Yanez v. Jacee Enterprise International, Inc.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:11-cv-01094
District Judge Garr M. King, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 23, 2019 at 3:38 AM EST (2.9 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Jose Jaimes Yanez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 430

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Catherine A. Highet +1 503 228 1889 +1 503 223 4518 cathy@highetlaw.com
No Logo Jacee Enterprise International, Inc., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barran Liebman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tamara E. Russell +1 503 228 0500 +1 503 274 1212 trussell@barran.com
No Logo John Choi, Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Barran Liebman LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Tamara E. Russell +1 503 228 0500 +1 503 274 1212 trussell@barran.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 207
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (28) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/9/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Stipulated Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed on 5/9/2012 by Judge Garr M. King. (pc) (Entered: 05/09/2012)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Stipulated Motion "Stipulated Judgment of Dismissal with Prejudice". Filed by All Defendants. (Russell, Tamara) (Entered: 05/08/2012)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 4/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Order by Judge Garr M. King. This case was reported as settled by Judge Sue Leeson. The 4/24/2012 telephone conference is STRICKEN. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King. (pc) (Entered: 04/24/2012)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 3/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Order Referring Case to Mediation. In accordance with LR 16-4, this case is referred to the Honorable Susan M. Leeson for mediation. Parties should refer to the webpage at ord.uscourts.gov/en/alternative-dispute-resolution/district-adr-program for more information. Signed on 3/15/2012 by Judge Garr M. King. (pc) (Entered: 03/15/2012)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 3/13/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          Order Referring Case to Mediation. In accordance with LR 16-4, this case is referred to The Honorable Susan M. Leeson for mediation. Parties should refer to the webpage at ord.uscourts.gov/en/alternative-dispute-resolution/district-adr-program for more information. Signed on 3/13/2012 by Judge Garr M. King. (pc) (Entered: 03/13/2012)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 2/1/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
            MINUTES of Proceedings: Status Conference held before Judge Garr M. King. Status of case discussed as stated on the record. Order - Setting case schedule as follows: Because of settlement discussions, the discovery deadline is extended to 4/24/2012. Order - setting a further status conference for 4/24/2012 at 9:30 a.m. by telephone. The Court will initiate the call. If a settlement is reached prior to the next status conference, the parties are to notify the court and the status conference will be stricken. Catherine A. Highet present as counsel for plaintiff(s). Tamara E. Russell present as counsel for defendant(s). Court Reporter: Nancy Walker. Judge Garr M. King presiding. (pc) (Entered: 02/01/2012)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 1/10/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              Scheduling Order by Judge Garr M. King. Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the TIME of the 2/1/2012 Telephone Scheduling Conference is re-set from 09:00AM to 08:30AM. The Court will initiate the call. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King. (pc) (Entered: 01/10/2012)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 12/20/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Reply . Filed by Jose Jaimes Yanez. (Related document(s): Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 19 .) (Highet, Catherine) (Entered: 12/20/2011)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 12/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Exhibits 1 and 2 re Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim 19 . Filed by John Choi, Jacee Enterprise International, Inc.. (Russell, Tamara) (Entered: 12/12/2011)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 12/6/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Answer to 2 Complaint with Jury Demand, Counterclaim Jose Jaimes Yanez. Filed by John Choi, Jacee Enterprise International, Inc.. (Russell, Tamara) (Entered: 12/06/2011)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 12/2/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Jacee Enterprise International, Inc.. (Russell, Tamara) (Entered: 12/02/2011)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 11/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                        ORDER: Granting Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer / UNOPPOSED Motion to Extend First Appearance Deadline 15 . Defendant must file a first appearance by 12/6/2011. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King. (pc) (Entered: 11/28/2011)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Declaration of Tamara E. Russell . Filed by All Defendants. (Related document(s): Motion for Extension of Time to Answer a Complaint/Petition 15 .) (Russell, Tamara) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Second Motion for Extension of Time to Answer /[UNOPPOSED] Motion to Extend First Appearance Deadline. Filed by All Defendants. (Russell, Tamara) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 11/21/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                              ORDER - Granting the parties' written request to extend deadlines. Order - Setting a case schedule as follows: Discovery is to be completed by 2/24/2012;Dispositive Motions are due by 3/26/2012; Pretrial Order is due by 4/25/2012; No ADR report is required. Order - Setting a telephone scheduling conference for 2/1/2012 at 09:00AM. The Court will initiate the call. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King. (pc) (Entered: 11/21/2011)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 11/14/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                ORDER: Granting Defendants' Motion for Extension of Time to Answer /Extend First Appearance Deadline 12 . First appearance for both defendants is due by 11/29/2011. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King. (pc) (Entered: 11/14/2011)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 11/9/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  Motion for Extension of Time to Answer /Extend First Appearance Deadline. Filed by All Defendants. (Russell, Tamara) (Entered: 11/09/2011)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Jacee Enterprise International, Inc. waiver sent on 9/15/2011. Filed by Jose Jaimes Yanez. (Highet, Catherine) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 10/18/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by John Choi waiver sent on 9/15/2011. Filed by Jose Jaimes Yanez. (Highet, Catherine) (Entered: 10/18/2011)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 10/4/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order and Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Garr M. King. Discovery is to be completed by 2/1/2012. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/2/2012. Pretrial Order is due by 3/2/2012. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King. (cib) (Entered: 10/04/2011)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 10/3/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER: Finding as Moot Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 6 . This Motion is a duplicate of 1, which was already addressed in an order. Ordered by Judge Garr M. King. (pc) (Entered: 10/03/2011)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Certificate of Service by Jose Jaimes Yanez of Application for Leave to Proceed IFP 6 Filed by Jose Jaimes Yanez. (sd) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/28/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Jose Jaimes Yanez. (sd) (Entered: 09/30/2011)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/26/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER: Granting Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis 1 . Signed on 9/26/2011 by Judge Garr M. King. (pc) (Entered: 09/26/2011)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/23/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  Notice of Case Reassignment: This case has been reassigned from Judge Ancer L. Haggerty to Judge Garr M. King. (eo) (Entered: 09/23/2011)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Ancer L. Haggerty. (cib) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                      Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: YES.Filed by Jose Jaimes Yanez against John Choi, Jacee Enterprise International, Inc.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet) (cib) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/12/2011, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Jose Jaimes Yanez. (cib) (Entered: 09/14/2011)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                          Statistics

                                                          This case has been viewed 2 times.

                                                          No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                          Space
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                          Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                           
                                                          PlainSite
                                                          Sign Up
                                                          Need Password Help?