Estrada Rodriguez v. Bletcher
Federal Civil Lawsuit Oregon District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00381
Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 7:23 PM EST (2.8 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

Space Space

No Logo Hector Sepulveda Mendoza, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bonnie E. Allen-Sailer +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 bonnie@nwjp.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
No Logo Jose Manuel Mejia, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bonnie E. Allen-Sailer +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 bonnie@nwjp.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
No Logo Leonardo Cervantes Martinez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bonnie E. Allen-Sailer +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 bonnie@nwjp.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
No Logo Raul Estrada Rodriguez, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bonnie E. Allen-Sailer +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 bonnie@nwjp.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
No Logo Victor Alfonso Sepulveda Mendoza, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Law Offices of D. Michael Dale

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED D. Michael Dale +1 503 357 8290 +1 503 357 8290 michaeldale@dmichaeldale.net

Toggle Switch Represented by Northwest Workers' Justice Project

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Bonnie E. Allen-Sailer +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 bonnie@nwjp.org
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich +1 503 525 8454 +1 503 946 3029 corinna@nwjp.org
v.
No Logo Robert Bletcher, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 106

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jesse D Conway +1 360 906 1007 +1 360 906 8155 jesse@conwaylaw.net
No Logo Steven Reseigne, Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Suite 106

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY, ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Jesse D Conway +1 360 906 1007 +1 360 906 8155 jesse@conwaylaw.net
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1938
Nature of Suit 710 - Labor: Fair Labor Standards Act
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 10/12/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
60-DAY ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court having been informed by counsel for the parties that this action has been settled, IT IS ORDERED that, pursuant to LR 41-1, this action is dismissed with prejudice and without costs and with leave, upon good cause shown within sixty (60) days, to have this order of dismissal set aside and the action reinstated if the settlement is not consummated. Pending motions, if any, are denied as moot. All pretrial deadlines and any trial date are stricken. By Clerk of Court Mary L. Moran. (gw) (Entered: 10/12/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 7/11/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) Agreement . Filed by Robert Bletcher. (Conway, Jesse) (Entered: 07/11/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      Full Consent by all Parties to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge. (ecp) (Entered: 06/30/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/22/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        MINUTES of Proceedings: Rule 16 Conference held by telephone before Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman on 6/22/2016. ORDER SETTING the following case management schedule: Parties are to amend pleadings or add any additional parties or claims by 9/5/2016. Discovery is to be completed by 10/11/2016. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 10/11/2016. Dispositive Motions are due by 11/10/2016. If no dispositive motions are filed, the Court will schedule a conference to set pretrial order and trial deadlines. Consents to Magistrate, if any, are to be filed by 11/10/2016. Signed consent forms must be mailed or delivered to the Clerk's Office, as they cannot be filed electronically. The parties are advised that a telephone conference must be scheduled with Judge Beckerman before any discovery motion is filed. Corinna R. Spencer-Scheurich present as counsel for plaintiffs. Jesse D. Conway present as counsel for defendants. Court Reporter: None. Tape No.: None. Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman presiding. (gw) (Entered: 06/22/2016)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/10/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          SCHEDULING ORDER: Setting a Rule 16 Conference for Wednesday, June 22, 2016 at 11:00 AM by telephone. Local Rules 16-2(b) and 26-1 require that counsel confer before the conference. At the conference, counsel should be prepared to discuss the status of the case, relevant dates and deadlines, and any other significant issues. If the parties plan to present a proposed schedule, they should e-mail the schedule to giselle_williams@ord.uscourts.gov, by noon the day before the conference. The parties shall call into the court's conference line (phone number to be provided via separate e-mail) five minutes before the scheduled conference time. The court will join the conference call at the appointed time. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman (gw) (Entered: 06/10/2016)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            Answer to 1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses. Filed by Robert Bletcher. (Conway, Jesse) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/8/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
              Notice Of Jesse D. Conway's Unavailability Filed by All Defendants (Conway, Jesse) (Entered: 06/08/2016)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/2/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                Notice Of Jesse D. Conway's Unavailability Filed by All Defendants (Conway, Jesse) (Entered: 06/02/2016)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 5/24/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Robert Bletcher waiver sent on 4/8/2016. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 05/24/2016)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 5/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Notice of Appearance of Jesse D. Conway appearing on behalf of All Defendants Filed by on behalf of All Defendants (Conway, Jesse) (Entered: 05/23/2016)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 5/16/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Waiver of Service of Summons Returned Executed by Steven Reseigne waiver sent on 4/8/2016. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 05/16/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Summons Issued Electronically as to Robert Bletcher, Steven Reseigne. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. (Attachments: # 1 issued summons) (ecp) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/1/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                          Notice of Case Assignment to Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the summonses and all documents issued by the Clerk at the time of filing upon all named parties in accordance with Local Rule 3-5. Discovery is to be completed by 6/29/2016. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 7/29/2016. Pretrial Order is due by 7/29/2016. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Stacie F. Beckerman. (ecp) (Entered: 03/01/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 2/29/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Complaint. Filing fee in the amount of $400 collected. Agency Tracking ID: 0979-4506679 Jury Trial Requested: Yes. Filed by Raul Estrada Rodriguez, Hector Sepulveda Mendoza, Jose Manuel Mejia, Leonardo Cervantes Martinez, Victor Alfonso Sepulveda Mendoza against All Defendants (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Proposed Summons Bletcher, # 3 Proposed Summons Reseigne). (Spencer-Scheurich, Corinna) (Entered: 02/29/2016)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 0 times.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?