Gholston v. North American Lighting Inc
Federal Civil Lawsuit Alabama Northern District Court, Case No. 2:16-cv-02065
District Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 6:48 PM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Kimberly Gholston, Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Felicia Teanna Long

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Kira Yalon Fonteneau +1 205 564 9005 +1 205 564 9006 kira@5pointslaw.com

Toggle Switch Represented by FONTENEAU & ARNOLD LLC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Allen Durham Arnold +1 205 252 1550 +1 205 252 1556 allen@fonteneauarnold.com
v.
No Logo North American Lighting, Inc., Defendant

Toggle Switch Represented by Lehr Middlebrooks Price & Vreeland, PC

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Albert Loring Vreeland, II +1 205 326 9266 +1 205 326 3008 avreeland@lehrmiddlebrooks.com
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 751 - Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
  Entries (14) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
ORDER - Plaintiff Kimberly Gholston and Defendant North American Lighting, Inc. filed a Stipulation for Dismissal with prejudice. (Doc. 12). The Court ORDERS that this action is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The parties are to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 9/18/2017. (KEK) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 9/18/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    STIPULATION of Dismissal by Kimberly Gholston. filed by Kimberly Gholston (Arnold, Allen) (Entered: 09/18/2017)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 11 Filed: 3/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
      QUALIFIED HIPAA PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 2/28/2017. (KEK) (Entered: 03/01/2017)
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 10 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
        SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/24/2017, at 11:00 AM, Hugo L Black US Courthouse, Birmingham, AL. Discovery due by 11/1/2017. Dispositive motions due by 12/1/2017. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 2/28/2017. (YMB) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 9 Filed: 2/28/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
          TEXT ORDER: The parties' Rule 26 report contains a request for the Court to enter the parties' proposed HIPAA order attached to the Rule 26 report as Exhibit A. (Doc. 8, pp. 3-4). The Court GRANTS the parties' request for a HIPAA order but DENIES the parties' request to adopt the parties' proposed HIPAA order. The Court will enter its standing HIPAA order. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 2/28/2017. (KEK) (Entered: 02/28/2017)
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 8 Filed: 2/27/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
            REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Attachments: # 1 Text of Proposed Order HIPAA Order)(Arnold, Allen) (Entered: 02/27/2017)
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 7 Filed: 2/2/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document TypeCourt Filing
              INITIAL ORDER. Signed by Judge Madeline Hughes Haikala on 2/2/2017. (KEK) (Entered: 02/02/2017)
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 6 Filed: 2/1/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                ANSWER to 1 Complaint by North American Lighting Inc.(Vreeland, Albert) (Entered: 02/01/2017)
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 5 Filed: 1/20/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                  SUMMONS Returned Executed North American Lighting Inc served on 1/13/2017, answer due 2/3/2017. (AVC) (Entered: 01/20/2017)
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 4 Filed: 1/11/2017, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                    Summons Issued as to North American Lighting Inc. Sent via certified mail. (KEK) (Entered: 01/11/2017)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-2762084. related document 1 COMPLAINT against North American Lighting Inc, filed by Kimberly Gholston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KAM, ). (Arnold, Allen)
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                      NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Kimberly Gholston (KAM, ) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                        Request for service by certified mail filed by Kimberly Gholston. (KAM, ) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/23/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                          COMPLAINT against North American Lighting Inc, filed by Kimberly Gholston. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(KAM, ) (Entered: 12/27/2016)
                            Request RequestSpace LREF

                            Statistics

                            This case has been viewed 11 times.

                            No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                            Space
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                            Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                             
                            PlainSite
                            Sign Up
                            Need Password Help?