:18-cr-00625
District Judge Catherine C. Blake, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 8, 2019 at 12:39 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Lindsey N McCulley +1 410 209 4800 lindsey.mcculley@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Patricia Corwin Mclane +1 410 209 4942 +1 410 962 0717 Patricia.McLane@usdoj.gov
v.
No Logo James Hill, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY David W Fischer +1 410 787 1800 +1 401 787 1853 fischerandputzi@hotmail.com
No Logo Kanakia Feagins, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Gerald C Ruter +1 410 821 9500 +1 410 821 6203 gruter.law@comcast.net
No Logo Michael Talley, Jr., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael D Montemarano +1 410 992 0067 +1 410 992 6915 montemarano67@gmail.com
No Logo Michael Talley, Sr., Defendant
No Logo Shannon Flint, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Christopher John Purpura +1 410 727 8550 +1 410 576 9351 cjpurpura@hotmail.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (26) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Case as to Michael Talley, Sr, Shannon Flint, Kanakia Feagins, James Hill, Michael Talley, Jr reassigned to Judge Catherine C. Blake. Judge Ellen L. Hollander no longer assigned to the case. (cags, Deputy Clerk)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    REQUEST & ORDER DIRECTING probation to prepare a preliminary report regarding criminal history as to Kanakia Feagins. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/28/2018. (c/em:probation) (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      CJA 20 as to Kanakia Feagins: Appointment of Attorney Gerald C Ruter for Kanakia Feagins. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/20/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        CJA 20 as to Shannon Flint: Appointment of Attorney Christopher John Purpura for Shannon Flint. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/19/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          CJA 20 as to Michael Talley: Appointment of Attorney Michael D Montemarano for Michael Talley. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/20/2018.(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            CJA 20 as to James Hill: Appointment of Attorney David W Fischer for James Hill. Signed by Judge Ellen L. Hollander on 12/20/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Michael D Montemarano as CJA Appointment appearing for Michael Talley, Jr(Montemarano, Michael) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                ORDER OF DETENTION as to James Hill. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/21/18. (krs, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/26/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Detention Hearing as to James Hill held on 12/21/2018 before Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson.(FTR- KLEIN 7B.) (jks, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/21/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER OF DETENTION by Agreement as to Michael Talley, Sr. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/19/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Michael Talley, Sr. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/19/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/19/2018 in case as to Michael Talley, Sr(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          ORDER OF Temporary DETENTION as to James Hill. Detention Hearing set for 12/21/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7B, 101 West Lombard Street, Baltimore, Maryland 21201, before Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/19/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by James Hill (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/19/2018 in case as to James Hill(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER OF DETENTION by Agreement as to Shannon Flint. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/19/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Shannon Flint (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/19/2018 in case as to Shannon Flint(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      ORDER Setting Conditions of Release as to Michael Talley, Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson on 12/19/2018. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Michael Talley, Jr (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Arrest Warrant Returned Executed on 12/19/2018 in case as to Michael Talley, Jr(hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            Initial Appearance as to James Hill (Defendant informed of Rights.) held on 12/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson.(FTR KLEIN -7B.) (jks, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              Initial Appearance as to Shannon Flint (Defendant informed of Rights.) held on 12/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson.(FTR KLEIN -7B.) (jks, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                Initial Appearance as to Michael Talley, Sr (Defendant informed of Rights.) held on 12/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson.(FTR KLEIN -7B.) (jks, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Initial Appearance as to Michael Talley, Jr (Defendant informed of Rights.) held on 12/19/2018 before Magistrate Judge J. Mark Coulson.(FTR KLEIN -7B.) (jks, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/20/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    INDICTMENT as to Michael Talley, Sr. (1) count(s) 1, 2-5, Shannon Flint (2) count(s) 1, 2, 4, Kanakia Feagins (3) count(s) 1, 2-3, James Hill (4) count(s) 1, 2-3, Michael Talley, Jr. (5) count(s) 1, 5. (hmls, Deputy Clerk) (Entered: 12/19/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                      Statistics

                                                      This case has been viewed 20 times.

                                                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                      Space
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                       
                                                      PlainSite
                                                      Sign Up
                                                      Need Password Help?