Daniel Jung v. Billy McFarland
Federal Civil Lawsuit New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-00449
District Judge P. Kevin Castel, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated November 15, 2021 at 9:37 PM EST (2.9 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Daniel Jung, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Geragos & Geragos, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Alexander Alarcon +1 213 625 3900 +1 213 232 3255 alex@geragos.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lori Gwen Feldman +1 212 363 7500 lori@geragos.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE Mark John Geragos +1 213 625 3900 +1 213 625 1600 mark@geragos.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Benjamin Jared Meiselas +1 213 625 3900 +1 213 625 1600 meiselas@geragos.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Zack Vincent Muljat +1 213 625 3900 +1 213 232 3255 muljat@geragos.com
v.
No Logo Billy McFarland, Defendant
No Logo Doe Property Owner, Defendant
No Logo Does, Defendant
Fyre Media, Inc. Fyre Media, Inc., Defendant
No Logo JEFFREY ATKINS, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Sclar Law Group Llp

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Rhett P Warriner +1 213 239 0810 rwarriner@sclarlaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Silverman Sclar Shin and Byrne LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Thomas Hunter Herndon +1 212 779 8600 +1 212 779 8858 therndon@silverfirm.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Smith Law

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Ryan Hayden Smith +1 919 809 3807 ryan@nclawyernow.com
No Logo Doe Investors, Cross Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332fr
Nature of Suit 370 - Fraud or Truth-In-Lending
  Entries (87) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 89 Filed: 11/15/2021, Entered: None Notice of Filing Transcript
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 88 Filed: 11/15/2021, Entered: None Transcript
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 83 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Certificate of Service Other
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 79 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 76 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: None Default Judgment
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lori Feldman to RE-FILE Document No. 62 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): THE REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS IS NOT LINKED UP TO ANY PLEADING WITHIN THIS CASE. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (laq)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 6/5/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                FILING ERROR - Summons not linked to corresponding pleading - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Grant Margolin, re: (47 in 1:17-cv-03296-PKC) Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Daniel Jung, Ritu Jutla, Zenovia Pittas. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-03296-PKC, 1:17-cv-03461-PKC, 1:17-cv-03541-PKC, 1:18-cv-00146-PKC, 1:18-cv-00449-PKC(Feldman, Lori) Modified on 6/6/2018 (laq). (Entered: 06/05/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 74 Filed: 6/19/2020, Entered: None Default Judgment
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/30/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Lori Gwen Feldman to Document No. 61 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons, 60 Request for Issuance of Amended Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): THE SUMMONSES ARE NOT LINKED UP TO ANY PLEADINGS. (pc)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 73 Filed: 11/18/2019, Entered: None Memorandum & Opinion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 5/29/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                        REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Grant Margolin, re: (44 in 1:17-cv-03296-PKC) Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Daniel Jung, Ritu Jutla, Zenovia Pittas. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-03296-PKC, 1:17-cv-03461-PKC, 1:17-cv-03541-PKC, 1:18-cv-00146-PKC, 1:18-cv-00449-PKC(Feldman, Lori) (Entered: 05/29/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 72 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Request for Issuance of Amended Summons
                            REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Grant Margolin, re: (41 in 1:17-cv-03296-PKC) Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Daniel Jung, Ritu Jutla, Zenovia Pittas. Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-03296-PKC, 1:17-cv-03461-PKC, 1:17-cv-03541-PKC, 1:18-cv-00146-PKC, 1:18-cv-00449-PKC(Feldman, Lori) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: None Substitute AttorneyCourt Filing
                              CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Tina Wolfson and Bradley K. King, New Attorney: Lori Feldman Joint Consent Motion to Substitute Counsel for Plaintiffs Ritu Jutla and Zenovia Pittas and Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff Daniel Sepulveda addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Bradley K. King, Tina Wolfson, and Lori Feldman dated May 18, 2018. Document filed by Ritu Jutla, Zenovia Pittas, Daniel Sepulveda.Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-03296-PKC, 1:17-cv-03461-PKC, 1:17-cv-03541-PKC, 1:18-cv-00146-PKC, 1:18-cv-00449-PKC(King, Bradley) (Entered: 05/18/2018)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: This Revised Proposed Civil Case Management Plan (the "Plan") is submitted by the plaintiffs and defendant Jeffrey Atkins in all five cases above in accordance with Rule 26(f)(3), Fed. R. Civ. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. ?? 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Consolidated Amended Complaint ("CAC") to be filed by April 20, 2018. All fact discovery shall be completed no later than November 15, 208. Depositions to be completed by 9/28/18. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: 10 days. The next Case Management Conference is scheduled for November 30, 2018 at 11:00. (As further set forth in this Order.) Deposition due by 9/28/2018. Fact Discovery due by 11/15/2018. Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/13/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-03296-PKC, 1:17-cv-03461-PKC, 1:17-cv-03541-PKC, 1:18-cv-00146-PKC, 1:18-cv-00449-PKC(cf) Modified on 5/3/2018 (cf). (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Declaration in Support of Motion
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: As a result of a Pre-Trial Conference held before the Court today, the following is ORDERED: 1. The above five actions are consolidated under docket 17 cv 3296. 2. The plaintiffs shall file a Consolidated Amended Complaint by April 20, 2018. 3. The caption is amended to read "IN RE FYRE Festival Litagation". 4. Geragos & Geragos is appointed lead counsel on consent. The next Case Management Conference will be held on November 30 at 11 am. Any conference scheduled for a date prior thereto is adjourned. (Amended Pleadings due by 4/20/2018., Case Management Conference set for 11/30/2018 at 11:00 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/13/2018) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:17-cv-03296-PKC, 1:17-cv-03461-PKC, 1:17-cv-03541-PKC, 1:18-cv-00146-PKC, 1:18-cv-00449-PKC(cf) (Entered: 03/13/2018)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 10/10/2019, Entered: None Reconsideration
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        CONSOLIDATED MEMBER CASE: Create association to 1:17-cv-03296-PKC. (cf)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/13/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Case Management Conference held on 3/13/2018. The next case management conference is scheduled for November 30, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. (Nacanther, Florence)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 3/12/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                            JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Lori G. Feldman, Tina Wolfson, Andrew Grous, Ryan Hayden Smith dated 03/12/2018 re: Status Conference. Document filed by Daniel Jung. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit)(Feldman, Lori) (Entered: 03/12/2018)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                              ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number 56 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (cf)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                ORDER denying 53 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. 1. What responsible lawyer would enter an appearance and substitution unless and until he or she was prepared to take over the case? Your firm's decision to appear is your firm's problem and your client's problem and not anyone else's problem. 2. That you are a North Carolina law firm (a point is make) is of no moment. 3. Having different dates for this conclusion of discovery in two of the five actions before the undersigned is a non-starter. Application DENIED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/5/2018) (cf) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 3/6/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                  JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Lori G. Feldman, Tina Wolfson, Andrew Grous dated 03/06/2018 re: Status Conference. Document filed by Daniel Jung. (Attachments: # 1 Case Management Plan)(Feldman, Lori) (Entered: 03/06/2018)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 3/5/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                    LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Ryan Hayden Smith dated 03/05/2018. Document filed by JEFFREY ATKINS. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Ryan) (Entered: 03/05/2018)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 3/2/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      ORDER granting 51 Motion for Ryan Hayden Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Castel, P.) (Entered: 03/02/2018)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                        >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 51 MOTION for Ryan Hayden Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14757063. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 3/1/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          MOTION for Ryan Hayden Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-14757063. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JEFFREY ATKINS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Certs. of Good Standing, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Ryan) (Entered: 03/01/2018)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice re: Document No. 50 FIRST MOTION for Ryan Hayden Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 1) missing Certificate of Good Standing from North Carolina Supreme Court (our court does not accept state bar certificates); 2) case caption is missing from Attorney Affidavit; and 3) filing fee was not paid. Pay the filing fee using the event Pro Hac Vice Fee Payment found under the event list Other Documents. (jc)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 2/28/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FIRST MOTION for Ryan Hayden Smith to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by JEFFREY ATKINS. (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit, # 2 Exhibit Good Standing Certs., # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Smith, Ryan) Modified on 2/28/2018 (jc). (Entered: 02/28/2018)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 2/22/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lori Gwen Feldman on behalf of Daniel Jung. (Feldman, Lori) (Entered: 02/22/2018)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                  NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge Deborah A. Batts is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/24/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                    CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:17-cv-03296-PKC. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 3/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/23/2018) (cf) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/23/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        ORDER: A conference is scheduled for March 13, 2018 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. (Status Conference set for 3/13/2018 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 1/23/2018) (cf) (Entered: 01/23/2018)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/19/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas Hunter Herndon, II on behalf of JEFFREY ATKINS. (Herndon, Thomas) (Entered: 01/19/2018)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                            CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                  Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 1/18/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                    CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of California Central; Case Number: 2:17-cv-03245. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo) (Entered: 01/18/2018)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      ORDER TO TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1404(A) 36 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: IT IS ORDERED that the Joint Motion to Transfer this matter to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York by Plaintiff and Defendant, Jeffrey Atkins, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1404(a) is GRANTED, and this matter is hereby transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. MD JS-6. Case Terminated. (lc) Modified on 1/17/2018 (lc). [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 01/17/2018)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                        ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lori G. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel Jung and designating Ben J Meiselas as local counsel 38 41 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                          NOTICE OF LODGING filed re Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lori Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel Jung (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 12/14/2017, Receipt No. 0973-20973464) 41 (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Meiselas, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/20/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                            Amended APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lori Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel Jung (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $325 Previously Paid on 12/14/2017, Receipt No. 0973-20973464) filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung. (Meiselas, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 12/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Pending before the Court is the Application of Non-Resident Attorney Lori G. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel Jung. (ECF No. 38.) The Court cannot grant the pending application as submitted due to the issues addressed in the Clerks Notice of Deficiency. (ECF No. 39.) Should the applicant wish to correct the deficiencies, they may do so no later than THURSDAY, DECEMBER 21, 2017. If no corrections are made, the Court will deny the application. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/18/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 12/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                NOTICE of Deficiency in Electronically Filed Pro Hac Vice Application RE: APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lori G. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel Jung (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20973464) 38 . The following error(s) was/were found: Phone and fax numbers are local numbers, and Proposed Order has the Los Angeles office as address listed for attorney. NY and WA State Bars lists attorney in NY. Incorrect and inconsistent information listed on forms. (lt) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/15/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 12/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                  APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Lori G. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Daniel Jung (Pro Hac Vice Fee - Fee Paid, Receipt No. 0973-20973464) filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order) (Mei selas, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/14/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                    NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of New York 36 . The following error(s) was/were found: Missing formal LR 6.1 formal Notice of Motion text re hearing date, time, Judge and courtroom, information In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/13/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 12/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      Joint NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to Southern District of New York filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung. Motion set for hearing on 1/22/2018 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, # 2 Declaration of Ben J. Meiselas, # 3 Proposed Order) (Geragos, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 12/12/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                        NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Proof of Service (subsequent documents), 34 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Service of summons and complaint returned executed 21 days. Other error(s) with document(s): The pdf document includes an initiating Cross claim, therefore the cited correct event should be used, select applicable cross claim defendant and follow system prompts. To assist in a search for correct events, please use the "SEARCH" option for a "key word" to narrow the selection process.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 11/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Jeffrey Atkins, re Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, Crossclaim, 24 on Defendants Billy McFarland, an individual, and Frye Media, Inc., a Delaware corporation, respectively served on Oct. 26, 2017; Nov. 3, 2017. (Warriner, Rhett) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 11/28/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE MOTION FOR CLASS CERTIFICATION 32 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The filing a class certification motion and the deadline for such motion shall be: a) extended to sixty (60) days after a decision denying a motion to transfer the action; or b) extended to February 16, 2018, should no motion to transfer the action be filed. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 11/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Motion for Class Certification filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Geragos, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 11/15/2017)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                SCHEDULING AND CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 11/14/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 3 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case ordered to a private mediator based upon a stipulation of the parties or by the court order. (yl) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 11/14/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 11/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                    STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Jung and Defendant Atkins filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung. (Geragos, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 11/13/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 11/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II:Before the Court is the Stipulation to Transfer the Case to the United States District Courtfor the Southern District of New York entered into between Plaintiff Daniel Jung and Defendant and Crossclaimant Jeffrey Atkins.(Stip., ECF No. 27.) Defendants Billy McFarland and Fyre Media, Inc. have not answered the Complaint (ECF No. 1) or the Crossclaim (ECF No. 24) in this action, and they do not join in the Stipulation to Transfer. (See document for Court's analysis). The Stipulation to Transfer Venue is DENIED without prejudice 27 . The Court also finds it inappropriate to decide whether to transfer venue based on stipulation of only two (out of four) parties to the case. Should Jung and Atkins still wish to move forward with their request to transfer venue, they should do so through a noticed motionpursuant to the Local Rules. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 11/01/2017)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        STIPULATION to Transfer Case to United States District Court for the Southern District of new York filed by Defendant Jeffrey Atkins. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Warriner, Rhett) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 10/31/2017)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 9/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung, upon Defendant Jeffrey Atkins served on 9/12/2017, answer due 10/3/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jeffrey Atkins in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Geragos, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/28/2017)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            ORDER that the Scheduling Conference is set for 11/20/2017 1:30 PM ; compliance with FRCP 16, and 26(f) and filing of joint report; Counsel for plaintiff shall immediately serve this Order on all parties, including any new parties to the action by Judge Otis D Wright, II (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/15/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              ANSWER to Amended Complaint/Petition 9 with JURY DEMAND, CROSSCLAIM against Doe Investors, Doe Property Owner, Does, Fyre Media, Inc., Billy McFarland filed by Defendant Jeffrey Atkins.(Attorney Rhett P Warriner added to party Jeffrey Atkins(pty:dft))(Warriner, Rhett) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung, upon Defendant Billy McFarland served on 9/9/2017, answer due 10/2/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Steve Macfarland - Father in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Meiselas, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/11/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  DECLARATION of Ben J. Meiselas re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Terminate Deadlines and Hearings, 20 RE: STATUS OF SERVICE OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung. (Meiselas, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 9/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                    PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung, upon Defendant Fyre Media, Inc. served on 8/22/2017, answer due 9/12/2017. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren, Corporate Operations Manager - CT Corporation in compliance with statute not specified by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Geragos, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 09/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 8/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      MINUTE IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: For good cause shown, the Court DISCHARGES the Order to Show Cause dated August 18, 2017 (ECF No. 17 ) and ORDERS that Plaintiffs deadline to serve Defendant Billy McFarland is extended until October 12, 2017. Further, the Court ORDERS Plaintiff to submit proof of service as to Defendants Jeffrey Atkins and Fyre Media, Inc., by September 5, 2017. (jp) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/29/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                        DECLARATION of Ben J. Meiselas re Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings,, 17 re Service of First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung. (Meiselas, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                          Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Jeffrey Atkins answer now due 9/11/2017, re Amended Complaint/Petition 9 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung.(Meiselas, Benjamin) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 8/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE, in writing only, no later than August 28, 2017, why the Court should not dismiss Defendants Billy McFarland, Jeffrey Atkins, and Fyre Media, Inc. based on Plaintiffs failure to serve the Complaint within the Rule 4(m) period. No hearing will be held. The Court will discharge this order upon the filing of a proof of service as to all three Defendants. Failure to timely respond to this Order may result in the dismissal of the action without further warning. (lc) Modified on 8/18/2017 (lc). [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                              ORDER DENYING TRANSFER from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 08/04/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition 9 as to defendant Fyre Media, Inc. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition 9 as to defendant Jeffrey Atkins. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                    21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition 9 as to defendant Billy McFarland. (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 05/09/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition 9 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung. (Geragos, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                        Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition 9 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung. (Geragos, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                          Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition 9 filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung. (Geragos, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 05/08/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                            FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants Jeffrey Atkins, Does, Fyre Media, Inc., Billy McFarland amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1, filed by Plaintiff Daniel Jung(Geragos, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 05/07/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR SPECIFIC FILING REQUIREMENTS AND INFORMATION; PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. all proposed sealed documents must be submitted via e-mail to the Judges Chambers email address, EXCLUDING those submitted by pro se parties and IN CAMERA filings, which shall continue to comply with Local Rule 79-5.1. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents (lc) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 05/02/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 as to Defendant Fyre Media, Inc. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 05/01/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff DANIEL JUNG, (Geragos, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 04/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 4/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                        Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) 1 filed by Plaintiff DANIEL JUNG. (Geragos, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 04/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                          CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff DANIEL JUNG. (Geragos, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 04/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                            COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-19771386 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff DANIEL JUNG. (Attorney Mark John Geragos added to party DANIEL JUNG(pty:pla))(Geragos, Mark) [Transferred from California Central on 1/18/2018.] (Entered: 04/30/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 16 times.

                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?