Overstreet v. Omni Hotels Management Corporation
Federal Civil Lawsuit Arizona District Court, Case No. 2:17-cv-01801
District Judge Diane J. Humetewa, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 7, 2019 at 4:52 PM ST (2.2 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Cornele A Overstreet, Petitioner

Toggle Switch Represented by National Labor Relations Board

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Judith Elizabeth Davila +1 602 640 2121 +1 602 640 2178 judith.davila@nlrb.gov
v.
No Logo Omni Hotels Management Corporation, Respondent

Toggle Switch Represented by Seyfarth Shaw LLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Monica Rodriguez +1 310 277 7200 +1 310 201 5219 morodriguez@seyfarth.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Brian M Stolzenbach +1 312 346 8000 +1 312 269 8869 bstolzenbach@seyfarth.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (25) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER: The parties' Stipulation of Dismissal 22 is granted. This action is dismissed in its entirety, each party to bear its own attorneys' fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate this action. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 9/15/2017. (LMR) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 9/15/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    First MOTION to Dismiss Case Stipulation of Dismissal by Cornele A Overstreet. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Davila, Judith) (Entered: 09/15/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 8/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      NOTICE re: Petitioner's Notice of Issuance of Consolidated Complaint and Rescheduling of Hearing in Underlying Administrative Proceedings by Cornele A Overstreet . (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit Appendix of Exhibits to Petitioner's Notice of Issuance of Consolidated Complaint and Rescheduling of Hearing in Underlying Administrative Proceedings)(Davila, Judith) (Entered: 08/01/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
        RESPONSE in Opposition re: 8 MOTION to Try Petition Based on Administrative Record, Affidavits, & Other Documentary Evidence filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 6/26/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
          RESPONSE to Motion re: 6 First MOTION to Expedite Hearing and Pleading Schedule filed by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 06/26/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            MEMORANDUM of Points and Authorities in Support of 1 Complaint/Petition by Petitioner Cornele A Overstreet. (KAS) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 6/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              ORDER - Petitioner's Motion for Leave to File Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Excess of Page Limitations (Doc. 7 ) is GRANTED. The Clerk of Court shall file the Memorandum currently lodged at Doc. 5 . The parties' Stipulation of No Discovery (Doc. 16 ) is GRANTED. In light of the parties' agreement that discovery will not be conducted in this case, the parties are exempt from the requirements of the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot project. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 06/20/2017. (KAS) (Entered: 06/20/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 6/19/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                STIPULATION OF NO DISCOVERY by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order)(Rodriguez, Monica) (Entered: 06/19/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Monica Rodriguez on behalf of Omni Hotels Management Corporation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  Remark: Pro hac vice motion granted for Brian M Stolzenbach on behalf of Omni Hotels Management Corporation. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 6/13/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Corporate Disclosure Statement by Omni Hotels Management Corporation. (Stolzenbach, Brian) (Entered: 06/13/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                      ORDER that a motion pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) is discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing a motion to dismiss to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 6/12/2017. (LMR) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 1 Complaint Appendix of Exhibits and Affidavits in Support of Petition for Temporary Injunction Under Section 10j of the National Labor Relations Act by Petitioner Cornele A Overstreet. (Davila, Judith) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 1 Complaint Proposed Order Granting 10j Injunction by Petitioner Cornele A Overstreet. (Davila, Judith) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 1 Complaint Certificate of Service by Petitioner Cornele A Overstreet. (Davila, Judith) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                              Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 1 Complaint Proposed Order to Show Cause by Petitioner Cornele A Overstreet. (Davila, Judith) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                Additional Attachments to Main Document re: 1 Complaint Jurat by Petitioner Cornele A Overstreet. (Davila, Judith) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                  *Motion to Try Petition Based on Administrative Record, Affidavits, & Other Documentary Evidence. Filed by Cornele A Overstreet. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Try on Admin Record)(Davila, Judith) *Modified to correct event type on 6/13/2017 (KAS). (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                    *First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages for Motion to Exceed Page Limitations re : 5 LODGED Proposed Petitioner's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support by Cornele A Overstreet. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Exceed Page Limitations)(Davila, Judith) *Modified to link document on 6/13/2017 (KAS). (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                      First MOTION to Expedite Hearing and Pleading Schedule by Cornele A Overstreet. (Attachments: # 1 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Expedite)(Davila, Judith) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                        *Filed at (Doc. 18 ) pursuant to 17 Order -- LODGED Proposed Petitioner's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of 1 Petition for Temporary Injunction Under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act. Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation for Leave to File or Amend is granted. Filed by Cornele A Overstreet. (Davila, Judith) *Modified to link document on 6/13/2017 (KAS). Modified on 6/20/2017 (KAS). (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 6/12/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                          NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re: Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. No further action is required. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KAS) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (KAS) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                                              This case has been assigned to the Honorable Judge Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-17-1801-PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (KAS) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 6/9/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                                COMPLAINT / PETITION for Temporary Injunction Under Section 10(j) of the National Labor Relations Act, as Amended [29 USC 160(j)] filed by Cornele A Overstreet. (Submitted by Judith Davila) (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KAS) (Entered: 06/12/2017)
                                                  Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                  Statistics

                                                  This case has been viewed 11 times.

                                                  No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                  Space
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                  Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                   
                                                  PlainSite
                                                  Sign Up
                                                  Need Password Help?