United States v. Parrello
Criminal Case New York Southern District Court, Case No. 1:16-cr-00522
District Judge Richard J. Sullivan, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated January 31, 2019 at 12:50 AM ST (2.7 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

United States of America United States of America, Plaintiff
Officially listed as "USA"

Toggle Switch Represented by United States Department of Justice

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Andrew Ken-Wei Chan +1 212 637 1072 andrew.chan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Amanda Kay Kramer +1 212 637 2478 +1 212 637 2527 amanda.kramer@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Abigail Sara Kurland +1 914 993 1900 +1 212 637 2527 abigail.kuriand@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jessica Rose Lonergan +1 212 637 1038 +1 212 637 2937 jessica.lonergan@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Max Clement Nicholas +1 212 637 1565 max.nicholas@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jonathan Rebold +1 212 637 2512 jonathan.rebold@usdoj.gov
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Brooke Schorr +1 914 993 1927 +1 914 993 1980 lauren.schorr@usdoj.gov

Toggle Switch Represented by Westchester County District Attorney(111 Dr. MLK Blvd)

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren Abinanti +1 914 995 3420 labinanti@westchesterda.net
v.
No Logo Pasquale Maiorino, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Charles F. Carnesi +1 516 512 8914 +1 516 873 8881 cfcarnesi49@aol.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Michael Kratt +1 212 941 1277 +1 212 274 1189 edkratt@verizon.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Hammock & Sullivan, Pc

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Edward Hammock +1 516 429 6811 +1 718 358 6424 lawoffice@hammock-sullivan.com
No Logo Russell M. Aoki, Coordinating Discovery Attorney

Toggle Switch Represented by AOKI LAW PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Russell M. Aoki , +1 206 624 1400 +1 206 442 4396 cde@aokilaw.com

Note: Criminal cases with multiple defendants may have several records with the same case number: one record for the master file (all defendants), as well as one record per defendant. It can often be difficult to tell which record is which. Other likely matches for this case include:

  Entries (123) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1450 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Pasquale Maiorino re: Sentence held on 12/13/17 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Michael McDaniel, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 2/6/2018. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/16/2018. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/16/2018. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1451 Filed: 1/16/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Pasquale Maiorino. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Sentence proceeding held on 12/13/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/16/2018)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Sentencing held on 12/13/2017 for Pasquale Maiorino (11) Count 1ss. Defendant Pasquale Maiorino present with attorney Charles F. Carnesi. AUSA Amanda Kramer present. Court reporter present. The Court sentenced the Defendant as set forth in a separately docketed judgment and conviction. (jbo)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        DISMISSAL OF COUNTS on Government Motion as to Pasquale Maiorino (11) Count 1,1s. (lnl)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1343 Filed: 12/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          JUDGMENT IN A CRIMINAL CASE as to Pasquale Maiorino (11). The defendant pleaded guilty to count 1 of the superseding information. All open counts are dismissed on the motion of the United States. IMPRISONMENT: 20 months. The court makes the following recommendations to the Bureau of Prisons: The Court recommends that Defendant be housed at FCI Danbury. The defendant shall surrender for service of sentence at the institution designated by the Bureau of Prisons: before 2 p.m. on 4/3/2018. SUPERVISED RELEASE: Three years, to run concurrently with the Defendant's undischarged term of supervised release in case number 15-cr-340. SPECIAL ASSESSMENT: $100.00 due immediately. The defendant shall forfeit the defendant's interest in the following property to the United States: $10,000 in substitute assets as set forth in the Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture (Doc. No. 726). (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 12/13/2017) (lnl) (Entered: 12/14/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR as to Pasquale Maiorino: Notice to Attorney Amanda Kay Kramer to RE-FILE Document 1313 Letter. Use the event type Sentencing Submission found under the event list Other Documents. (ka)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1313 Filed: 12/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Maiorino addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan Document filed by USA. (Kramer, Amanda) Modified on 12/11/2017 (ka). (Entered: 12/08/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1283 Filed: 12/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                MOTION in Limine as to Joseph Merlino and Eugene O'Nofrio. Document filed by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. (Nicholas, Max) (Entered: 12/01/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1273 Filed: 11/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SENTENCING SUBMISSION by Pasquale Maiorino. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letters of Support)(Carnesi, Charles) (Entered: 11/29/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Sealed Legal Document 1245 Filed: 11/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 11/20/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1198 Filed: 10/25/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Andrew Ken-Wei Chan appearing for USA. (Chan, Andrew) (Entered: 10/25/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1120 Filed: 10/4/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Lauren Brooke Schorr appearing for USA. (Schorr, Lauren) (Entered: 10/04/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1035 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Pasquale Maiorino re: Conference held on 8/1/17 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Sonya Ketter Huggins, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 9/29/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/10/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/7/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1036 Filed: 9/8/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Pasquale Maiorino. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Hearing proceeding held on 8/1/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 09/08/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk: as to Pasquale Maiorino (11). Transmitted re: 1018 Order, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing of document. (bw)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1014 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                LETTER by Pasquale Maiorino addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Charles Carnesi dated August 30, 2017 re: Dental Update (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Dentist's Letter)(Carnesi, Charles) (Entered: 08/30/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1018 Filed: 8/30/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                  ORDER as (16-Cr-522-11) to Pasquale Maiorino. The Court is in receipt of a letter from Defendant Maiorino apprising the Court his recent dental prognosis and proposing a treatment schedule that would take approximately fifteen months to complete. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, by Friday, September 1, 2017, the government shall respond to Defendant's letter indicating whether it objects to the proposed treatment schedule. Additionally, in light of the privacy issues implicated by the medical information contained in Defendant's letter, the Court finds that the presumption in favor of open records has been overcome. See United States v. Amodeo, 71 F.3d 1044, 1050 (2d Cir. 1995). Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to seal the letter at docket number 1014. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/30/2017)(bw) (Entered: 08/31/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 999 Filed: 8/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                    Sentencing Letter by Pasquale Parrello as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Mark S. DeMarco dated August 28, 2017 re: Supplemental Sentence Letter. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letters in Support)(DeMarco, Mark) (Entered: 08/28/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 983 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                      Sentencing Letter by Pasquale Parrello as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Mark S. DeMarco dated August 24, 2017. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit, # 2 Exhibit, # 3 Exhibit, # 4 Exhibit, # 5 Exhibit)(DeMarco, Mark) (Entered: 08/24/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 988 Filed: 8/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                        ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. ORDER: Because the motion conference scheduled for Friday, August 25, 2017 at 4:15 p.m. only concerns motions filed by Defendants Merlino, Marino, Cirillo, Onofrio, Depergola, and Santaniello, only those Defendants need appear. Furthermore, because Defendant Santaniello entered a plea of guilty on August 22, 2017, his presence at the August 25, 2017 conference is not required.SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/24/2017)(bw) (Entered: 08/25/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 970 Filed: 8/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                          ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg ( Status Conference set for 8/25/2017 at 04:15 PM in Courtroom 26B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the motion conference scheduled for Friday, August 25, 2017 at 4:15 p.m. shall take place in Courtroom 26B of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/22/17)(jw) (Entered: 08/22/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 960 Filed: 8/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            Appearance Bond Entered as to (16-Cr-522-11) Pasquale Maiorino in amount of $1 Million. Execution of a $1 Million Personal Recognizance Bond that is secured by the four properties listed in the August 7 Letter and cosigned by the following individuals: A) Lorraine Caggiano, B) Nissam Amar, C) Jonathan Amar, D) Natalie Caggiano, E) Nicholas Caggiano, F) Lisa Ann Rizzo, G) Frank Rizzo, H) Charles Simmons and I) James Webster; home incarceration enforced by GPS monitoring and permission to leave Defendant's residence for medical and dental appointments with 48 hours advanced notice to Pretrial Services; compliance with all other conditions as set by Pretrial Services. Defendant is to remain in custody pending the signing of the bond by the cosigners, the posting of the four (4) properties and compliance with all other conditions as set by Pretrial Services. Defendant shall submit a letter, three (3) weeks after release on bail, apprising the Court of the status of his dental care. [Advice of Penalties and Sanctions attached. Defendant Released.] (bw) (Entered: 08/15/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 949 Filed: 8/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              ORDER as to (16-Cr-522-11) Pasquale Maiorino. On August 1, 2017, the Court held a bail hearing at which it found that exceptional circumstances justify Defendant Maiorino's release on bail and that, with the imposition of the proposed bail conditions, Defendant has demonstrated by clear and convincing evidence that he is not likely to flee and does not pose a danger to the safety of any other person or the community. The Court is now in receipt of a letter from the government dated August 7, 2017, proposing conditions for Defendant's release on bail ("August 7 Letter"). The government represents that the Defendant has consented to these conditions. The government also requests permission to publicly file a redacted version of the August 7 Letter redacting the street addresses of four properties used to secure the proposed bond pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1. (See Doc. No. 938.) Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, for the reasons stated on the record at the August 1, 2017 hearing, Defendant Maiorino shall be bailed on the following conditions: 1. Execution of a $1 million personal recognizance bond that is secured by the four properties listed in the August 7 Letter and co-signed by the following individuals: a. Lorraine Caggiano, b. Nissam Amar, c. Jonathan Amar, d. Natalie Caggiano, e. Nicholas Caggiano, f. Lisa-Ann Rizzo, g. Frank Rizzo, h. Charles Simmons, and i. James Webster; 2. Home incarceration enforced with GPS monitoring and permission to leave Defendant's residence for medical and dental appointments with 48 hours advanced notice to Pretrial Services; and 3. Compliance with all other conditions as set by Pretrial Services. Defendant is to remain in custody pending the satisfaction of conditions 1-3 above. The government is directed to take all steps necessary, and consistent with this order, to expedite Defendant's prompt release. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, three weeks after he is released on bail, Defendant shall submit a letter apprising the Court of the status of his dental care. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 49.1, the government's request to file a redacted version of the August 7 Letter is GRANTED. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/9/2017)(bw) (Entered: 08/10/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 938 Filed: 8/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Maiorino addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from AUSA Amanda Kramer dated August 7, 2017 re: Pasquale Maiorino Document filed by USA. (Kramer, Amanda) (Entered: 08/07/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 927 Filed: 8/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Max Clement Nicholas appearing for USA. (Nicholas, Max) (Entered: 08/03/2017)
                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan:Status Conference as to Pasquale Maiorino held on 8/1/2017. Defendant Maiorino present, in custody, with attorney Charles Carnesi. AUSAs Amanda Kramer and Max Nicholas present. Court reporter present. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court finds that exceptional circumstances justifying Defendants release exist, that Defendant does not present a risk of danger to the community, and that Defendants proposed bail conditions, which include home confinement at all times except for trips to the dentist (for which Defendant will give 48 hours notice), ankle bracelet monitoring, $1,000,000 bond, and four co-signors, sufficiently mitigate his risk of flight. Government to submit proposed conditions of bail. Defendant to submit update from dentist three weeks after he is released on bail. (jw)
                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 905 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Charles Carnesi dated July 27, 2017 re: Request for Appearance to Discuss Bail Pending Sentencing. Document filed by Pasquale Maiorino. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Letter Dentist)(Carnesi, Charles) (Entered: 07/27/2017)
                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 909 Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                        MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 905 LETTER MOTION filed by Pasquale Maiorino (11), addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Attorney Charles F. Carnesi dated July 27, 2017 re: Request for Appearance to Discuss Bail Pending Sentencing. It is respectfully requested that the Court schedule an appearance to address a bail application for Pasquale Maiorino based on the following circumstances. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a conference on Tuesday, August 1, 2017 at 11:30 a.m. to discuss Defendant's bail application. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/27/2017) (bw) (Entered: 07/28/2017)
                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                          Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Pasquale Maiorino (11): Status Conference set for 8/1/2017 at 11:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (bw)
                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 902 Filed: 7/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                            LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from AUSAs Amanda Kramer/ Abigail Kurland/ Jessica Lonergan/ Jonathan Rebold/ Lauren Abinanti (SAUSA), dated July 7, 2017 re: The Government respectfully submits this letter in response to the Court's order of June 29, 2017 regarding a letter filed by Jerry Capeci (the "Capeci Letter") and a letter filed by defendant Joseph Merlino (the "Merlino Letter"). In the Order, the Court directed the Government to address two issues: (1) the need for continued sealing of the Government's Jetter of March 8, 2017 (the "Government Letter") and related correspondence; and (2) Merlino's request to see the 30-day status updates (the "Status Updates") regarding an ongoing Federal Bureau of Investigation Administrative Inquiry (the "Administrative Inquiry"). For the reasons set forth in more detail below, the Government Letter and all related filings should remain under seal, the Court should maintain in place the protective order prohibiting dissemination of the Government Letter and its contents, and the Status Updates should remain ex parte and under seal. (bw) (Entered: 07/26/2017)
                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                              Sealed Legal Document 897 Filed: 7/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                              SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 07/20/2017)
                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 891 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                ENDORSED LETTER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from AUSAs Amanda Kramer/ Abigail Kurland/ Jessica Lonergan/ Jonathan Rebold/ Lauren Abinanti, dated July 17, 2017 re: The Government respectfully submits this letter requesting that the Government be pem1itted to publicly file a redacted version of its omnibus opposition memorandum (the "Memorandum") in response to the defendants' pre-trial motions. ENDORSEMENT: For the reasons stated in the Court's order dated April 26, 2017 (Doc. No. 613), the Court finds that the presumption of public access to the redacted portions of the government's memorandum and the redacted portion of this letter is overcome by the privacy interests implicated by the Sealed Documents. See United States v. Amodeo, 71 F.3d 1044, 1050 (2d Cir. 1995). Accordingly, the government's motion to file redacted versions of its memorandum and this letter is GRANTED. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/18/2017)(bw) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 892 Filed: 7/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                  ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. ORDER: On June 27, 2017, the Court received a letter from Jerry Capeci (Doc. No. 867 (the "Letter")) requesting "a renewed consideration" of the Court's April 26, 2017 order denying his request to unseal certain documents provided by the government to Defendants pursuant to its discovery obligations (the "Sealed Documents").(See Footnote 1 on this Order). In the Letter, Mr. Capeci also requested access to updates provided by the Federal Bureau of Investigation ("FBI") regarding an administrative inquiry related to this matter (the "Updates"). (Id.) On June 29, 2017, the Court filed the Letter on ECF and ordered the government to respond (id.), and on July 7, 2017, the government filed a sealed response (the "Response"). On July 11, 2017, the Court received the attached letter from Mr. Capeci requesting access to the Response as well. For the reasons set forth below, Mr. Capeci's requests to unseal the Sealed Documents and for access to the Updates are DENIED; with respect to Mr. Capeci's request for access to the Response, the government shall submit to the Court proposed redactions narrowly tailored to protect the privacy interests of third parties involved in the FBI's administrative inquiry....[See this Order]... For these reasons and the reasons stated in the Court's April 26, 2017 order, the Court finds that the presumption in favor of open records is still overcome by the need to protect the privacy interests of third parties, and that the qualified First Amendment right access still does not attach to the Sealed Documents. As the Court noted in its April 26, 2017 order, "if and when the information contained in the Sealed Documents is utilized at trial, those in attendance, including the press, will have access to those proceedings." (Doc. No. 613 at 8.) Until then, however, the contents of the Sealed Documents properly remain under seal. Accordingly, Mr. Capeci's requests to unseal the Sealed Documents and for access to the Updates are DENIED; with respect to Mr. Capeci's request for access to the Response, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, by Friday, July 21, 2017, the government shall submit to the Court proposed redactions in accordance with the instructions set forth above. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/18/2017)(bw) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 883 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan Document filed by USA. (Kurland, Abigail) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 884 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                      ENDORSED LETTER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from AUSAs Amanda Kramer/ Jessica Lonergan/ Jonathan Rebold, dated July 17, 2017 re: The Government respectfully writes pursuant to the the Court's Individual Rules and Practices 2(B) seeking permission to file an oversized memorandum of law in opposition to the pretrial motions of defendants Joseph Merlino, a/k/a "Joey," Eugene Onofrio, a/k/a "Rooster," Daniel Marino, Jr., a/k/a "Danny," Anthony Cirillo, Francesco Depergola, a/k/a "Frank," and Ralph Santaniello (collectively, the "Moving Defendants"). The Government 's memorandum in opposition is due July 17, 2017. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/17/2017)(bw) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 885 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                        FIRST LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Abigail S. Kurland dated July 17, 2017 re: Permission to File Redacted Memorandum Document filed by USA. (Kurland, Abigail) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 886 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                          MEMORANDUM in Opposition by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg re 837 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Seth Ginsberg dated June 19, 2017 re: Pretrial Motions ., 834 MOTION to Dismiss ., 842 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Johnathan Cartelli, Esq. dated 6/19/17 re: pre-trial motions ., 830 MOTION to Suppress ., 838 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Joseph DiBenedetto dated June 19, 2017 re: Pretrial Motions ., 846 FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Gerard M. Marrone dated June 20, 2017 re: separation of trial ., 839 MOTION Dismissal, Preclusion of Evidence, Severance ., 832 MOTION for Discovery ., 852 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Edwin J. Jacobs, Jr. dated June 21, 2017 re: Access to FBI 30 day reports ., 828 MOTION to Transfer Case ., 844 LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Joseph Merlino dated June 19, 2017 re: 835 Memorandum in Support of Motion, 834 MOTION to Dismiss . re: Request to Seal Document .. (Kurland, Abigail) (Entered: 07/17/2017)
                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 888 Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                            ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a confidential memorandum dated July 11, 2017 (the "Memorandum") from the Federal Bureau of Investigation ("FBI") containing law enforcement sensitive information and submitted in response to a sealed order requiring the government to periodically update the Court as to the status of an ongoing administrative inquiry (the "Inquiry"). The Court is also in receipt of a letter from the government dated July 11, 2017 requesting that the Memorandum be filed under seal in light of the privacy interests implicated by the Inquiry. (Doc. No. 876.) For the reasons stated in the Court's order dated April 26, 2017 (Doc. No. 613), the Court finds that the presumption of public access to the Memorandum is overcome by the privacy interests implicated by the Inquiry. See United States v. Amodeo, 71 F.3d 1044, 1050 (2d Cir. 1995). Accordingly, the government's motion to file the Memorandum under seal is GRANTED. Additionally, because the FBI status updates set forth no critical information that is not also contained in the multiple letters provided to defense counsel by the government, the Court finds that there is little to be gained by requiring the submission of further status letters. Of course, the government is reminded that the results of the administrative inquiry may implicate its broad duty to disclose evidence favorable to an accused, including impeachment and exculpatory evidence, see 18 U.S.C. § 3500; Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963); Giglio v. United States, 405 U.S. 150 (1972), and that the government has an ongoing obligation to produce such material. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/17/2017)(bw) (Entered: 07/18/2017)
                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                              Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk: as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. Transmitted re: 888 Order, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing of document. (bw)
                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 876 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                THIRD LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Abigail S. Kurland dated July 11, 2017 re: Status Updates Document filed by USA. (Kurland, Abigail) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 877 Filed: 7/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                  ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the trial previously scheduled to commenceon Monday, September 5, 2017 is adjourned until Monday, January 15, 2018 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall comply with the following schedule for pre-trial submissions. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear for a final pretrial conference on Monday, January 8, 2017 at 1:00 p.m. for argument on all pending motions in limine and to otherwise discuss the trial, which, as ordered above, will commence on the morning of January 15, 2018. Pursuant to 18 U.S.C. §3 161 (h)(7)(A) time is excluded for Defendants through January 15, 2018 in the interest of justice to allow the defense to review discovery materials, prepare for trial, and maintain continuity of counsel, which outweigh the interests of the public and Defendants in a speedy trial. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 12/1/2017, Responses due by 12/15/2017, Jury Trial set for 1/15/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan, Pretrial Conference set for 1/8/2017 at 01:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 7/11/2017)(ft) (Entered: 07/11/2017)
                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 874 Filed: 7/7/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Jessica Lonergan dated 07/07/2017 re: Trial scheduling Document filed by USA. (Lonergan, Jessica) (Entered: 07/07/2017)
                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 870 Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                      MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting 862 LETTER MOTION as to Pasquale Parrello (1), Joseph Merlino (2), Eugene O'Nofrio (3), Conrad Ianniello (4), Israel Torres (5), Anthony Zinzi (6), Anthony Vazzano (7), Alex Conigliaro (8), Frank Barbone (9), Ralph Balsamo (10), Pasquale Maiorino (11), John Spirito (12), Vincent Casablanca (13), Marco Minuto (14), Paul Cassano (15), John Lembo (17), Mitchell Fusco (18), Reynold Alberti (19), Vincent Terracciano (20), Joseph Tomanelli (21), Agostino Camacho (22), Nicholas Devito (23), Anthony Cassetta (24), Nicholas Vuolo (25), Bradford Wedra (26), Michael Poli (27), Pasquale Capolongo (28), Anthony Depalma (29), John Tognino (30), Mark Maiuzzo (31), Joseph Dimarco (32), Harold Thomas (33), Richard Lacava (34), Vincent Thomas (35), Anthony Camisa (36), Frank Trapani (37), Anthony Cirillo (38), Carmine Gallo (39), Joseph Falco (40), Francesco Depergola (41), Ralph Santaniello (42), Laurence Keith Allen (43), Craig Bagon (44), Bradley Sirkin (45), Wayne Kreisberg (46); granting in part and denying in part 862 LETTER MOTION as to Daniel Marino, Jr. (16). Although the government offers no reason or justification for its adjournment request, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the government's deadline to respond to Defendants' motions is adjourned until July 17, 2017, Defendants' deadline to reply to the government's response is adjourned until July 24, 2017, and the conference previously scheduled for July 31, 2017 is adjourned until August 25, 2017 at 4:15 p.m. As for the government's request for an adjournment of the September 5 trial date until "mid-February 2018 or later," IT IS ORDERED THAT, by July 7, 2017, Edwin Jacobs shall submit a letter to the Court setting forth his trial schedule for the months between September 2017 and February 2018, including the case name, docket number, judge, and estimated length of time for each trial. The government shall also submit a letter to the Court by July 7, 2017 setting forth the "preexisting commitments" that prevent each of the four Assistant United States Attorneys assigned to this action from trying this case, which was indicted nearly a year ago, until 2018. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/30/2017) (ft) (Entered: 07/05/2017)
                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 7/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                        Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg: Replies due by 7/24/2017. Responses due by 7/17/2017. Status Conference set for 8/25/2017 at 04:15 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (ft)
                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 862 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                          LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Amanda Kramer / Abigail Kurland / Jessica Lonergan / Jonathan Rebold / Lauren Abinanti dated 06/29/2017 re: Adjournment requests . Document filed by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. (Lonergan, Jessica) (Entered: 06/29/2017)
                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 867 Filed: 6/29/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                            ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. ORDER: On June 21, 2017, Defendant Joseph Merlino submitted a letter to the Court requesting access to all status updates provided to the Court regarding an administrative inquiry being conducted by the Federal Bureau of Investigation ("FBI"). (Doc. No. 852.) On June 22, 2017, the Court ordered the government to respond to Defendant Merlino's request for access to the status updates. (Doc. No. 855.) On June 27, 2017, Jerry Capeci sent the attached letter to the Court renewing his request to unseal documents related to the administrative inquiry and requesting access to the status updates as well. The Court is now in receipt of a letter from the government dated June 28, 2017, which includes a letter dated June 27, 2017 from Lisa K. Matsumoto, Unit Chief of the Investigative Law Unit of the FBI's Office of the General Counsel, as an exhibit. (Doc. Nos. 861, 861-1.) The two letters explain that the FBI wishes to provide status updates regarding the administrative inquiry directly to the Court, and objects to disclosure of the updates to the parties in this matter in accordance with a "general rule" that the FBI does not disclose details to outside counsel during the pendency of internal investigations. Neither the government nor the FBI offer authority for the government's apparent outsourcing of its representation in this action. Moreover, the FBI's letter is wholly conclusory, without citation to any relevant legal authority or even an acknowledgment of the standard to be applied in considering Defendant Merlina's request for access to the status updates. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, by Friday, July 7, 2017, the government shall submit an amended response to the Court's June 22, 2017 order that addresses the arguments set forth in Defendant Merlina's June 21, 20 17 letter and Mr. Capeci's June 27, 2017 letter. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/29/2017)(bw) (Entered: 06/30/2017)
                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 861 Filed: 6/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                              FIRST LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Abigail S. Kurland dated June 28, 2017 re: Ex Parte Status Updates Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kurland, Abigail) (Entered: 06/28/2017)
                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 848 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. ORDER: On June 14, 2017, the government filed a letter motion informing that Court that Defendant Joseph Merlino had retained John Meringolo, who is also counsel for Defendant John Tognino in this case, as counsel. (Doc. No. 811.) In its letter, the government represented that Defendant Merlino's retention of Mr. Meringolo presents a potential conflict of interest requiring the Court to conduct a hearing pursuant to United States v. Curcio, 680 F.2d 881 (2d Cir. 1982), and submitted a list of questions for the Court to consider asking Defendant Merlino at a Curcio hearing. (Id. at 9-13.) On June 19, 2017, Mr. Meringolo responded to the government's letter motion, arguing that there is no conflict of interest and attaching affidavits from Defendants Tognino and Merlino stating that they have waived any potential conflict. (Doc. No. 827.) Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the parties, including Defendants Tognino and Merlino, shall appear for a Curcio hearing on June 30, 2017 at 2:00 p.m. If Defendant Merlino, who resides in Florida, wishes to appear via videoconference from a courthouse in the Southern District of Florida, he may submit a request to do so. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/20/2017)(bw) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 849 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                  ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg., as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg( Motions due by 7/10/2017., Replies due by 7/17/2017., Jury Trial set for 9/5/2017 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 905, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan., Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2017 at 10:00 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.)On June 19, 2017, Defendants submitted pretrial motions per the Court's January 1, 2017 order. (See Doc. No. 645.) Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the government shall submit its opposition to Defendants' pretrial motions by July 10, 2017, and Defendants shall file their replies by July 17, 2017. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall appear for a conference on Defendants' motions on Monday, July 31, 2017 at 10:00 a.m.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that a jury trial shall commence on Tuesday, September 5,2017 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 905 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/20/17)(jw) (Entered: 06/21/2017)
                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                    Sealed Legal Document 826 Filed: 6/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                    SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 817 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Amanda Kramer / Abigail Kurland / Jessica Lonergan / Jonathan Rebold / Lauren Abinanti dated 06/15/2017 re: Status update and request to file under seal . Document filed by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. (Lonergan, Jessica) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 819 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                        ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. The Court is in receipt of a confidential memorandum (the "Memorandum") from the Federal Department of Investigation containing law enforcement sensitive information and submitted in response to a sealed order requiring the government to periodically update the Court as to the status of an ongoing administrative inquiry (the "Inquiry"). The Court is also in receipt of a letter from the government dated June 15, 2017 requesting that the Memorandum be filed under seal in light of the privacy interests implicated by the Inquiry. (Doc. No. 817.) For the reasons stated in the Court's order dated April 27, 2017 (Doc. No. 613), the Court finds that the presumption of public access to the Memorandum is overcome by the privacy interests implicated by the Inquiry. See United States v. Amodeo, 71 F.3d 1044, 1050 (2d Cir. 1995). Accordingly, the government's motion to file the Memorandum under seal is GRANTED. The government is reminded that its next update as to the status of the Inquiry is due by Thursday, July 13, 2017. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 6/15/17)(jw) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 825 Filed: 6/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                          NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Pasquale Maiorino, Marco Minuto, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Plea proceeding held on 5/17/17 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 06/15/2017)
                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 775 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                            ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. ORDER: The Court is in receipt of a confidential memorandum (the "Memorandum") from the Federal Department of Investigation containing law enforcement sensitive information and submitted in response to a sealed order requiring the government to periodically update the Court as to the status of an ongoing administrative inquiry (the "Inquiry"). The Court is also in receipt of a letter from the government dated May 18, 2017 requesting that the Memorandum be filed under seal in light of the privacy interests implicated by the Inquiry. (Doc. No. 698.) For the reasons stated in the Court's order dated April 27, 2017 (Doc. No. 613), the Court finds that the presumption of public access to the Memorandum is overcome by the privacy interests implicated by the Inquiry. See United States v. Amodeo, 71 F.3d 1044, 1050 (2d Cir. 1995). Accordingly, the government's motion to file the Memorandum under seal is GRANTED. The government is reminded that its next update as to the status of the Inquiry is due by Monday, June 19, 2017. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/31/2017)(bw) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                              Transmission to Sealed Records Clerk: as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. Transmitted re: 775 ORDER, to the Sealed Records Clerk for the sealing of document. (bw)
                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                Sealed Legal Document 776 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 05/31/2017)
                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 779 Filed: 5/31/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                  ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - On April 21, 2017, the Court issued an order requiring "any Defendants who have not yet contracted to use Invendica" to either contract to use Invendica or "submit a letter to the Court confinning that they do not wish to avail themselves of that service." (Doc. No. 603.) The Court directed counsel to comply with this order by April 28, 2017. (Id.) As of May 31, 2017, the Court has not received a letter from counsel for the following Defendants who are not signed up to use Invendica: Alberti, Camacho, Cassetta, Depalma, Devito, Dimarco, Falco, Lacava, Maiuzzo, Minuto, O'Nofrio, Spirito, Terracciano, Tognino, Tomanelli, Torres, Trapani, Vazzano, Vuolo, Wedra, or Zinzi. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by June 9, 2017, any Defendants who have neither contracted to use Invendica nor submitted a letter to the Court confirming that they do not wish to do so shall submit a letter to the Court (I) confirming that they do not wish to use Invendica, and (2) showing cause why they should not be sanctioned for failure to abide by the Court's April 21, 2017 order. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/31/17)(jw) (Entered: 06/01/2017)
                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 698 Filed: 5/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                    LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Amanda Kramer / Abigail Kurland / Jessica Lonergan / Jonathan Rebold / Lauren Abinanti dated 05/18/2017 re: Status update and request to file under seal . Document filed by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. (Lonergan, Jessica) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                      Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan:Change of Plea Hearing as to Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Pasquale Maiorino, Marco Minuto, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho held on 5/17/2017., Plea entered by Alex Conigliaro (8) Guilty as to Count 1ss and Frank Barbone (9) Guilty as to Count 1ss and Pasquale Maiorino (11) Guilty as to Count 1ss and Marco Minuto (14) Guilty as to Count 1ss and Joseph Tomanelli (21) Guilty as to Count 1ss and Agostino Camacho (22) Guilty as to Count 1ss. Defendant Frank Barbone present with attorney Jake Lasala. Defendant Agostino Camacho present with with attorney Winston Lee. Defendant Alex Conigliaro present with attorney Larry Silverman. Defendant Marco Minuto present with attorney Kerry Lawrence. Defendant Pasquale Maiorino in custody present with attorney Charles Carnesi. Defendant Joseph Tomanelli present with attorney Cesar de Castro. AUSAs Jessica Lonergan and Jonathan Rebold present. Court reporter present. Defendants withdrew plea of Not Guilty and entered plea of Guilty to Count 1 of superseding informations. Sentencing date for Defendant Barbone set for 10/27/2017 at 10:30 a.m. Sentencing date for Defendant Camacho set for 10/27/2017 at 2:30 p.m. Sentencing date for Defendant Conigliaro set for 10/26/2017 at 2:30 p.m. Sentencing date for Defendant Minuto set for 9/5/2017 at 2:30 p.m. Sentencing date for Defendant Tomanelli set for 10/25/2017 at 10:00 a.m. Sentencing date for Defendant Maiorino set for 9/29/2017 at 1:00 p.m. Defendants sentencing submissions due two weeks prior to sentencing; governments sentencing submission due one week prior to sentencing. Preliminary orders of forfeiture entered in a separate order. PSIs ordered (jw)
                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                        Order of Referral to Probation for Presentence Investigation and Report as to Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Pasquale Maiorino, Marco Minuto, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/17/17)(jw)
                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan as to Pasquale Maiorino; Sentencing set for 9/29/2017 at 01:00 PM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. (jw)
                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 726 Filed: 5/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                            CONSENT PRELIMINARY ORDER OF FORFEITURE / MONEY JUDGMENT: as to (S28-16-Cr-522-11) Pasquale Maiorino....[See this Order]... IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between the United States of America, by its attorney Joon H. Kim, Acting United States Attorney, Assistant United States Attorneys Amanda Kramer, Abigail Kurland, Jessica Lonergan, and Jonathan Rebold, and Special Assistant United States Attorney Lauren Abinanti, of counsel, and the defendant, and his counsel, Charles F. Carnesi, Esq., that: 1. As a result of the offense charged in Count One of the Information, to which the defendant pled guilty, a money judgment in the amount of $10,000 in United States currency (the "Money Judgment") shall be entered against the defendant. This forfeiture obligation shall be joint and several with any such obligations entered against the co-defendant's co-conspirator, Pasquale Parrella, charged in United States v. Pasquale Parrella, S16 16 Cr. 522 (RJS); 2. Pursuant to Rule 32.2(b)(4) of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure, upon entry of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment, this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment is final as to the defendant, PASQUALE MAIORINO, and shall be deemed part of the sentence of the defendant, and shall be included in the judgment of conviction therewith....[See this Order]... 6. The Court shall retain jurisdiction to enforce this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment, and to amend it as necessary, pursuant to Rule 32.2 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. 7. The Clerk of the Court shall forward three certified copies of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment to Assistant United States Attorney Sarah K. Eddy, Co-Chief of the Money Laundering and Asset Forfeiture Unit, United States Attorney's Office, One St. Andrew's Plaza, New York, New York 10007. 8. The signature page of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment may be executed in one or more counterparts, each of which will be deemed an original but all of which together will constitute one and the same instrument. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 5/17/2017) [*** NOTE: The Clerk of the Court has forwarded three certified copies of this Consent Preliminary Order of Forfeiture/Money Judgment to AUSA Sarah K. Eddy, by inter-office mail on 5/18/2017. ***] (bw) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 723 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                              (S28) SUPERSEDING INFORMATION (Felony) filed as to Pasquale Maiorino (11) count(s) 1ss. (jm) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 724 Filed: 5/16/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                WAIVER OF INDICTMENT by Pasquale Maiorino. (jm) (Entered: 05/18/2017)
                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 638 Filed: 5/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 05/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 632 Filed: 5/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                    LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from U.S. Attorney's Office dated May 3, 2017 re: United States v. Parrello, et al. Document filed by USA. (Kramer, Amanda) (Entered: 05/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 625 Filed: 4/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                      LETTER by Pasquale Maiorino addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Charles F. Carnesi dated April 28, 2017 re: Non-use of Invendica database (Frankel, Allen) (Entered: 04/28/2017)
                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 613 Filed: 4/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. For the reasons set forth above, Mr. Capeci's motion to intervene is GRANTED and his motion to unseal the Sealed Documents is DENIED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/26/2017)(ft) (Entered: 04/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 603 Filed: 4/21/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by April 28, 2017, any Defendants who have not yet contracted to use Invendica shall do so or submit a letter to the Court confirming that they do not wish to avail themselves of that service. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that retained and court-appointed counsel who have signed up with Invendica shall not share their log in credentials with counsel who have not contracted for the database. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 4/21/2017)(ft) (Entered: 04/21/2017)
                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                            Sealed Legal Document 592 Filed: 4/6/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                            SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (mps) (Entered: 04/06/2017)
                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 577 Filed: 3/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                              LETTER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Jerry Capeci (of Gang Land News) dated March 27, 2017 re: This letter addresses the Government's opposition to my pending request for the unsealing of its March 8, 2017 submission to the Court in the above referenced matter. In its reply to my request that the letter be unsealed, the government has ignored the Court's order directing it to publicly docket its reasons why its March 8, 2017 letter and any related documents should remain under seal. Instead, the Government has decided to file its reasons under seal so that the alleged reasons for closure remain inaccessible to the public. (bw) (Entered: 03/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 576 Filed: 3/24/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Amanda Kramer / Abigail Kurland / Jessica Lonergan / Jonathan Rebold / Lauren Abinanti dated 03/24/2017 re: Letter from Jerry Capeci Document filed by USA. (Lonergan, Jessica) (Entered: 03/24/2017)
                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                  Sealed Legal Document 571 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                  SEALED DOCUMENT placed in vault. (rz) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 573 Filed: 3/22/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                    FIRST LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Abigail S. Kurland dated 3-22-17 re: S1 Indictment Document filed by USA. (Kurland, Abigail) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 572 Filed: 3/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                      (S1) SUPERSEDING INDICTMENT FILED as to Pasquale Parrello (1) count(s) 1s, 2s, Joseph Merlino (2) count(s) 1s, Eugene O'Nofrio (3) count(s) 1s, Conrad Ianniello (4) count(s) 1s, Israel Torres (5) count(s) 1s, 2s, Anthony Zinzi (6) count(s) 1s, 3s, 7s, Anthony Vazzano (7) count(s) 1s, Alex Conigliaro (8) count(s) 1s, Frank Barbone (9) count(s) 1s, Ralph Balsamo (10) count(s) 1s, Pasquale Maiorino (11) count(s) 1s, John Spirito (12) count(s) 1s, Vincent Casablanca (13) count(s) 1s, Marco Minuto (14) count(s) 1s, Paul Cassano (15) count(s) 1s, Daniel Marino, Jr. (16) count(s) 1s, John Lembo (17) count(s) 1s, Mitchell Fusco (18) count(s) 1s, 4s, Reynold Alberti (19) count(s) 1s, Vincent Terracciano (20) count(s) 1s, Joseph Tomanelli (21) count(s) 1s, Agostino Camacho (22) count(s) 1s, Nicholas Devito (23) count(s) 1s, Anthony Cassetta (24) count(s) 1s, Nicholas Vuolo (25) count(s) 1s, Bradford Wedra (26) count(s) 1s, Michael Poli (27) count(s) 1s, Pasquale Capolongo (28) count(s) 1s, Anthony Depalma (29) count(s) 1s, John Tognino (30) count(s) 1s, Mark Maiuzzo (31) count(s) 1s, 3s, Joseph Dimarco (32) count(s) 1s, Harold Thomas (33) count(s) 1s, Richard Lacava (34) count(s) 1s, Vincent Thomas (35) count(s) 1s, Anthony Camisa (36) count(s) 1s, 5s, 6s, Frank Trapani (37) count(s) 1s, Anthony Cirillo (38) count(s) 1s, Carmine Gallo (39) count(s) 1s, Joseph Falco (40) count(s) 1s, Francesco Depergola (41) count(s) 1s, Ralph Santaniello (42) count(s) 1s, Laurence Keith Allen (43) count(s) 1s, Craig Bagon (44) count(s) 1s, Bradley Sirkin (45) count(s) 1s, Wayne Kreisberg (46) count(s) 1s. (jm) (Entered: 03/22/2017)
                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 569 Filed: 3/17/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                        ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. ORDER: On March 8, 2017, the government, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16(d)(1), provided the Court with an ex parte application under seal (the "Application") requesting a protective order precluding the dissemination of certain materials disclosed in a letter dated March 8 (the "Letter") attached as an exhibit to the application. On March 9, 2017, the Court entered the requested protective order (the "Protective Order") and the government distributed the Letter to the Defendants in this case. (Doc. No. 563.) On March 12, 2017, three days after the Court entered the Protective Order, the New York Post published a story allegedly disclosing the contents of the Letter and citing multiple sources for the allegedly leaked information. On March 16, 2017, the Court received the attached letter from third-party Jerry Capeci (the "Capeci Letter") seeking to intervene in order to assert the public's First Amendment right of access to the Letter and asking the Court to unseal the Letter and all documents submitted with the Letter. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that by March 24, 2017, the government shall respond to the Capeci Letter and docket its response on ECF. Specifically, the government shall address (1) whether third-party Jerry Capeci should be allowed to intervene in this case and (2) the need to seal the Letter and all documents submitted with the Letter. Mr. Capeci and any other party who wishes to file a reply to the government's response shall do so by Wednesday, March 29, 2017. SO ORDERED: (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/16/2017)(bw) (Entered: 03/17/2017)
                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 567 Filed: 3/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                          FIRST LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Abigail S. Kurland dated March 15, 2017 re: Violation of Protective Order Document filed by USA. (Kurland, Abigail) (Entered: 03/15/2017)
                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 563 Filed: 3/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. ORDER: The Court is in receipt of an application from the government for an order precluding the dissemination of certain materials disclosed in a letter dated March 8, 2017 (the "Letter") which the government intends to provide to Defendants pursuant to its discovery obligations in this action. Based on the representations set forth in the government's application, the Court finds that good cause exists to restrict the inspection and dissemination of the letter in the manner set forth below. See Fed. R. Crim. P. 16(d)(1). Specifically, the Court finds that the confidentialit y and privacy interests of third parties would be adversely affected by disclosure of the contents of the Letter at this time. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT: (1) The Letter be used by Defendants and defense counsel of record ("Defense Counsel") solely for the purpose of defending this case; (2)Defense Counsel may not give copies of the Letter to Defendants, except that Defendant s may review the Letter when in the presence of Defense Counsel; (3) Defendants and Defense Counsel may not disseminate the Letter, including any copies thereof or excerpts therefrom, or any information contained therein, to anyone other than (a) Defense Counsel; (b) any paralegal, investigator, or legal assistant employed or contracted by Defense Counsel ("Defense Staff"); or (c) such other person as hereafter may be authorized by Order of the Court ("Other Authorized Persons"), and to the extent the Letter is disclosed to Defense Staff or Other Authorized Persons, Defense Counsel shall instruct such individual(s) of the te1ms of this Order and that such individual(s) are bound by this order; (4) Defendants, Defense Counsel, Defense Staff, and Other Authorized Persons may not post or cause to be posted the Letter or information contained in the Letter on the Internet, including any social media website; (5) Defendants, Defense Counsel, Defense Staff, and Other Authorized Persons may not publicly file the Letter or information contained in the Letter unless authorized by the government in writing or by Order of the Court; (6) Any filings that incorporate the Letter by attachment, contain any excerpts of the Letter, or incorporate the Letter by reference must be filed under seal, though nothing in this Order precludes Defense Counsel from properly using the Letter in judicial proceedings in this case; (7) For Defendants Ralph Santaniello, Francesco DePergola, Bradley Sirken, and Wayne Kreisberg, Defense Counsel may share the letter with counsel who represent those Defendants in federal criminal proceedings in other jurisdictions upon a written agreement by said counsel to be bound by the terms of this Order; (8) Nothing in this Order shall preclude Defense Counsel or Defense Staff from sharing the Letter with each other via Dropbox (with password protection) or other secure, password-protected file-sharing software. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 3/9/2017)(bw) (Entered: 03/10/2017)
                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 523 Filed: 2/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                              FIRST LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Abigail Kurland dated February 3, 2017 re: Proposed Trial Groupings Document filed by USA. (Kurland, Abigail) (Entered: 02/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 497 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg re: Arraignment held on 8/23/16 before Judge Richard J. Sullivan. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Martha Martin, (212) 805-0300, Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 1/26/2017. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/6/2017. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/5/2017. (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 498 Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Arraignment proceeding held on 8/23/16 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days.... (McGuirk, Kelly) (Entered: 01/05/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 1/5/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                    Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Status Conference as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg held on 1/5/2017. Pasquale Parrello (1) present in custody with Attorneys Kevin Faga and Mark DeMarco. Attorney Edwin Jacobs present for Joseph Merlino (2), who waived his appearance. Attorney Thomas Nooter present for Eugene O'Nofrio (3), who waived his appearance. Attorney Lisa Scolari present for Conrad Ianniello (4), who waived his appearance. Israel Torres (5) present in custody with Attorney Matthew Kluger. Anthony Zinzi (6) present in custody with Attorney Jacob Mitchell. Anthony Vazzano (7) present not in custody with Attorney Lorraine Gauli-Rufo. Alex Conigliaro (8) present not in custody with Attorney Larry Silverman. Frank Barbone (9) present not in custody with Attorney Jake Lasala. Ralph Balsamo (10) present not in custody with Attorney Laurence DiGiansante. Pasquale Maiorino (11) present in custody with Attorney Charles Carnesi. John Spirito (12) present not in custody with Attorney Calvin Scholar. Vincent Casablanca (13) present not in custody with Attorney Joseph DiBenedetto. Marco Minuto (14) not present and waived his appearance. Attorney A. James Bell present for Paul Cassano (15), who waived his appearance. Daniel, Jr. Marino (16) present not in custody with Attorney Seth Ginsberg. John Lembo (17) present in custody with Attorney Joseph Corozzo. Mitchell Fusco (18) present not in custody with Attorney Xavier Donaldson. Reynold Alberti (19) present not in custody with Attorney Guy Oksenhendler. Vincent Terracciano (20) present not in custody with Attorney Steven Brill. Joseph Tomanelli (21) present not in custody with Attorney Valerie Gotlib. Agostino Camacho (22) present not in custody with Attorney Winston Lee. Attorney Ezra Spilke present for Nicholas Devito (23), who waived his appearance. Anthony Cassetta (24) present not in custody with Attorney John Paul Casale. Nicholas Vuolo (25) present not in custody with Attorney Richard Lind. Bradford Wedra (26) present not in custody with Attorney Michael Sporn. Michael Poli (27) present not in custody with Attorney Michael Marinaccio. Attorney Martin Raskin present for Pasquale Capolongo (28), who waived his appearance. Anthony Depalma (29) present not in custody with Attorney John Kaley. John Tognino (30) present not in custody with Attorney John Meringolo. Mark Maiuzzo (31) present in custody with Attorney William Stampur. Joseph Dimarco (32) present not in custody with Attorney Thomas Dunn. Harold Thomas (33) present not in custody with Attorney Lawrence DiGiansante. Richard Lacava (34) present not in custody with Attorney Jean Barrett. Vincent Thomas (35) present not in custody with Attorney Bruno Gioffre, Jr. Anthony Camisa (36) present in custody with Attorney Gerald McMahon. Attorney Sam Schmidt present for Frank Trapani (37), who waived his appearance. Anthony Cirillo (38) present not in custody with Attorney Joseph DiBenedetto. Carmine Gallo (39) not present and waived his appearance. Joseph Falco (40) present not in custody with Attorney Bradley Henry. Attorney Peter Tomao present for Francesco Depergola (41), who waived his appearance. Ralph Santaniello (42) present not in custody with Attorney Jake Lasala, standing in for Attorney Gerard Marrone. Laurence Keith Allen (43) failed to appear. Craig Bagon (44) not present and waived his appearance. Bradley Sirkin (45) present not in custody with Attorney James Froccaro, Jr. Wayne Kreisberg (46) present not in custody with Attorney Joseph Milano. Defendants' Coordinating Discovery Attorney Russell Aoki present via video conference. AUSAs Abigail Kurland, Amanda Kramer, Lauren Abinanti, and Jonathan Rebold present. Court reporter present. Government to propose severance proposal and indicate plans with respect to superseding charging documents by 2/3/2017. Defense pretrial motions due 5/12/2017. Time excluded through 5/12/2017 pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7). Defendants' detention and bail (as applicable) continued. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 486 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Seth Ginsberg dated January 3, 2017 re: Request to Utilize Courtroom for Joint Defense Meeting . Document filed by Daniel Marino, Jr. as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. (Ginsberg, Seth) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 492 Filed: 1/3/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                        ENDORSED LETTER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Seth GInsberg dated 1/3/2017 re: Attorney Meeting. ENDORSEMENT: Unfortunately, the courtroom reserved for this Thursday's conference (the Ceremonial Courtroom at 500 Pearl Street) is reserved after the conference for a memorial for the late Judge Sand. Accordingly, defense counsel's request is denied. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 1/3/2017)(ft) (Entered: 01/03/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 437 Filed: 11/28/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. Time excluded from 11/28/16 until 1/5/17. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the conference previously scheduled for December 9, 2016 is adjourned to January 5, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. Defendants and their counsel who have been granted leave not to attend the December 9 conference or the previously scheduled October 31, 2016 conference need not reapply for leave.However, any defendant who has been granted such leave and now intends to appear at the January 5 conference shall notify the Court forthwith. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 316l(h)(7)(A), time is excluded through January 5, 2017. The Court finds that such a continuance best serves the ends of justice by allowing Defendants to review discovery, which outweighs the best interests of the public and Defendants in a speedy trial. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/28/2016)(jw) (Entered: 11/29/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 433 Filed: 11/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER: The Court is in receipt of an ex parte letter dated November 21, 2016, from Russell M. Aoki, Defendants' discovery coordinator in this matter, which indicates that the distribution of discovery materials to Defendants is running behind schedule and is not likely to be complete until shortly before the status conference currently scheduled for December 9, 2016. In order to ensure that Defendants have sufficient time to review the discovery materials before the conference, the Court intends to adjourn the conference to January 5, 2017 at 1:30 p.m. Any party who objects to this adjournment and would like to keep the original date (December 9, 2016 at 2:30 p.m.) shall submit a letter setting forth the grounds for such objection by November 28, 2016 at 5:00 p.m.After that time, the Court will issue an order adjourning the conference or reaffirming the original schedule (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 11/21/2016)(jw) (Entered: 11/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 382 Filed: 10/27/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                              ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. Now before the Court is the Discovery Coordinator's October 24, 2016 ex parte interim report ('Report"), apprising the Court of the status of discovery production and requesting funds to employ the services of a third-party vendor, pursuant to the Court's September 8, 2016 Order appointing the Discovery Coordinator (Doc. No. 246). Accordingly, IT IS HEREBYORDERED THAT the instant request for funds is granted. In addition, the Discovery Coordinator has informed the Court that, because logistical constraints preclude him from providing certain material to all of the Defendant at once, he plans to make successive distributions to randomly- selected groups of Defendants. However, to ensure" that Defendants who are in custody have "timely and effective" use of the material (Doc. No. 246), the Discovery Coordinator should distribute it to this group first. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, when constrained to make successive distributions ofmaterial, the Discovery Coordinator shall prioritize in-custody Defendants. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/25/2016)(jw) (Entered: 10/27/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 379 Filed: 10/25/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                FIRST LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Mark S. DeMarco dated October 11, 2016 re: Redacted Motion for Mr. Parrello's Release on Bail . Document filed by Pasquale Parrello as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. (DeMarco, Mark) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 377 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. ORDER: On August 23, 2016, as set forth on the record at the initial conference in this case, the Court directed the parties to appear on October 31, 2016 for a conference regarding discovery production and any contemplated motions. (See Minute Entry for Proceedings dated August 23, 2016; see also Doc. No. 152.) The Court is now in receipt of an interim report on the status of discovery production, dated October 24, 2016, from Coordinating Discovery Attorney Russell Aoki, stating that it is "unlikely that discovery will be distributed to defense counsel for another two to three weeks." Accordingly, in the interest of efficiency and in order to give defense counsel time to receive and review the discovery, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the conference previously scheduled for October 31, 2016 is adjourned to Friday, December 9, 2016 at 2:30 p.m. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT the time between October 31, 2016 and December 9, 2016 is excluded in the interest of justice under the Speedy Trial Act, 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A), because the Court finds that the interests of Defendants and the public in a speedy trial are outweighed by the need to allow Defendants time to review the discovery and consider possible pretrial motions in advance of the next conference. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/24/2016)(bw) (Entered: 10/25/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 552 Filed: 10/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                    ENDORSED LETTER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Russell M. Aoki dated 10/24/2016 re: Interim report on the status of discovery and request $6,000 for third-party services by Slate Technology. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 2/24/2017)(ft) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 374 Filed: 10/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                      LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Mark S. DeMarco dated October 21, 2016 re: Redaction of Personal Information . Document filed by Pasquale Parrello as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. (DeMarco, Mark) (Entered: 10/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 359 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                        NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Lauren Abinanti appearing for USA. (Abinanti, Lauren) (Entered: 10/17/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 361 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. ORDER: On September 12, 2016, the government filed a letter requesting entry of a proposed protective order (Doc. No. 25 1-1), pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16(d)(1). (Doc. No. 251.) In an Order dated September 16, 2016, the Court solicited further briefing from the parties. (Doc. No. 273.) In response to the government's original letter and proposal, counsel for various Defendants submitted letters arguing that: (1) the government cannot show good cause for entry of any protective order (Doc. No. 287); (2) not only defense counsel, but also defense staff should be permitted to show discovery material to potential witnesses (Doc. No. 261); (3) any protective order should also limit the government's disclosure of discovery material (id.); (4) any protective order should apply only to material that identifies the cooperating witness or undercover agent (Doc. No. 285); (5) defense counsel should be able to share discovery material with counsel representing their clients in similar cases prosecuted elsewhere (Doc. No. 270); and (6) defense counsel should be able to publicly file documents containing discovery material so long as they do not identify the cooperating witness or undercover agent (id.)....[See this Order]... Accordingly, for the reasons set forth above, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the separately-docketed protective order shall govern the dissemination of material produced pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/17/2016)(bw) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 362 Filed: 10/17/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                            ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. ORDER: Upon the application of the United States of America, Preet Bharara, United States Attorney for the Southern District of New York, by and through Assistant United States Attorney Amanda Kramer, of counsel, for an order precluding the dissemination of material produced in this case pursuant to Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Criminal Procedure (the "Discovery"), IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Discovery shall be used by the defendants ("Defendants"), defense counsel of record ("Defense Counsel"), and anyone else who lawfully possesses Discovery pursuant to this Order, solely for purposes of defending this case. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants and Defense Counsel are precluded from disseminating any of the Discovery, including any copies thereof or excerpts therefrom, or any information contained therein, to anyone other than: (a) Defendants; (b) Defense Counsel; (c) any paralegal, investigator, or legal assistant employed or contracted by defense counsel("Defense Staff"); (d) any expert, advisor, or any other individual retained or employed by defendants and defense counsel for the purpose of assisting in the defense of this case ("Defense Experts/Advisors"); or (e) such other persons as hereafter may be authorized by Order of the Court ("Other Authorized Persons" ).To the extent the Discovery is disclosed to Defense Staff, Defense Experts/Advisors, or Other Authorized Persons, Defense Counsel shall instruct such individual(s) of the terms of this Order and that such individual(s) are bound by this Order. Defense Counsel and Defense Staff may show, but not disseminate to or provide any copies of, the Discovery to potential witnesses and other individuals consulted or interviewed during the course of and for the purpose of investigating and defending the case ("Potential Witnesses"), after Defense Counsel or Defense Staff instructs such individual(s) of the terms of this Order and that such individual(s) are bound by this Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Defendants, Defense Counsel, Defense Staff, Defense Experts/Advisors, Potential Witnesses, and Other Authorized Persons are precluded from posting or causing to be posted any of the Discovery or information contained in the Discovery on the Internet, including any social media website....[See this Order]... IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that except for Discovery that has been made part of the record of this case, Defense Counsel shall return to the Government or securely destroy or delete all Discovery within 30 days of the expiration of the period for direct appeal from any verdict in the above-captioned case; the period of direct appeal from any order dismissing any of the charges in the above-captioned case; or the granting of any motion made on behalf of the Government dismissing any charges in the above-captioned case, whichever date is later. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the provisions of this Order shall not terminate at the conclusion of this criminal prosecution, and the Court will retain jurisdiction to enforce this Order following termination of the case. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/17/2016)(bw) (Entered: 10/18/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 340 Filed: 10/6/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                              NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Charles F. Carnesi appearing for Pasquale Maiorino. Appearance Type: Retained. (Carnesi, Charles) (Entered: 10/06/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 332 Filed: 10/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. ORDER: Now before the Court is the government's request for entry of a protective order governing the dissemination of discovery material in this matter (Doc Nos. 251, 251-1, 296, 296-1), and defense objections (Doc. Nos. 251-2, 261, 270, 285, 287). As a general matter, the government has the burden of showing good cause for the Court to issue a protective order pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16(d)(1)....[See this Order]... Accordingly, since the government has the "burden of demonstrating, and not just alleging, that public disclosure of the Rule 16 materials in this case could jeopardize" the interests it has identified, id., IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT, by October 7, 2016, the government shall submit an ex parte letter for in camera review "provid[ing] specific details" demonstrating that disclosure of discovery material "plausibly could undermine" criminal investigations, which are in fact "ongoing," id., and/or jeopardize the safety of individuals. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 10/4/2016)(bw) (Entered: 10/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 296 Filed: 9/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                  SECOND LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Amanda Kramer/Abigail Kurland/Jessica Lonergan/Jonathan Rebold/Lauren Abinanti (SAUSA), Assistant United States Attorneys dated September 23, 2016 re: Protective Order Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order Clean, # 2 Exhibit Proposed Protective Order Mark-Up)(Rebold, Jonathan) (Entered: 09/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 283 Filed: 9/21/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Abigail S. Kurland dated Sept. 21, 2016 re: Adjourn Curcio Request Document filed by USA. (Kurland, Abigail) (Entered: 09/21/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 272 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                      FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for John Paul Casale to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12766071. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Anthony Cassetta as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. Return Date set for 9/16/2016 at 09:00 AM. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Casale, John) Modified on 9/16/2016 (wb). (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                        >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg to RE-FILE Document No. 272 MOTION for John Paul Casale to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12766071. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from missing Proposed Order;. Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 273 Filed: 9/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                          ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. The Court is in receipt of several submissions regarding a possible protective order governing the dissemination of certain material produced in discovery pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16. Specifically, in a letter dated September 12, 2016, the government requested entry of its proposed protective order, which was enclosed as an attachment (Doc. No. 251 -1 ), citing the safety of cooperating witnesses and the integrity of ongoing investigations asjustifications. (Doc. No. 251.) In that letter, the government also advised the Court of defense objections to entry of any protective order and to its particular proposal. (Id.) Finally, thegovernment set forth its own objections to the order proposed by counsel for Defendant JosephMerlino, which was also enclosed as an attachment (Doc. No. 251-2). (Doc. No. 251.) Inaddition, in a letter dated September 13, 2016, counsel for Defendant Daniel Marino, Jr.proposed specific modifications to the government's proposed order that would cure his objections to the government's request. (Doc. No. 261). Most recently, counsel for Defendant Pasqual Capolongo filed a letter, dated September 14, 2016, objecting to portions of the government's proposed order and consenting to Defendant Merlino's proposed order. (Doc. No. 270.) Because it appears that the need for and content of any protective order are contested, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT all responses to the government's September 12, 2016 letter, if any, shall be filed by September 21, 2016, and the government's reply shall be filed by September 23, 2016 (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/16/2016)(jw) (Entered: 09/16/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 249 MOTION for Bruce E. Reinhart to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 251 Filed: 9/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from AUSA Amanda Kramer dated September 12, 2016 re: Protective Order Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Govt Proposed Protective Order, # 2 Defense Proposed Protective Order)(Kramer, Amanda) (Entered: 09/12/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 246 Filed: 9/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. ORDER: Upon the application of Defendants through their counsel, and with the consent of the government, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT Russell M. Aoki, Esq., of AokiLaw, PLLC, 1200 Fifth Avenue, Suite 950, Seattle, Washington, is appointed as Coordinating Discovery Attorney for defense counsel. The Coordinating Discovery Attorney shall oversee any discovery issues that are common to all of the defendants. His responsibilities will include:...[See this Order]... The Coordinating Discovery Attorney shall also provide this Court with monthly ex parte status reports indicating the status of work and whether that work remains within the budget of any third-party funds authorized by the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 9/8/2016)(bw) (Entered: 09/09/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 242 Filed: 9/7/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                  NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Mark Steven DeMarco appearing for Pasquale Parrello. Appearance Type: Retained. (DeMarco, Mark) Modified on 9/8/2016 (ka). (Entered: 09/07/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 236 Filed: 8/31/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                    FIRST LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Abigail S. Kurland dated August 31, 2016 re: Curcio Hearing Document filed by USA. (Kurland, Abigail) (Entered: 08/31/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 218 Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                      NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Edward Michael Kratt appearing for Pasquale Maiorino. Appearance Type: Retained. (Kratt, Edward) (Entered: 08/23/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Richard J. Sullivan: Arraignment as to Pasquale Parrello (1) Count 1,2 and Joseph Merlino (2) Count 1 and Eugene O'Nofrio (3) Count 1 and Conrad Ianniello (4) Count 1 and Israel Torres (5) Count 1,2 and Anthony Zinzi (6) Count 1,3 and Anthony Vazzano (7) Count 1 and Alex Conigliaro (8) Count 1 and Frank Barbone (9) Count 1 and Ralph Balsamo (10) Count 1 and Pasquale Maiorino (11) Count 1 and John Spirito (12) Count 1 and Vincent Casablanca (13) Count 1 and Marco Minuto (14) Count 1 and Paul Cassano (15) Count 1 and Daniel Marino, Jr. (16) Count 1 and Mitchell Fusco (18) Count 1,4 and Reynold Alberti (19) Count 1 and Vincent Terracciano (20) Count 1 and Joseph Tomanelli (21) Count 1 and Agostino Camacho (22) Count 1 and Nicholas Devito (23) Count 1 and Anthony Cassetta (24) Count 1 and Nicholas Vuolo (25) Count 1 and Bradford Wedra (26) Count 1 and Michael Poli (27) Count 1 and Pasquale Capolongo (28) Count 1 and Anthony Depalma (29) Count 1 and John Tognino (30) Count 1 and Mark Maiuzzo (31) Count 1,3 and Joseph Dimarco (32) Count 1 and Harold Thomas (33) Count 1 and Richard Lacava (34) Count 1 and Vincent Thomas (35) Count 1 and Frank Trapani (37) Count 1 and Anthony Cirillo (38) Count 1 and Carmine Gallo (39) Count 1 and Joseph Falco (40) Count 1 and Francesco Depergola (41) Count 1 and Ralph Santaniello (42) Count 1 and Craig Bagon (44) Count 1 and Bradley Sirkin (45) Count 1 and Wayne Kreisberg (46) Count 1 held on 8/23/2016. Plea entered by Pasquale Parrello (1) Count 1,2 and Joseph Merlino (2) Count 1 and Eugene O'Nofrio (3) Count 1 and Conrad Ianniello (4) Count 1 and Israel Torres (5) Count 1,2 and Anthony Zinzi (6) Count 1,3 and Anthony Vazzano (7) Count 1 and Alex Conigliaro (8) Count 1 and Frank Barbone (9) Count 1 and Ralph Balsamo (10) Count 1 and Pasquale Maiorino (11) Count 1 and John Spirito (12) Count 1 and Vincent Casablanca (13) Count 1 and Marco Minuto (14) Count 1 and Paul Cassano (15) Count 1 and Daniel Marino, Jr. (16) Count 1 and Mitchell Fusco (18) Count 1,4 and Reynold Alberti (19) Count 1 and Vincent Terracciano (20) Count 1 and Joseph Tomanelli (21) Count 1 and Agostino Camacho (22) Count 1 and Nicholas Devito (23) Count 1 and Anthony Cassetta (24) Count 1 and Nicholas Vuolo (25) Count 1 and Bradford Wedra (26) Count 1 and Michael Poli (27) Count 1 and Pasquale Capolongo (28) Count 1 and Anthony Depalma (29) Count 1 and John Tognino (30) Count 1 and Mark Maiuzzo (31) Count 1,3 and Joseph Dimarco (32) Count 1 and Harold Thomas (33) Count 1 and Richard Lacava (34) Count 1 and Vincent Thomas (35) Count 1 and Frank Trapani (37) Count 1 and Anthony Cirillo (38) Count 1 and Carmine Gallo (39) Count 1 and Joseph Falco (40) Count 1 and Francesco Depergola (41) Count 1 and Ralph Santaniello (42) Count 1 and Craig Bagon (44) Count 1 and Bradley Sirkin (45) Count 1 and Wayne Kreisberg (46) Count 1 Not Guilty. The Court held arraignments and an initial conference in this matter. All Defendants present except Defendant Anthony Camisa, Defendant Ralph Santaniello, and Defendant Laurence Keith Allen. Defense counsel present as follows: Kevin Faga present with Defendant Pasquale Parrello, who was present in custody; Edwin Jacobs present with Defendant Joseph Merlino; Thomas Nooter present with Defendant Eugene ONofrio; Joyce London present for this appearance only with Defendant Conrad Ianniello, who was present in custody; Matthew Klugar present with Defendant Israel Torres, who was present in custody; Allan Haber present with Defendant Anthony Zinzi, who was present in custody; Lorraine Gauli-Rufo present with Defendant Anthony Vazzano; Richard Ma present with Defendant Alex Conigliaro; Jake LaSala present with Defendant Frank Barbone; Lawrence DiGiansante present with Defendant Ralph Balsamo, who was present in custody, and with Defendant Harold Thomas; Edward Hammock present with Defendant Pasquale Maiorino, who was present in custody; Calvin Scholar present with Defendant John Spirito; Joseph DiBenedetto present with Defendant Vincent Casablanca and with Defendant Anthony Cirillo; Kerry Lawrence present with Defendant Marco Minuto; James Bell present with Defendant Paul Cassano; Seth Ginsberg present with Defendant Daniel Marino, Jr.; Steven Brill present with Defendant Vincent Terracciano and present for this appearance only with Defendant John Lembo, who was present in custody, and with Defendant Nicholas DeVito; Xavier Donaldson present with Defendant Mitchell Fusco; Guy Oksenhendler present with Defendant Reynold Alberti and present for this appearance only with Defendant Joseph DiMarco; Cesar de Castro present with Defendant Joseph Tomanelli; Winston Lee present with Defendant Agostino Camacho; John Casale present with Defendant Anthony Cassetta; Richard Lind present with Defendant Nicholas Vuolo; William Stampur present with Defendant Mark Maiuzzo, who was present in custody, and present for this appearance only with Defendant Bradford Wedra; Michael Marinaccio present with Defendant Michael Poli; Martin Raskin present with Defendant Pasquale Capolongo; John Kaley present with Defendant Anthony DePalma; John Meringolo present with Defendant John Tognino; Jean Barrett present with Defendant Richard LaCava; Bruno Gioffre present with Defendant Vincent Thomas; Sam Schmidt present with Defendant Frank Trapani; Michael Alber present with Defendant Carmine Gallo; Bradley Henry present with Defendant Joseph Falco; Peter Tomao present with Defendant Francesco DePergola; Gerard Marrone present for Defendant Ralph Santaniello; Bruce Reinhart present with Defendant Craig Bagon; James Froccaro present with Defendant Bradley Sirkin; Joseph Milano present with Defendant Wayne Kreisberg. AUSAs Amanda Kramer, Abigail Kurland, and Jonathan Rebold present for the government. Also present FBI Agent Joy Adam, Special AUSA Lauren Abinanti, and USAO Paralegal Chloe Marmet. U.S. Marshals present. Court reporter present. Defendants Merlino, Gallo, Sirkin, Kreisberg, Capolongo, Trapani, Bagon, and DePergola (the Arraignment Defendants) were arraigned and entered pleas of not guilty to the charges in the Indictment. Thereafter, the Court issued Orders on the record as to each of the Arraignment Defendants, imposing the same respective bail conditions as had previously been set for them by magistrate judges in different districts, modified only (1) to give the Arraignment Defendants one week to satisfy the conditions in the Southern District of New York, and (2) to permit each Defendant residing outside of the State, including each of the Arraignment Defendants, to travel to and through SDNY/EDNY and all travel points between SDNY/EDNY and his jurisdiction of residence, including DNJ. In addition, as stated on the record, the Court adopted the proposed schedule for discovery set forth in the government's letter dated August 5, 2016 (Doc. No. 152), noting that production for Phase I should conclude on or about October 10, 2016, and scheduled a status conference for October 31, 2016. The Court ordered that pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A), time is excluded through October 31, 2016. The Court found that granting such an exclusion best served the ends of justice by allowing for defense counsel to review discovery and outweighed the interests of the public and Defendants in a speedy trial. (jbo)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 205 Filed: 8/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                          FIRST LETTER by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Abigail S. Kurland dated August 22, 2016 re: Defendants arrested out of District Document filed by USA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(Kurland, Abigail) (Entered: 08/22/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                            >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 179 MOTION for Edwin J. Jacobs, Jr., Esquire to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number 0208-12653242. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 151 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                              LETTER MOTION addressed to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses from Jessica Lonergan dated 08/04/2016 re: Requests for Pretrial Detention . Document filed by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. (Lonergan, Jessica) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 152 Filed: 8/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                LETTER MOTION addressed to Judge Richard J. Sullivan from Jessica Lonergan dated 08/05/2016 re: Scheduling Requests . Document filed by USA as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. (Lonergan, Jessica) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 149 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  ORDER as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. ORDER: This case has been assigned to my docket. Accordingly, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED THAT the parties shall appear for an initial pretrial conference on Tuesday, August 23, 2016 at 11:30 a.m. in the Ceremonial Courtroom on the 9th floor of the Daniel Patrick Moynihan U.S. Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007, to discuss preliminary discovery and scheduling issues. Specifically, at this conference, the Court will discuss the proposed discovery schedule set forth in the attached letter from the government, dated August 5, 2016 (the "August 5 Letter"), and the potential appointment of a coordinating discovery attorney. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, in the interim, the government shall immediately commence "Phase I" of discovery as proposed in its August 5 Letter, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 16. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED THAT, in order to allow Defendants sufficient time to review discovery and in the interests of justice, time shall be excluded between now and August 23, 2016, pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161(h)(7)(A). SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Richard J. Sullivan on 8/9/2016)(bw) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 150 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Edward Hammock appearing for Pasquale Maiorino. (ft) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Arrest of Pasquale Maiorino. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 154 Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman:Initial Appearance as to Pasquale Maiorino held on 8/9/2016. Deft. present with atty Edward Kratt standing in for atty Edward R Hammock; AUSA Kurland also present. Deft. is detained on consent without prejudice. (jm) (Entered: 08/10/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/9/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                          Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman: Deft. present with atty Edward Kratt; AUSA Kurland also present. Arraignment as to Pasquale Maiorino (11) Count 1 Pasquale Maiorino (11) Count 1 held on 8/9/2016., Plea entered by Pasquale Maiorino (11) Count 1 Pasquale Maiorino (11) Count 1 Not Guilty., As to Pasquale Maiorino( Status Conference set for 8/23/2016 at 11:30 AM before Judge Richard J. Sullivan.) (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 68 Filed: 8/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                            NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Jonathan Rebold appearing for USA. (Rebold, Jonathan) (Entered: 08/08/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                              Order to Unseal Indictment as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Rynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapano, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg.. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 8/3/16)(jm) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                INDICTMENT UNSEALED as to Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                  Case Designated ECF as to Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 8/4/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                    Attorney update in case as to Pasquale Parrello, Joseph Merlino, Eugene O'Nofrio, Conrad Ianniello, Israel Torres, Anthony Zinzi, Anthony Vazzano, Alex Conigliaro, Frank Barbone, Ralph Balsamo, Pasquale Maiorino, John Spirito, Vincent Casablanca, Marco Minuto, Paul Cassano, Daniel Marino, Jr., John Lembo, Mitchell Fusco, Reynold Alberti, Vincent Terracciano, Joseph Tomanelli, Agostino Camacho, Nicholas Devito, Anthony Cassetta, Nicholas Vuolo, Bradford Wedra, Michael Poli, Pasquale Capolongo, Anthony Depalma, John Tognino, Mark Maiuzzo, Joseph Dimarco, Harold Thomas, Richard Lacava, Vincent Thomas, Anthony Camisa, Frank Trapani, Anthony Cirillo, Carmine Gallo, Joseph Falco, Francesco Depergola, Ralph Santaniello, Laurence Keith Allen, Craig Bagon, Bradley Sirkin, Wayne Kreisberg. Attorney Amanda Kay Kramer,Jessica Rose Lonergan,Abigail S. Kurland for USA added.. (jm)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      Sealed Legal Document 2 Filed: 8/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                      SEALED INDICTMENT as to Pasquale Parrello (1) count(s) 1, 2, Joseph Merlino (2) count(s) 1, Eugene O'Nofrio (3) count(s) 1, Conrad Ianniello (4) count(s) 1, Israel Torres (5) count(s) 1, 2, Anthony Zinzi (6) count(s) 1, 3, Anthony Vazzano (7) count(s) 1, Alex Conigliaro (8) count(s) 1, Frank Barbone (9) count(s) 1, Ralph Balsamo (10) count(s) 1, Pasquale Maiorino (11) count(s) 1, John Spirito (12) count(s) 1, Vincent Casablanca (13) count(s) 1, Marco Minuto (14) count(s) 1, Paul Cassano (15) count(s) 1, Daniel Marino, Jr. (16) count(s) 1, John Lembo (17) count(s) 1, Mitchell Fusco (18) count(s) 1, 4, Rynold Alberti (19) count(s) 1, Vincent Terracciano (20) count(s) 1, Joseph Tomanelli (21) count(s) 1, Agostino Camacho (22) count(s) 1, Nicholas Devito (23) count(s) 1, Anthony Cassetta (24) count(s) 1, Nicholas Vuolo (25) count(s) 1, Bradford Wedra (26) count(s) 1, Michael Poli (27) count(s) 1, Pasquale Capolongo (28) count(s) 1, Anthony Depalma (29) count(s) 1, John Tognino (30) count(s) 1, Mark Maiuzzo (31) count(s) 1, 3, Joseph Dimarco (32) count(s) 1, Harold Thomas (33) count(s) 1, Richard Lacava (34) count(s) 1, Vincent Thomas (35) count(s) 1, Anthony Camisa (36) count(s) 1, Frank Trapano (37) count(s) 1, Anthony Cirillo (38) count(s) 1, Carmine Gallo (39) count(s) 1, Joseph Falco (40) count(s) 1, Francesco Depergola (41) count(s) 1, Ralph Santaniello (42) count(s) 1, Laurence Keith Allen (43) count(s) 1, Craig Bagon (44) count(s) 1, Bradley Sirkin (45) count(s) 1, Wayne Kreisberg (46) count(s) 1. (jm) (Entered: 08/05/2016)
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Statistics

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        This case has been viewed 12 times.

                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Space
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                         
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        PlainSite
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Sign Up
                                                                                                                                                                                                                                                        Need Password Help?