Peco Foods, Inc. v. United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1529, AFL-CIO, CLC
Federal Civil Lawsuit Mississippi Southern District Court, Case No. 3:16-cv-00670
District Judge Daniel P. Jordan, III, presiding

Tags No tags have been applied so far. Sign in to add some.
Last Updated February 2, 2019 at 10:56 AM ST (2.3 years ago) Request Update Request UpdateSpaceE-Mail Alert Get E-Mail Alerts

No Logo Peco Foods, Inc., Plaintiff

Toggle Switch Represented by Brunini Grantham et al

Name Phone Fax E-Mail
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED, LEAD ATTORNEY Stephen J. Carmody +1 601 948 3101 scarmody@brunini.com
ATTORNEY TO BE NOTICED Lauren O. Lawhorn +1 601 960 6850 +1 601 960 6902 llawhorn@brunini.com
v.
No Logo United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1529, AFL-CIO, CLC, Defendant
Citation Section 29 U.S.C. § 160(1)
Nature of Suit 720 - Labor: Labor/Management Relations
  Entries (3) Tab Overlap Calendar Events Tab Overlap Related (0) Tab Overlap Tools Right End
Save 25% on a pre-paid one year subscription.
Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 3 Filed: 8/30/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Peco Foods, Inc. (Carmody, Stephen) (Entered: 08/30/2016)
    Request RequestSpace LREF
    Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 2 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
    Summons Issued as to United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1529, AFL-CIO, CLC. (TLC) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
      Request RequestSpace LREF
      Legal Document (Payment Possibly Required) 1 Filed: 8/26/2016, Entered: None Unknown Document Type
      COMPLAINT against United Food and Commercial Workers International Union, Local 1529, AFL-CIO, CLC ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 34643040866), filed by Peco Foods, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Exhibit A - Agreement).(TLC) (Entered: 08/26/2016)
        Request RequestSpace LREF

        Statistics

        This case has been viewed 9 times.

        No comments have been added yet. Sign in to post a comment.
        Space
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
        Issues Laws Cases Pro Articles Firms Entities
         
        PlainSite
        Sign Up
        Need Password Help?