Appel v. Wolf
Federal Civil Lawsuit California Southern District Court, Case No. 3:18-cv-00814-L-BGS
District Judge M. James Lorenz, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 28, 2021 at 1:58 PM DT (2.4 weeks ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Howard Appel, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Steven Brower +1 714 549 5150 Steve@BrowerLawGroup.com
Space Tae Jin Im +1 949 668 0825 Tae@BrowerLawGroup.com
Space Jennifer A. Needs +Pleas eus eavalid Jennifer@BrowerLawGroup.com
v.
No Logo Robert S. Wolf, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Derek Wallen +1 760 568 6500 +1 760 568 0100 dwallen@capobiancolaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by Capobianco and Bram

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Anthony Capobianco +1 760 771 8345 acapobianco@capobiancolaw.com
Citation Section 28 U.S.C. § 1332lb
Nature of Suit Assault Libel & Slander
Office San Diego
Filed 4/27/2018
Jury Demand Plaintiff
Demand $75000
Jurisdiction Diversity
Disposition
County San Diego
Terminated
Origin 1
Reopened
Lead Case
None
Related Case
None
Other Court Cases 19-56131[USCA], 19-56184[USCA]
Defendant Custody Status
Flags APPEAL,ENE
  Entries (54) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 57 Filed: 4/28/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 56 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 55 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 54 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 53 Filed: 4/23/2021, Entered: None Notice of Appearance
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 52 Filed: 4/7/2021, Entered: None Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 50 Filed: 3/23/2021, Entered: None Scheduling Order
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 48 Filed: 2/22/2021, Entered: None Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 47 Filed: 2/10/2021, Entered: None Order on Motion to Amend/Correct
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 45 Filed: 2/7/2021, Entered: None Response in Opposition to Motion
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 44 Filed: 2/7/2021, Entered: None Amend/Correct
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 43 Filed: 2/6/2021, Entered: None Continue
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 42 Filed: 1/25/2021, Entered: None Notice (Other)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 41 Filed: 1/22/2021, Entered: None Order for Early Neutral Evaluation
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 40 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None Order
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 39 Filed: 1/7/2021, Entered: None USCA Mandate
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 38 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019 USCA Time Schedule Order
                                  USCA Time Schedule Order as to [36] Notice of Cross Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Howard Appel, [31] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Robert S. Wolf. (akr)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 37 Filed: 10/9/2019, Entered: 10/9/2019 USCA Case Number
                                    USCA Case Number 19-56184 for [36] Notice of Cross Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Howard Appel. (akr)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 36 Filed: 10/8/2019, Entered: 10/8/2019 Notice of Cross Appeal to 9th Circuit
                                      NOTICE OF CROSS APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to [29] Order Denying Defendant's Special Motion to Strike by Howard Appel. (Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0974-13036068.) (Needs, Jennifer). (Modified on 10/8/2019: Edited docket text re linked Order.) (akr).
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Blank 35 Filed: 10/7/2019, Entered: 10/7/2019 OrderCourt Filing
                                        MINUTE ORDER: re [30] Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conference. The October 18, 2019 ENE/CMC is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 10/7/2019.(no document attached) (rxa)
                                          LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 34 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 USCA Time Schedule Order
                                          USCA Time Schedule Order as to [31] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Robert S. Wolf. (akr)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 33 Filed: 9/25/2019, Entered: 9/25/2019 USCA Case Number
                                            USCA Case Number 19-56131 for [31] Notice of Interlocutory Appeal to the 9th Circuit filed by Robert S. Wolf. (akr)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 32 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Notice - other
                                              NOTICE of Stay Pending Appeal by Robert S. Wolf (Wallen, Derek) (sjt).
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 31 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: 9/24/2019 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal to 9th Circuit
                                                NOTICE OF INTERLOCUTORY APPEAL to the 9th Circuit as to [29] Order Denying Defendant's Special Motion to Strike by Robert S. Wolf. (Filing fee $ 505 receipt number 0974-12980035.) (Wallen, Derek). (Modified on 9/24/2019: Edited docket text re linked Order.) (akr).
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 30 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 Notice and Order for Early Neutral Evaluation conferenceCourt Filing
                                                  NOTICE AND ORDER: (1) For Early Neutral Evaluation Conference, and (2) Setting Rule 26 Compliance and Case Management Conference. Early Neutral Evaluation and Case Management Conference set for 10/18/2019 at 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Joint Discovery Plan due 10/11/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 9/19/2019.(lrf)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 29 Filed: 9/19/2019, Entered: 9/19/2019 order on motion to strikeCourt Filing
                                                    ORDER Denying Defendant's Special Motion to Strike [Doc. [5]]. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 9/18/2019. (lrf)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Notice of appearance
                                                      NOTICE of Appearance by Jennifer A. Needs on behalf of Howard Appel (Needs, Jennifer)Attorney Jennifer A. Needs added to party Howard Appel(pty:pla) (sjt).
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 5/24/2019, Entered: 5/24/2019 Reply to Response to motion
                                                        REPLY to Response to Motion re [5] MOTION to Strike [1] Complaint, filed by Robert S. Wolf. (Attachments: # (1) Request for Judicial Notice, # (2) Responses to Plaintiff's Evidentiary Objections, # (3) Evidentiary Objections to Declaration of Steven Brower)(Wallen, Derek) (sjt).
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 5/13/2019, Entered: 5/13/2019 response in opposition to motion
                                                          RESPONSE in Opposition re [5] MOTION to Strike [1] Complaint, filed by Howard Appel. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration Declaration of Steven Brower, # (2) Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Decl of Steven Brower, # (3) Supplement Evidentiary Objections to Declaration in Support of Motion)(Brower, Steven) (tcf).
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous (Other 1)Court Filing
                                                            ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Extend Time to Respond [ECF No. [22]]. The Court finds good cause exists to grant the motion in light of the impending trial by plaintiff's counsel in the Central District. Therefore, the Joint Motion is granted. Accordingly, the opposition to defendant's motion to dismiss shall be filed no later than 5/13/2019 and reply shall be filed no later than 5/27/2019. Pursuant to this district's ECF Policies and Procedures, proposed orders should not be filed or submitted within the electronic filing system. As such, the Court directs the Clerk's Office to strike the Joint Motion for Order [ECF No. [23] and [24]] filed by plaintiff as it is the proposed order in connection with the instant joint motion. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/16/2019. (lrf) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/16/2019: # (1) Rejected Document 23, # (3) Rejected Document 24) (lrf). Modified text on 4/16/2019 (lrf).
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 4/16/2019, Entered: 4/16/2019, Terminated: 4/16/2019 motion to amend/correct
                                                              ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER [25]*** Amended Proposed Order by Howard Appel. (Im, Tae) (Discrepancy Prepared - Proposed Ordered NOT to be Filed) (sjt). (Main Document 24 replaced on 4/16/2019) (lrf). Modified to strike per law clerk on 4/16/2019 (lrf).
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019, Terminated: 4/15/2019 Motion for order
                                                                ***DOCUMENT STRICKEN PER ORDER [25]*** Proposed Order by Howard Appel. (Im, Tae) (Discrepancy Prepared - Proposed Ordered NOT to be Filed) (sjt). (Main Document 23 replaced on 4/16/2019) (lrf). Modified to strike on 4/16/2019 (lrf).
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 4/15/2019, Entered: 4/15/2019, Terminated: 4/16/2019 Miscellaneous (Other 1)
                                                                  Joint MOTION Motion to Extend Time re [5] MOTION to Strike [1] Complaint, , Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Opposition by Howard Appel. (Im, Tae)Attorney Tae Jin Im added to party Howard Appel(pty:pla) (sjt).
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Blank 21 Filed: 4/11/2019, Entered: 4/11/2019 Order Lifting StayCourt Filing
                                                                    MINUTE ORDER By Judge M. James Lorenz: Per the order entered on 4/10/2019 [ECF No. [20]], the stay previously ordered in this case is lifted. Signed by the Chambers of Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/11/2019.(no document attached) (lrf)
                                                                      LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 4/10/2019, Entered: 4/10/2019 Order Setting Briefing ScheduleCourt Filing
                                                                      ORDER Overruling [17] Objection re: Order Denying Application for Discovery, Setting Briefing Schedule re [5] MOTION to Strike [1] Complaint. Appel shall file an opposition to Wolfs motion no later than April 29, 2019. Wolf shall file a reply in support of the motion no later than May 6, 2019. Once briefed, the Court shall take this matter under submission and decidethe motion without oral argument. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 4/10/2019.(sjt)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 2/22/2019, Entered: 2/22/2019 Reply to Objection to Report and Recommendation
                                                                        Reply to [17] Objection to [15] ORDER Denying Ex Parte Application for Discovery filed by Robert S. Wolf. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Anthony Capobianco)(Wallen, Derek) Modified on 2/25/2019 (sjt).
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 2/11/2019, Entered: 2/11/2019 Scheduling OrderCourt Filing
                                                                          SCHEDULING ORDER: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 72 (a), it is hereby ordered that Defendant's memorandum of points and authorities inopposition to Plaintiff's objection, if any, which shall be no more than ten pages in length, in addition to supporting evidence, if any, shall be filed and served no later than 2/25/2019. Upon filing the foregoing, the matter will be deemed taken under submission without oral argument as the parties await further order of the court. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 2/11/2019.(lrf)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 2/8/2019, Entered: 2/8/2019 Objection to Report and Recommendation
                                                                            Objection re [15] ORDER Denying Ex Parte Application for Discovery filed by Howard Appel. (Attachments: # (1) Exhibit Exhibit 1 - Redline of Motion to Strike)(Brower, Steven) Modified to correct event on 2/11/2019 (sjt).
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 1/28/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Notice of change of address
                                                                              NOTICE of Change of Address by Steven Brower (Brower, Steven)(sjt).
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 1/25/2019, Entered: 1/28/2019 Order on Motion to continueCourt Filing
                                                                                ORDER Denying Ex Parte Application for Discovery [ECF No. [7], [14]]. The Ex Parte Application for Discovery is denied and the requests for attorneys' fees and costs are denied. The request to strike Appel's supplemental briefing is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 1/25/2019. (lrf)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 1/3/2019, Entered: 1/3/2019, Terminated: 1/25/2019 Motion to strike
                                                                                  MOTION to Strike SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Robert S. Wolf re [12] Supplemental Briefing . (Wallen, Derek) Modified on 1/3/2019 (sjt).
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: 12/31/2018 Supplemental Document
                                                                                    SUPPLEMENTAL DOCUMENT by Howard Appel re [12] Supplemental Briefing Exhibit A to Supplemental Statement - Redline of Memorandum. (Brower, Steven) (QC mailer sent re: filer did not sign)(sjt).
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 12/31/2018, Entered: 12/31/2018 Supplemental Briefing
                                                                                      SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING by Plaintiff Howard Appel re [10] Order, . (Brower, Steven) (sjt).
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 12/27/2018, Entered: 12/27/2018 Declaration
                                                                                        DECLARATION re [10] Order, of Derek Wallen by Defendant Robert S. Wolf. (Wallen, Derek) (sjt).
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 12/20/2018, Entered: 12/21/2018 OrderCourt Filing
                                                                                          ORDER To File Declaration. For the reasons set forth in this order, the Court orders Wolf's counsel to file a declaration as set forth in this order by 12/28/2018. After reviewing the declaration, the Court will issue a final order on the request for discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal on 12/20/2018.(lrf)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 7/20/2018, Entered: 7/20/2018 Order Referring MotionCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER REFERRING EX-PARTE MOTION [Doc. [7]] for Early Discovery to Magistrate Judge and Staying Briefing on Motion [Doc. [5]] to Strike Complaint. Plaintiff's ex parte motion for early discovery is referred to Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal. Briefing on Defendant's motion to strike the complaint is stayed. Upon resolution of Plaintiff's ex parte motion for early discovery, a scheduling order establishing a new briefing schedule on Defendant's motion to strike will be issued. Signed by Judge M. James Lorenz on 7/20/2018. Motions set before Bernard G. Skomal.(lrf)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 7/19/2018, Entered: 7/19/2018 response in opposition to motion
                                                                                              RESPONSE in Opposition re [7] MOTION to Continue filed by Robert S. Wolf. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration of Anthony Capobianco)(Wallen, Derek) (sjt).
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 7/17/2018, Entered: 7/17/2018, Terminated: 1/25/2019 Motion to Continue
                                                                                                Ex Parte MOTION to Continue re [5] MOTION to Strike [1] Complaint, Application to Continue Hearing on Motion to Strike and to Order Discovery by Howard Appel. (Attachments: # (1) Declaration, # (2) Proof of Service)(Brower, Steven) Modified on 7/18/2018 (sjt).
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 7/6/2018, Entered: 7/6/2018 Notice of appearance
                                                                                                  NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony Capobianco on behalf of Robert S. Wolf (Capobianco, Anthony)Attorney Anthony Capobianco added to party Robert S. Wolf(pty:dft) (sjt).
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018, Terminated: 9/19/2019 Motion to strike
                                                                                                    MOTION to Strike [1] Complaint, by Robert S. Wolf. (Attachments: # (1) Memo of Points and Authorities in Support of Special Motion to Strike Complaint, # (2) Declaration of Robert S. Wolf, # (3) Declaration of Chad Roffers, # (4) Declaration of Anthony Capobianco)(Wallen, Derek) (sjt).
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 7/2/2018, Entered: 7/2/2018 Answer
                                                                                                      ANSWER to [1] Complaint, with Jury Demand by Robert S. Wolf.(Wallen, Derek)Attorney Derek Owen Wallen added to party Robert S. Wolf(pty:dft) (sjt).
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 5/18/2018, Entered: 5/18/2018 waiver of service executed
                                                                                                        WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Howard Appel, as to Robert S. Wolf. (Brower, Steven) (sjt).
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 Summons issued
                                                                                                          Summons Issued. Counsel receiving this notice electronically should print this summons and serve it in accordance with Rule 4, Fed.R.Civ.P and LR 4.1. (jms) (jao).
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 4/27/2018, Entered: 4/27/2018 ComplaintCourt Filing
                                                                                                            COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Robert S. Wolf (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0974-11160418), filed by Howard Appel. (Attachments: # (1) Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:18-cv-814-L-BGS. Judge M. James Lorenz and Magistrate Judge Bernard G. Skomal are assigned to the case. (Brower, Steven)(jms) (jao).
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                              Statistics

                                                                                                              This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                                                                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                              Space
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                               
                                                                                                              PlainSite
                                                                                                              Sign Up
                                                                                                              Need Password Help?