INDUSTRIAL WASTE v. GRAND CENTRAL
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-01048-JEI

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo INDUSTRIAL WASTE MANAGEMENT, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by wardshoemaker.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS H. WARD +1 856 853 7771 tward@wardshoemaker.com
No Logo GRAND CENTRAL SANITATION, INC., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
v.
No Logo GRAND CENTRAL SANITATION, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
No Logo INDUSTRIAL WASTE MANAGEMENT, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by wardshoemaker.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS H. WARD +1 856 853 7771 tward@wardshoemaker.com
Office Camden
Filed 3/9/1993
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Settled
County Gloucester
Terminated 1/24/1996
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case L-2601-92[SUP.CT.GLOU.CNTY.]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BJ, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (19) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 14 Filed: 1/24/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996 Stipulation of Dismissal
STIPULATION of dismissal with prejudice (jm1)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 1/24/1996, Entered: 1/24/1996 Terminated Case
    Case closed (jm1)
      LREF
      Blank 13 Filed: 12/18/1995, Entered: 12/20/1995 OrderCourt Filing
      ORDER of reassignment from Judge Rodriguez to Judge Irenas. ( signed by Chief Judge Anne E. Thompson ) (mgr)
        LREF
        Blank 12 Filed: 9/3/1993, Entered: 9/8/1993 Remark
        Copy of Order denying, without prejudice, deft.'s motion for leave to file an Amended Counterclaim and Third Party Complaint (femp)
          LREF
          Blank 11 Filed: 9/1/1993, Entered: 9/1/1993 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER denying [6-1] motion to remand matter to Superior Court, Gloucester County, Law Division terminating [6-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 6/18/93 on [6-1] motion ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (femp)
            LREF
            Blank 10 Filed: 7/1/1993, Entered: 7/1/1993 Scheduling Order
            SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joining of parties,amending of pleadings on 8/31/93 ; Discovery cutoff 9/30/93 ; Pretrial conference 9:30 2/22/94 ; Trial with jury 3/31/94 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 2/22/94 ; ( signed by Magistrate Robert B. Kugler ) (femp)
              LREF
              Blank 9 Filed: 6/3/1993, Entered: 6/3/1993 Order
              ORDER, consolidating v. 93-1048 and 93-1049 for DISCOVERY ONLY , set settlement conference for 3:30 6/14/93 ( signed by Magistrate Robert B. Kugler ) (femp)
                LREF
                Blank -- Filed: 5/27/1993, Entered: 5/27/1993 Scheduling Conference
                Scheduling conference held before Magistrate Robert B. Kugler on 5/27/93. (femp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 8 Filed: 5/17/1993, Entered: 5/17/1993 Certification
                  CERTIFICATION of Frank Pertnoy Re: [6-1] motion to remand matter to Superior Court, Gloucester County, Law Division (femp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 7 Filed: 5/17/1993, Entered: 5/17/1993 Certification
                    CERTIFICATION of William Mackin Re: [6-1] motion to remand matter to Superior Court, Gloucester County, Law Division (femp)
                      LREF
                      Blank 6 Filed: 5/17/1993, Entered: 5/17/1993, Terminated: 9/1/1993 Motion to Remand
                      Notice of MOTION to remand matter to Superior Court, Gloucester County, Law Division by INDUSTRIAL WASTE, Motion hearing set for 9:30 6/18/93 on [6-1] motion . (Briefs submitted) (femp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 5 Filed: 4/1/1993, Entered: 4/1/1993, Terminated: 1/24/1996 Answer to Counterclaim
                        ANSWER by INDUSTRIAL WASTE to [4-2] counter claim (femp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 4 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: 3/19/1993, Terminated: 1/24/1996 Answer
                          ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by GRAND CENTRAL against INDUSTRIAL WASTE (femp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 3 Filed: 3/11/1993, Entered: 3/11/1993 Order
                            ORDER, set scheduling conference for 9:00 4/21/93 ( signed by Magistrate Robert B. Kugler ) (ar1)
                              LREF
                              Blank 2 Filed: 3/11/1993, Entered: 3/11/1993 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                              NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate ROBERT B. KUGLER (ar1)
                                LREF
                                Blank 1 Filed: 3/9/1993, Entered: 3/17/1993 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by GRAND CENTRAL : amends [1-1], filed in Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Gloucester County. (ar1)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 1 Filed: 3/9/1993, Entered: 3/17/1993 Answer
                                  ANSWER to Complaint by GRAND CENTRAL, filed in Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Gloucester County. (ar1)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 1 Filed: 3/9/1993, Entered: 3/11/1993 Complaint
                                    COMPLAINT filed in Superior Court Gloucester County, docket #L-2601-92. jury demand (ar1) Modified on 03/11/1993
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 1 Filed: 3/9/1993, Entered: 3/11/1993 Notice of Removal
                                      NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GRAND CENTRAL SANITATION, INC. Removed from Superior Court Gloucester County, filed with the following state court proceedings, a] Complaint b] Summons FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 163758 (ar1) Modified on 03/11/1993
                                        LREF

                                        Statistics

                                        This case has been viewed 49 times.

                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                        Space
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                         
                                        PlainSite
                                        Sign Up
                                        Need Password Help?