District Appellate Supreme
Federal
Colorado District Court Court of Appeals for the Tenth Circuit
  1. Case No. 19-1011
    Filed 1/14/2019
  2. Case No. 20-1141
    Filed 4/9/2020
United States Supreme Court

Farmland Partners Inc. v. Fortunae
Federal Civil Lawsuit Colorado District Court, Case No. 1:18-cv-02351-RBJ
District Judge R. Brooke Jackson, presiding

Tags
Last Updated March 29, 2021 at 3:27 PM DT (1.5 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Farmland Partners Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Sarah E. Barr +1 303 592 1500 sbarr@mofo.com
Space Brenden James Cline +1 303 592 2209 bcline@mofo.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Morrison & Foerster, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space RHIANNON N. BATCHELDER +1 212 336 4155 rbatchelder@mofo.com
Space Michael David Birnbaum +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 mbirnbaum@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Michael David Birnbaum +1 212 468 8000 +1 212 468 7900 mbirnbaum@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Scott Frederick Llewellyn +1 303 592 2204 +1 303 592 1510 sllewellyn@mofo.com
Space Scott Frederick Llewellyn +1 303 592 2204 +1 303 592 1510 sllewellyn@mofo.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Kyle Saari Pietari +1 303 592 1500 +1 303 592 1510 kpietari@mofo.com
v.
No Logo Donald Marchiony, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tess Hand-Bender +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 tess.hand-bender@dgslaw.com
Space Claire Eleanor Mueller +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 claire.mueller@dgslaw.com
Space Chad David Williams +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 chad.williams@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winstead PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toby M Galloway +1 817 420 8200 +1 817 420 8201 tgalloway@winstead.com
Space Jamie M. Lacy +1 817 420 8274 +1 817 420 8201 jlacy@winstead.com
No Logo George Baxter, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tess Hand-Bender +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 tess.hand-bender@dgslaw.com
Space Claire Eleanor Mueller +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 claire.mueller@dgslaw.com
Space Chad David Williams +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 chad.williams@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winstead PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toby M Galloway +1 817 420 8200 +1 817 420 8201 tgalloway@winstead.com
Space Jamie M. Lacy +1 817 420 8274 +1 817 420 8201 jlacy@winstead.com
No Logo QKM, L.L.C., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foster Graham Milstein & Calisher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Katherine Anna Roush +1 303 333 9810 +1 303 333 9786 kroush@fostergraham.com
No Logo Rota Fortunae, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Foster Graham Milstein & Calisher LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space John Andrew Chanin +1 303 333 9810 +1 303 333 9786 jchanin@fostergraham.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED John Andrew Chanin +1 303 333 9810 +1 303 333 9786 jchanin@fostergraham.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Katherine Anna Roush +1 303 333 9810 +1 303 333 9786 kroush@fostergraham.com
No Logo Sabrepoint Capital Management, LP, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jamie M. Lacy +1 817 420 8274 +1 817 420 8201 jlacy@winstead.com
Space Claire Eleanor Mueller +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 claire.mueller@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Davis Graham & Stubbs, LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Tess Hand-Bender +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 tess.hand-bender@dgslaw.com
Space Chad David Williams +1 303 892 9400 +1 303 893 1379 chad.williams@dgslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Winstead PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Toby M Galloway +1 817 420 8200 +1 817 420 8201 tgalloway@winstead.com
No Logo Hough Farms, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGrath, North, Mullin & Kratz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr. +1 402 341 3070 +1 402 341 0216 pbrookhouser@mcgrathnorth.com
No Logo Jesse Hough, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGrath, North, Mullin & Kratz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr. +1 402 341 3070 +1 402 341 0216 pbrookhouser@mcgrathnorth.com
No Logo Pine Ridge Holdings Inc, Movant

Toggle Switch Represented by McGrath, North, Mullin & Kratz, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Patrick E. Brookhouser, Jr. +1 402 341 3070 +1 402 341 0216 pbrookhouser@mcgrathnorth.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331as
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
Office Denver
Filed 9/14/2018
Jury Demand Both
Demand
Jurisdiction Federal Question
Disposition
County Denver
Terminated
Origin 2
Reopened
Lead Case
118-cv-02351-RBJ
Related Case
None
Other Court Cases 19-1011[USCA 10th Circuit], 20-1141[USCA], 2018CV32713[Denver County District Court]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags APPEAL,CONMAG,JD1,LEAD,MJ CIV PP
  Entries (190) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 216 Filed: 3/29/2021, Entered: None Withdraw as Attorney
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 212 Filed: 3/26/2021, Entered: None Leave to Restrict
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 211 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Leave
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 206 Filed: 2/26/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Dismiss
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 2/19/2021, Entered: None SUMMARY JUDGMENT
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 201 Filed: 2/9/2021, Entered: None Leave
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 184 Filed: 11/23/2020, Entered: 11/23/2020 Exhibits
              Exhibits in Support of [178] Brief in Opposition to Motion,,, Correction of Exhibit P to Farmland Partners Inc.s Opposition to Sabrepoints Motion to Dismiss, to attach documents cited as Exhibit P in brief by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 183 Filed: 11/19/2020, Entered: 11/19/2020 Reply to Response to motion
                REPLY to Response to [172] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants George Baxter, Donald Marchiony, Sabrepoint Capital Management, LP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A)(Galloway, Toby)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Blank 182 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Order on Motion To QuashCourt Filing
                  ORDER denying [181] Motion to Quash. Under the local rules of this Court, i.e., D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(a), counsel must confer (meaning talk to) opposing counsel and make a good faith effort to resolve the issue before filing a non-dispositive motion. Please confer with counsel for both parties and then refile a motion if you have not been able to resolve the dispute. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 11/13/2020. Text Only Entry(rbjsec. )
                    LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 181 Filed: 11/13/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020, Terminated: 11/13/2020 motion to quash
                    MOTION to Quash or Modify a Subpoena Served on First Midwest Bank Calling For Information About Them, by Movants Jesse Hough, Pine Ridge Holdings, Inc., Hough Farms. (Attachments: # (1) Brief, # (2) Declaration of Jesse Hough, # (3) Declaration of Patrick Brookhouser Jr., # (4) Proposed Order)(rvill, )
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 180 Filed: 11/12/2020, Entered: 11/13/2020 Order on Motion to consolidate casesCourt Filing
                      ORDER. Before the Court is defendant Rota Fortunae's Unopposed Motion to Consolidate 1:20-mc-00101-DDD-KLM with 1:18-cv-2351-RBJ. ECF No. [179]. The motion is granted in part. The Court directs that case 1:20-mc-00101-DDD be closed and that the motion to quash or modify subpoena previously filed into that case at ECF No. 1 be docketed by the Clerk of Court's office into case 1:18-cv-02351-RBJ, Farmland Partners, Inc. v. Rota Fortunae et al. All future filings shall be made on the docket in case number 1:18-cv-02351-RBJ. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on November 12, 2020. (rvill, )
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 179 Filed: 11/10/2020, Entered: 11/10/2020, Terminated: 11/12/2020 Motion to consolidate cases
                        Unopposed MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Defendants Rota Fortunae, QKM, L.L.C.. (Roush, Katherine)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 178 Filed: 11/6/2020, Entered: 11/6/2020 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                          BRIEF in Opposition to [172] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Brenden J. Cline ISO Opposition, # (2) Exhibit A to Declaration, # (3) Exhibit B to Declaration, # (4) Exhibit C to Declaration, # (5) Exhibit D to Declaration, # (6) Exhibit E to Declaration, # (7) Exhibit F to Declaration, # (8) Exhibit G to Declaration, # (9) Exhibit H Part 1 to Declaration, # (10) Exhibit H Part 2 to Declaration, # (11) Exhibit I to Declaration, # (12) Exhibit J to Declaration, # (13) Exhibit K to Declaration, # (14) Exhibit L to Declaration, # (15) Exhibit M to Declaration, # (16) Exhibit N to Declaration, # (17) Exhibit O to Declaration, # (18) Exhibit P to Declaration, # (19) Exhibit Q to Declaration)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 177 Filed: 10/29/2020, Entered: 10/29/2020 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                            MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge R. Brooke Jackson: Telephone Status Conference held on 10/29/2020. Court Reporter: Sarah Mitchell. (jdyne, )
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 176 Filed: 10/26/2020, Entered: 10/26/2020 Notice - other
                              NOTICE re [172] MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants George Baxter, Donald Marchiony, Sabrepoint Capital Management, LP (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Declaration of George Baxter)(Galloway, Toby)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Blank 175 Filed: 10/22/2020, Entered: 10/22/2020 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                MINUTE ORDER re: [173] Letter. A Telephonic Status/Scheduling Conference is set for 10/29/2020 at 10:00 AM. The Court directs that the parties use dial-in number 1-888-204-5984 and enter access code 7557338# when prompted. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/22/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
                                  LREF
                                  Blank 174 Filed: 10/21/2020, Entered: 10/21/2020 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                  MINUTE ORDER re: [173] LETTER Jointly Requesting Scheduling Conference. The Court directs that counsel jointly contact Chambers at jackson_chambers@cod.uscourts.gov to schedule a telephonic scheduling conference. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 10/21/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec.)
                                    LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 173 Filed: 10/20/2020, Entered: 10/20/2020 letter
                                    LETTER Jointly Requesting Scheduling Conference by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A Draft Motion to Extend)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 172 Filed: 10/16/2020, Entered: 10/16/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                      MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint by Defendants George Baxter, Donald Marchiony, Sabrepoint Capital Management, LP. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit C-1, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit G-A, # (10) Proposed Order (PDF Only) Proposed Order)(Galloway, Toby)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 171 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                        NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Jamie M. Lacy by Jamie M. Lacy on behalf of George Baxter, Donald Marchiony, Sabrepoint Capital Management, LPAttorney Jamie M. Lacy added to party George Baxter(pty:dft), Attorney Jamie M. Lacy added to party Donald Marchiony(pty:dft), Attorney Jamie M. Lacy added to party Sabrepoint Capital Management, LP(pty:dft) (Lacy, Jamie)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Blank 170 Filed: 9/22/2020, Entered: 9/22/2020 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                          MINUTE ORDER re: [166] Letter filed by Farmland Partners Inc., [165] Letter filed by Sabrepoint Capital Management, LP. The Court has reviewed the parties' letters and authorizes a motion to dismiss for lack of personal jurisdiction. Although not a condition for filing, the Court believes that the parties and the Court would likely be better served by the parties' first conducting some initial, limited discovery concerning Sabrepoint's knowledge or lack thereof of the Mathews article before it was published and Sabrepoint's knowledge or lack of knowledge of the Mitzner letter. By Judge R. Brooke Jackson on 9/22/2020. Text Only Entry (rbjsec. )
                                            LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 169 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                            NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Claire Eleanor Mueller on behalf of George Baxter, Donald Marchiony, Sabrepoint Capital Management, LPAttorney Claire Eleanor Mueller added to party George Baxter(pty:dft), Attorney Claire Eleanor Mueller added to party Donald Marchiony(pty:dft), Attorney Claire Eleanor Mueller added to party Sabrepoint Capital Management, LP(pty:dft) (Mueller, Claire)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 168 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                              NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Tess Hand-Bender on behalf of George Baxter, Donald Marchiony, Sabrepoint Capital Management, LPAttorney Tess Hand-Bender added to party George Baxter(pty:dft), Attorney Tess Hand-Bender added to party Donald Marchiony(pty:dft), Attorney Tess Hand-Bender added to party Sabrepoint Capital Management, LP(pty:dft) (Hand-Bender, Tess)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 167 Filed: 9/21/2020, Entered: 9/21/2020 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Chad David Williams on behalf of George Baxter, Donald Marchiony, Sabrepoint Capital Management, LPAttorney Chad David Williams added to party George Baxter(pty:dft), Attorney Chad David Williams added to party Donald Marchiony(pty:dft), Attorney Chad David Williams added to party Sabrepoint Capital Management, LP(pty:dft) (Williams, Chad)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 166 Filed: 9/18/2020, Entered: 9/18/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                  LETTER re: [165] Letter to Judge Jackson by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 165 Filed: 9/14/2020, Entered: 9/14/2020 letterCourt Filing
                                                    LETTER to Judge Jackson by Defendant Sabrepoint Capital Management, LP. (Galloway, Toby)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 164 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020 summons returned executed
                                                      SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farmland Partners Inc.. George Baxter served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 163 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020 summons returned executed
                                                        SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farmland Partners Inc.. Sabrepoint Capital Management, LP served on 8/25/2020, answer due 9/15/2020. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 162 Filed: 9/4/2020, Entered: 9/4/2020 summons returned executed
                                                          SUMMONS Returned Executed by Farmland Partners Inc.. Donald Marchiony served on 8/24/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Blank 161 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 Case ReassignedCourt Filing
                                                            CASE REASSIGNED pursuant to [159] Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge. All parties do not consent. This case is randomly reassigned to Judge R. Brooke Jackson. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02351-RBJ. (Text Only Entry) (nmarb, )
                                                              LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 160 Filed: 8/25/2020, Entered: 8/25/2020 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                              MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/25/20 re: [159] Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge filed by Rota Fortunae, QKM, L.L.C.. At least one party in this civil action does not consent to have a United States Magistrate Judge conduct all proceedings. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case shall be assigned to a District Judge under D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(c)(8) and D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1(a). (nmarb, )
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 159 Filed: 8/24/2020, Entered: 8/24/2020 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendants Rota Fortunae, QKM, L.L.C. All parties do not consent.. (Roush, Katherine)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 158 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: 8/11/2020 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Roush, Katherine)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 157 Filed: 8/11/2020, Entered: 8/11/2020 Answer to amended complaint
                                                                    DEFENDANTS DAVID QUINTON MATHEWS AND QKM, LLCS ANSWER to [155] Amended Complaint Attorney Katherine Anna Roush added to party QKM, L.L.C.(pty:dft) by Rota Fortunae, QKM, L.L.C..(Roush, Katherine)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 156 Filed: 7/31/2020, Entered: 7/31/2020 Summons issuedCourt Filing
                                                                      SUMMONSES issued by Clerk. (Attachments: # (1) Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (nmarb, )
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document 155 Filed: 7/28/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 Amended Complaint
                                                                        AMENDED COMPLAINT against Rota Fortunae, filed by Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Summons QKM, # (2) Summons Sabrepoint Capital, # (3) Summons Marchiony, # (4) Summons Baxter)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                          LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 7/27/2020, Entered: 7/28/2020 Order on Motion for leaveCourt Filing
                                                                          ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/27/20 GRANTING [149] Farmland Partner Inc.'s Motion for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. Plaintiff is granted leave to file its proposed First Amended Complaint [#149-1]. (nmarb, )
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 153 Filed: 7/23/2020, Entered: 7/23/2020 Notice - other
                                                                            NOTICE re [149] MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Defendant Rota Fortunae (Roush, Katherine)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: 7/14/2020 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                              NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Sarah E. Barr on behalf of Farmland Partners Inc.Attorney Sarah E. Barr added to party Farmland Partners Inc.(pty:pla) (Barr, Sarah)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 7/14/2020, Entered: 7/14/2020 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Brenden James Cline on behalf of Farmland Partners Inc.Attorney Brenden James Cline added to party Farmland Partners Inc.(pty:pla) (Cline, Brenden)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020 Corporate Disclosure Statement
                                                                                  CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 7/10/2020, Entered: 7/10/2020, Terminated: 7/27/2020 Motion for leave
                                                                                    MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit 1 First Amended Complaint, # (2) Exhibit 2 Redline, # (3) Exhibit 3 Proposed Order)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 148 Filed: 7/8/2020, Entered: 7/8/2020 Answer
                                                                                      ANSWER to [3] Complaint by Rota Fortunae.(Roush, Katherine)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 147 Filed: 6/29/2020, Entered: 6/29/2020 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/29/20 re: [146] Notice of Farmland Partner Inc.'s Withdrawal of its Motion for Leave to Allow Substituted Service [#135] [#146] (the Notice). In light of the Notice [#146], IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the record shall reflect that Farmland Partner Inc.'s Motion for Leave to Allow Substituted Service [#135] is withdrawn. (nmarb, ).
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 146 Filed: 6/25/2020, Entered: 6/25/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                          NOTICE re [135] MOTION for Leave to Allow Substituted Service by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 145 Filed: 6/22/2020, Entered: 6/22/2020 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/22/20, re: [143] Joint Notice of Trial Availability filed by Farmland Partners Inc.. Final Pretrial Conference and Jury Instructions Conference set for 7/9/2021 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. Five day Jury Trial set for 7/26/2021 10:00 AM to 7/30/21 10:00 AM, in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (nmarb, ) Modified on 6/22/2020 to show correct date jury trial to start. (nmarb, ).
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 144 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/16/20 GRANTING [142] Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant has up to and including 6/25/20, to file a response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Allow Substituted Service [#135]. (nmarb, )
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 143 Filed: 6/16/2020, Entered: 6/16/2020 Notice - other
                                                                                                NOTICE OF TRIAL AVAILABILITY by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 142 Filed: 6/11/2020, Entered: 6/11/2020, Terminated: 6/16/2020 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                  Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [135] MOTION for Leave to Allow Substituted Service by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Roush, Katherine)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 141 Filed: 6/3/2020, Entered: 6/4/2020 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/3/20 GRANTING [140] Joint Motion To Extend Discovery Deadlines. Designation of Affirmative Experts due by 11/19/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 2/19/2021. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 12/17/2020. Fact Discovery due by 9/24/2020.(nmarb, )
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 140 Filed: 6/2/2020, Entered: 6/2/2020, Terminated: 6/3/2020 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                      Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 139 Filed: 5/29/2020, Entered: 5/29/2020 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / ReplyCourt Filing
                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/29/20 GRANTING [138] Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Allow Substituted Service. Defendant Rota Fortunae has up to and including June 11, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Allow Substituted Service.(nmarb, ).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 138 Filed: 5/28/2020, Entered: 5/28/2020, Terminated: 5/29/2020 motion for extension of time to file response/reply
                                                                                                          Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to [135] MOTION for Leave to Allow Substituted Service by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Roush, Katherine)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 137 Filed: 5/18/2020, Entered: 5/18/2020 Order on motion to compelCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/18/20 GRANTING [11] Plaintiff Farmland Partner Inc.'s (FPI) Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Rota Fortunae. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that within 20 days of this Order, Rota must provide full responses to FPI's first set of interrogatories and documents requests, as set forth in the Motion [#115]. Within 45 days of this Order, Rota must sit for a deposition without limits related to anonymity.(nmarb, )
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document 136 Filed: 5/15/2020, Entered: 5/18/2020 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 5/15/20 as to [97] Motion to Dismiss. The motion is DENIED as to the personal jurisdiction argument, GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART as to the defamation claim, and DENIED as to the remaining claims.(nmarb, )
                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 135 Filed: 5/11/2020, Entered: 5/11/2020, Terminated: 6/29/2029 Motion for leave
                                                                                                                WITHDRAWN - MOTION for Leave to Allow Substituted Service by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Appendix Declaration from Scott F. Llewellyn in Support of Farmland Partners Inc.'s Motion to Allow Substitute Service, # (2) Exhibit A to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (3) Exhibit B to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (4) Exhibit C to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (5) Exhibit D to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (6) Exhibit E to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (7) Exhibit F to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (8) Exhibit G to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (9) Exhibit H to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (10) Exhibit I to Llewelly Declaration, # (11) Exhibit J to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (12) Exhibit K to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (13) Exhibit L to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (14) Exhibit M to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (15) Exhibit N to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (16) Exhibit O to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (17) Exhibit P to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (18) Exhibit Q to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (19) Exhibit R to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (20) Exhibit S to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (21) Exhibit T to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (22) Exhibit U to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (23) Exhibit V to Llewelllyn Declaration, # (24) Exhibit W to Llewelllyn Declaration)(Llewellyn, Scott) Modified on 6/29/2020 to show as withdrawn pursuant to [147] Minute Order. (nmarb, ).
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Blank 134 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Letter re: Record Complete.
                                                                                                                  LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to [130] Notice of Appeal filed by Rota Fortunae. A transcript order form was filed stating that the necessary transcript is already on file. ( Appeal No. 20-1141) Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 133 Filed: 4/27/2020, Entered: 4/27/2020 Transcript Order Form
                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM by Defendant Rota Fortunae. Necessary transcripts already on file for proceedings held on 12/20/18 and 1/11/19 re [130] Notice of Appeal. (nmarb, )
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 132 Filed: 4/9/2020, Entered: 4/9/2020 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                      USCA Case Number 20-1141 for [130] Notice of Appeal filed by Rota Fortunae. (nmarb, )
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 131 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: 4/9/2020 Letter Transmitting Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                        LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the [130] Notice of Appeal filed by Rota Fortunae to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: # (1) Docket Sheet, # (2) Preliminary Record)(nmarb, )
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 130 Filed: 4/8/2020, Entered: 4/8/2020 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                          NOTICE OF APPEAL by Defendant Rota Fortunae (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-7242922) (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 129 Filed: 4/2/2020, Entered: 4/2/2020 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 4/2/20 GRANTING [128] Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines and Vacate Trial Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel. Designation of Affirmative Experts due by 6/12/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 8/21/2020. Designation of Rebuttal Experts due by 7/10/2020. Fact Discovery due 5/22/2020. Deadline for Service of Interrogatories, Requests for Production of Documents and/or Admissions 4/17/20. Deadline for Joinder of Parties and Amendment of Pleadings: 5/29/20. Deadline for Expert Depositions and ExpertDiscovery: 7/31/20.(nmarb, )
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 128 Filed: 4/1/2020, Entered: 4/1/2020, Terminated: 4/2/2020 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                              Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery Deadlines Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document 127 Filed: 3/9/2020, Entered: 3/9/2020 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/9/20 DENYING without prejudice [98] Defendant's Motion to Dismiss Under the Texas Citizens' Participation Act. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that to the extent the Motion [#98] was filed to preserve rights under the TCPA, this was unnecessary as RFs rights were preserved through the filing of its initial motion [#22] that is currently on appeal. (nmarb, )
                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 126 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/22/2020 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/21/20 GRANTING [125] Unopposed Joint Motion to Extend Discovery Deadlines and Vacate Trial Pending Resolution of Plaintiffs Motion to Compel. Discovery due by 6/12/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 7/3/2020. The five-day jury trial set on August 10, 2020, and the Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation and Jury Instructions Conference set on July 24, 2020 are VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the trial will be reset after the Court has ruled on Plaintiff's Motion to Compel Discovery [#115]. (nmarb, )
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 125 Filed: 1/21/2020, Entered: 1/21/2020, Terminated: 1/21/2020 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                    Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery Deadlines and Vacate Trial Pending Resolution of Plaintiff's Motion to Compel by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 124 Filed: 12/17/2019, Entered: 12/17/2019 Notice of Change of Address/Contact Information
                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information by Rhiannon N. Batchelder (Batchelder, Rhiannon)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 123 Filed: 11/19/2019, Entered: 11/19/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                        REPLY to Response to [115] MOTION to Compel Discovery From Defendant Rota Fortunae filed by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Rhiannon N. Batchelder in Support of Farmland Partners Inc.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Compel Discovery from Defendant Rota Fortunae, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I, # (11) Exhibit J, # (12) Exhibit K, # (13) Exhibit L, # (14) Exhibit M, # (15) Exhibit N, # (16) Exhibit O)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 121 Filed: 11/13/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/13/19 GRANTING [120]Joint Motion To Extend Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 1/31/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 5/1/2020. (nmarb, )
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 120 Filed: 11/12/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019, Terminated: 11/13/2019 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                            Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Extend Discovery Deadlines by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 122 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/13/2019 protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              CONFIDENTIALITY AGREEMENT AND PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/8/19. (nmarb, )
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 119 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/12/2019 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/8/19 GRANTING [117] parties' Stipulated Motion for Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Confidentiality Agreement and Protective Order [#117) supplied by the parties is accepted for filing and entered as an Order of the Court, with interlineations, as of the date of this Minute Order.(nmarb, )
                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 118 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: 11/8/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF PARTIES' AGREEMENT by Defendant Rota Fortunae (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 117 Filed: 11/7/2019, Entered: 11/7/2019, Terminated: 11/8/2019 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                    Stipulated MOTION for Protective Order and Confidentiality Agreement by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 116 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: 11/5/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                      RESPONSE to [115] MOTION to Compel Discovery From Defendant Rota Fortunae IN OBJECTION filed by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 115 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: 10/15/2019, Terminated: 5/18/2020 Motion to compel
                                                                                                                                                        MOTION to Compel Discovery From Defendant Rota Fortunae by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration From Rhiannon N. Batchelder in Support of Farmland Partners Inc.'s Motion to Compel Discovery From Defendant Rota Fortunae, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G, # (9) Exhibit H, # (10) Exhibit I)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 114 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: 10/4/2019 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                          NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Rhiannon N. Batchelder on behalf of Farmland Partners Inc.Attorney Rhiannon N. Batchelder added to party Farmland Partners Inc.(pty:pla) (Batchelder, Rhiannon)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 113 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: 10/1/2019 Order on Motion for protective orderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 9/30/19 DENYING [79] Motion for Protective Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, on or before October 7, 2019, Defendant Rota shall provide a list of terms for redaction to the appropriate person at Goldman Sachs with respect to the Third-Party Subpoena.(nmarb, )
                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 112 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to [98] MOTION to Dismiss Under The Texas Citizens' Participation Act IN SUPPORT filed by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 111 Filed: 9/18/2019, Entered: 9/18/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to [97] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint IN SUPPORT filed by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 9/4/2019, Entered: 9/4/2019 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                  BRIEF in Opposition to [97] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, [98] MOTION to Dismiss Under The Texas Citizens' Participation Act filed by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Michael D. Birnbaum in Support of Farmland Partners Inc.'s Opposition to Rota Fortunae's Motions to Dismiss, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 9/2/2019, Entered: 9/2/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                    TRANSCRIPT of Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference held on August 21, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Mix. Pages: 1-19. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 108 Filed: 8/30/2019, Entered: 8/30/2019 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER denying [105] Motion for a Stay of Discovery and Disclosures Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(c), by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/30/2019.(jgonz, )
                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 107 Filed: 8/23/2019, Entered: 8/26/2019 USCA order
                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER of USCA as to [49] Notice of Appeal, filed by Rota Fortunae. (USCA Case No. 19-1011). It is appropriate for the district court to consider appellants request to stay discovery proceedings in the first instance. See Fed. R. App. P. 8(a)(1). Accordingly, we deny the motion for stay filed in this court. (nmarb, )
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 106 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/23/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          STIPULATED 502(d) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 08/22/19. (nmarb, )
                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 105 Filed: 8/22/2019, Entered: 8/22/2019, Terminated: 8/30/2019 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Stay DISCOVERY AND DISCLOSURES PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(c) by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Blank 104 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                              Utility Setting/Resetting Deadlines/Hearings: Text Only Entry Proposed Final Pretrial Order due by 7/17/2020. (nmarb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 103 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 letterCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                KLM Civil Trial Practice Standards, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (nmarb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 102 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  SCHEDULING ORDER: by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/21/19. (lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 101 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 scheduling conferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/21/2019. Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 3/20/2020. Final Pretrial/Trial Preparation and Jury Instructions Conference set for 7/24/2020 2:00 PM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix.Five Day Jury Trial set for 8/10/2020 08:30 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix., FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (Attachments: # (1) Discovery Procedures and Requirements of Practice) (lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 100 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: 8/21/2019 stipulation
                                                                                                                                                                                      STIPULATION ORDER by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 8/19/2019, Entered: 8/19/2019 Order on Motion for leaveCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER granting [95] Unopposed Motion for Leave to Exceed Page Limits on His Motion to Dismiss. Defendants Rota Fortunaes Motion to Dismiss Complaint #[97] is accepted for filing, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/19/2019.(jgonz, )
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 98 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019, Terminated: 3/9/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Under The Texas Citizens' Participation Act by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 97 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019, Terminated: 5/15/2020 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A to Defendant Rota Fortunae's Motion to Dismiss Complaint)(Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 96 Filed: 8/14/2019, Entered: 8/14/2019 Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                              Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 95 Filed: 8/13/2019, Entered: 8/13/2019, Terminated: 8/19/2019 Motion for leave
                                                                                                                                                                                                Unopposed MOTION for Leave to Exceed Page Limits on Motion to Dismiss by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Blank 94 Filed: 8/2/2019, Entered: 8/2/2019 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER. PLEASE NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. Due to a conflict on the Court calendar, and after conferral with the parties, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for August 21, 2019, at 12:00 p.m. is VACATED and RESET to August 21, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties' revised proposed scheduling order remains due on or before August 14, 2019. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/2/2019. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 93 Filed: 8/1/2019, Entered: 8/1/2019 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 8/1/19. Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2019 12:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 92 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                      MINUTE ORDER re: [90] Proposed Scheduling by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/31/19. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for August 1, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED. (lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 91 Filed: 7/31/2019, Entered: 7/31/2019 Order on Motion to stayCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 7/31/19. Rota's Motion for a Stay Pending Appeal [52] is DENIED. Rota's Motion for a Protective Order and/or Stay of Discovery Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 26(c) [56] is GRANTED in part and DENIED without prejudice in part. (lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 90 Filed: 7/25/2019, Entered: 7/25/2019 Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 89 Filed: 6/19/2019, Entered: 6/20/2019 order on motion to resetCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/19/19 GRANTING [88] Defendant Rota Fortunae's Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Scheduling Conference. Proposed Scheduling Order due no later than 7/25/2019. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/19 at 10:00 AM is VACATED and RESET for 8/1/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (nmarb, ) .
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 88 Filed: 6/17/2019, Entered: 6/17/2019, Terminated: 6/19/2019 motion to reset
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Unopposed MOTION to Reset /RESCHEDULE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 87 Filed: 6/14/2019, Entered: 6/14/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Corrected TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on March 5, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Mix. Pages: 1-38. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 86 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/11/2019 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/11/19. Scheduling Conference set for 8/8/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Blank 85 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/11/2019 Order on Motion for Default JudgmentCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER finding as moot [70] Motion for Default Judgment. In light of the Court's Order [83] granting reconsideration of substituted service on the John and Jane Doe Defendants, Plaintiff's Renewed Motion for Default Judgment Against John/Jane Does 2-10 [70] is DENIED as moot. For the reasons explained in that Order [83], the John and Jane Doe Defendants were not properly served prior to removal of this case from state court. Plaintiff's argument that it is entitled to default judgment against these defendants is, therefore, moot. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/11/2019. Text Only Entry(klmlc1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Blank 84 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/11/2019 Order on Motion to Remand to State Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 83 Filed: 6/11/2019, Entered: 6/11/2019 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 6/11/19 GRANTING [72] Defendant Rota Fortunae's Motion To Reconsider Order Granting Substituted Service of Fictitious Defendants John/Jane Does 2-10. Accordingly, the State Court Order [#1-7] is VACATED and Plaintiffs Motion for Substituted Service [#1-6] is DENIED without prejudice. Plaintiffs Proof of Service [#15-10] of process on the Doe Defendants is STRICKEN, although it was not properly filed as a separate entry on the Courts docket. D.C.COLO.LCivR 81.1.7 (nmarb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 82 Filed: 5/23/2019, Entered: 5/23/2019 letter
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER Requesting a Conference by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 81 Filed: 5/16/2019, Entered: 5/16/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to [79] MOTION for Protective Order PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(c) AND/OR TO QUASH A SUBPOENA PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 45 IN SUPPORT filed by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 80 Filed: 5/2/2019, Entered: 5/2/2019 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              BRIEF in Opposition to [79] MOTION for Protective Order PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(c) AND/OR TO QUASH A SUBPOENA PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 45 filed by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 79 Filed: 4/24/2019, Entered: 4/24/2019, Terminated: 9/30/2019 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION for Protective Order PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(c) AND/OR TO QUASH A SUBPOENA PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 45 by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 78 Filed: 4/3/2019, Entered: 4/3/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  REPLY to Response to [72] MOTION for Reconsideration re [71] Notice (Other) of ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS JOHN/JANE DOES 2-10 [1-7] filed by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 77 Filed: 3/20/2019, Entered: 3/20/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [72] MOTION for Reconsideration re [71] Notice (Other) of ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS JOHN/JANE DOES 2-10 [1-7] filed by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 76 Filed: 3/19/2019, Entered: 3/19/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE re [69] Status Conference OF SUPPLEMENTING HIS INTERROGATORY RESPONSES by Defendant Rota Fortunae (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A - DEFENDANT ROTA FORTUNAES NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTING HIS INTERROGATORY RESPONSES)(Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 75 Filed: 3/17/2019, Entered: 3/17/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on March 5, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Mix. Pages: 1-38. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 74 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          REPLY to Response to [72] MOTION for Reconsideration re [71] Notice (Other) of ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS JOHN/JANE DOES 2-10 [1-7] IN SUPPORT filed by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document 73 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            RESPONSE to [72] MOTION for Reconsideration re [71] Notice (Other) of ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS JOHN/JANE DOES 2-10 [1-7] By PLAINTIFF'S filed by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document 72 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019, Terminated: 6/11/2019 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Reconsideration re [71] Notice (Other) of ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE OF FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS JOHN/JANE DOES 2-10 [1-7] by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 71 Filed: 3/14/2019, Entered: 3/14/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE OF FILED MOTION TO RECONSIDER ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTED SERVICE ON FICTITIOUS DEFENDANTS JOHN/JANE DOES 2-10 by Defendant Rota Fortunae (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document 70 Filed: 3/8/2019, Entered: 3/8/2019, Terminated: 6/11/2019 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Renewed MOTION for Default Judgment as to John/Jane Does 2-10 by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration from Michael D. Birnbaum in Support of Farmland Partners Inc.'s Renewed Motion for Default Judgment Against John/Jane Does 2-10, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Exhibit F, # (8) Exhibit G)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 69 Filed: 3/5/2019, Entered: 3/6/2019 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 3/5/2019. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document 68 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: 2/22/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      REPLY to Response to [56] MOTION for Protective Order AND/OR STAY OF DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(c) filed by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 67 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF in Opposition to [56] MOTION for Protective Order AND/OR STAY OF DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(c) filed by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 66 Filed: 2/4/2019, Entered: 2/4/2019 order on motion to resetCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 2/4/19. Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Status Conference [65] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Status Conference set for March 7, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to 3/5/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 65 Filed: 2/1/2019, Entered: 2/1/2019, Terminated: 2/4/2019 motion to reset
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Unopposed MOTION to Reset /RESCHEDULE STATUS CONFERENCE by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 64 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to [52] MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal in Support filed by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C, # (4) Exhibit D)(Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 63 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Order on Motion for Hearing/ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/28/19. [57] Motion for Hearing is GRANTED. Status Conference set for 3/7/2019 10:00 AM in Courtroom A401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 62 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Letter re: Record Complete.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LETTER TO USCA and all counsel certifying the record is complete as to [49] Notice of Appeal, filed by Rota Fortunae. A transcript order form was filed stating that the necessary transcripts are already on file. ( Appeal No. 19-1011) Text Only Entry (nmarb, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 61 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019 Reporter Transcript Order Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    REPORTER TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM filed by Patterson Transcription Company. Transcripts already on file. (nrich)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 60 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/25/2019 Transcript Order Form
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT ORDER FORM re [49] Notice of Appeal, by Defendant Rota Fortunae (Roush, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 59 Filed: 1/23/2019, Entered: 1/23/2019 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF in Opposition to [52] MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal filed by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 58 Filed: 1/20/2019, Entered: 1/20/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          TRANSCRIPT of Status Conference held on January 11, 2019 before Magistrate Judge Mix. Pages: 1-19. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019, Terminated: 1/28/2019 Motion for Hearing/Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MOTION for Hearing/Conference by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A, # (2) Exhibit B, # (3) Exhibit C)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 1/18/2019, Entered: 1/18/2019, Terminated: 7/31/2019 Motion for protective order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Protective Order AND/OR STAY OF DISCOVERY PURSUANT TO F.R.C.P. 26(c) by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Answering Interrogatories by Defendant Rota Fortunae (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 1/14/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 USCA Case Number
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  USCA Case Number 19-1011 for [49] Notice of Appeal, filed by Rota Fortunae. (jgonz, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 1/13/2019, Entered: 1/13/2019, Terminated: 7/31/2019 Motion To Stay
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION to Stay Pending Appeal by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Roush, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 51 Filed: 1/13/2019, Entered: 1/13/2019 transcriptCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      TRANSCRIPT of Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference held on December 20, 2018 before Magistrate Judge Mix. Pages: 1-7. NOTICE - REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Within seven calendar days of this filing, each party shall inform the Court, by filing a Notice of Intent to Redact, of the party's intent to redact personal identifiers from the electronic transcript of the court proceeding. If a Notice of Intent to Redact is not filed within the allotted time, this transcript will be made electronically available after 90 days. Please see the Notice of Electronic Availability of Transcripts document at www.cod.uscourts.gov. Transcript may only be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber prior to the 90 day deadline for electronic posting on PACER. (Patterson Transcription Company, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 1/11/2019, Entered: 1/14/2019 Status ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ENTRY for Status Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/11/2019. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/11/2019 Letter Transmitting Notice of Appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LETTER Transmitting Notice of Appeal to all counsel advising of the transmittal of the [49] Notice of Appeal, filed by Rota Fortunae to the U.S. Court of Appeals. ( Retained Counsel, Fee paid,) (Attachments: # (1) Docket Sheet, # (2) Preliminary Record)(jgonz, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 49 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Notice of appeal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF APPEAL as to [45] Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Hearing/Conference,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, Scheduling Conference,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, [48] Order on Motion for Reconsideration by Defendant Rota Fortunae (Filing fee $ 505, Receipt Number 1082-6475331) (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Order on Motion for reconsiderationCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 1/9/19. [46] Motion to Reconsider is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. (lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 1/9/2019, Entered: 1/9/2019 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                RESPONSE to [46] MOTION for Reconsideration re [45] Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Hearing/Conference,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, Scheduling Conference,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, filed by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 46 Filed: 1/4/2019, Entered: 1/4/2019, Terminated: 1/9/2019 Motion for reconsideration
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION for Reconsideration re [45] Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Order on Motion for Hearing/Conference,, Order on Motion for Default Judgment,, Scheduling Conference,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/20/2018 Order on Motion to DismissCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MINUTE ENTRY for Scheduling Conference held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/20/2018; Status Conference set for 1/11/2019 09:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. [18] Motion to Dismiss; [22] Motion to Dismiss; [32] Motion for Hearing/Conference; and [37] Motion for Default Judgment are DENIED without prejudice. FTR: 401. (morti, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/18/2018 Early Neutral Evaluation ConferenceCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      DISREGARD: This minute entry was entered in the incorrect case. MINUTE ENTRY for Early Neutral Evaluation held before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix held on 12/17/2018. FTR: KLM Courtroom A401. (lgale, ) Modified on 12/19/2018 to note this was erroneously filed(lgale, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 12/17/2018, Entered: 12/17/2018 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        MINUTE ORDER. PLEASE NOTE TIME CHANGE ONLY. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. Due to a conflict on the Court calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for December 20, 2018, at 2:00 p.m. is VACATED and RESET to December 20, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. By Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 12/17/2018. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: 12/13/2018 Proposed Scheduling Order
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Proposed Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            REPLY to Response to [18] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              REPLY to Response to [22] MOTION to Dismiss under the Texas Citizens Participation Act filed by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Reply to Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                REPLY to Response to [15] MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A to Farmland Partners INC.'s Reply in Support of its Motion to Remand)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 11/30/2018, Entered: 11/30/2018 Clerk's Note Regarding Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018, Terminated: 12/20/2018 Motion for Default Judgment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    MOTION for Default Judgment as to John/Jane Does 2-10 by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Kyle S. Pietari in Support of Farmland Partner Inc. Motion for Default Judgment Against John/Jane Does 2-10, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D, # (6) Exhibit E, # (7) Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 11/28/2018, Entered: 11/28/2018, Terminated: 11/30/2018 Motion for Entry of Default
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      MOTION for Entry of Default as to John/Jane Does 2-10 by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Kyle S. Pietari in Support of Plaintiffs Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Against John/Jane Does 2-10, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 35 Filed: 11/21/2018, Entered: 11/21/2018 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        BRIEF in Opposition to [32] MOTION for Hearing/Conference re [22] MOTION to Dismiss under the Texas Citizens Participation Act filed by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Kyle S. Pietari in Support of Farmland Partners Inc.'s Opposition to Rota Fortunae's Motion to Set a Hearing on its Motion to Dismiss Under the Texas Citizens Participation Act, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B)(Birnbaum, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 34 Filed: 11/16/2018, Entered: 11/16/2018 Brief in Opposition to Motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          BRIEF in Opposition to [18] MOTION to Dismiss Complaint, [22] MOTION to Dismiss under the Texas Citizens Participation Act filed by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Affidavit Declaration of Kyle S. Pietari, # (2) Exhibit A, # (3) Exhibit B, # (4) Exhibit C, # (5) Exhibit D)(Birnbaum, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 11/8/2018, Entered: 11/8/2018 order on motion to resetCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 11/8/18. Unopposed Motion to Reschedule Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference [27] is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for December 18,2018, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to 12/20/2018 02:00 PM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 10/31/2018, Entered: 10/31/2018, Terminated: 12/20/2018 Motion for Hearing/Conference
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MOTION for Hearing/Conference re [22] MOTION to Dismiss under the Texas Citizens Participation Act by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 10/29/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Michael D. Birnbaum on behalf of Farmland Partners Inc.Attorney Michael D. Birnbaum added to party Farmland Partners Inc.(pty:pla) (Birnbaum, Michael)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/29/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  KLM CIVIL MOTIONS PRACTICE STANDARDS by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/26/18. (lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Response to motion
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    RESPONSE to [15] MOTION to Remand to State Court in Opposition filed by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 10/26/2018, Entered: 10/26/2018 Order on Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      ORDER OF REFERENCE Upon Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge: Pursuant to the parties' consent [26] and 28 USC 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Mix to fully preside over for all purposes. By Chief Judge Marcia S. Krieger on 10/26/18. Text Only Entry (msklc2, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 10/25/2018, Entered: 10/25/2018, Terminated: 11/8/2018 motion to reset
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Unopposed MOTION to Reset /Reschedule Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Roush, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 10/22/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 Consent to Jurisdiction of Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          CONSENT to Jurisdiction of Magistrate Judge by Defendant Rota Fortunae All parties consent.. (Roush, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/22/2018 order on motion for extension of time to fileCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MINUTE ORDER granting [23] Joint Motion for Extension of Time, by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/19/2018. (jgonz, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 10/19/2018, Entered: 10/19/2018 Minute OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              MINUTE ORDER. PLEASE NOTE DATE AND TIME CHANGE ONLY. This matter is before the Court sua sponte. Due to a conflict on the Court calendar, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Conference set for December 13, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. is VACATED and RESET to December 18, 2018, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom A-401, Fourth Floor, Alfred A. Arraj United States Courthouse, 901 19th Street, Denver, Colorado. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the proposed scheduling order shall be submitted on or before December 11, 2018. by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/19/2018. Text Only Entry (klmlc1, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 10/17/2018, Entered: 10/17/2018, Terminated: 10/19/2018 MOTION for Extension of Time
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond/Amend by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Proposed Order (PDF Only) [Proposed] Order Granting Joint Motion for Extension of Time)(Pietari, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018, Terminated: 12/20/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  MOTION to Dismiss under the Texas Citizens Participation Act by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Roush, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/15/2018, Entered: 10/15/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING/PLANNING CONFERENCE by Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix on 10/15/18. Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2018 10:00 AM in Courtroom A 401 before Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment 1, # (2) Attachment 2) (lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Supplement/Amendment
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SUPPLEMENT/AMENDMENT to [1] Notice of Removal, Amended Civil Cover Sheet by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Roush, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/9/2018, Entered: 10/9/2018 Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Consent Form due by 11/19/2018 pursuant to the filing of [15]. Text Only Entry(lgale, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document 18 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018, Terminated: 12/20/2018 Motion to Dismiss
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          MOTION to Dismiss Complaint by Defendant Rota Fortunae. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit A - Declaration, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration, # (3) Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration)(Roush, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Kyle Saari Pietari on behalf of Farmland Partners Inc.Attorney Kyle Saari Pietari added to party Farmland Partners Inc.(pty:pla) (Pietari, Kyle)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE of Entry of Appearance by Scott F. Llewellyn on behalf of Farmland Partners Inc. (Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document 15 Filed: 10/5/2018, Entered: 10/5/2018, Terminated: 6/11/2019 Motion to remand to State Court
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Farmland Partners Inc.. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration from Kyle S. Pietari in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, # (2) Exhibit A to Pietari Declaration, # (3) Exhibit B to Pietari Declaration, # (4) Exhibit C to Pietari Declaration, # (5) Exhibit D to Pietari Declaration, # (6) Exhibit E to Pietari Declaration, # (7) Exhibit F to Pietari Declaration, # (8) Exhibit G to Pietari Declaration, # (9) Exhibit H to Pietari Declaration, # (10) Exhibit I to Pietari Declaration, # (11) Exhibit J to Pietari Declaration, # (12) Exhibit K to Pietari Declaration, # (13) Declaration from Joshua Mitts in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, # (14) Exhibit A to Mitts Declaration, # (15) Exhibit B to Mitts Declaration)(Llewellyn, Scott)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/18/2018, Entered: 9/18/2018 Notice - other
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE of Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Defendant Rota Fortunae (Roush, Katherine)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Melanie MacWilliams-Brooks by John Andrew Chanin on behalf of Rota Fortunae (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of Katherine A. Roush by John Andrew Chanin on behalf of Rota Fortunae (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Notice of Entry of Appearance
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE of Entry of Appearance of John A. Chanin by John Andrew Chanin on behalf of Rota Fortunae (Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to D.C.COLO.LCivR 40.1, direct assignment of civil actions to full time magistrate judges. (athom, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Memorandum Returning CaseCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            MEMORANDUM RETURNING CASE by Senior Judge Blackburn. This case is randomly reassigned to Magistrate Judge Kristen L. Mix. All future pleadings should be designated as 18-cv-02351-KLM. (athom, ) Modified on 9/17/2018 to attach main document (athom, ).
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Notice to Attorney(s) in Removed, Transferred or Other Cases
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              FIRST AND FINAL NOTICE TO ALL ATTORNEY(S) AND UNREPRESENTED PARTIES IN REMOVED, TRANSFERRED, OR OTHER CASES. To receive any further notice in a case removed or transferred to this court, or special matters including discovery disputes, bankruptcy appeals, or withdrawls of reference, Multi-district litigation (MDL), etc., all attorneys and unrepresented parties must enter an appearance under D.C.COLO.LAttyR 5(a). An attorney must be an active member of this court's bar and be in good standing in accordance with D.C.COLO.LAttyR 3. A waiver of the fee for bar admission may apply in limited situations. (dbera, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Magistrate JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Magistrate Judge consent form issued pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c). (dbera, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 State Court OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's August 28, 2018 Motion to Allow Substituted Service. By Elizabeth A. Starrs, Denver District Court Judge on 08/29/2018.(dbera, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Affidavit/Return of Service
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    AFFIDAVIT/RETURN of Service of Summons, Civil Cover Sheet, Complaint, Three Exhibits, Substituted Service Order, Pre-Trial Order upon Matthew Mitzner on 08/15/2018 (dbera, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 State Court OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      STATE COURT ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's Motion to Allow Substituted Service. By Elizabeth A. Starrs, Denver District Court Judge on 08/13/2018.(dbera, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document 3 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Complaint
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        COMPLAINT against Rota Fortunae, filed by Farmland Partners Inc..(dbera, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 Case Assigned to JudgeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Case assigned to Judge Robert E. Blackburn and drawn to Magistrate Judge Michael E. Hegarty. Text Only Entry (dbera, )
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 9/14/2018, Entered: 9/14/2018 notice of removal
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Rota Fortunae (Filing fee $ 400, Receipt Number 1082-6295180), filed by Rota Fortunae. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit A-1, # (2) Exhibit A-2, # (3) Exhibit B-1, # (4) Exhibit B-2, # (5) Exhibit C, # (6) Exhibit D-1, # (7) Exhibit D-2, # (8) Exhibit D-3, # (9) Exhibit D-4, # (10) Exhibit D-5, # (11) Exhibit D-6, # (12) Civil Cover Sheet)(Chanin, John)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 53 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                               
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Need Password Help?