Flores v. Valley Growers Nursery & Landscape, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:10-cv-00902
District Judge Robert E. Jones, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2019 at 2:11 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Felipe Jesus Flores-Salgado, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY T Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Ignacio Mendez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY T Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Jose Graciano Tercero, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY T Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Jose Luis Diaz-Ibarra, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY T Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Luis Diaz-Luna, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY T Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Sergio Flores, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY T Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Tobias Mascote, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by INTELLECTUAL PROPERTY GROUP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 12/05/2011, ATTORNEY T Meg Heaton +1 503 363 4189 +1 503 334 2337 meg@causaoregon.org

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
v.
No Logo John Appel, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of Judy Snyder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Holly M. Lloyd +1 503 228 5027 +1 503 241 2249 holly@jdsnyder.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Judy Danelle Snyder +1 503 228 5027 +1 503 241 2249 judy@jdsnyder.com
No Logo Valley Growers Nursery & Landscape, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bullard Smith Jernstedt Wilson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Riewald +1 503 248 1134 +1 503 224 8851 driewald@bullardlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Folawn Alterman & Richardson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/10/2011, TERMINATED: 02/10/2011 Corey B. Tolliver +1 503 517 8200 +1 503 517 8204 corey@farlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Neth Warberg +1 503 221 0309 +1 503 296 5373 jwarberg@littler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Powers McCulloch & Bennett, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/04/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/04/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J. Licurse +1 503 228 0057 ml@pmblaw.com
No Logo Victoria Guevara, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Bullard Smith Jernstedt Wilson

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED David J. Riewald +1 503 248 1134 +1 503 224 8851 driewald@bullardlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Folawn Alterman & Richardson LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
TERMINATED: 02/10/2011, TERMINATED: 02/10/2011 Corey B. Tolliver +1 503 517 8200 +1 503 517 8204 corey@farlawfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Littler Mendelson, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jennifer Neth Warberg +1 503 221 0309 +1 503 296 5373 jwarberg@littler.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Powers McCulloch & Bennett, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/04/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, TERMINATED: 11/04/2011, LEAD ATTORNEY Michael J. Licurse +1 503 228 0057 ml@pmblaw.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 201
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (47) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 9/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Order Dismissal. Signed on 9/11/2012 by Cindy Schultz, Deputy Clerk (ecp) (Entered: 09/13/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 5/25/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
    RECORD ORDER: Granting Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 44 . Deadline to amend pleadings and join all claims and parties - 8/27/2012. Deadline to complete discovery and file discovery motions- 8/27/2012. Deadline to file dispositive motions - 9/27/2012. Deadline to file joint alternate dispute resolution report - 10/29/2012. Signed on 5/25/12 by Judge Robert E. Jones. (ecp) (Entered: 05/29/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 5/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Order Referring Case to Mediation. In accordance with LR 16-4, this case is referred to the Staff Mediator for mediation. Parties should refer to the webpage at ord.uscourts.gov/en/alternative-dispute-resolution/district-adr-program for more information. Signed on 5/24/2012 by Judge Robert E. Jones. (sm) (Entered: 05/24/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 5/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Defendants. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A) (Riewald, David) (Entered: 05/23/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Amended Complaint .Filed by Jose Luis Diaz-Ibarra, Sergio Flores, Felipe Jesus Flores-Salgado, Ignacio Mendez, Jose Graciano Tercero against All Defendants. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 02/27/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 2/23/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint 40 . Signed on 2/23/2012 by Judge Robert E. Jones. (ecp) (Entered: 02/23/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Declaration of D. Michael Dale ISO Motion to Amend Complaint. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition 40 .) (Dale, D.) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 2/21/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint/Petition . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1 - Proposed Amended Complaint) (Dale, D.) (Entered: 02/21/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 2/2/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Jose Luis Diaz-Ibarra, Sergio Flores, Felipe Jesus Flores-Salgado, Ignacio Mendez, Jose Graciano Tercero. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 02/02/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                    ORDER by Judge Robert E. Jones: GRANTING Defendants' unopposed motion (# 36 ) to extend deadlines as follows: All amended pleadings and join all claims and parties to be completed by 5/25/12. Discovery is to be completed and all discovery motions are due by 5/25/2012. Dispositive Motions are due by 6/25/2012. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/25/2012. (eo) (Entered: 12/28/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Declaration of Jennifer N. Warberg . Filed by Victoria Guevara, Valley Growers Nursery & Landscape, Inc.. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 36 .) (Warberg, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/16/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by Victoria Guevara, Valley Growers Nursery & Landscape, Inc.. (Warberg, Jennifer) (Entered: 12/16/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 12/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Notice of Attorney Withdrawal: Filed by All Plaintiffs (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 12/05/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney David J. Riewald is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Corey B. Tolliver Filed by Valley Growers Nursery & Landscape, Inc., Victoria Guevara (Riewald, David) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Answer to 1 Complaint, . Filed by John Appel. (Snyder, Judy) (Entered: 11/11/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER: Having received no response from plaintiffs, defendant Appel's Motion to Set Aside Order of Default 27 is granted. Ordered by Judge Robert E. Jones. (ecp) (Entered: 11/10/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Notice of Attorney Substitution:Attorney Corey B. Tolliver is substituted as counsel of record in place of Attorney Michael J. Licurse Filed by Valley Growers Nursery & Landscape, Inc., Victoria Guevara (Tolliver, Corey) (Entered: 11/04/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Affidavit of Judy Danelle Snyder in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default. Filed by John Appel. (Related document(s): Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment 27 .) (Snyder, Judy) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Affidavit of John Appel in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default. Filed by John Appel. (Related document(s): Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment 27 .) (Snyder, Judy) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        Memorandum in Support of Motion to Set Aside Default. Filed by John Appel. (Related document(s): Motion to Set Aside Default Judgment 27 .) (Snyder, Judy) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/17/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Motion to Set Aside the Default Judgment . Filed by John Appel. (Snyder, Judy) (Entered: 10/17/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion 24 for Entry of Default as to John Appel is granted. Ordered by Judge Robert E. Jones. (ecp) (Entered: 09/29/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Declaration of Meg Heaton . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for default 24 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                Motion for Entry of Default as to John Appel. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/8/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  Amended Return of Service by Publication in the Canby Herald. Last date published was 08/13/2011 filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 09/08/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 8/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Return of Service by Publication in the Canby Herald. Last date published was 8/13/2011 filed by All Plaintiffs. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 08/30/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER by Judge Robert E. Jones: Granting Plaintiff's Motion for Service by Publication on Defendant John Appel 18 . (mkk) (Entered: 08/11/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Declaration of Meg Heaton . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Service by Publication 18 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Memorandum in Support . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Service by Publication 18 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 7/19/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            Motion for Service by Publication . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 07/19/2011)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 5/31/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                              ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion 15 for extension of pretrial deadlines is granted as follows: Service upon defendant John Appel: July 29, 2011. Pretrial pleadings, joinder, motions and discovery: December 27, 2011, Alternative dispute resolution report: January 25, 2012. Plaintiff' motion 13 is moot. Ordered by Judge Robert E. Jones. (ecp) (Entered: 06/02/2011)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                Declaration of Meg Heaton. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 15 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 4/29/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines & Deadline for Service. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 04/29/2011)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    Declaration of Meg Heaton. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 13 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 4/11/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                      Motion for Extension of Time for Service. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 04/11/2011)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 3/30/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER: Plaintiffs' Motion 11 to extend all pretrial deadlines and deadline for service is granted as follows: Deadline for all pretrial pleadings, joinder, motions and discovery is extended to 5/31/2011. Deadline for Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is extended to 6/30/2011. Plaintiffs to complete service on John Appel by 4/11/11. Ordered by Judge Robert E. Jones. (ecp) (Entered: 03/31/2011)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          Motion for Extension of Time Pre-trial and service deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: # 1 Attachment Declaration) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 03/21/2011)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/10/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            Answer to 1 Complaint,. Filed by Victoria Guevara, Valley Growers Nursery & Landscape, Inc.. (Tolliver, Corey) (Entered: 02/10/2011)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 1/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                              ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion 7 to extend time for service is granted as follows: Plaintiffs to complete service on defendants by 2/25/2011. Ordered by Judge Robert E. Jones. (ecp) (Entered: 01/07/2011)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Declaration of Meg Heaton. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time 7 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 1/5/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Service. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 01/05/2011)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 12/1/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    ORDER: Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 3 is granted as follows: Deadline for all pretrial pleadings, joinder, motions and discovery is extended to 3/2/2011. Alternative Dispute Resolution Report is due 4/2/2011. Pretrial Order is waived. Signed on 12/1/2010 by Judge Robert E. Jones. (ecp) (Entered: 12/02/2010)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 11/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                      Summons Issued as to John Appel, Victoria Guevara, Valley Growers Nursery & Landscape, Inc. (ljl) (Entered: 11/30/2010)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Declaration of Meg Heaton. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 3 .) (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 11/29/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Heaton, Meg) (Entered: 11/29/2010)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Robert E. Jones. Discovery is to be completed by 12/2/2010. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 12/30/2010. Pretrial Order is due by 12/30/2010. Ordered by Judge Robert E. Jones. (ljl) (Entered: 08/02/2010)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 7/30/2010, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                              Complaint. Filing Fee in amount of $350 collected. Receipt No. 34926. Filed by Luis Diaz-Luna, Jose Luis Diaz-Ibarra, Sergio Flores, Felipe Jesus Flores-Salgado, Tobias Mascote, Ignacio Mendez, Jose Graciano Tercero against John Appel, Victoria Guevara, Valley Growers Nursery & Landscape, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet JS44) (dnt) (Entered: 07/30/2010)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                                This case has been viewed 0 times.

                                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                Space
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                 
                                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                                Need Password Help?