Collins v. Foley
Federal Civil Lawsuit Ohio Northern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02861
District Judge Christopher A. Boyko, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated March 11, 2020 at 5:31 PM DT (1.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo James D. Collins, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space James D. Collins
v.
No Logo Jennifer Gillence, Defendant
No Logo Keith Foley, Defendant
No Logo LaShann Eppinger, Defendant
No Logo Lt. Costello, Defendant
No Logo Richard Roddick, Defendant
No Logo Steve Weishar, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Copy of docket and 8 Magistrate Consent Form mailed to James D. Collins 311789, Southern Ohio Correctional Facility, P.O. Box 45699, Lucasville, OH 45699 on 12/13/2018. (M,TL)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 3/11/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion to Alter/Amend Judgment
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Magistrate Consent Form issued. (M,TL) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/25/2019, Entered: None Alter/Amend judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Random Assignment of Magistrate Judge pursuant to Local Rule 3.1. In the event of a referral, case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge William H. Baughman, Jr. (M,TL)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/8/2019, Entered: None Extension (Other)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Judge Christopher A. Boyko assigned to case. (M,TL)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None Judgment
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Ohio Southern. Case number 2:18-cv-01381. Electronic file, transfer order and docket sheet received. (Entered: 12/13/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 3/21/2019, Entered: None memorandum opinion and order
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Case transferred to District of Northern District of Ohio Eastern Division at Cleveland. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (daf) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/12/2018, Entered: None Order on Motion to change/transfer venueCourt Filing
                        ORDER denying 5 Motion to Transfer this Action to the Western Division in Cincinnati. This is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio Eastern Division at Cleveland. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 12/12/2018. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 12/12/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/29/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          MOTION to Transfer This Action to the Western Division in Cincinnati, Ohio by Plaintiff James D. Collins. (Attachments: # 1 Envelope) (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/20/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Filing fee received: $400. Receipt number: 200COL054702. (ew) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER and NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY: Plaintiff is ORDERED to pay the $400 filing fee within THIRTY (30) DAYS. Alternatively, Plaintiff may submit an application to proceed in forma pauperis under ?? 1915(a), submitting the required affidavit and trust fund statement from his prison's cashier. Signed by Magistrate Judge Chelsey M. Vascura on 11/8/2018. (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 11/08/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Set/Reset Deadlines: Deficiency Deadline by 12/6/2018. (daf) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.]
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY (Attachments: # 1 Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis) (daf)(This document has been sent by regular mail to the party(ies) listed in the NEF that did not receive electronic notification.) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 11/06/2018)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Plaintiff's Motion to Order U.S Marshall to Serve the Summons and Complaint of Each Defendant by Plaintiff James D. Collins. (daf) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 11/06/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 11/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Lt. Costello, Lashann Eppinger, Keith Foley, Jennifer Gillence, Richard Roddick, and Steve Weishar, filed by James D. Collins. (Attachments: # 1 Summons Forms, # 2 Marshal Forms, # 3 Civil Cover Sheet, # 4 Exhibit AA, # 5 Exhibit A-Z, # 6 Letter, # 7 Envelope) (daf) [Transferred from ohsd on 12/13/2018.] (Entered: 11/06/2018)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?