Murphy v. GE Money Bank

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:06-cv-00046
District Judge Larry M. Boyle, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Larry M. Boyle
Last Updated January 31, 2019 at 12:52 AM EST (6.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo Michael D Murphy, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY John L Gannon +1 208 433 0629 +1 208 343 5807 johngannon100@aol.com
v.
GE Money Bank GE Money Bank, Defendant

Represented by Gjording Fouser PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Trudy Hanson Fouser +1 208 336 9777 tfouser@gfidaholaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1681
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
Timeline
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/14/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE re 23 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by GE Money Bank.. This matter is dismissed with prejudice with each party bearing their own costs and attorney fees.. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jg, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal by GE Money Bank. (Fouser, Trudy)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 11/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 21 Motion to Seal Document 19 Judgment Offer. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 11/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION to Seal Document 19 Judgment Offer by GE Money Bank. Responses due by 11/27/2006 (Fouser, Trudy)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/31/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Mikel H. Williams : Settlement Conference held on 10/31/2006. This case has settled. Paperwork forthcoming. (al, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
JUDGMENT OFFER filed by GE Money Bank. (Fouser, Trudy)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/4/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER Settlement Conference set for 10/31/2006 09:30 AM in Boise, ID before Honorable Mikel H. Williams.. Signed by Judge Mikel H. Williams. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by jg, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/26/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER granting 16 Stipulation Re: Case Managment cutoff dates filed by GE Money Bank, ADR Plan to be filed by 11/1/2006. Amended Pleadings due by 11/1/2006. Discovery due by 11/1/2006.. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dks, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/25/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION Re: Case Management Cutoff Dates by GE Money Bank. (Fouser, Trudy)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Amended Pleadings due by 10/1/2006. Discovery due by 11/1/2006. Joinder of Parties due by 10/1/2006. Dispositive Motions due by 10/1/2006. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by ja, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/13/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Larry M. Boyle : Court shall enter Scheduling Order and refer this matter for a Settlement Conference. (Court Reporter v.jones.) (lc, ) Additional attachment(s) added on 6/13/2006 (lc, ).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 5/19/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Hearing:Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 6/13/2006 02:30 PM (Mtn. Time) in Boise, ID before Honorable Larry M. Boyle. Mr. Gannon to initiate Conference Call at 208-334-1495.(caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by lc, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (dkh, ) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT filed. (dkh, ) (Entered: 05/16/2006)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DOCKET TEXT NOTICE: ALL PARTIES SHALL FILE CONSENT ELECTION FORMS- REFER TO DOC. 2. (lc, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 5/9/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Michael D Murphy. (dkh, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 5/3/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CORRECTIVE ENTRY - The entry docket number 8 Request for Admissions filed by Michael D Murphy, was filed incorrectly in this case. These are not to be filed pursuant to Civil Rule 5.4 - non filing of discovery or disclosure and discovery materials specifically requests for admission. Counsel is asked not to file these in the future. (dkh, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
REQUEST for Admissions by Michael D Murphy.(Gannon, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 5/1/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE by Michael D Murphy Notice of Compliance (Gannon, John)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 3/29/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
CONSENT filed. (dkh, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 3/27/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for GE Money Bank re 4 Answer to Complaint (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dkh, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 3/24/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Defendant GE Money Bank's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by GE Money Bank.(Fouser, Trudy)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 2/15/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Reissued as to GE Money Bank. (dkh, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 2/6/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER that plas shall submit a litigation plan and consent forms; DDL 5/6/06 . Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dkh, )
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 2/2/2006, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Michael D Murphy re 1 Complaint (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by dkh, )
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 1 time.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?