A & B DUMP TRUCK v. METCALF & EDDY, et al
Federal Civil Lawsuit New Jersey District Court, Case No. 1:93-cv-01049-JHR

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo A & B DUMP TRUCK SERVICES, INC., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by wardshoemaker.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS H. WARD +1 856 853 7771 tward@wardshoemaker.com
No Logo GRAND CENTRAL SANITATION, INC., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
v.
No Logo GRAND CENTRAL SANITATION, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
No Logo METCALF & EDDY SERVICES, INC., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FRANCIS X. FERRARA +1 973 622 7711
No Logo A & B DUMP TRUCK SERVICES, INC., Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by wardshoemaker.com Law Firm Placeholder

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space THOMAS H. WARD +1 856 853 7771 tward@wardshoemaker.com
No Logo GRAND CENTRAL SANITATION, INC., Cross-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Dechert LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space MATTHEW V. DELDUCA +1 609 620 3200 mdelduca@dechert.com
No Logo METCALF & EDDY SERVICES, INC., Cross-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space FRANCIS X. FERRARA +1 973 622 7711
Office Camden
Filed 3/9/1993
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $0
Nature of Suit 320 - Personal Injury: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause Section 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition Dismissed - Other
County Gloucester
Terminated 3/3/1994
Origin 2
Reopened None
Lead Case None
Related Case
Other Court Case L-2602-92[SUP.CT.GLOU.CNTY.]
Def Custody Status
Flags 12BG, CLOSED, SCHEDO
  Entries (24) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Blank 19 Filed: 3/3/1994, Entered: 3/3/1994 OrderCourt Filing
ORDER removing this matter to U.S. Bankruptcy Court. (WIZMUR) (See Judge Wizmur's Order filed on November 9, 1993). (mgr)
    LREF
    Blank -- Filed: 3/3/1994, Entered: 3/3/1994 Terminated Case
    Case closed (mgr)
      LREF
      Blank 18 Filed: 9/7/1993, Entered: 9/9/1993 Minutes-Miscellaneous
      Minute entry: Minutes of: 9/3/93; The following actions were taken, denying [13-1] motion for leave to file amended cntclm.,3rd pty. compl By Magistrate Robert B. Kugler (femp)
        LREF
        Blank 17 Filed: 9/3/1993, Entered: 9/8/1993 Order
        ORDER denying, without prejudice, [13-1] motion for leave to file amended cntclm.,3rd pty. compl terminating [13-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 9/3/93 on [13-1] motion ( signed by Magistrate Robert B. Kugler ) (femp)
          LREF
          Blank 16 Filed: 9/1/1993, Entered: 9/1/1993 OrderCourt Filing
          ORDER denying [8-1] motion to remand matter to Superior Court, Gloucester County, Law Division terminating [8-2] hearing Motion hearing set for 9:30 6/18/93 on [8-1] motion ( signed by Judge Joseph H. Rodriguez ) (femp)
            LREF
            Blank 15 Filed: 8/3/1993, Entered: 8/4/1993 Order
            ORDER admitting StevenBrown, Esq. pro hac vice ( signed by Magistrate Robert B. Kugler ) (femp)
              LREF
              Blank 14 Filed: 7/28/1993, Entered: 7/29/1993 Certification
              CERTIFICATION of Matthew Delduca, Esq. Re: [13-1] motion for leave to file amended cntclm.,3rd pty. compl (femp)
                LREF
                Blank 13 Filed: 7/28/1993, Entered: 7/29/1993, Terminated: 9/3/1993 Motion for Leave to File
                Notice of MOTION for leave to file amended cntclm.,3rd pty. compl by GRAND CENTRAL [13-1] motion referred to Magistrate Joel B. Rosen, Motion hearing set for 9:30 9/3/93 on [13-1] motion . (femp)
                  LREF
                  Blank 12 Filed: 7/1/1993, Entered: 7/1/1993 Scheduling Order
                  SCHEDULING ORDER setting Joining of parties,amending of pleadings on 8/31/93 ; Discovery cutoff 9/30/93 ; Pretrial conference 9:30 2/22/94 ; Trial with jury 3/31/94 ; Pretrial order to be submitted on or before 2/22/94 ; ( signed by Magistrate Robert B. Kugler ) (femp)
                    LREF
                    Blank 11 Filed: 6/3/1993, Entered: 6/3/1993 Remark
                    Copy of Order consolidating Civ. 93-1048 and 93-1049 for DISCOVERY PURPOSES ONLY, setting settlement conference for 6/14/93 at 3:30, etc. (femp)
                      LREF
                      Blank -- Filed: 5/27/1993, Entered: 5/27/1993 Scheduling Conference
                      Scheduling conference held before Magistrate Robert B. Kugler on 5/27/93. (femp)
                        LREF
                        Blank 10 Filed: 5/17/1993, Entered: 5/17/1993 Certification
                        CERTIFICATION of Frank Pertnoy Re: [8-1] motion to remand matter to Superior Court, Gloucester County, Law Division (femp)
                          LREF
                          Blank 9 Filed: 5/17/1993, Entered: 5/17/1993 Certification
                          CERTIFICATION of William Mackin Re: [8-1] motion to remand matter to Superior Court, Gloucester County, Law Division (femp)
                            LREF
                            Blank 8 Filed: 5/17/1993, Entered: 5/17/1993, Terminated: 9/1/1993 Motion to Remand
                            Notice of MOTION to remand matter to Superior Court, Gloucester County, Law Division by A & B DUMP TRUCK, Motion hearing set for 9:30 6/18/93 on [8-1] motion . (Briefs submitted) (femp)
                              LREF
                              Blank 7 Filed: 4/8/1993, Entered: 4/12/1993 ~Notice (other)
                              Notice of Intent to submit a Dispositive motion by A & B DUMP TRUCK (femp)
                                LREF
                                Blank 6 Filed: 4/1/1993, Entered: 4/1/1993, Terminated: 3/3/1994 Answer to Counterclaim
                                ANSWER by A & B DUMP TRUCK to [5-2] counter claim (femp)
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 5 Filed: 3/19/1993, Entered: 3/19/1993, Terminated: 3/3/1994 Answer
                                  ANSWER to Complaint and COUNTERCLAIM by GRAND CENTRAL against A & B DUMP TRUCK (femp)
                                    LREF
                                    Blank 4 Filed: 3/17/1993, Entered: 3/18/1993 Answer
                                    ANSWER to complaint and CROSSCLAIM by METCALF & EDDY against GRAND CENTRAL (femp)
                                      LREF
                                      Blank 3 Filed: 3/10/1993, Entered: 3/11/1993 Order
                                      ORDER, set scheduling conference for 11:00 4/21/93 ( signed by Magistrate Joel B. Rosen ) (ar1) Modified on 03/17/1993
                                        LREF
                                        Blank 2 Filed: 3/10/1993, Entered: 3/11/1993 Case Assigned/Reassigned
                                        NOTICE of Allocation and Assignment filed. Magistrate JOEL B. ROSEN (ar1) Modified on 04/22/1993
                                          LREF
                                          Blank 1 Filed: 3/9/1993, Entered: 3/17/1993 Amended Answer to Complaint
                                          AMENDED ANSWER to Complaint by GRAND CENTRAL : amends [1-1] answer, filed in Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Gloucester County. (ar1)
                                            LREF
                                            Blank 1 Filed: 3/9/1993, Entered: 3/17/1993 Answer
                                            ANSWER to Complaint by GRAND CENTRAL, filed in Superior Court of New Jersey, Law Division, Gloucester County. (ar1)
                                              LREF
                                              Blank 1 Filed: 3/9/1993, Entered: 3/11/1993 Complaint
                                              COMPLAINT filed in Gloucester County Superior Court , docket # L-2602-92; jury demand (ar1)
                                                LREF
                                                Blank 1 Filed: 3/9/1993, Entered: 3/11/1993 Notice of Removal
                                                NOTICE OF REMOVAL by GRAND CENTRAL SANITATION. Removed from Superior Court Gloucester county, filed with the following state court proceedings, a] Complaint b] Summons. FILING FEE $ 120.00 RECEIPT # 163759 (ar1)
                                                  LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 55 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?