Schreier v. Drealan Kvilhaug Hoefker & Co. P.A.
Federal Civil Lawsuit Minnesota District Court, Case No. 0:18-cv-02310
District Judge David S. Doty, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated May 19, 2020 at 7:20 PM DT (11.8 months ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Drealan Kvilhaug Hoefker & Co. P.A., Counter-Claimant

Toggle Switch Represented by Meagher & Geer, PLLP

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark A Bloomquist +1 612 338 0661 Mbloomquist@meagher.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Laura E. Kuipers +1 612 338 0661 +1 612 877 3140 lkuipers@meagher.com
No Logo Hedeen Hughes & Wetering, Defendant
No Logo Allan M. Schreier, Counter-Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by DeWitt Mackall Crounse & Moore

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Mark G Ohnstad +1 612 305 1416 +1 612 305 1414 mgo@dewittmcm.com
Citation Section 18 U.S.C. § 1961
Nature of Suit 470 - Civil (RICO) Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 110 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Judgment - Cost
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 109 Filed: 5/19/2020, Entered: None Judgment - Cost
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 99 Filed: 3/25/2020, Entered: None Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 98 Filed: 3/24/2020, Entered: None Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/27/2018, Entered: None Scheduling Order
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/5/2018, Entered: None MDL Pretrial Order
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 8/15/2018, Entered: None
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 8/10/2018, Entered: None Court Filing
                ORDER/NOTICE of Setting: Pretrial Conference set for 10/3/2018 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8E (MPLS) before Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Signed by Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez on 8/10/2018. (Attachments: # 1 Consent Form) (KAT) (Entered: 08/10/2018)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 8/9/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
                  TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge David S. Doty per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Katherine M. Menendez. Please use case number 18cv2310 DSD/KMM. (AKL) (Entered: 08/09/2018)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    ANSWER to Complaint of Drealan Kvilhaug Hoefker & Co. P.A., COUNTERCLAIM against Allan M. Schreier. filed by Drealan Kvilhaug Hoefker & Co., P.A.. (Bloomquist, Mark) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 8/8/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      EXHIBIT 8 Second Amended Complaint with Exhibits re 1 Notice of Removal,,,. (Bloomquist, Mark) (Entered: 08/08/2018)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        AFFIDAVIT of Service by Drealan Kvilhaug Hoefker & Co., P.A. re 1 Notice of Removal,,, (Bloomquist, Mark) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. There is no parent corporation, publicly held corporation or wholly-owned subsidiary to report for Defendant Drealan Kvilhaug Hoefker & Co., P.A.. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Bloomquist, Mark) (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/7/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                            NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Nobles County Distric Court, case number 53-cv-17-505 (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6288486) filed by Drealan Kvilhaug Hoefker & Co., P.A.. No summons requested. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Demand for Removal and Appeal from Conciliation Court, # 2 Exhibit(s) Court's Order Vacating Conciliation Court Judgment, # 3 Exhibit(s) Judicial Order to Recuse, # 4 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, # 5 Exhibit(s) Scheduling Order, # 6 Exhibit(s) Order Regarding Discovery Motions, # 7 Exhibit(s) Amended Scheduling Order, ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE-# 8 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, ATTACHMENT FILED IN ERROR-WILL REFILE SEPARATELY-# 9 Exhibit(s) DKH's Answer to Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, # 10 Exhibit(s) Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Bloomquist, Mark) Modified on 8/8/2018 (AKL). (Entered: 08/07/2018)
                              Request RequestSpace LREF

                              Statistics

                              This case has been viewed 1 time.

                              No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                              Space
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                              Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                               
                              PlainSite
                              Sign Up
                              Need Password Help?