Unknown Case Title
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-01552
Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2019 at 3:38 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Armando Palmeno, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Gilberto Altamirano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
No Logo Marco Serrano, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net
v.
No Logo Juan Munoz, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 111

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Diane C. Cady +1 503 352 0731 +1 503 597 1325 dcady@proctorlawpc.com
No Logo Munoz Construction, LLC, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 111

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Diane C. Cady +1 503 352 0731 +1 503 597 1325 dcady@proctorlawpc.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 0216
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (15) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER OF DISMISSAL - Based on the unopposed motion 14 to dismiss, filed on 9/6/12, the court finds this case has been fully compromised and settled. Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs to any party and with leave, upon good cause shown within 60 days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Dated this 7th day of September 2012, by U.S. Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (peg) (Entered: 09/07/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Unopposed Motion to Dismiss . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 09/06/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/6/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - In light of the reported settlement of this matter, the Court STRIKES the current case management schedule and SETS a Final Paper Call hearing for Monday, September 10, 2012, at 9:00AM, in Courtroom 15B. If documents sufficient to finalize this matter are filed by the parties on or before close of business 9/6/12, the FPC hearing will automatically be stricken and counsel would not need to appear on 9/10/12. (peg) (Entered: 08/06/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 4/27/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MINUTES of Proceedings: Telephone Rule 16 Conference held by Judge Acosta. ORDER: Discovery to be completed and a joint ADR report due by 7/27/12; Dispositive motions, if any, are to be filed no later than 8/27/12; DEFERRING the filing of a pretrial order until after the court rules on any dispositive motions; DENYING as MOOT plaintiff's motion for extension of time 10, in light of this Rule 16 Conference. Michael Dale present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Diane Cady present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: None. Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta presiding. (peg) (Entered: 04/27/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          Declaration of D. Michael Dale In Support of Motion to Extend Pretrial Deadlines. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines 10 .) (Dale, D.) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Unopposed Motion for Extension of Discovery & PTO Deadlines . Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 04/26/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              SCHEDULING ORDER by Judge Acosta - SETTING a Telephone Rule 16 Conference for Friday, 4/27/2012 at 9:15AM; Court staff will initiate the call. (peg) (peg) (Entered: 04/18/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 4/16/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Amended Answer to Answer to Complaint 5 Affirmative Defenses and Counterclaim. Filed by Juan Munoz, Munoz Construction, LLC. (Related document(s): Answer to Complaint 5 .) (Cady, Diane) (Entered: 04/16/2012)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/11/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (ecp) (Entered: 04/12/2012)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Gilberto Altamirano, Armando Palmeno, Marco Serrano. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 04/04/2012)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Answer to 1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Juan Munoz, Munoz Construction, LLC. (Cady, Diane) (Entered: 03/26/2012)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Munoz Construction, LLC waiver sent on 1/30/2012. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Juan Munoz waiver sent on 1/30/2012. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Dale, D.) (Entered: 02/03/2012)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                            Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. Discovery is to be completed by 4/26/2012. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 5/29/2012. Pretrial Order is due by 5/29/2012. Ordered by Magistrate Judge John V. Acosta. (ecp) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Complaint. Filing Fee in amount of $350 collected. Receipt No. 44632. Jury Trial Requested: Yes.Filed by Gilberto Altamirano, Armando Palmeno, Marco Serrano against Juan Munoz, Munoz Construction, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (ecp) (Entered: 12/29/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                Statistics

                                This case has been viewed 1 time.

                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                Space
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                 
                                PlainSite
                                Sign Up
                                Need Password Help?