Moses v. City of San Antonio
Federal Civil Lawsuit Texas Western District Court, Case No. 5:18-cv-01302
District Judge Orlando L. Garcia, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated April 22, 2020 at 3:24 PM DT (1.1 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Maurice A. Moses, Sr., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by #01566522

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
Space Maurice A. Moses, Sr.
v.
No Logo 5th Circuit Court of Appeals, Defendant
No Logo Angela J. Moore, Defendant
No Logo Angus Kelly McGinty, Defendant
No Logo Bexar County, Defendant
No Logo Brittany Jensen, Defendant
No Logo City of San Antonio, Defendant
No Logo David A. Ezra, Defendant
No Logo David Lunan, Defendant
No Logo FNU Clement, Defendant
No Logo FNU Davis, Defendant
No Logo FNU Dennis, Defendant
No Logo FNU Haynes, Defendant
No Logo FNU Higginbotham, Defendant
No Logo FNU Higginson, Defendant
No Logo FNU Owen, Defendant
No Logo FNU Reavley, Defendant
No Logo FNU Smith, Defendant
No Logo Harry Lee Hudspeth, Defendant
No Logo Jeannette J. Clack, Defendant
No Logo Lyle W. Cayce, Defendant
No Logo Nicolas LaHood, Defendant
No Logo Phillip Kazen, Defendant
No Logo Susan Reed, Defendant
No Logo The Texas Court of Criminal Appeals, Defendant
No Logo Xavier Rodriguez, Defendant
Citation Section 42 U.S.C. § 1983
Nature of Suit 550 - Prisoner Petitions: Civil Rights
  Entries (23) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 28 Filed: 4/22/2020, Entered: None Letter of Transmittal from USCA
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 27 Filed: 1/23/2020, Entered: None Filing Fee Received
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 26 Filed: 12/10/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Objection
        Request RequestSpace LREF
        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 25 Filed: 11/15/2019, Entered: None Order
          Request RequestSpace LREF
          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 24 Filed: 11/8/2019, Entered: None USCA Judgment/Mandate
            Request RequestSpace LREF
            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 23 Filed: 11/5/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Objection
              Request RequestSpace LREF
              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 22 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Recusal
                Request RequestSpace LREF
                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 21 Filed: 10/17/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 20 Filed: 10/15/2019, Entered: None Recusal
                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 19 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion for Recusal
                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 18 Filed: 10/4/2019, Entered: None Order Referring Motion
                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 17 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Letter of Transmittal from USCA
                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 16 Filed: 9/30/2019, Entered: None Order Directing Prisoner Payment - TDCJ
                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 15 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis
                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 14 Filed: 9/24/2019, Entered: None Miscellaneous Objection
                                Request RequestSpace LREF
                                Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 13 Filed: 8/21/2019, Entered: None Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal
                                  Request RequestSpace LREF
                                  Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 12 Filed: 8/6/2019, Entered: None Proceed In Forma Pauperis on Appeal
                                    Request RequestSpace LREF
                                    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None Remark
                                      Request RequestSpace LREF
                                      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/13/2018, Entered: None case referred to magistrate judge
                                        Request RequestSpace LREF
                                        Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Proceed In Forma PauperisCourt Filing
                                        MOTION to Proceed in forma pauperis by Maurice A. Moses, Sr. Motions referred to Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (dtg) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
                                          Request RequestSpace LREF
                                          Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Complaint
                                          COMPLAINT, filed by Maurice A. Moses, Sr. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Copy of Cover Letter, # 3 Copy of Envelope)(dtg) (Entered: 12/13/2018)
                                            Request RequestSpace LREF
                                            Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
                                            CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Henry J. Bemporad. (dtg)
                                              Request RequestSpace LREF
                                              Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required)  Filed: 12/11/2018, Entered: None Remark
                                                Request RequestSpace LREF

                                                Statistics

                                                This case has been viewed 4 times.

                                                No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
                                                Space
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
                                                 
                                                PlainSite
                                                Sign Up
                                                Need Password Help?