Destefano v. Udren Law Offices PC
Appeal Court of Appeals for the Third Circuit, Case No. 18-2309

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 22, 2019 at 4:52 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Nature of Suit 3480 - Consumer Credit
  Entries (10) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Luciana DeStefano - Appendix. Copies: 4. Volumes: 3 (Volume I attached to Brief). (EAF) [Entered: 10/04/2018 11:47 AM]
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 10/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    HARD COPY RECEIVED from Appellant Luciana DeStefano - Brief with Volume I of Appendix attached. Copies: 7. (LM) [Entered: 10/02/2018 12:28 PM]
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3013047349 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC APPENDIX on behalf of Appellant Luciana DeStefano, filed. Certificate of service dated 09/28/2018 by ECF. [18-2309] (FC) [Entered: 09/28/2018 03:06 PM]
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3013047326 Filed: 9/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        ECF FILER: ELECTRONIC BRIEF with Volume I of Appendix attached on behalf of Appellant Luciana DeStefano, filed. Certificate of Service dated 09/28/2018 by ECF. [18-2309] (FC) [Entered: 09/28/2018 02:59 PM]
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3013025481 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          BRIEFING NOTICE ISSUED. Brief on behalf of Appellant Luciana DeStefano due on or before 10/15/2018. Appendix due on or before 10/15/2018. (JK) [Entered: 09/05/2018 10:17 AM]
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3013025436 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            ORDER (Clerk) granting Stipulation to Dismiss Appellees. The appeal is dismissed with prejudice and without costs as to Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Company as Trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-HE8 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE8 and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC only. The appeal will continue as to the remaining Appellee, Udren Law Offices P.C., filed. (JK) [Entered: 09/05/2018 10:03 AM]
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3013020901 Filed: 8/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              ECF FILER: Stipulation to Dismiss Appellees Deutsche Bank National Trust Company, as trustee for Morgan Stanley ABS Capital I Inc. Trust 2006-HE8 Mortgage Pass-Through Certificates, Series 2006-HE8 and Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b) filed by Appellant Luciana DeStefano with prejudice and without costs. Certificate of Service dated 08/29/2018. Service made by ECF. [18-2309]--[Edited 08/29/2018 by JK] (FC) [Entered: 08/29/2018 12:24 PM]
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012992391 Filed: 7/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Notice to Counsel. The attached document is restricted. To view document, click on the document number link in the NDA (Notice of Docket Activity). In order to access this document, you must be the attorney of record using your individual ECF login and password. (TNH) [Entered: 07/26/2018 12:14 PM]
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012981893 Filed: 7/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  ECF FILER: Concise Summary of the Case filed by Appellee Udren Law Offices PC, received. [18-2309] (JEK) [Entered: 07/13/2018 03:15 PM]
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3012970240 Filed: 6/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    FOLLOW UP LETTER to David Neeren, Esq. for Udren Law Offices PC requesting the following document(s): Appearance Form on or before 07/13/2018. (JK) [Entered: 06/29/2018 10:00 AM]
                      Request RequestSpace LREF

                      Statistics

                      This case has been viewed 10 times.

                      No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                      Space
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                      Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                       
                      PlainSite
                      Sign Up
                      Need Password Help?