BROWN v. HAYDEN, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-00778-JBS

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo RAY ANTHONY BROWN, Plaintiff
v.
No Logo Camden County, Defendant
No Logo John Doe Defendants 1 through 10, Defendant
Officially listed as "JOHN DOE DEFENDANTS"
No Logo JOSEPH L. BATTEN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEVEN B. SACHAROW +1 856 667 1111
Hayden, Michael V. Hayden, Michael V., Defendant
Officially listed as "MICHAEL HAYDEN"
Motorola, Inc. Unknown Role, Motorola, Inc.

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEVEN B. SACHAROW +1 856 667 1111
No Logo THOMAS DIGANGI, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEVEN B. SACHAROW +1 856 667 1111
No Logo TOWNSHIP OF BERLIN, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space STEVEN B. SACHAROW +1 856 667 1111
Office Camden
Filed 2/25/1993
Jury Demand None
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
Cause Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition Judgment - Motion Before Trial
County Cumberland
Terminated 2/21/1995
Origin 4
Reopened 6/13/1994
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case None
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED
  Entries (39) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 33 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER, dismissing the case against deft CAMDEN COUNTY ( signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle ) (dt)
    LREF
    Blank 32 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
    ORDER dismissing as moot [28-1] motion of pltf. to stay the decision relating to deft's motion for summary judgment for six months, granting [27-1] motion of defts HAYDEN, TWP OF BERLIN, DIGANGI AND BATTEN for summary judgment and dismissing the complaint against them. (signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle ) (dt) Modified on 02/27/1995
      LREF
      Blank 31 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 OrderCourt Filing
      OPINION ( signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle ) (dt) Modified on 02/27/1995
        LREF
        Blank 30 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 2-21-95; The following actions were taken, mooting [28-1] motion to stay the decision relating to deft's motion for summary judgment for six months By Judge Jerome B. Simandle (dt)
          LREF
          Blank 29 Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
          Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 2-21-95; The following actions were taken, granting [27-1] motion for summary judgment By Judge Jerome B. Simandle (dt) Modified on 02/27/1995
            LREF
            Blank -- Filed: 2/21/1995, Entered: 2/27/1995 Terminated Case
            Case closed (dt)
              LREF
              Blank 28 Filed: 7/25/1994, Entered: 8/1/1994, Terminated: 2/21/1995 Motion to Stay
              Notice of MOTION to stay the decision relating to deft's motion for summary judgment for six months by RAY BROWN JR., Motion hearing set for 9:30 9/2/94 on [28-1] motion . --SUBMITTED WITH CERTIFICATION--- (dt)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 6/13/1994, Entered: 6/13/1994 Case Reopened
                Case reopened (mgr)
                  LREF
                  Blank 27 Filed: 6/10/1994, Entered: 6/16/1994 Motion for Summary Judgment
                  Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by JOSEPH L. BATTEN, MICHAEL HAYDEN, THOMAS DIGANGI, TOWNSHIP OF BERLIN, Motion hearing set for 7/15/94 on [27-1] motion . ---SUBMITTED WITH STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS AND BRIEF-- (dt)
                    LREF
                    Blank 26 Filed: 6/6/1994, Entered: 6/13/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                    ORDER reopening case for further proceedings. ( signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle ) (mgr)
                      LREF
                      Blank 25 Filed: 1/24/1994, Entered: 1/27/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                      ORDER DENYING DEFTS MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT BASED ON PLTFS FAILURE TO FILE COMPLAINT WITHIN STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS, granting defts[22-1] motion for summary judgment ON FORTH AMENDEMENT CLAIMS, GRANTING MOTION OF DEFTS TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE T STATE A CLAIM AND GRANTING MOTION OF DEFTS TO DISMISS PLTFS 1986 CLAIM FOR FAILURE TO FILE WITHIN APPLICABLE STATUTE OF LIMITATIONS, ETC.( signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle ) (dt)
                        LREF
                        Blank 24 Filed: 1/24/1994, Entered: 1/27/1994 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                        Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 1-24-94; The following actions were taken, granting [22-1] motion for summary judgment By Judge Jerome B. Simandle (dt)
                          LREF
                          Blank 23 Filed: 1/24/1994, Entered: 1/27/1994 OrderCourt Filing
                          OPINION ( signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle ) (dt)
                            LREF
                            Blank -- Filed: 1/24/1994, Entered: 1/27/1994 Terminated Case
                            Case closed (dt)
                              LREF
                              Blank 22 Filed: 7/30/1993, Entered: 8/5/1993, Terminated: 1/24/1994 Motion for Summary Judgment
                              Notice of MOTION for summary judgment by MICHAEL HAYDEN, TOWNSHIP OF BERLIN, THOMAS DIGANGI, JOSEPH L. BATTEN, Motion hearing set for 9/3/93 on [22-1] motion . ---submitted with memo--- (dt)
                                LREF
                                Blank 21 Filed: 7/12/1993, Entered: 7/15/1993 Answer to Amended Complaint
                                ANSWER by MICHAEL HAYDEN, TOWNSHIP OF BERLIN, THOMAS DIGANGI, JOSEPH L. BATTEN to amended complaint (dt)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 20 Filed: 7/6/1993, Entered: 7/7/1993 Pretrial Memorandum
                                  PRETRIAL MEMORANDUM by RAY BROWN JR. (dt)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 19 Filed: 6/30/1993, Entered: 7/6/1993 Minutes-MiscellaneousCourt Filing
                                    Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 6.30.93; The following actions were taken, granting [11-1] motion to dismiss, granting [11-2] motion for summary judgment By Judge Jerome B. Simandle (dt)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 18 Filed: 6/30/1993, Entered: 7/6/1993 Amended Complaint
                                      AMENDED COMPLAINT by RAY BROWN JR. , (Answer due 7/10/93 for TOWNSHIP OF BERLIN, for CAMDEN COUNTY, for MARY ALISON ALBRIGHT, for MICHAEL HAYDEN ) amending [1-1] complaint against THOMAS DIGANGI, JOSEPH L. BATTEN (dt)
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 17 Filed: 6/28/1993, Entered: 6/30/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                        MEMORANDUM AND ORDER granting [11-1] motion to dismiss denying [11-2] motion for summary judgment, and dismissing the case as to Mary Alison Albright with prejudice ( signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle ) (dt)
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 16 Filed: 6/16/1993, Entered: 6/17/1993 Order
                                          CONSENT ORDER, extending time , and for leave to file amended complaint ( signed by Magistrate Robert B. Kugler ) (dt)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 15 Filed: 6/14/1993, Entered: 6/16/1993 Answer
                                            ANSWER to Complaint by TOWNSHIP OF BERLIN (dt)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank -- Filed: 6/9/1993, Entered: 6/9/1993 Clerks Entry of Default*
                                              DEFAULT ENTERED as to JOHN DOE, MAYOR OF THE CITY OF BERLIN, and JOHN DOE, CHIEF OF POLICE OF THE CITY OF BERLIN granting [12-1] default requested (dt)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 14 Filed: 6/7/1993, Entered: 6/9/1993 Order
                                                ORDER granting [9-1] motion for leave to file answer out of time by deft TOWNSHIP OF BERLIN within 14 days of this order ( signed by Magistrate Robert B. Kugler ) (dt)
                                                  LREF
                                                  Blank 13 Filed: 6/7/1993, Entered: 6/9/1993 Minutes-Miscellaneous
                                                  Minute entry: Proceedings recorded by Ct-Reporter: none; Minutes of: 6-4-93; The following actions were taken, granting [9-1] motion for leave to file answer out of time By Magistrate Robert B. Kugler (dt)
                                                    LREF
                                                    Blank 12 Filed: 6/1/1993, Entered: 6/9/1993 request for default
                                                    REQUEST BY RAY BROWN JR. FOR DEFAULT AGAINST JOHN DOE, MAYOR OF THE CITY OF BERLIN, JOHN DOE, CHIEF OF POLICE OF THE CITY OF BERLIN (dt)
                                                      LREF
                                                      Blank 11 Filed: 5/25/1993, Entered: 6/2/1993, Terminated: 6/28/1993 Motion to Dismiss
                                                      Notice of MOTION to dismiss , and/or for summary judgment by MARY ALISON ALBRIGHT, Motion hearing set for 6/18/93 on [11-1] motion, set for 6/18/93 on [11-2] motion . --submitted with breif in support--- (dt)
                                                        LREF
                                                        Blank -- Filed: 5/10/1993, Entered: 5/10/1993 Remark
                                                        PRE TRIAL LETTER SENT TO PARTIES (dt)
                                                          LREF
                                                          Blank 10 Filed: 5/6/1993, Entered: 5/10/1993 Answer
                                                          ANSWER to Complaint by MICHAEL HAYDEN (dt)
                                                            LREF
                                                            Blank 9 Filed: 5/6/1993, Entered: 5/10/1993, Terminated: 6/7/1993 Motion for Leave to File
                                                            Notice of MOTION for leave to file answer out of time by TOWNSHIP OF BERLIN [9-1] motion referred to Magistrate Robert B. Kugler, Motion hearing set for 9:30 6/4/93 on [9-1] motion . ---SUBMITTED WITH CERT. IN SUPPORT--- (dt)
                                                              LREF
                                                              Blank 8 Filed: 4/19/1993, Entered: 4/22/1993 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                              ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE as to MICHAEL HAYDEN 4/19/93 Answer due on 5/9/93 for MICHAEL HAYDEN (dt)
                                                                LREF
                                                                Blank 7 Filed: 4/19/1993, Entered: 4/22/1993 Acknowledgment of Service
                                                                ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE as to TOWNSHIP OF BERLIN 4/9/93 Answer due on 4/29/93 for TOWNSHIP OF BERLIN (dt)
                                                                  LREF
                                                                  Blank 6 Filed: 4/15/1993, Entered: 4/19/1993 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                  RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to MARY ALISON ALBRIGHT 4/12/93 Answer due on 5/2/93 for MARY ALISON ALBRIGHT (dt)
                                                                    LREF
                                                                    Blank 5 Filed: 4/13/1993, Entered: 4/15/1993 Summons Returned Executed
                                                                    RETURN OF SERVICE executed as to TOWNSHIP OF BERLIN 4/8/93 Answer due on 4/28/93 for TOWNSHIP OF BERLIN (dt)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/24/1993, Entered: 3/24/1993 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                                                      NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate ROBERT B. KUGLER (femp) Modified on 03/24/1993
                                                                        LREF
                                                                        Blank -- Filed: 3/24/1993, Entered: 3/24/1993 Summons Issued
                                                                        SUMMONS(ES) issued for MICHAEL HAYDEN, MARY ALISON ALBRIGHT, CAMDEN COUNTY, TOWNSHIP OF BERLIN ( 20 Days) and returned to plaintiff with USM form 285 and letter of explanation to return completed form to US Marshal's office. (Mailed to Counsel) (femp) Modified on 03/24/1993
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Blank 2 Filed: 2/25/1993, Entered: 3/24/1993 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER, granting in forma pauperis ( signed by Judge Jerome B. Simandle ) (femp)
                                                                            LREF
                                                                            Blank 1 Filed: 2/25/1993, Entered: 3/24/1993 Complaint
                                                                            COMPLAINT filed, with application to proceed in forma pauperis, FILING FEE waived. (femp)
                                                                              LREF
                                                                              Blank 4 Filed: 2/24/1993, Entered: 3/25/1993 Letter
                                                                              LETTER from JUDGE SIMANDLE's CHAMBERS requesting additional information from pltf., etc., (dt) Modified on 03/31/1993
                                                                                LREF

                                                                                Statistics

                                                                                This case has been viewed 30 times.

                                                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                Space
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                 
                                                                                PlainSite
                                                                                Sign Up
                                                                                Need Password Help?