Twichell v. 3M Company
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:18-cv-01123

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 2:19 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Ben Twichell, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Levin Papantonio Thomas Mitchell Rafferty & Proctor, PA

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY DANIEL A. NIGH +1 850 435 7013 +1 850 435 7020 dnigh@levinlaw.com
v.
3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Innovative Properties Company, Defendant
Officially listed as "3M Company"
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332-pip-Diversity-Personal
Nature of Suit 367 - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
  Entries (8) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT (Attachments: # 1 Civil Notice - appeal)(AKL) (Entered: 12/28/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/17/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT. Due to the retirement of Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel, this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge David T. Schultz. Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel no longer assigned to the case. NOTE: the new case number is 18-cv-01123-JNE-DTS. Please use this case number for all subsequent pleadings. (JAT) (Entered: 08/17/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      TEXT ONLY ENTRY. COUNSEL PLEASE NOTE: This docket contains pleadings and orders pertaining to this case only and some, but not all, orders from the master case file In re: Bair Hugger Forced Air Warming Devices Products Liability Litigation, 0:15-md-2666 (JNE/FLN). Counsel shall read and comply with all Pretrial Orders filed in this master case. Pleadings filed and orders issued in the master case may be accessed through the master docket sheet at 0:15-md-2666-JNE-FLN. Additionally, access to Pretrial Orders, minutes, transcripts, and other documents issued in the master case may be found on the Bair Hugger MDL website at: www.mnd.uscourts.gov/MDL-Bair-Hugger/index.shtml . (AKL) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MDL PRETRIAL ORDER No. 1 Establishing Procedures. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 1/13/2016. (AKL) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Summons Issued as to 3M Company. (AKL) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/26/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Joan N. Ericksen per MDL list, referred to Magistrate Judge Franklin L. Noel. Please use case number 18cv1123 JNE/FLN. (AKL) (Entered: 04/26/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 12/21/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 Court Filing
              ORDER Directing Clerk to Enter Judgment. Signed by Judge Joan N. Ericksen on 12/21/2018. (CBC)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/25/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                COMPLAINT against 3M Company (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6078818) filed by Ben Twichell. Filer requests summons issued. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (Nigh, Daniel) (Entered: 04/25/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                  Statistics

                  This case has been viewed 4 times.

                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                  Space
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                   
                  PlainSite
                  Sign Up
                  Need Password Help?