Schaefer v. Harris
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-02224

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 3, 2019 at 4:23 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Jason Paul Schaefer, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Jason Paul Schaefer
v.
No Logo Craig Mueller, Defendant
No Logo Detective Harris, Defendant
No Logo Detective Hoskins, Defendant
No Logo Jeff Gill, Defendant
No Logo Lt. McGranahan, Defendant
No Logo Officer Coulson, Defendant
No Logo Officer Nomako, Defendant
No Logo Sergeant Condon, Defendant
No Logo Sgt. Kramer, Defendant
No Logo Unknown Beaverton Police Officers 1-2, Defendant
No Logo Unknown Environmental Protection Agency Agents 1-10, Defendant
No Logo Unknown FBI Agents 1-5, Defendant
No Logo Unknown Portland Police Officers 1-5, Defendant
No Logo Unknown Washington County District Attorney, Defendant
No Logo Wade Mutchler, Defendant
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1331
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (6) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Motion for Appointment of Counsel. Filed by Jason Paul Schaefer. (dsg) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Declaration of Jason Schaefer. Filed by Jason Paul Schaefer. (Related document(s): Application for leave to proceed ifp 3 .) (dsg) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 1/16/2019, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Application for Leave to Proceed IFP. Filed by Jason Paul Schaefer. (dsg) (Entered: 01/16/2019)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        Notice of Case Assignment: This case is assigned to Judge Michael H. Simon. (Mailed copy to plaintiff) (dsg) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/28/2018, Entered: None Complaint
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/26/2018, Entered: None Complaint
            Complaint. Jury Trial Requested: No. NO FEE, NO IFP. Filed by Jason Paul Schaefer against Condon, Coulson, Jeff Gill, Harris, Hoskins, Kramer, McGranahan, Craig Mueller, Wade Mutchler, Nomako, Unknown Beaverton Police Officers 1-2, Unknown Environmental Protection Agency Agents 1-10, Unknown FBI Agents 1-5, Unknown Portland Police Officers 1-5, Unknown Washington County District Attorney. (dsg) (Entered: 12/27/2018)
              Request RequestSpace LREF

              Statistics

              This case has been viewed 21 times.

              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
              Space
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
               
              PlainSite
              Sign Up
              Need Password Help?