Shears v. Associated Creditors Exchange

Federal Civil Lawsuit Idaho District Court, Case No. 1:12-cv-00137
District Judge Larry M. Boyle, presiding
Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
District Judge Larry M. Boyle
Last Updated February 1, 2019 at 12:52 AM EST (6.2 years ago) Update UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert AlertsSpaceJump Jump
Summary

No one has written a summary of this case yet. Sign up or sign in to contribute one.

Parties
No Logo David Shears, Plaintiff

Represented by Unknown Firm

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Robert C Montgomery +1 208 322 8865 bmontgomerylaw@gmail.com

Represented by Krohn and Moss, Ltd.

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, PRO HAC VICE, LEAD ATTORNEY Ryan Scott Lee +1 323 988 2400 +1 866 583 3695 rlee@consumerlawcenter.com
v.
No Logo Associated Creditors Exchange, Defendant

Represented by Duke Scanlan & Hall, PLLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Aubrey Dean Lyon +1 208 345 8600 adl@dukescanlan.com

Represented by P. O. Box 1576

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Terrence Scott Jones +1 208 780 3939 +1 208 780 3030 tsj@quanelaw.com
Attributes
Citation Section 15 U.S.C. § 1692
Nature of Suit 480 - Consumer Credit
Timeline
  Entries (20) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION re: 17 Stipulation of Dismissal filed by Associated Creditors Exchange. Signed by Judge Larry M. Boyle. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 10/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Associated Creditors Exchange. (Lyon, Aubrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 10/8/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by David Shears (Montgomery, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Change of Address by Aubrey Dean Lyon (Lyon, Aubrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 8/24/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Settlement by David Shears (Montgomery, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 6/29/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DOCKET ENTRY ORDER granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of attorney Ryan Lee for David Shears. Per General Order 206, out-of-state counsel shall immediately register for ECF. (Notice sent to CM/ECF Registration Clerk) (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 6/28/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE APPEARANCE by Ryan Lee. ( Filing fee $ 225 receipt number 0976-900265.)Robert C Montgomery appearing for Plaintiff David Shears. Responses due by 7/23/2012 (Montgomery, Robert) (Main Document 12 replaced to prevent any changes on 7/3/2012) (krb).
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
DOCKET ENTRY NOTICE of Case Number Change, Case reassigned to Judge Larry M. Boyle for all further proceedings. Judge Edward J. Lodge no longer assigned to case. Bench trial set before Judge Lodge for 10/22/13 vacated. Please use this case number on all future pleadings, 12-00137-S-LMB (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 6/15/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ALL PARTIES HAVE CONSENTED TO PROCEED BEFORE A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE(dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 6/7/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
SCHEDULING ORDER referring all non-dispositive matters to U.S. Magistrate Judge Larry M. Boyle; Referring settlement conference to U.S. Magistrate Mikel H. Williams; Amended Pleadings and Joinder of Parties due by 2/1/2013. Judicially Supervised Settlement Conference shall be held by 4/1/2013. Motions due by 4/1/2013. Bench Trial set for 10/22/2013 09:30 AM in Boise - Courtroom 2 before Judge Edward J. Lodge.. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 6/5/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SCHEDULING CONFERENCE FORM - LITIGATION PLAN by Associated Creditors Exchange. (Lyon, Aubrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 6/4/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
Docket entry only - CONSENT to Magistrate Judge filed. (dks) (Entered: 06/05/2012)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 4/26/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Associated Creditors Exchange. (Lyon, Aubrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 4/20/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE: Pursuant to FRCP 7.1 you are required to file a Corporate Disclosure Statement with the Clerk's Office. You can do this by choosing the category Other Documents, then select Corporate Disclosure Statement. (cjm)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 4/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
NOTICE of Availability of Magistrate Judge and Requirement for Consent sent to counsel for Associated Creditors Exchange, David Shears re 5 Answer to Complaint Consent/Objection to Magistrate due by 6/21/2012. (krb)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 4/18/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
ANSWER to 1 Complaint by Associated Creditors Exchange.(Lyon, Aubrey)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 4/3/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Shears. Associated Creditors Exchange served on 3/28/2012, answer due 4/18/2012. (Montgomery, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 3/22/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
LITIGATION ORDER- Telephonic Scheduling Conference set for 6/19/2012 10:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing - Boise Chambers before Judge Edward J. Lodge.. Signed by Judge Edward J. Lodge. (caused to be mailed to non Registered Participants at the addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) by (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
Summons Issued as to Associated Creditors Exchange. (Print attached Summons for service.) (dks)
Request RequestSpace LREF
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 3/19/2012, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
COMPLAINT against Associated Creditors Exchange ( Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0976-861066.), filed by David Shears. (Attachments: # 1 Cover Sheet, # 2 Summons)(Montgomery, Robert)
Request RequestSpace LREF

Statistics

This case has been viewed 2 times.

Space
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
 
PlainSite
Sign Up
Need Password Help?